FTC v. Trudeau, et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC, Robert Barefoot, Deonna Enterprises, Inc., Trustar Global Media, Karbo Enterprises, Inc., K.T. Corporation, Limited and Trucom, LLC
Petitioner: Nataliya Babenko, GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc. and WebSite Solutions USA, Inc.
Respondent: The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Winston & Strawn LLP, Marc J. Lane and Suneil Sant
Receiver: Robb Evans & Associates LLC
Intervenor: Perry Kiraly, Lisa Bergamin, Yon Cole, Dorothy Cornelius, Patrick Cristofero, James Dilyard, Everett Garry, JOO BOSCO DE CASTRO GUIMARES, Cheryl Hampton, Timothy Hampton, Mike Higgins, Douglas Lee Hine, Karen Lucas, Robyn Mctague, Amanda Meeker, Stephen Miller, Steven Nigra, Arthur Noel, Roberta Patzer, Gerhard Plohberger, Bruce Shaefbauer, Vester Imanuel Thacker, Kim M White, Reginald Willison and Diana S Young
Case Number: 1:2003cv03904
Filed: June 9, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 972 NOTICE of Removal of Material from the Custody of the Clerk's Office by Kimball R. Anderson as to Kevin Trudeau. (ph, )
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 971 NOTICE of Exhibit Disposal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.1. The following documents are eligible for removal #835 : Mailed Notice (td, )
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 970 LETTER from Kevin Trudeau dated 1/10/20. (Case number not on document) (Postmark illegible) (kp, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 969 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/02/2008 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Order Number: 36332. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312)435-5885, on behalf of Jennifer Costales. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2020. (Scarpelli, Rosemary)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 966 ORDER: Motion #964 by attorney Thomas L. Kirsch to withdraw as attorney for Kevin Trudeau is granted. Motion hearing date of October 4, 2017 at 9:15 a.m. is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/3/2017. Mailed notice(ks, )
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 965 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #964 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/4/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Kirsch, Thomas)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 964 MOTION by Attorney Thomas L. Kirsch to withdraw as attorney for Kevin Trudeau. No party information provided (Kirsch, Thomas)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 963 ORDER: Motion #961 of Andre Collins Sullivan for leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/20/2017. Mailed notice (jh, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 962 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Collins Sullivan for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #961 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/13/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Sullivan, Andrew)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 961 MOTION by Attorney Andrew C. Sullivan to withdraw as attorney for Kevin Trudeau. No party information provided (Sullivan, Andrew)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 960 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 15-3472 consisting of Loose pleadings: 19 vol. Sealed Envelopes: 10. (lf, )
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 959 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 9/14/2016; Decided 12/29/2016 in USCA case no. 15-3472. (lf, )
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 958 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 12/29/2016 regarding notice of appeal #921 ; USCA No. 15-3472; The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (lf, )
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 957 MANDATE of USCA dated 2/21/2017 regarding notice of appeal #921 ;USCA No.15-3472 ; Entire record returned. (lf, )
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 956 ORDER dated 8/22/2016 from the 7th Circuit regarding appeal #921 ; Appellate case no: 15-3472: IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Document nos. 485, 603, and 631 shall remain under seal in this court. The other sealed items shall be placed in the public record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant SHALL FILE on or before August 29, 2016, a redacted version of document nos. 485, 603, and 631 which removes personally identifying or confidential information. Once submitted, the redacted versions shall be maintained in the public record. (mc, )
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 955 USCA RECEIVED on 7/28/16 the long record regarding notice of appeal #921 . (smm)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 954 CERTIFIED and transmitted to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #921 (USCA no. 15-3472). (smm)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 953 NOTICE to Transmit Record on Appeal regarding notice of appeal #921 ; USCA Case No. 15-3472. (lf, )
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER Granting the Receiver's Motion for an Order (A) Approving Final Accounting; (B) Authorizing Final Distribution to FTC; (C) Assigning Future Royalty Payments to FTC; (D) Authorizing Abandonment and Destruction of Records; (E) Discharging Receiver; and (F) Granting Related Relief. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/23/2016. Mailed notice (lf, )
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 950 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on February 18, 2016, before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR - 312.435.7626 - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2016. (Bistany, Nancy)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 951 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/18/2016. Receiver's motion #936 for final approval of accounting, distribution, etc. is granted. Counsel is to submit a proposed draft order. Mailed notice (gds)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 949 STATUS Report Regarding Redress by Federal Trade Commission (Cohen, Jonathan)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 948 REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to motion for miscellaneous relief, #936 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits in Support of Reply Regarding Royalties)(Cohen, Jonathan)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 947 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Federal Trade Commission (Cohen, Jonathan)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 946 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for an Order (A) Approving Final Accounting; (B) Authorizing Final Distribution to FTC; (C) Assigning Future Royalty Payments to FTC; (D) Authorizing Abandonment and Destruction of Records; (E) Discharging #936 (Anderson, Kimball)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 945 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/26/13 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Charles R. Zandi, 312/435-5387, charles_zandi@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2016. (Zandi, Charles)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 944 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Suneil Sant, WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Deady, Patrick)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 943 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Suneil Sant, WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Deady, Patrick)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 942 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 1/5/2016. Response to Receiver's motion #936 for final approval of accounting, distribution, etc. is due by 1/19/2016. Reply is due by 1/26/2016. Status hearing is set for 2/18/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 941 ORDER GRANTING THE RECEIVER'S FIFTH MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/5/2016. Mailed notice (tt, )
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 940 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on April 16, 2013, before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR - 312.435.7626 - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 939 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on April 9, 2013, before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR - 312.435.7626 - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 938 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on April 4, 2013, before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR - 312.435.7626 - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 937 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #936 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/5/2016 at 09:15 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 936 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for an Order (A) Approving Final Accounting; (B) Authorizing Final Distribution to FTC; (C) Assigning Future Royalty Payments to FTC; (D) Authorizing Abandonment and Destruction of Records; (E) Discharging Receiver; and (F) Granting Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zanzig, Blair)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 935 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #934 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/5/2016 at 09:15 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 934 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC For Approval of Fees and Expenses and Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index & Ex A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Zanzig, Blair)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 928 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Federal Trade Commission (Mora, Michael)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 933 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/21/2013 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER S. COSTALES, CRR, RMR 219 South Dearborn Street Room 1706 Chicago, Illinois 60604 (312) 427-5351. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2016. (tg, )
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 932 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/13/2013 at 3:30 p.m. before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER S. COSTALES, CRR, RMR 219 South Dearborn Street Room 1706 Chicago, Illinois 60604 (312) 427-5351. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2016. (tg, )
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 931 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/2/2013 at 11:15 a.m. before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER S. COSTALES, CRR, RMR 219 South Dearborn Street Room 1706 Chicago, Illinois 60604 (312) 427-5351. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2016. (tg, )
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 930 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/7/2013 at 11:00 a.m. before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER S. COSTALES, CRR, RMR 219 South Dearborn Street Room 1706 Chicago, Illinois 60604 (312) 427-5351. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2016. (tg, )
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 929 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/8/2013 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER S. COSTALES, CRR, RMR 219 South Dearborn Street Room 1706 Chicago, Illinois 60604 (312) 427-5351. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2016. (tg, )
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 927 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Suneil Sant, WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Deady, Patrick)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 926 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Suneil Sant, WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Deady, Patrick)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER APPROVING INTERIM DISTRIBUTION TO FTC. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/4/2015. Mailed notice (tt, )
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 924 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #921 ; USCA Case No. 15-3472. (tt, )
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 923 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #921 . Notified counsel (smm)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 922 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #921 . (smm)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 921 NOTICE of appeal by Suneil Sant, WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. regarding orders #917 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-11258417. (Deady, Patrick)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 920 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #919 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/4/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 919 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC to Approve Interim Distribution (Zanzig, Blair)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 918 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on October 7, 2015, before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR - 312.435.7626 - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2016. (Bistany, Nancy)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/7/2015. Plaintiff's motion #892 for approval of partial victim redress plan is granted. All objections to that motion are overruled. Status hearing held on 10/7/2015. Mailed notice (gds)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 916 REPLY by Respondent Suneil Sant, Movant WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. in Support of the Objections of Hogan Marren Babbo & Rose, Ltd. and Faruki Ireland & Cox, P.L.L. to Receiver's Proposed Plan to Distribute (Deady, Patrick)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Exhibits to Reply in Support of Federal Trade Commission's Motion for Approval of Partial Redress Plan and Response to Objections Thereto by Federal Trade Commission (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 914 REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to objections #909 , objections #912 Reply in Support of Federal Trade Commission's Motion for Approval of Partial Redress Plan and Response to Objections Thereto (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 913 RESPONSE by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC to letter #907 , objections #910 , objections #912 , letter #911 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Zanzig, Blair)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 912 OBJECTIONS OF HOGAN MARREN BABBO & ROSE AND FARUKI IRELAND & COX, P.L.L. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Deady, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Donnellon)(Deady, Patrick)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 911 LETTER from Johan Hendriks dated 09/02/2015. (rm, )
