Varnauskas v. State of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Steven J. Varnauskas
Defendant: Scanning Lawrence, Dee Dee Brookhart, IDOC, Service List and State of Illinois
Petitioner: Steven J Varnauskas
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2020cv04136
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 by Respondent Dee Dee Brookhart. Responses due by 8/28/2020 (Fischer, Garson)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Garson Steven Fischer on behalf of Dee Dee Brookhart (Fischer, Garson)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/22/2020. The Clerk is directed to identify the Petition #8 as a pleading that is pending ruling. Dee Dee Brookhart is the appropriate Respondent. All others will be terminated. Petitioner's Motion to Request counsel #4 is DENIED. Respondent has 60 days to file an Answer to the Petition #8 . See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02446. .
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Rock Island Division the electronic record. (pj, )
June 17, 2020 MAILED a copy of the order dated 6/5/2020 #10 to Steven J. Varnauskas. (The paper copy of document #10 was delayed for mailing. The Clerk did not mail the document until June 17, 2020.) (pj, )
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Petitioner Steven J. Varnauskas, a Lawrence Correctional Center prisoner, brings this 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition challenging his 2015 Henry County conviction. The proper venue for this case lies in either the Central District of Illinois, where he was convicted and sentenced, or in the Southern District, where he is in custody. See 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). The federal district where a petitioner was convicted and "where... records and witnesses pertinent to petitioner's claim are likely to be found," is generally considered the more appropriate forum. Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Kentucky, 410 U.S. 484, 493-94 (1973). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Central District of Illinois, Rock Island Division. See 2241(d). The case in this Court is closed. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/5/2020. Mailed notice (pj, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Steven J. Varnauskas against Dee Dee Brookhart, I.D.O.C., State of Illinois. (pj, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Petitioner Steven J. Varnauskas for attorney representation (pj, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Petitioner Steven J. Varnauskas for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (pj, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pj, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Steven J. Varnauskas against Dee Dee Brookhart, I.D.O.C., and State of Illinois. (pj, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020. Mailed notice. (pj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varnauskas v. State of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scanning Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Dee Brookhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service List
Represented By: Prisoner Correspondence 12 - Internal Use Only
Represented By: Chief of Criminal Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Varnauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven J Varnauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?