Speagle v. Donathan et al
Plaintiff: Billy A Speagle
Defendant: Greg Donathan, Liberty Healthcare Corporation, Shan Jumper, Erin Posey, Sharlene Caraway, Cody WaterKotte, Nicole Velez, Courtney Rhoades, Gerald Carreon, Natalia Bygrave, Eleanor Schupick, Julie Goddard and Cora Bezold
Case Number: 4:2023cv04148
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Merit Review Opinion by Plaintiff Billy A Speagle. Responses due by 11/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter and Scanning Program Cover Sheet) (TC)
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel of Discovery Documents (Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff) by Theresa M Powell on behalf of Cora Bezold, Natalia Bygrave, Sharlene Caraway, Gerald Carreon, Julie Goddard, Shan Jumper, Courtney Rhoades, Eleanor Schupick (Powell, Theresa)
October 19, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Leah G Nolan on behalf of Cora Bezold, Natalia Bygrave, Sharlene Caraway, Gerald Carreon, Julie Goddard, Shan Jumper, Courtney Rhoades, Eleanor Schupick (Nolan, Leah)
October 19, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Cora Bezold, Natalia Bygrave, Sharlene Caraway, Gerald Carreon, Julie Goddard, Shan Jumper, Courtney Rhoades, Eleanor Schupick.(Powell, Theresa)
October 19, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Theresa M Powell on behalf of Cora Bezold, Natalia Bygrave, Sharlene Caraway, Gerald Carreon, Julie Goddard, Shan Jumper, Courtney Rhoades, Eleanor Schupick (Powell, Theresa)
September 26, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Billy A Speagle. Nicole Velez waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (BMG)
September 21, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Billy A Speagle. Greg Donathan waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (KE)
September 20, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Billy A Speagle. Erin Posey waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023; Cody WaterKotte waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver Posey)(KE)
September 18, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Billy A Speagle. Cora Bezold waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023; Natalia Bygrave waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023; Sharlene Caraway waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023; Gerald Carreon waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023; Julie Goddard waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023; Shan Jumper waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023; Courtney Rhoades waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023; Eleanor Schupick waiver sent on 9/15/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Rhoades Executed Waiver, #2 Jumper Executed Waiver, #3 Goddard Executed Waiver, #4 Carreon Executed Waiver, #5 Caraway Executed Waiver, #6 Bygrave Executed Waiver, #7 Bezold Executed Waiver)(KE)
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Greg Donathan, Shan Jumper, Erin Posey, Sharlene Caraway, Cody WaterKotte, Nicole Velez, Courtney Rhoades, Gerald Carreon, Natalia Bygrave, Eleanor Schupick, Julie Goddard, Cora Bezold on 9/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Velez Waiver, #2 Schupick Waiver, #3 Rhoades Waiver, #4 Posey Waiver, #5 Jumper Waiver, #6 Goddard Waiver, #7 Donathan Waiver, #8 Carreon Waiver, #9 Caraway Waiver, #10 Bygrave Waiver, #11 Bezold Waiver)(KE)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/15/2023. See written order. (KE)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/15/2023. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint, the Court finds that Plaintiff's Complaint states a Fourteenth Amendment Due Process claim against the individually named Defendants for failing to provide adequate treatment to him during his confinement at Rushville. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The Clerk of the Court is directed to effect service of process upon the individually named Defendants pursuant to the Court's standard procedures. The Clerk is further directed to dismiss Defendant Liberty Healthcare Corporation because Plaintiff's Complaint fails to state a claim against Liberty upon which relief can be granted. 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A; Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 GRANTED. See written order. (KE)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Billy A Speagle (KE)
September 6, 2023 Filing 5 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust Fund Ledgers due by 9/20/2023. (KE)
September 6, 2023 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Billy A Speagle (KE)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Billy A Speagle. Responses due by 9/20/2023 (KE)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 9/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE)
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Billy A Speagle. (Attachments: #1 Scanning Page)(KE)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/6/2023. This Court has instituted a reduced payment procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment is assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $402 filing fee).Income includes all deposits from any source. The plaintiff Billy A Speagle is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. However, the plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $1.00 or less. No reduced filing fee will be assessed. (KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speagle v. Donathan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy A Speagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Donathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan Jumper
Represented By: Theresa M Powell
Represented By: Leah G Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Posey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharlene Caraway
Represented By: Leah G Nolan
Represented By: Theresa M Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody WaterKotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Rhoades
Represented By: Theresa M Powell
Represented By: Leah G Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Carreon
Represented By: Theresa M Powell
Represented By: Leah G Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalia Bygrave
Represented By: Theresa M Powell
Represented By: Leah G Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Schupick
Represented By: Theresa M Powell
Represented By: Leah G Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Goddard
Represented By: Theresa M Powell
Represented By: Leah G Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cora Bezold
Represented By: Theresa M Powell
Represented By: Leah G Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?