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 909 OBJECTIONS by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for Approval of Partial Victim Redress Plan #892 (Anderson, Kimball)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 910 OBJECTIONS by John and Stephanie Nicolaides to the proposed plan to distribute all net receivership assets to the FTC. (lk, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER: Motion #904 to withdraw William P. Ferranti as counsel for defendant is granted. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/1/2015. Mailed notice (cc, )
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 906 LETTER from C T Corporation System dated 8/12/2015. (cc, )
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 907 LETTER dated 8/12/2015. (cc, )
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 905 NOTICE of Motion by William P Ferranti for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #904 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/25/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Ferranti, William)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 904 MOTION by Attorney William P. Ferranti to withdraw as attorney for Kevin Trudeau. No party information provided (Ferranti, William)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 901 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on July 21, 2015, before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR - 312.435.7626 - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2015. (Bistany, Nancy)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER Granting the Receiver's Fourth Motion for Interim Approval of Fees and Expenses. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/21/2015. Mailed notice(cc, )
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER Approving the Form and Manner of Receiver's Notice of Distribution to FTC. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/21/2015. Mailed notice(cc, )
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER: Status hearing held. Receiver's motion #887 for approval of fees and expenses is granted. Counsel is to submit a proposed draft order. Objections to plaintiff s motion #892 for approval of Partial Victim Redress Plan are due by 9/4/2015. Responses are due by 9/25/2015. Ruling is set for 10/7/2015, at l0:00 a.m. Receiver's motion #894 to approve turnover of escrow account is granted. Objections to Receiver's motion #898 to approve Notice of Distribution are due by 9/4/2015. Responses to any objections are due by 9/25/2015. Hearing is set for 10/7/2015, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/21/2015. Mailed notice (cc, )
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 899 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #898 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/21/2015 at 10:00 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 898 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC to Approve Notice of Distribution to FTC (Zanzig, Blair)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 897 RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Support of MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for Approval of Fees and Expenses #887 (Cohen, Jonathan)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 896 REPLY by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC to motion for miscellaneous relief #887 (Zanzig, Blair)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 895 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #894 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/21/2015 at 10:00 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 894 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC to Approve Turnover of Escrow Account (Zanzig, Blair)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 893 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #892 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/21/2015 at 10:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 892 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for Approval of Partial Victim Redress Plan (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Approval of Partial Victim Redress Plan, #2 Exhibits 1-3 in Support of Motion for Approval of Partial Victim Redress Plan)(Cohen, Jonathan)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 891 OBJECTIONS by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for Approval of Fees and Expenses #887 (Anderson, Kimball)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 890 Receiver's Forensic Analysis and Accounting Report by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-35)(Zanzig, Blair)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 889 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 6/17/2015 regarding Receiver's motion for approval of fees and expenses miscellaneous relief #887 . Any objections by plaintiff are due by 7/9/2015. Status hearing date of 7/9/2015 is reset to 7/21/2015 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 888 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #887 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/17/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 887 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for Approval of Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-N)(Zanzig, Blair)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 886 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to compel #879 the Receiver to file tax returns and a status report is denied. Status hearing held on 5/21/2015. Receiver's report is due by 6/30/2015. Mailed notice (gds)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 885 REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion to compel #879 (Anderson, Kimball)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 884 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Receiver's motion for leave to file response instanter #882 is granted. Motion presentment date of 5/5/2015 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 883 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion to file instanter #882 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/5/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 882 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC to file instanter Response to Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Response), #2 Exhibit A-D)(Zanzig, Blair)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 881 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 4/7/2015 regarding defendant's motion #879 to compel Receiver to file tax returns and a status report. Response is due by 4/28/2015. Reply is due by 5/12/2015. Status hearing is set for 5/21/2015 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds )
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 880 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to compel #879 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/7/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 879 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to compel the Receiver to File Tax Returns and File a Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Anderson, Kimball)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 878 ORDER Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/23/2014: Corrected motion #874 to withdraw the appearance of Justin D. Scheid as counsel for defendant Kevin Trudeau is granted. Motion #873 is withdrawn. Mailed notice (tlm)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 877 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on December 5, 2013 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov - 312.435.7626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2014. (Bistany, Nancy)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 875 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Daniel Scheid for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #874 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/18/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Scheid, Justin)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 874 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney CORRECTED (Scheid, Justin)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 873 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Scheid, Justin)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER APPROVING SALE of Natrual Cures Assets #872 Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/9/2014. Mailed notice (tlm)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 872 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/9/2014. Receiver's motion #869 for order approving sale of Natural Cures assets is granted. Mailed notice (gds)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 871 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for order #869 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 870 DECLARATION of Val Miller regarding motion for order #869 (Zanzig, Blair)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 869 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for order Approving Sale of The Natural Cures and Related Assets (Zanzig, Blair)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 868 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 14-1344 consisting of 22 Loose Pleadings, 8 Transcripts and 10 sealed envelopes. (gcy, )
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 867 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Receiver's motion #865 for interim approval of fees and expenses is granted. Status hearing held on 7/10/2014. Status hearing set for 7/9/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 866 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #865 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/10/2014 at 02:00 PM. (Zanzig, Blair)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 865 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for Interim Approval of Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Zanzig, Blair)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 864 STATUS Report by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zanzig, Blair)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 863 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 6/27/2014 is re-set to 7/10/2014 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 862 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Now that defendant has been assigned to a facility, this court's order dated 2/25/2014 regarding defendant Trudeau's use of personal glasses and contact lenseswhile incarcerated is deemed moot. Mailed notice (gds)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER Approving Report of Sale and Distribution and Order for Possession Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/27/2014. Mailed notice (tlm)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 860 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for order of sale #857 is granted. Status hearing held on 5/27/2014. Mailed notice (gds)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 859 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for order of sale #857 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/27/2014 at 01:30 PM. (Zanzig, Blair)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 858 DECLARATION of Brick Kane regarding motion for order of sale #857 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Zanzig, Blair)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 857 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for order of sale of GIN Club Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances (Zanzig, Blair)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER setting hearing for 5/27/2014, at 1:30 p.m. and approving the form and manner of notice signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/24/2014. Motion hearing held on 4/24/2014 granting motion for order #852 . Mailed notice (gds) Modified on 4/28/2014 (gds).
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Andrew Collins Sullivan (Sullivan, Andrew)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/21/2014: Defendant's motion #5 for leave to withdraw Katherine E. Rohlf as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (tlm)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 853 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for order #852 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/24/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 852 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for order (A) Setting Hearing For Approval of the Sale of GIN Club Assets and (B) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice (Zanzig, Blair)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 851 NOTICE of Motion by Katherine E Rohlf for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #850 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/22/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Rohlf, Katherine)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Rohlf, Katherine)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 849 MANDATE of USCA dated 3/25/2014 regarding notice of appeal #820 ; USCA No. 14-1344; Upon consideration of the INTERVENORS'-APPELLANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THEIR APPEAL, filed on March 25, 2014, by counsel for the appellants, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (mgh, )
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 848 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit regarding the record on appeal in USCA no. 14-1344 consisting of record to be returned later. (mgh, )
