Clayborne et al v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Clayborne and Andrea Erley
Defendant: Jarod Maddox, City of Springfield, Illinois, Mike Brown, Michael Brown and City of Springfield
Case Number: 3:2020cv03145
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendants' Motion to Extend Time for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint #14 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 8/17/2020. (LB, ilcd)
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven C Rahn on behalf of Michael Brown, City of Springfield, Jarod Maddox (Rahn, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Michael Brown, City of Springfield, Jarod Maddox. Responses due by 7/20/2020 (Zimmerman, John)
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Michael Zimmerman on behalf of All Defendants (Zimmerman, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Alfred Clayborne as to City of Springfield. (Sabin, Scott)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Alfred Clayborne as to Michael Brown. (Sabin, Scott)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Alfred Clayborne as to Jarod Maddox. (Sabin, Scott)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Michael Brown, City of Springfield, Jarod Maddox on behalf of Plaintiff Alfred Clayborne. Originals returned to attorney Scott Sabin. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to City of Springfield, #2 Summons as to Jarod Maddox)(MJC, ilcd)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Michael Brown, City of Springfield, Jarod Maddox on behalf of Plaintiff Andrea Erley. Originals returned to attorney Frederick J Schlosser. (Attachments: #1 Summons to City of Springfield, #2 Summons to Jarod Maddox)(MJC, ilcd)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Erley. Michael Brown served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Schlosser, Frederick)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Erley. Jarod Maddox served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Schlosser, Frederick)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Erley. City of Springfield served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Schlosser, Frederick)
June 16, 2020 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Motion to Strike Document #2 (d/e #3 ) is ALLOWED. Entry of Appearance #2 is STRICKEN. (LB, ilcd)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Frederick J Schlosser on behalf of Andrea Erley (Schlosser, Frederick)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Strike #2 Notice of Appearance of Attorney by Plaintiff Alfred Clayborne. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Sabin, Scott)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Scott Alan Sabin on behalf of Andrea Erley (Sabin, Scott)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Brown, City of Springfield, Illinois, Jarod Maddox ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3397973.), filed by Alfred Clayborne, Andrea Erley.(Sabin, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayborne et al v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarod Maddox
Represented By: John Michael Zimmerman
Represented By: Steven C Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brown
Represented By: John Michael Zimmerman
Represented By: Steven C Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield
Represented By: John Michael Zimmerman
Represented By: Steven C Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Clayborne
Represented By: Scott Alan Sabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Erley
Represented By: Scott Alan Sabin
Represented By: Frederick J Schlosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?