Western Illinois Service Coordination et al v. Illinois Department of Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Western Illinois Service Coordination, F.L., Central Illinois Service Access and DayOne Pact
Defendant: Melissa Wright, Gary Kramer, Grace B. Hou, Division of Developmental Disabilities, Illinois Department of Human Services, Bobby Gilmore, Kathleen R. Ward and Grace B Hou
Intervenor: Service Inc of Illinois, Prairieland Service Coordination Inc and Service of Will Grundy and Kankakee Counties
Case Number: 3:2019cv03127
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 47 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. (MJC, ilcd)
July 8, 2019 TEXT ORDER BY RICHARD MILLS, United States District Judge: The Court is in receipt of a letter concerning this case. The letter shall be docketed and filed under seal, with copies to counsel. Entered on 7/8/2019. (MJC, ilcd)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Defendants' Consent Motion to Stay the deadline for filing an Answer #46 is GRANTED. The deadline is stayed pending resolution of the issues that are pending on appeal before the Seventh Circuit. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/28/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 46 Consent MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline by Defendants Division of Developmental Disabilities, Bobby Gilmore, Grace B Hou, Illinois Department of Human Services, Gary Kramer, Kathleen R. Ward, Melissa Wright. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Bracey, Joseph)
June 27, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on June 21, 2019, before Judge Richard Mills. Court Reporter/Transcriber JEJ. Transcript purchased by: Sarah Hunt. IMPORTANT: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Motion of Requested Redactions shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this motion will be restricted to the Court and the attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Motion are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public, without redaction, 90 days from the date initially filed. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the Clerk's Office public terminal or contact the Court Reporter for purchase. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from U S Court of Appeals regarding #40 Notice of Appeal, filed by Central Illinois Service Access, DayOne Pact, F.L. and Western Illinois Service Coordination. U S Court of Appeals Case Number is 19-2211 (Attachment: #1 U S Court of Appeals Notice of Case Opening)(MAS, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 43 Short Record of Appeal Sent to U S Court of Appeals regarding #40 Notice of Appeal. (MAS, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 42 Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Service Inc of Illinois against DayOnePact. (MAS, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 41 Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Prairieland Service Coordination Inc. against Western Illinois Service Coordination (MAS, ilcd) Modified on 6/25/2019 (MAS, ilcd).
June 25, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #39 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Intervene, by Central Illinois Service Access, DayOne Pact, F.L., Western Illinois Service Coordination. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0753-3135786. (Hunt, Sarah)
June 25, 2019 Filing 39 OPINION entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/25/2019. The Motion of Plaintiffs for a Preliminary Injunction, d/e #16 is DENIED. The Motion of Prairieland Service Coordination, Inc. to Intervene as of right, d/e #23 is GRANTED. The Motion of Service Inc. of Illinois f/k/a Service of Will, Grundy and Kankakee Counties to Intervene as of right, d/e #31 is GRANTED. (SEE WRITTEN OPINION) (MAS, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Parties and Intervenors telephonically contacted the Court as directed. The Parties reported that the Plaintiffs' settlement offer was rejected. There was no counteroffer from the Defendants. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/25/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 38 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List marked and admitted at Preliminary Injunction Hearing held 6/21/2019. Exhibits to be kept in Clerk's office vault. (GL, ilcd)
June 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Mills: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Hearing held on 6/21/2019. Attorneys Thomas E. Kennedy, Sarah Jane Hunt, and Maggi Carfield present on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Plaintiff Mary Jane Friedrich present on behalf of Western Illinois Service Coordination. Plaintiff Steve Boisse present on behalf of DayOne Pact. Plaintiff Mary McGlauchlen present on behalf of Central Illinois Service Access. Plaintiff Jeanette Gathman present as Guardian of F.L. Attorneys Joseph Bracey, Jr. and Shannon Fruth present on behalf of the Defendants. Defendant Bobby Gilmore present as Bureau Chief of Reimbursements and Programs Support for IDHS-DDD. Attorneys Jordan Klein and Jacob Swanson present on behalf of the Intervenors. Position stated of record as to motion. Witnesses sworn and testified. Exhibits admitted. Court questioned counsel as to case. Negotiated resolution discussed. Parties to notify court by 3:00 p.m. Monday, 6/24/2019, as to possible resolution. Order to enter following outcome of negotiations by parties. Oral motion by defense counsel granted for a seven day extension to file Answer to Complaint. Hearing adjourned. (Court Reporter J.J.) (GL, ilcd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Maggi Katherine Carfield on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carfield, Maggi)
June 21, 2019 Filing 36 Exhibit List for PI Hearing by Central Illinois Service Access, DayOne Pact, F.L., Western Illinois Service Coordination. (Hunt, Sarah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jacob Joel Swanson on behalf of Service Inc of Illinois (Swanson, Jacob)
June 20, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jordan Timothy Klein on behalf of Service Inc of Illinois (Klein, Jordan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jack Kiley on behalf of Service Inc. of Illinois (Kiley, Jack)
June 20, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Service Inc. of Illinois. (Kiley, Jack)
June 20, 2019 Filing 31 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Service Inc. of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint)(Kiley, Jack)
June 19, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Division of Developmental Disabilities, Bobby Gilmore, Grace B Hou, Illinois Department of Human Services, Gary Kramer, Kathleen R. Ward, Melissa Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HCBS Waiver)(Bracey, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jordan Timothy Klein on behalf of Prairieland Service Coordination Inc (Klein, Jordan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jacob Joel Swanson on behalf of Prairieland Service Coordination Inc (Swanson, Jacob)