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 847 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal #820 (USCA no. 14-1344) consisting of one volume of electronic transcript. (tlm)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 846 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on March 19, 2014 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR; (312) 435-7626; nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2014. (Bistany, Nancy)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 844 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/19/2014: The Court suspends its 11/21/2013 order imposing coercive incarceration of defendant Kevin Trudeau. This suspension shall remain in effect while Trudeau is serving the sentence imposed in 10Cr886. Upon release from incarceration by the Bureau of Prisons, Trudeau is ordered to report to this court. His personal appearance at future status proceedings concerning the Receivership has been waived. Status hearing is set for 6/27/2014, at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 843 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 3/19/2014. Receiver's motion #837 to approve the 2nd interim fees and expenses request is granted. Mailed notice (gds)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/18/2014: This matter is before the Court upon the Motion of Daniel J. Donnellon and Kenjiro D. LeCroix to withdraw as counsel for GIN USA Inc., KT Radio Network Inc., and webSite solutions USA Inc. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Mailed notice (tlm)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 841 STATUS Report Third by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 842 USCA RECEIVED on 3/17/14 the long record regarding notice of appeal #820 . (smm)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 840 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #820 (USCA no. 14-1344). (smm)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 839 STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission in Advance of the March 19 Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibits PXA1-PXA3)(Cohen, Jonathan)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 838 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #837 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/19/2014 at 11:00 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 837 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC to Approve Second Interim Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Zanzig, Blair)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 836 MOTION by counsel for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. to withdraw as attorney (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donnellon, Daniel)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 834 Correspondence from Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Judge Gettleman by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kirsch, Thomas)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 832 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion presentment date of 3/6/2014 is stricken. Telephone notice (gds)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 831 COPY of Order dated 3/5/14 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #820 ; Appellate case no. : 14-1344 IT IS ORDERED that the appellant file this overdue Docketing Statement with the clerk of this court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in a one hundred dollar ($100.00) fine and/or dismissal of this notice of appeal. (tlm)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 833 AGREED ORDER APPROVING SALE OF Personal Property Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/28/2014: Mailed notice (tlm)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER APPROVING SALE of Real Property Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/26/2014. Mailed notice (tlm)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/25/2014: The Court directs the officials at the Chicago Metropolitan Corrections Center to allow defendant Kevin Trudeau to use his personal glasses and contact lenses while incarcerated. Mailed notice (gds)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 828 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 2/25/2014. Receiver's motion #824 for approval of sale of real property is approved, and motion for approval of sale of personal property is continued to 3/6/2014, at 9:30 a.m. A draft order is to follow. Mailed notice (gds, )
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 827 COPY of order dated 2/25/14 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #820 ; Appellate case no. : 14-1344 IT IS ORDERED that the motion for Injunction Pending Appeal is DENIED. The appellants have not offered an adequate reason why the assets of the Global Information Network should not be sold. Any dispute about how much money the members of that organization are entitled to is not something that requires an injunction. (tlm)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 826 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for order of sale #824 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/25/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 825 DECLARATION of Kenton Johnson regarding motion for order of sale #824 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit D1, #6 Exhibit D2, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Zanzig, Blair)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 824 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for order of sale of Real and Personal Property (Zanzig, Blair)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #820 ; USCA Case No. 14-1344. (tlm)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 822 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #820 . Notified counsel (smm)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 821 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #820 . (smm)
February 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 820 NOTICE of appeal by Perry Kiraly regarding orders #817 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-9205341. (Shimko, Timothy)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 819 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on January 30, 2014 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR, nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 435-7626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2014. (Bistany, Nancy)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 818 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on December 19, 2013 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany, CSR, RPR, FCRR, nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 435-7626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2014. (Bistany, Nancy)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 817 Status hearing held on 1/30/2014. Motion to intervene #793 is denied. Motion for preliminary injunction #794 is denied. Status hearing set for 3/19/2014 at 11:00 a.m. Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/30/2014:Mailed notice (gds)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 816 MEMORANDUM by Perry Kiraly in Opposition to motion for leave to file #812 Receiver's Sur-reply (Shimko, Timothy)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 815 STATUS Report Second Report by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receiver's Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 814 STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibits PXA1-PXA2)(Cohen, Jonathan)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 813 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for leave to file #812 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/30/2014 at 10:00 AM. (Zanzig, Blair)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 812 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for leave to file Sur-Reply Opposing Motion to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Sur-Reply), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Zanzig, Blair)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 811 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The time of the 1/30/2014 status hearing is set for 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
January 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 810 REPLY by Intervenor Parties Lisa Bergamin, Yon Cole, Dorothy Cornelius, Patrick Cristofero, JOO BOSCO DE CASTRO GUIMARES, James Dilyard, Everett Garry, Cheryl Hampton, Timothy Hampton, Mike Higgins, Douglas Lee Hine, Perry Kiraly, Karen Lucas, Robyn Mctague, Amanda Meeker, Stephen Miller, Steven Nigra, Arthur Noel, Roberta Patzer, Gerhard Plohberger, Bruce Shaefbauer, Vester Imanuel Thacker, Kim M White, Reginald Willison, Diana S Young to response in opposition to motion, #809 , motion to intervene,, #793 , response in opposition to motion, #808 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Timothy Shimko with Exhibit A)(Shimko, Daniel)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 809 RESPONSE by Robb Evans & Associates LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Intervenor Parties Gerhard Plohberger, Mike Higgins, Amanda Meeker, Dorothy Cornelius, Kim M White, Timothy Hampton, Cheryl Hampton, Reginald Willison, Stephen Miller, Robyn Mctague, JOO BOSCO DE CASTRO GUIMARES, Karen Lucas, Douglas Lee Hine, #793 Joining FTC's Opposition to Pyramid Scheme Participants' Motion to Intervene (Zanzig, Blair)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 808 RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Intervenor Parties Gerhard Plohberger, Mike Higgins, Amanda Meeker, Dorothy Cornelius, Kim M White, Timothy Hampton, Cheryl Hampton, Reginald Willison, Stephen Miller, Robyn Mctague, JOO BOSCO DE CASTRO GUIMARES, Karen Lucas, Douglas Lee Hine, #793 (Attachments: #1 PXA, #2 PXB, #3 PXC, #4 PXD)(Cohen, Jonathan)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 807 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Kevin Trudeau has requested the court to enter a draft order permitting him to wear contact lenses. The courrt has contacted the M.C.C., which has a valid policy of not permitting contact lenses unless medically necessary. In the absence of a showing of such medical necessity, the court denies defendant's request. Should defendant submit appropriate medical evidence showing the need for contact lenses, the court will reconsider defendant's request. Mailed notice (gds)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 806 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/19/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 805 STATUS Report for December 19, 2013 Hearing by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Zanzig, Blair)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 804 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/5/2013. Status hearing set for 12/19/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/22/2013: Motion #792 of Daniel Shimko for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion #795 of Timothy Shimko for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion {797] of Andrew Gordon for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice (tlm)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 802 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 11/21/2013. Receiver's motion #790 to approve fees is granted. Motion presentment date of 11/26/2013 is stricken. Status hearing and motion to modify the Receivership order are continued to 12/5/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Responses to motion #793 to intervene is due by 12/20/203. Reply is due by 1/17/2014. Status hearing is set for 1/30/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/21/2013: Defendant Kevin Trudeau is to be incarcerated to coerce his compliance with the court's orders to pay the $37.6 million to the Federal Trade Commission and to fully disclose his assets. He shall not receive credit for time served. He shall remain in custody until further order of court. Mailed notice (gds)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Justin Daniel Scheid (Scheid, Justin)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 799 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew B Gordon for presentment of motion to amend/correct #798 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/21/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Gordon, Andrew)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 798 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to amend/correct Receivership Order with Respect to Certain Income Tax Matters (Gordon, Andrew)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 797 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8954410. (Gordon, Andrew)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 796 STATUS Report (Third Supplemental) by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Report, #2 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Zanzig, Blair)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 795 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8938615. on behalf of Intervenors (Shimko, Timothy)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 794 MOTION by Intervenor Parties Lisa Bergamin, Yon Cole, Dorothy Cornelius, Patrick Cristofero, JOO BOSCO DE CASTRO GUIMARES, James Dilyard, Everett Garry, Cheryl Hampton, Timothy Hampton, Mike Higgins, Douglas Lee Hine, Perry Kiraly, Karen Lucas, Robyn Mctague, Amanda Meeker, Stephen Miller, Steven Nigra, Arthur Noel, Roberta Patzer, Gerhard Plohberger, Bruce Shaefbauer, Vester Imanuel Thacker, Kim M White, Reginald Willison, Diana S Young for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law)(Shimko, Daniel)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 793 MOTION by Intervenor Parties Gerhard Plohberger, Mike Higgins, Amanda Meeker, Dorothy Cornelius, Kim M White, Timothy Hampton, Cheryl Hampton, Reginald Willison, Stephen Miller, Robyn Mctague, JOO BOSCO DE CASTRO GUIMARES, Karen Lucas, Douglas Lee Hine, Arthur Noel, Vester Imanuel Thacker, Diana S Young, Steven Nigra, James Dilyard, Lisa Bergamin, Roberta Patzer, Everett Garry, Patrick Cristofero, Bruce Shaefbauer, Yon Cole, Perry Kiraly to intervene (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law)(Shimko, Daniel)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 792 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8938049. on behalf of Intervenors (Shimko, Daniel)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 791 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #790 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/21/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Zanzig, Blair)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 790 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC to Approve Interim Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Zanzig, Blair)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 789 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Kevin Trudeau is directed to appear at the next status hearing 11/21/2013, 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER Entered by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/28/2013: Status hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, order defendant KEVIN TRUDEAU is released from custody forthwith. Status hearing continued to 11/21/2013, at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (tlm)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 787 Correspondence With The Receiver by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibit 1-6)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 786 Correspondence by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zanzig, Blair)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 785 STATUS Report (Second Supplemental) by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 784 Sworn Financial STATEMENT by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachments 3-5)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 783 Correspondence with the Receiver by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 10/24/2013. Government's motion to unseal document #778 is granted to the extent that leave is given to defendant to file a redacted version by 10/25/2013. Status hearing is continued to 10/28/2013 at 1:30 p.m.. Mailed notice (gds)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 781 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Unknown United States of America to unseal document #778 (Anderson, Kimball)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order FORWARDED a certified copy of the 10/22/2013 Order to the U.S. Marshal's Service. (tlm) Modified on 10/23/2013 (tlm).
