Design Ideas, Ltd v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Design Ideas, Ltd
Defendant: Target Corporation and Shipt, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03231
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Unopposed Motion for a Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint #7 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 12/4/2020 for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead. (LB, ilcd)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) by Plaintiff Design Ideas, Ltd. Responses due by 11/12/2020 (Schodde, Gregory)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Unopposed Motion for a First Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint #6 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 11/4/2020 for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead. (LB, ilcd)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED by Plaintiff Design Ideas, Ltd. Responses due by 10/15/2020 (Schodde, Gregory)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Design Ideas, Ltd. Shipt, Inc. served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Schodde, Gregory)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Design Ideas, Ltd. Target Corporation served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Schodde, Gregory)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shipt, Inc. and Target Corporation and returned to Plaintiff's counsel to effectuate service. (SKN, ilcd)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Design Ideas, Ltd. (Schodde, Gregory)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3467218.), filed by Design Ideas, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Summons - Target, #17 Summons - Shipt)(Schodde, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Ideas, Ltd v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Ideas, Ltd
Represented By: Gregory Clements Schodde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shipt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?