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jack Kiley on behalf of PRAIRIELAND SERVICE COORDINATION, INC (Kiley, Jack)
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr on behalf of Division of Developmental Disabilities, Bobby Gilmore, Grace B Hou, Illinois Department of Human Services, Gary Kramer, Kathleen R. Ward, Melissa Wright (Bracey, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Shannon Lynn Fruth on behalf of Division of Developmental Disabilities, Bobby Gilmore, Grace B Hou, Illinois Department of Human Services, Gary Kramer, Kathleen R. Ward, Melissa Wright (Fruth, Shannon)
June 14, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by PRAIRIELAND SERVICE COORDINATION, INC. (Kiley, Jack)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor PRAIRIELAND SERVICE COORDINATION, INC. Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint)(Kiley, Jack)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pending is the Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #16 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. The Defendants' response is due by June 19, 2019. Because of the time-sensitive nature of the relief sought, a hearing on the motion is scheduled for June 21, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/12/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. Melissa Wright served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hunt, Sarah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. Bobby Gilmore served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hunt, Sarah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. Kathleen R. Ward served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hunt, Sarah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. Gary Kramer served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hunt, Sarah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. Grace B. Hou served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hunt, Sarah)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Central Illinois Service Access, DayOne Pact, F.L., Western Illinois Service Coordination. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Friedrich Declaration, #2 Affidavit McGlauchlen Declaration, #3 Affidavit Boisse Declaration, #4 Affidavit Propheter Declaration, #5 Affidavit Gathman Declaration, #6 Affidavit Hall Declaration, #7 Exhibit B RFI, #8 Exhibit C Letter, #9 Exhibit D NOFO, #10 Exhibit E DDD Funding, #11 Exhibit F Minutes, #12 Exhibit G ISSA Transfer Req, #13 Exhibit H ISSA Transfer Info, #14 Exhibit I Wright Email)(Hunt, Sarah)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Central Illinois Service Access, DayOne Pact, F.L., Western Illinois Service Coordination. Responses due by 6/19/2019 (Hunt, Sarah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Division of Developmental Disabilities, Bobby Gilmore, Grace B. Hou, Illinois Department of Human Services, Gary Kramer, Kathleen R. Ward, Melissa Wright, filed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hunt, Sarah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. Illinois Department of Human Services served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Hunt, Sarah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. Division of Developmental Disabilities served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019; Kathleen R. Ward served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Hunt, Sarah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Melissa Wright and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Kathleen R. Ward and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Gary Kramer and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Division of Developmental Disabilities and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bobby Gilmore and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Grace B. Hou and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Illinois Department of Human Services and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas E Kennedy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kennedy, Thomas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit re #1 Complaint, Exhibit A by Central Illinois Service Access, DayOne Pact, F.L., Western Illinois Service Coordination. (Hunt, Sarah)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Central Illinois Service Access, DayOne Pact, F.L., Western Illinois Service Coordination. (Hunt, Sarah)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sarah Jane Hunt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hunt, Sarah)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Division of Developmental Disabilities, Bobby Gilmore, Grace B. Hou, Illinois Department of Human Services, Gary Kramer, Kathleen R. Ward, Melissa Wright ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3106796.), filed by F.L., Central Illinois Service Access, Western Illinois Service Coordination, DayOne Pact. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunt, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Illinois Service Coordination et al v. Illinois Department of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Wright
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kramer
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace B. Hou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Human Services
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Gilmore
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen R. Ward
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace B Hou
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Fruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Illinois Service Coordination
Represented By: Sarah Jane Hunt
Represented By: Thomas E Kennedy
Represented By: Maggi Katherine Carfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.L.
Represented By: Sarah Jane Hunt
Represented By: Thomas E Kennedy
Represented By: Maggi Katherine Carfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Illinois Service Access
Represented By: Sarah Jane Hunt
Represented By: Thomas E Kennedy
Represented By: Maggi Katherine Carfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DayOne Pact
Represented By: Sarah Jane Hunt
Represented By: Thomas E Kennedy
Represented By: Maggi Katherine Carfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Service Inc of Illinois
Represented By: Jack Kiley
Represented By: Jordan Timothy Klein
Represented By: Jacob Joel Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Prairieland Service Coordination Inc
Represented By: Jordan Timothy Klein
Represented By: Jack Kiley
Represented By: Jacob Joel Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Service of Will Grundy and Kankakee Counties
Represented By: Jack Kiley
Represented By: Jordan Timothy Klein
Represented By: Jacob Joel Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?