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/22/2013: This Court's order directing the US Marshal to take defendant KEVIN TRUDEAU into custody is confirmed. Defendant is taken into custody in open court. While in custody, the defendant is allowed to keep his reading glasses and contact lens. #772 Mailed notice (tlm)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 779 NOTICE of Motion by April Perry for presentment of motion to unseal document #778 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/24/2013 at 10:00 AM. (Perry, April)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 778 MOTION by Unknown United States of America to unseal document (Perry, April)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 777 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file #774 a statement concerning defendant's letters of direction is granted. Status hearing held on 10/22/2013. Status hearing set for 10/24/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 776 Statement by Kevin Trudeau Regarding Purging Civil Contempt (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Z)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 775 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, #774 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/22/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 774 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction, #2 Exhibits PXA-PXC to Proposed Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction)(Cohen, Jonathan)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 773 AMENDED ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/17/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER signed by the Honorable Judge Robert Gettleman on 10/16/2013. Status hearing held on 10/16/2013. FTC motion for leave to file #767 reply is granted. Receiver's motion for leave to file #769 reply is granted. The U.S. Marshal is directed to take defendant Kevin Trudeau into custody on 10/22/2013 after this court's 9:30 a.m. hearing, and hold him until further order of court. Defendant Trudeau's oral motion for a stay of this order pending appeal is denied. Status hearing set for 10/22/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 771 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for leave to file Receiver's Reply in Support of the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions #769 , MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Reply in Support of Coercive Incarceration #767 (Anderson, Kimball)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 770 NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for leave to file #769 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/16/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Zanzig, Blair)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 769 MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for leave to file Receiver's Reply in Support of the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zanzig, Blair)
October 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 768 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file #767 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/16/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
October 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 767 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Reply in Support of Coercive Incarceration (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply, #2 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:27 to Proposed Reply)(Cohen, Jonathan)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 766 Opposition to the FTC's and the Receiver's Statements Regarding the Need for Coercive Sanctions by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 765 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is given leave to file response to Receiver's statement [764} on or before 10/11/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 764 STATEMENT by Robb Evans & Associates LLC Supporting the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Zanzig, Blair)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 763 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is given leave to file response to FTC's statement regarding the need for coercive sanctions #759 on or before 10/11/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 762 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion #761 to re-set Friday's proceeding pending new appropriations to the FTC is granted. Status hearing date of 10/4/2013 is re-set to 10/16/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 761 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Reset Friday's Proceeding Pending New Appropriations to the FTC (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 759 STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission Regarding the Need for Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: #1 PXA:1-PXA:13)(Cohen, Jonathan)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 758 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 10/1/2013 is re-set to 10/4/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 757 Response to Trudeau's Opposition to the FTC's Proposed Order by Federal Trade Commission (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 756 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to reset October 1, 2013 Status Hearing (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/26/2013: Plaintiff's motion to modify the 8/7/2013 order to terminate Trudeau's personal expense allowance is granted. Mailed notice (gds)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 755 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/26/2013. Motion #744 to modify Receivership order is granted. A draft order will follow. Status hearing set for 10/1/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/19/2013: The court releases Kevin Trudeau from custody of the US Marshal. He is to comply with directions of the Receiver and is ordered to appear at the next court hearing Motion #744 to modify the receivership order is set for 9/26/2013, at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER defendant KEVIN TRUDEAU is to be released from custody forthwith, signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/19/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 752 NOTICE of Ruling from the Seventh Circuit in their case #13-3055. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Docketing) The following is before the Seventh Circuit Court : EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, or in the Alternative, a Writ Of Habeas Corpus, filed on September 18, 2013, by counsel for the petitioner.IT IS ORDERED that petition for writ of mandamus, or in the alternative, a writ ofhabeas corpus is DENIED. (tlm)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/18/2013: Status hearing held on 9/18/2013. The court finds defendant Kevin Trudeau in contempt of court and directs the US Marshal to take him into custody and hold him until further order of the court. Status hearing set for 9/19/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Defendant's request for a stay of this order is denied. Mailed notice (gds)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 750 STATUS Report Supplemental by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Receiver's Supplemental Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 749 REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to response in opposition to motion, #748 To Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding Personal Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate Consumers (Attachments: #1 Exhibits PXA-PXB)(Cohen, Jonathan)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 748 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionTo Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims #744 (Anderson, Kimball)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 747 STATUS Report of Receiver for Period August 7, 2013 through September 5, 2013 by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Receiver's Report of Activities from 8/7/2013 through 9/5/2013, #2 Exs 1-12 to Receiver's Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 746 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/4/2013 regarding motion #744 to modify the Receivership order. Response is due by 9/12/2013. Reply is due by 9/16/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 745 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #744 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/4/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 744 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionTo Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims (Attachments: #1 Exhibits in Support of FTC's Motion To Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims)(Cohen, Jonathan)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC by Blair Robert Zanzig (Zanzig, Blair)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER APPOINTING A RECEIVER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/7/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 740 RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to notice of filing #739 (EMERGENCY) (Rohlf, Katherine)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Filing of Revised Proposed Order and Redline (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Order, #2 Redline)(Cohen, Jonathan)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 741 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 8/6/2013. Defendant Trudeau's motion #736 to release assets for payment of attorneys' fees is denied. Plaintiff FTC's motion #737 for leave to file consolidated response is granted. Proposed order appointing a Receiver is to be modified and resubmitted pursuant to the Court's oral comments made in open court. Status hearing set for 9/18/2013 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 738 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, #737 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/6/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 737 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file FTC's Consolidated Response to Trudeau's Proposed Order and Opposition to His Request To Pay His Attorneys With Money Belonging to Consumers (Attachments: #1 FTC'S Consolidated Response to Trudeau's Proposed Order and Opposition to His Request To Pay His Attorneys With Money Belonging to Consumers, #2 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:14)(Cohen, Jonathan)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 736 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Release Assets for Payment of Attorney's Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Kimball)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 735 RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to the FTC'S Proposed Receivership Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 731 Proposed Order Appointing a Receiver and Implementing Ancillary Relief by Federal Trade Commission (Cohen, Jonathan)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 734 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' motion to release funds for attorneys' fees is due by 8/2/2013, and is continued to 8/6/2013, at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephone status hearing held on 7/31/2013. Plaintiff's proposed Receivership order is due by 8/1/2013. Defendants' objections are due by 8/2/2013. Status hearing to enter the order is set for 8/6/2013 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 732 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 7/30/2013. Telephone status hearing is set for 7/31/2013 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 730 STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission With Respect to the Appointment of a Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:2)(Cohen, Jonathan)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 728 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 7/26/2013. Plaintiff's motion #481 to hold defendant Trudeau in contempt is granted in part. Plaintiff is to submit the name and qualifications of a Receiver. Until further order of court, defendant is enjoined from directing the transfer or use of any money or property of any Trudeau Entity. Status hearing set for 7/30/2013 at 1:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 727 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The time of teh 7/26/2013 evidentiary hearing is re-set to 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 726 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file, #725 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 725 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file Instanter a Response to the FTC's Post-Hearing Brief (Attachments: #1 Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Response in Opposition to the FTC's Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Its Contempt Motion)(Anderson, Kimball)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 724 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/23/2013. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages #708 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages #714 is granted. Defendant's motion #717 for continuance is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file #719 response is granted. Plaintiff's motion #721 to lift stay of writ is granted. Mailed notice (gds)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 723 Pursuant to the Court's order (DE707), Plaintiff FTC hereby files its Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat and Related Filings, which were previously filed under seal. by Federal Trade Commission , previously filed Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, An Order Compelling Trudeau To Surrender His Passports, And An Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Preliminarily Enjoined From Leaving The United States (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, #2 Cover Letter in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, #3 Rule 65(b)(1) Certification of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, #4 Proposed Writ Ne Exeat, #5 Ex Parte Motion For Leave to File Under Seal Temporarily Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, #6 Exhibits Part 1 (PXA1 through PXA19), #7 Exhibits Part 2 (PXA20 through PXA28), #8 Exhibits Part 3 (PXA29 through PXA42), #9 Exhibits Part 4 (PXA43 through PXB))(Kostner, Amanda)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 722 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #721 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/23/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 721 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Lift the Stay of the Writ Ne Exeat (Attachments: #1 FTC's Opposition to Trudeau's Motion To Waive His Appearance and Cross-Motion To Lift the Stay of the Writ Ne Exeat, #2 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:4)(Cohen, Jonathan)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 720 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, #719 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 719 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Response to Assertions of Law in Trudeaus Post-Hearing Brief (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Response to Assertions of Law in Trudeaus Post-Hearing Brief, #2 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:2)(Cohen, Jonathan)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 718 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #717 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/23/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 717 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for Short Continuance of July 26, 2013 Argument or in the Alternative to Waive Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Appearance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Kimball)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 716 MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, #481 Plaintiff's Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Motion To Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him To Provide An Accounting of and Turnover Assets (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A:1-A:2)(Cohen, Jonathan)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 715 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #714 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 714 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file excess pages (Cohen, Jonathan)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 713 Post-Hearing Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Federal Trade Commission (Kostner, Amanda)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Post-Hearing Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 711 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau regarding memorandum, #710 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25)(Anderson, Kimball)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 710 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Motion to Hold Him in Contempt(Post-Hearing) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 4, #6 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 5, #7 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 6, #8 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 7, #9 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 8, #10 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 9, #11 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 10)(Anderson, Kimball)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 709 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #708 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 708 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages instanter (Anderson, Kimball)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/1/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 706 MINUTE entry Hearing held on 7/1/2013.The Writ Ne Exeat is stayed The hearing set for 7/8/2013 is continued to 7/26/2013, at 2:00 p.m. Parties' submissions re: FTC's motion to hold defendant Trudeau in contempt are due by 7/15/2013. Parties are to file all exhibits referred to in the briefs re: the Ne exeat order and the current contempt motion, as well as the exhibits introduced at the recent contempt hearings, unsealed. The parties shall redact personal identifiers from those documents. Further hearing is set for 7/26/2013 at 2:00 p.m. Defendant Trudeau is to be present. Mailed notice (gds )
