Farris v. Kohl et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Farris
Defendant: Eric Kohl, Erik Kohlrus, Christine Brannon, Clara Charron, Norine Ashley, Lisa Johnson, Patrick Keane, Mike Funk, Felipe Zavala, Alan Pasley, J. Woolfolk, Matthew Mitchey, James Barry, William Lemon, A. Adams, Snyder, Jones, Locke and Unknown Logan Correctional Internal Affairs Investigators
Case Number: 3:2017cv03279
Filed: November 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Sue E. Myerscough
Presiding Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff Jacqueline Farris' Motion to Strike Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2)(C) Disclosure of Ryan Nottingham 201 is DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff Jacqueline Farris' Renewed Motion for Leave to Take Depositions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(a)(2) 150 is ALLOWED in part. The Court modifies the sched ule of this case with respect to Farris' claims against the Department Defendants as follows: Fact Discovery due by 2/3/2020; Plaintiff`s Expert Disclosure due by 3/4/2020; Department Defendant`s Expert Disclosure due by 4/6/2020; Expe rt Discovery due by 5/4/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2020. See written order. Final Pretrial Conference set 6/1/2020 is CANCELLED and reset 8/31/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 in Springfield before U.S. District Judge Sue E. Myerscough. Jury Trial set 6/16/2020 is CANCELLED and reset 9/15/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Myerscough. (LB, ilcd)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendants' Fifth Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests 106 is DENIED as moot; and Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel Discovery Respon ses and Response to Defendants' Fifth Motion for Extension of Time 108 and the matters reserved by the Court from Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Defendants to Participate in Discovery and to Enforce this Court's October 5, 2018 Order 102 are ALLOWED in part. The Department Defendants are directed to provide any missing verifications of answers to interrogatories by February 15, 2019. The Department Defendants are ordered to produce the additional discovery responses calle d for in this Opinion by February 28, 2019. The Court further ALLOWS Plaintiff's requests for fees and expenses incurred in filing her Motions as stated above. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a statement of the fees and expenses incurred in filing her two Motions at issue by February 22, 2019. The Department Defendants are given until March 22, 2019, to respond to the statement of fees and expenses.The existing Revised Scheduling Order 92 in this case provides that fact discovery is t o be completed on or before March 1, 2019, and that the parties have until April 1, 2019 to complete expert discovery. Given the necessity to resolve the numerous discovery disputes between the parties, it appears to the Court that the existing scheduling deadlines are unrealistic and, probably, untenable. Consequently, the Court orders the parties to confer and present a revised discovery schedule to the Court on or before February 28, 2019. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris v. Kohl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Kohlrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clara Charron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norine Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Pasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Woolfolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mitchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Logan Correctional Internal Affairs Investigators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Farris
Represented By: Sarah C Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?