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The Clerk is to correct the docket to reflect attorney Kimball Anderson withdrew as counsel for defendants Marc J. Lane and the Law offices of Marc J. Lane PC only. Mr. Anderson continues to represent defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA) LLC and Winston & Strawn LLP. Mailed notices (gcy, )
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Opinion of Mary O'Connor, ASA by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 703 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing resumed on 6/27/2013 on plaintiff's motion #481 to hold defendant in contempt and for writ ne exeat order. Evidentiary hearing continued to 7/1/2013 at 10:00 a.m. As stated in open court, defendant is enjoined from transferring any assets outside of ordinary and customary living expenses until further order of court. Mailed notice (gds)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 702 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing resumed on 6/26/2013 on plaintiff's motion #481 to hold defendant in contempt. Evidentiary hearing continued to 6/27/2013 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 701 SEALED EXHIBIT filed in support of motion to admit evidence relative to Defendant Kevin Trudeau. (jmp, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 700 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is ordered not to leave the United States until further order of court. Defendant is ordered to surrender immediately all of his passports and any other documents that would permit international travel, to the Clerk of this Court. Defendant is ordered to attend all future hearings. Plaintiff's motion for a writ ne exeat and supporting documents are to be sealed for three business days after service of this order. Defendant is to appear on 7/8/2013, at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why he should not be preliminarily enjoined from leaving the United States. Mailed notice (gds)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 699 WRIT NE EXEAT, Order to Surrender Passports, and Order to Show Cause why defendant should not be preliminarily enjoined from leaving the United States Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/25/2013. (ph, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 698 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to amend/correct MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionAdmit evidence in evidentiary hearing regarding FTC's pending motion to hold defendant in contempt #694 ; CORRECTED Attachment #1 (Brief in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence) to MOTION (Kostner, Amanda)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 697 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission regarding MOTION by to seal temporarily FTC's proposed exhibits in the evidentiary hearing #696 (Exhibits 1 through 6). (jmp, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 696 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal temporarily FTC's proposed exhibits in the evidentiary hearing (Kostner, Amanda)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 695 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. Respondents' Motion to substitute attorney #685 is granted. Vincent P. Schmeltz is substituted as counsel for respondent Marc J. Lane and the law offices of Marc J. Lane. Kimball Anderson is given leave to withdraw as their counsel. Attorney Kimball Richard Anderson terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 694 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionAdmit evidence in evidentiary hearing regarding FTC's pending motion to hold defendant in contempt (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence, #2 Exhibits in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence)(Kostner, Amanda)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 693 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit regarding no return of the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, )
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 692 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/29/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #613 , notice of appeal #609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, )
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 691 MANDATE of USCA dated 4/29/13 regarding notice of appeal #613 , notice of appeal #609 ; USCA No. 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, )
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Austin Jennings Burke CORRECTED (Burke, Austin)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Vincent P. Schmeltz, III CORRECTED (Schmeltz, Vincent)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 688 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Austin Jennings Burke (Burke, Austin)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Vincent P. Schmeltz, III (Schmeltz, Vincent)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 686 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #685 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/20/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 685 MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to substitute attorney (Anderson, Kimball)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Notice of Name Change by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP (Croswell, Katherine)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Supplemental Objections to the FTC's Deposition Designations by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 682 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 consisting of 16 loose pleadings, 8 volumes of transcripts and 3 sealed items. (jmm-r, )
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 681 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 consisting of 16 loose pleadings, 8 transcripts, 3 sealed envelopes (jat, )
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 680 Deposition Designations and Objections by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Deposition of Michael Dow)(Anderson, Kimball)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 679 MANDATE of USCA dated 5/24/13 regarding notice of appeal #650 ; USCA No. 13-1898 (pg, )
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 678 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit regarding return of the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 at a later date (pg, )
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of long record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #650 , notice of appeal #613 , notice of appeal #609 ; USCA Case No. 13-1746, 13-1747, 13-1898 (pg, )
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 677 USCA RECEIVED on 5/22/13 the long record regarding notice of appeal #650 , notice of appeal #613 , notice of appeal. #609 (dj )
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/22/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 673 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #650 , #609 (USCA no. 13-1746, 13-1747, 13-1898).(smm)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing begins on plaintiff's motion #481 to hold Kevin Trudeau in contempt. Plaintiff's motion to compel #538 is withdrawn without prejudice. Suneil Sant's motion to quash #590 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to compel #593 Sant to comply is denied as moot. Evidentiary hearing continued to 6/26/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Kevin Trudeau and Marc Lane are ordered to appear. Mailed notice (gds)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 672 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/20/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 671 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to continue #667 hearing is denied. Status hearing held on 5/16/2013. A brief status hearing is set for 5/20/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 669 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue #667 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/16/2013 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 668 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue #667 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/16/2013 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 667 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Evidentiary Hearing Until Completion of Third Party Accounting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 670 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Winston & Strawn LLP (jmm-r, )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/14/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 665 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Order entered regarding discovery, documents, depositions, etc. Defendant Trudeau is to be present at the 5/21/2013 hearing. A status hearing is set for 5/16/2013 at 2:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 664 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/13/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 663 Status Update of Third-Party Corporations and Alternative Request to Participate in Status Conference Telephonically by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 662 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion of Amanda Brooke Kostner for leave to appear pro hac vice #632 is granted. Attorney Amanda Brooke Kostner for Federal Trade Commission added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 661 Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/2/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/2/2013. Depositions are expected to proceed. FTC's motion to compel #626 Marc Lane to disclose information is granted on an attorneys'-eyes-only basis. Mr. Lane's deposition will remain under seal until further order of court. Status hearing set for 5/13/2013 at 3:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gds).
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Defendant Kevin Trudeau by William P Ferranti (Ferranti, William)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 658 REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to memorandum in opposition to motion #654 , MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan #626 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PXB-PXC)(Mora, Michael)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 657 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The FTC may file a reply to Marc J. Lane and the Law Offices Marc J. Lane, PC's memorandum in opposition to the FTC's motion to compel #654 by close of business 5/1/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 656 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/29/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #650 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1898 (pg, )
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 654 MEMORANDUM by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC in Opposition to motion to compel,,, #626 (Anderson, Kimball)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 652 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #650 . Notified counsel (smm)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 651 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (smm)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #650 ; USCA Case No. 13-1898. (jmm-r, )
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 653 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Request #647 to participate in status conference via telephonic appearance is granted. Telephone notice (gds)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 650 NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders #649 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8288181. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/26/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 648 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/26/2013. Plaintiff's motion #642 for a determination that the contempt proceedings in this court are not subject to the Automatic Stay Provision is granted. Lane's brief and sample documents for an in camera inspection are due by 4/29/2013. Parties are directed to proceed with depositions previously set forthwith. Status hearing is set for 5/2/2013, at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 647 Request to Participate in Status Conference Via Telephonic Appearance by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 646 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionDetermine That Automatic Stay is Inapplicable #642 (Anderson, Kimball)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 645 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/25/2013. Status hearing set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 644 CIRCUIT RULE 3(c) directs the appellant to file and serve a Docketing Statement, which meets the requirements of Circuit Rule 28(a), with the clerk of the District Court at the time of the filing of the notice of appeal or with the clerk of this court within seven (7) days of filing the notice of appeal. Your Rule 3(c) Docketing Statement has not been filed to date. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the appellant file this overdue Docketing Statement with the clerk of this court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in a one hundred dollar ($100.00) fine and/or dismissal of this notice of appeal. (jmp, )
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 643 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #642 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/30/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 642 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionDetermine That Automatic Stay is Inapplicable (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Mora, Michael)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 641 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/23/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #613 , notice of appeal #609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, )
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 640 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike, #639 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/30/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 639 MOTION by Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike deadline to file response brief to Motion to Compel (D.I. 626), deadline to submit documents for in camera review and corresponding hearing date (Anderson, Kimball)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 638 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 635 Corrected UNREDACTED Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG1-PXG11), #2 Affidavit Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG12-PXG17), #3 Affidavit Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG18-PXH1))(Cohen, Jonathan)
April 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 634 UNREDACTED version of Brief in Support of Motion (DE597) To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt, Filed Pursuant to Court Order (DE608) (Apr. 9, 2013) by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG1-PXG11), #2 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG12-PXG17), #3 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG18-PXH1))(Cohen, Jonathan)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 636 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/19/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #613 , notice of appeal #609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 & 13-1747 (jat, )
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 633 NOTICE of Motion by Amanda Brooke Kostner for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #632 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/25/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Kostner, Amanda)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 632 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda B. Kostner (Kostner, Amanda)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 637 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. FTC's motion #628 to file certain documents under seal temporarily, until 4/25/2013, is granted. Parties' in-camera submissions to the court for review are due by 4/24/2013, noon. Defendant's brief on crime fraud exception is due by 4/24/2013, noon. Hearing on motion to compel is set for 4/25/2013, at 2:00 p.m.Docketing mailed notice (pg, )
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 631 SEALED BRIEF and EXHIBITS in support of motion to compel Marclane to disclose information regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (jmp, )
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 630 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/16/2013. Status hearing set for 5/2/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 629 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to seal #628 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/18/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 628 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal documents temporarily (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion for Leave To File Documents Under Temporary Seal)(Cohen, Jonathan)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 627 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel,,, #626 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/18/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan, #2 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:1-PXA:2), #3 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:3-PXA:10), #4 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:11-PXA:14))(Cohen, Jonathan)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 625 COPY of order dated 4/12/13 from the Seventh Circuit regarding notices of appeal #613 , #609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 & 13-1747; these appeals are consolidated for purposes of briefing and disposition. (jmm-r, )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 624 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Winston & Strawn LLP (jmm-r, )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 623 copy of order dated 4/10/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 granting Emergency Motion For 48- Hour Stay. (pg, )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 620 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #613 . Notified counsel (dj )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 619 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (dj )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 618 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #609 . Notified counsel (dj )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 617 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (dj )
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #613 ; USCA Case No. 13-1747 (pg, )
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #609 ; USCA Case No. 13-1746 (pg, )
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 616 NOTICE by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. re notice of appeal #613 and emergency motion for 48-hour stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lecroix, Kenjiro)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 615 NOTICE of Motion by Kenjiro D. Lecroix for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief #614 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2013 at 04:30 PM. (Lecroix, Kenjiro)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 614 MOTION by Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. to stay regarding order #608 pending appeal (Lecroix, Kenjiro)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE of appeal by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. regarding orders #608 , #606 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8228016. (Lecroix, Kenjiro)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 612 NOTICE by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP re notice of appeal #609 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 611 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay #610 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2013 at 04:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 610 MOTION by Respondents The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Winston & Strawn LLP, Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay oral order of April 9, 2013 (Renewed Emergency) (Anderson, Kimball)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 609 NOTICE of appeal by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP regarding orders #606 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8227361. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/9/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 607 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/9/2013. Motion #604 for leave to file a status report is granted. Plaintiff is directed to file documents with redactions forthwith. Defendant's and respondents' oral request for a stay of this order is denied. Status hearing set for 4/16/2013 at 4:30 p.m. Motions #538 #590 #593 #597 are continued to that date and time. Mailed notice (gds)
April 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, #604 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/9/2013 at 01:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 604 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Status Report Regarding Efforts To Depose Kevin Trudeau in Switzerland as the Corporate Designee of GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network (Attachments: #1 Status Report Regarding Efforts To Depose Kevin Trudeau in Switzerland as the Corporate Designee of GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network)(Cohen, Jonathan)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 606 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's motion #599 to file response to motion for continuance is granted. Defendant's motion #586 for continuance is denied. Plaintiff's motion #595 to file certain documents under seal is denied, and said documents will be unsealed on 4/9/2013 after counsel have had the opportunity to redact personal information. Plaintiff's motion #597 to hold parties in contempt, and plaintiff's motion #593 to compel Suneil Sant to comply with subpoena and Sant's motion #590 to quash subpoena are continued to 4/9/2013, at 1:00 p.m.Docketing mailed notice (pg, )
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 602 STATUS Report Regarding the FTC's Post-Judgment Discovery by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 603 SEALED DOCUMENT (Document Not Imaged). (jmp, )
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 601 REPLY by Suneil Sant to MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant to quash SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT #590 (Haim, Evan)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 600 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, #599 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 599 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Response To Trudeaus Motion For Continuance, Status Report, And Statement Regarding The Scope Of The Evidentiary Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Motion For Leave To File Response To Trudeaus Motion For Continuance, Status Report, And Statement Regarding The Scope Of The Evidentiary Hearing)(Cohen, Jonathan)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 598 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #597 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 597 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Hold The Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 596 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to seal #595 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 595 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal Certain Documents Related to the Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 594 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel #593 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 593 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Suneil Sant To Comply With a Subpoena (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to quash #590 and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion To Compel Suneil Sant To Comply With a Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibits PXA-PXB)(Cohen, Jonathan)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 591 MEMORANDUM by Suneil Sant in support of motion to quash #590 SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT (Haim, Evan)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant to quash SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT (Haim, Evan)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 589 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 3/21/2013. Motion for leave to file #583 motion to quash under seal is denied. Memorandum in support of motion to quash is due by 3/25/2013. Plaintiff's response is due by 3/28/2013. Reply is due by 4/1/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 588 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue #586 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 587 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue #586 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/2/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue May 21, 2013 Evidentiary Hearing (Anderson, Kimball)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Patrick Edward Deady (Deady, Patrick)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE of Motion by Evan J Haim for presentment of motion for leave to file #583 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/21/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Haim, Evan)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant for leave to file under seal (Haim, Evan)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Evan J Haim of Patrick E. Deady (Haim, Evan)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Evan J Haim (Haim, Evan)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/7/2013:Mailed notice(tlp, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 579 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Enter order. Motion hearing held on 3/7/2013. Status hearing held. The motion by respondents Marc J. Lane to quash third party subpoenas #568 is denied. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/21/2013 at 10:00 AM. Status hearing set for 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, )
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 578 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/6/2013: Mailed notice(tlp, )
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, the motion to compel Winston & Strawn, the Law Offices of Marc Lane, and Website Solutions USA to comply with subpoenas #557 is granted. Mailed notice (tlp, )
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 576 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion hearing held on 3/5/2013. MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to quash Third Party Subpoenas #568 is continued to 3/7/2013 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, )
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 575 REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to motion to compel, #557 GIN USA and KTRN To Comply With Subpoenas, and Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion To Compel Website Solutions To Comply With a Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PXB:1-PXB:3)(Cohen, Jonathan)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 574 MEMORANDUM by WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, #538 (Donnellon, Daniel)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MEMORANDUM by KT Radio Network, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, #557 (Donnellon, Daniel)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MEMORANDUM by GIN USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, #557 (Donnellon, Daniel)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Joint Discovery Plan by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, WebSite Solutions USA, Inc., Winston & Strawn LLP (Anderson, Kimball)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 570 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash #568 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/5/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MEMORANDUM by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC in support of motion to quash #568 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Kimball)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to quash Third Party Subpoenas (Anderson, Kimball)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 564 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to stay #545 third party discovery and appoint Special Master was denied. Motion hearing held on 2/21/2013 regarding plaintiff's motion #557 to compel GIN and KT Radio Network to comply with subpoenas. Response is due by 2/28/2013. Reply is due by 3/4/2013. That motion is continued to 3/7/2013, at 11:030 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc. by Kenjiro D. Lecroix (Lecroix, Kenjiro)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 561 REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to motion to compel, #538 Winston & Strawn, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane, and Website Solutions USA To Comply With Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(Cohen, Jonathan)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 560 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Leonard Gail is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Nataliya Babenko, GIN USA, KT Radio Network, and Website Solutions USA. Attorney Leonard A. Gail terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, )
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel, #557 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/21/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 557 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel GIN USA and KT Radio Network To Comply With Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Compel GIN USA and KT Radio Network To Comply With Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit PXA:1-PXA:17)(Cohen, Jonathan)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 556 MEMORANDUM by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Winston & Strawn LLP in Opposition to motion to compel, #538 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Anderson, Kimball)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Proposed Discovery and Contempt Hearing Schedule by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Cohen)(Cohen, Jonathan)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/8/2013. Plaintiff's plan is due by 2/13/2013. Joint proposal is due by 2/27/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 547 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay #545 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/8/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 546 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay #545 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Kimball)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay Third-Party Discovery and Appoint a Special Master for the Purpose of Establishing a Consumer Remediation Plan (Anderson, Kimball)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 542 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Leave is given to defendant to file financial statement under seal. Mailed notice (gds)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 540 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau Sworn Financial Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Anderson, Kimball)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 541 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 1/23/2013 regarding plaintiff's motion to compel #538 . Response is due by 2/13/2013. Reply is due by 2/20/2013. Status hearing is set for 3/7/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Status hearing date of 2/1/2013 is re-set to 2/8/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel, #538 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/24/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Winston & Strawn, the Law Offices of Marc Lane, and Website Solutions USA To Comply With Subpoenas, and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit FTC Exhibits PXA-PXE)(Cohen, Jonathan)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion hearing held on 12/10/2012 regarding defendant's motion #531 to abstain from filing non-parties' e-mails which is granted. E-mails by non-parties will not be accepted or filed as part of this case. Mailed notice (gds)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 536 FTC'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Regarding the Court's Suggestion to Appoint a Forensic Accountant as a Master and in Support of Contempt Motion by Federal Trade Commission. (mr, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012: Mailed notice (gds)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion #481 to hold defendant in contempt is continued until further order of court. Defendant's sworn complete statement of his financial condition is due by 1/25/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 533 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/6/2012. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file #526 is granted. Defendant's motion #528 for appointment of a Special Master is is denied. Status hearing set for 2/1/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 532 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #531 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/10/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 531 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Abstain from Filing Emails Erroneously Submitted Through Proposed Order Email System or, in the Alternative, to File Under Seal (Anderson, Kimball)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 530 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #528 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #528 for the Appointment of a Special Master Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 53 (Anderson, Kimball)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 528 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for the Appointment of a Special Master Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. R. 53 (Anderson, Kimball)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file, #526 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Mora, Michael)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 526 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Instanter a Supplemental Brief Re Court's Suggestion to Appoint Forensic Accountant as Master, and in Support of Contempt Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Mora, Michael)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 525 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 12/5/2012 is re-set to 12/6/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 524 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/25/2012 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: LAURA R. RENKE, CSR, RDR, CRR, CLR Contract Court Reporter 219 S. Dearborn Street, Room 2144A Chicago, Illinois 60604 708.447.0905 laurarenke@hotmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2013. (rp, )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 523 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Trudeau's Motion to Strike Mora Declaration (Doc. 500) is granted in part. The court strikes and will ignore the portions of the Mora declaration that contain improper argument. Trudeau's Motion to Strike New Matter and Argument in the FTC's Reply Brief (Doc. 519) is granted in part. Trudeau is given leave to file a sur-reply in opposition to the FTC's Motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt (Doc. 481). Trudeau's sur-reply shall be limited to addressing the new matter raised in the FTC's reply brief. The FTC's motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt (Doc. 481) is continued to December 5, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mr, )
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 522 MINUTE entry before Honorable RObert Gettleman: Status hearing is re-set to 11/20/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) Modified on 11/16/2012 (gds).
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 521 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike #519 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to strike #519 (Anderson, Kimball)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 519 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike New Matter and Argument in FTC's Reply Brief (Anderson, Kimball)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 518 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to continue #512 status hearing is granted. Status hearing date of 10/24/2012 is re-set to 10/30/2012 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 517 REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets #481 , response in opposition to motion, #508 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibits 8-9)(Mora, Michael)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 516 REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt #481 #500 (Anderson, Kimball)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 515 REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Status Hearing From October 24, 2012 to October 30, 2012 #512 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to continue #512 October 24 Hearing on FTC's Motion to Hold Trudeau In Civil Contempt (Mora, Michael)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue #512 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/18/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Status Hearing From October 24, 2012 to October 30, 2012 (Anderson, Kimball)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 511 RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt #481 #500 (Attachments: #1 Declaration FTC Exhibit 5 Supplemental Declaration of Ronald Lewis)(Mora, Michael)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 510 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/25/2012. Motion to file tax returns under seal #482 is granted. Motion for recusal #497 is denied. Defendant's motion for extension of time #503 to file response to motion to hold defendant in contempt is granted. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages #506 is granted, but is limited to 20 pages. Response to motion #500 to strike Mora declaration is due by 10/5/2012. Reply is due by 10/12/2012. Mailed notice (gds)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 509 SEALED RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets #481 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H)(Anderson, Kimball)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 508 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets #481 (REDACTED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-H)(Anderson, Kimball)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #506 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 506 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages For Brief In Opposition To The FTC's Motion To Hold Defendant Trudeau In Contempt For Violating The June 2, 2012 Order, Incarcerate Him, And Order Him To Provide An Accounting Of And Turnover Assets (Anderson, Kimball)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 505 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of extension of time, #503 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 504 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of extension of time, #503 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/27/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for extension of time to File Response to the FTC's Motion to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating June 2, 2012 order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets #481 (Anderson, Kimball)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 502 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike #500 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 501 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to strike #500 (Anderson, Kimball)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt #481 (Anderson, Kimball)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for recusal #497 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for recusal #497 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Anderson, Kimball)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for recusal (Anderson, Kimball)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 496 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion #468 of Stephen C. Dowdell for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion #495 of Jonathan Cohen for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mr, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/17/2012: Mailed notice (gds)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion #476 for modification of order is denied. Hearing date of 8/30/2012 is stricken. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motionm #481 to hold defendant in contempt is due by 9/24/2012. Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/15/2012. Status hearing is set for 10/24/2012 at 1:30 p.m. mailed notice (gds)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 492 NOTICE of Motion by David A. O'Toole for presentment of motion for leave to file #491 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/30/2012 at 11:00 AM. (O'Toole, David)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Modification of Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Toole, David)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 490 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/18/12 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura R. Renke, (708) 447-0905, laurarenke@hotmail.com.. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2012. (smm)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 489 REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion for miscellaneous relief #476 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Anderson, Kimball)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief #476 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, #2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, #3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C)(Mora, Michael)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion #483 for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/18/2012 regarding motion to seal document #482 and motion to hold defendant in contempt #481 which are continued to 8/30/2012, at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 485 RESTRICTED Documents Pursuant to LR 26.2 by Federal Trade Commission (mr, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 484 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #483 , motion for miscellaneous relief, #481 , motion to seal, motion to seal document #482 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/18/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file excess pages for Brief in Support of Motion to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt (Mora, Michael)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal Certain Documents Related to Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt, MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal document (Mora, Michael)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 481 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit FTCX 1, Part I, Lewis Dec & Att A-U, #3 Exhibit FTCX 1, Part II, Att V-Z, #4 Exhibit FTCX 2, Luceri Dec & Att A-H, #5 Exhibit FTCX 3, Van Wazer Dec & Att. A-J, #6 Exhibit FTCX 4, Mora Dec & Att A-J)(Mora, Michael)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion #473 of Daniel J. Donnellon for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion #474 of Kenjiro D. LeCroix for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, )
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 480 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 6/19/2012 regarding plaintiff's motion #476 for modification of order. Response is due by 7/26/2012. Reply is due by 8/9/2012. In court hearing is set for 8/30/2012 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 478 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #476 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/19/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #476 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for Modification of Order, Approval of Consumer Remediation Plan, and Leave to Administer Consumer Remediation Plan through Rust Consulting, Inc. (Anderson, Kimball)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 475 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 5/24/2012 regarding motion to quash #470 . The motion to quash or modify the 5/8/2012 subpoena to produce is denied. Mailed notice (gds)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 474 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7170908. (Lecroix, Kenjiro)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 473 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7170858. (Donnellon, Daniel)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE of Motion by Leonard A. Gail for presentment of motion to quash #470 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/24/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Gail, Leonard)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 471 MEMORANDUM by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. in support of motion to quash #470 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gail, Leonard)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 470 MOTION by Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. to quash Subpoena (Gail, Leonard)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Leonard A. Gail (Gail, Leonard)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionMotion and application to appear pro hac vice (Government attorney) (Dowdell, Stephen)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 467 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion #454 of Douglas R. Cole for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (psm, )
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 466 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for order #450 is denied. Motion to quash or for protective order #451 is denied. Motion #457 to adopt is granted;. Status hearing held on 4/19/2012 Mailed notice (gds)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 4/13/2012 is re-set to 4/19/2012 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Notice of Unavailability of Counsel STATEMENT by Nataliya Babenko (Gail, Leonard)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 463 REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion to quash, motion for protective order #451 (Anderson, Kimball)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's reply brief is due by 4/6/2012, noon. Mailed notice (gds, )
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 461 MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to quash, motion for protective order #451 , motion for miscellaneous relief #457 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, #2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, #3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C)(Mora, Michael)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 460 SUPPLEMENT to memorandum in opposition to motion, #459 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A)(Mora, Michael)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion for order #450 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, #2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, #3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C, #4 Exhibit FTC Attachment D, #5 Exhibit FTC Attachment E)(Mora, Michael)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MOTION by Movant Nataliya Babenko Adopting and Joining Defendant Trudeau's Motion to Quash (Gail, Leonard)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 3/14/2012 regarding motion to quash, or for protective order #451 . Plaintiff's response is due by 3/28/2012. Defendant's reply is due by 4/4/2012. Status hearing date of 4/11/2012 is re-set to 4/13/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 456 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash, motion for protective order #451 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/14/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 455 SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Nataliya Babenko (Gail, Leonard)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6919313. (Cole, Douglas)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. Movant Nataliya Babenko's motion #446 for leave to file a sworn statement under seal is granted. Movant's motion statement is due by 3/9/2012. Plaintiff FTC is given leave to file a response to the motion regarding marital privilege by 3/21/2012. Reply is due by 3/28/2012. Status hearing is set for 4/11/2012, at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mr, )
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 452 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash, motion for protective order #451 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/13/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to quash Third Party Subpoena Directed to Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC, d.b.a. Rivers Casino or in the Alternative, MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for protective order (Anderson, Kimball)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 450 MOTION by Movant Nataliya Babenko for order pursuant to Customer Challenge Provision of Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gail, Leonard)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 449 NOTICE of Motion by Leonard A. Gail for presentment of motion to seal #446 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/7/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Gail, Leonard)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Nataliya Babenko by Leonard A. Gail on behalf of Matthew Reedy (Gail, Leonard)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Nataliya Babenko by Leonard A. Gail (Gail, Leonard)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MOTION by Unknown Nataliya Babenko to seal sworn statement (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gail, Leonard)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 445 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings and twelve loose pleadings. (mr, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 444 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings. (mr, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 443 LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings and twelve loose pleadings to be returned later. (mr, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 442 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 9/24/2010; Decided 11/29/2011 in USCA case no. 10-2418. (mr, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 441 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 1/30/2012 from the USCA regarding notice of appeal #380 ; Appellate case no. : 10-2418; On consideration of the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc, filed on January 13, 2012, no judge in active service has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc and all of the judges on the original panel have voted to DENY the petition for rehearing. Accordingly, the petition for rehearing is DENIED. (mr, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MANDATE of USCA dated 11/29/2011 regarding notice of appeal #380 ; USCA No. 10-2418; The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (mr, )
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for leave to withdraw Aesha R. Pallesen as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 10/22/2010 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds, )
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/19/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The court overrules Trudeau's objections to the Show Cause order and denies his motion #416 to recuse. Mailed notice (gds, )
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The undersigned judge chooses to exercise his prerogative as a senior judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sect. 294(b), to transfer the criminal proceedings arising from its order dated 9/16/2010, [doc. 339] ordering defendant Kevin Trudeau to show cause why he should not be held in criminal contempt for violating the agreed consent order dated 9/2/2004 [doc. 56], to the Executive Committee of this district for reassignment to another judge under a new number and caption: United states v. Kevin Trudeau. This court will continue to preside in the civil proceedings brought by the FTC against Trudeau. See FTC v. Truddeau 606 F.3d 382,391 (7th Cir. 2010). Mailed notice (gds, )
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 10/5/2010 regarding motion to correct #429 . That motion is denied. Mailed notice (gds, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE of Removal of Material from the Custody of the Clerk's Office documents #237 and #313 by Shop America (USA), LLC, Kevin Trudeau (ca, ).
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Argument heard on 9/29/2010. Status hearing and ruling set for 10/22/2010 at 10:00 a.m. By agreement of the parties, time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act 18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(1) until that date. Mailed notice (gds, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE of Exhibit Disposal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.1. The following documents are eligible for removal: Defendant's Counsel: David J. Bradford, Document #237, 313. Mailed Notice (jh, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief #429 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/5/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to amend/correct order #426 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 9/24/10 from the Seventh regarding notice of appeal #380 ; Appellate case no. : 10-3230. Upon consideration of the PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, filed September 24, 2010, by counsel for the petitioner, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as premature (ca, ).
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #380 ; USCA Case No. 10-3230 (ca, ).
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/24/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/24/2010. Defendant's motion to stay #420 further proceedings is denied and this matter is continued to 9/29/2010, at 2:00 p.m. By agreement of the parties, time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(1) until that date. Mailed notice (gds, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/24/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for declaratory relief #401 and construction of corrected supplemental order is denied. Mailed notice (gds, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: It has been brought to the court's attention in defendant's motion for stay pending a petition for mandamus #420 that the minute order entered by the court on 9/14/2010 #419 noted that the defendant's motion for recusal #416 is denied. That portion of the 9/14/2010 minute order is vacated as erroneously entered. As stated on the record and discussed with counsel on that date, defendant's motion for recusal was taken with the hearing regarding the rule to show cause, set to be heard 9/24/2010 at 2:00 p.m. The government was given leave to file a response to the motion to recuse, but government counsel stated in open court that he was unlikely to file an additional brief because the issue had been thoroughly discussed in the government's response to defendant's memorandum in response to the 4/16/2010 order to show cause and motion to dismiss #406 The denial of the motion to recuse is therefore vacated and will be addressed at the hearing on 9/24/2010, at 2:00 p.m.Mailed notice (gds, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 421 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay #420 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/29/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Anderson, Kimball)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for recusal #416 is denied. Motion hearing held on 9/14/2010 regarding motion for recusal #416 . The time of the 9/24/2010 hearing regarding rule to show cause is re-set to 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for recusal #416 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/14/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for recusal #416 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Anderson, Kimball)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for recusal (Anderson, Kimball)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 413 REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to memorandum #357 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Kimball)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order #401 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of additional record, 1 box of exhibits; (return now complete). (lp, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 414 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of additional record; 8 Transcripts (return now complete). (lp, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' motion #409 for leave to withdraw Aesha R. Pallesen as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE of Motion by Aesha R Pallesen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #409 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/19/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Pallesen, Aesha)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Pallesen, Aesha)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order #401 (Attachments: #1 FTC Attachment 1, #2 FTC Attachment 2, #3 FTC Attachment 3, #4 FTC Attachment 4)(Mora, Michael)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 406 RESPONSE by Unknown United States of America to motion hearing #404 to Defendant's Memorandum in Response to April 16, 2010, Order to Show Cause and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Order to Show Cause (Krickbaum, Marc)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 405 EXHIBIT G (CD) by Defendant Kevin Trudeau regarding memorandum in support of motion #402 (Document not imaged)(ca, ).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/28/2010 regarding defendant's motion for declaratory judgment #401 . Response is due by 8/13/2010. Reply is due by 8/27/2010. Mailed notice (gds, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for declaratory judgment #401 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/29/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 402 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for declaratory judgment #401 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Anderson, Kimball)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order (Anderson, Kimball)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is still set for 7/29/2010, at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 STATUS Report On Monetary Sanction by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit FTC Attachment 2, #3 Exhibit FTC Attachment 3)(Mora, Michael)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/13/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: This matter is referred to the U.S. Attorney for this District pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Sect. 401 and Fed. R. Crim. P. 42(a) The clerk is directed to create a separate docket entitled United States v. Kevin Trudeau and provide for random assignment to a judge other than Judge Gettleman. Mailed notice (gds, )
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 396 OPINION from the USCA for the Seventh Circuit; Argued April 8, 2010; Decided May 20, 2010 in USCA case no. 10-1383 (ca, ).
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MANDATE of USCA dated 5/20/10 regarding notice of appeal #301 ; USCA No. 10-1383. We VACATE Trudeau's sentence and the district court's finding of contempt, and REMAND for further proceedings according to 18 U.S.C. 401, Fed. R. Crim. P. 42(a), and the opinion. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (ca, ).
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 394 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of eight volumes of transcripts, one volume of exhibits, and one box of additional exhibits (ca, ).
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 393 USCA RECEIVED on 7/6/2010 the long record regarding notice of appeal #380 . (gej, )
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 392 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #380 (USCA no. 10-2418). (gej, )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 391 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Trudeau (ca, ).
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/16/2010(ca, ).
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion #384 for extension of time is granted. Government's response to defendant's motion #363 is due by 8/13/2010. Defendant's reply is due by 8/27/2010. Hearing date of 7/29/10 is reset to 9/24/10 at 9:30 a.m. Time is excluded through 9/24/10 under T.18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(7)(A). The remedies hearing remains set for 7/29/2010 at 10:00 a.m. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ca, )
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE of Correction regarding #385 (ca, ).
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE of Motion by Lisa Marie Noller for presentment of extension of time #384 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/16/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Noller, Lisa)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Document entered in error (Noller, Lisa) Modified on 6/15/2010 (ca, ).
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 AGREED MOTION by Unknown United States of America for extension of time (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noller, Lisa) Modified on 6/15/2010 (ca, ).
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #380 ; USCA Case No. 10-2418 (ca, ).
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 382 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #380 . Notified counsel (gej, )
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, )
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders #335 , #371 , #337 , #370 , #372 , #336 , #373 , #334 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-4904032. (Anderson, Kimball)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 6/10/2010 regarding motion to stay pending ppeal, without requirement of a supersedeas bond #377 . That motion is denied. Mailed notice (gds, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief #377 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/10/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for stay pending appeal #377 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 6/8/2010 (ca, ).
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding order #372 PENDING APPEAL (Anderson, Kimball)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 376 NOTICE of Removal of Material from the Custody of the Clerk's Office #293 by Edward Bach (ca, ).
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: This Court's minute order dated 6/1/2010 is amended in part to VACATE that portion that denied defendant's motion #363 to dismiss the order to show cause, and to INCLUDE the denial of defendant's motion #348 to amend the supplemental order. Mailed notice (gds, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Corrected Supplemental Order modifying the stipulated final order for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief as to defendant Kevin Trudeau signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/2/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Defendant Kevin Trudeau's motion #366 to release bond and passport is granted. The Clerk is directed to release the $50,000 bond, with any accrued interest, and Mr. Trudeau's passport to Edward Bach, head of the docket dept, at defendant's counsel's firm. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend the Supplemental Order Dated April 16, 2010 #348 (ca, ).
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/1/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 6/1/2010. Both parties have moved #348 #361 to amend the supplemental order dated 4/16/2010 and the court amends said order. Defendant's motion to dismiss #363 the order to show cause is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file #368 sur-reply is granted. Defendant's oral motion to extend time to respond is denied. Mailed notice (gds, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file #368 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/3/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend the Supplemental Order Dated April 16, 2010 (Mora, Michael)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II for presentment of motion to release bond and passport #366 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/1/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Kirsch, Thomas) Modified on 5/25/2010 (ca, ).
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau TO RELEASE BOND AND PASSPORT (Kirsch, Thomas)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 365 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Amend Supplemental Order #361 #335 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ca, ).
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 364 REPLY Memorandum by Kevin Trudeau in Support of Motion to Amend the Supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 #348 #337 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ca, ).
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to dismiss ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Kirsch, Thomas)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion #361 to amend supplemental order is due by 5/21/2010. Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/27/2010. Telephone notice (gds, )
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Amend Supplemental Order #335 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, Redlined Excerpted Supplemental Order, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2, Revised Escrow Agreement ("Attachment A" to Supplemental Order)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2010 (ca, ).
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 360 OPPOSITION by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to amend supplemental order and for Stay of enforcement pending resolution of motion #337 #348 (Mora, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2010 (ca, ).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER dated 5/6/10 from the Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal #301 ; Appellate case no. : 10-1383 (ca, ).
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 DESIGNATION of Marc Krickbaum as U.S. Attorney for Unknown United States of America (Krickbaum, Marc)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM in Response to April 16, 2010 Order to Show Cause #339 by Kevin Trudeau (ca, ).
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Defendant's motion #353 for leave to file excess pages is granted. Defendant's submission is due by 5/13/2010. Government's response is due by 6/14/2010. Defendant's reply is due by 6/28/2010. This Courts 7/29/2010, 10:00 a.m. status hearing will include hearing and argument. The Court waives setting a trial date at this time. The Court deems the period of time through 7/29/2010 excludable under the provisions of T. 18 U.S. Code, Section 3161(h)(7)(A) - interest of justice. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Steffen Nathanael Johnson (Johnson, Steffen)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #353 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/29/2010 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages INSTANTER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants motion #346 for leave to withdraw the appearance of Lisa J Parker as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ph, )
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to reset #344 rule to show cause hearing is is granted. Rule to show cause hearing date of 4/28/2010 is stricken. Status hearing is set for 4/29/2010, at 2:30 p.m. Motion hearing held on 4/27/2010 regarding defendant's motion #348 to amend the supplemental order. Response is due by 5/7/2010. Reply is due by 5/22/2010. Status hearing set for 6/1/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Motion to stay enforcement of the 4/16/2010 order is granted until 6/1/2010. Mailed notice (gds, )
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion to stay, motion for relief,,, #348 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of Motion to amend the supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 and for Stay of Enforcement pending resolution of the motion #348 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ).
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Amend the Supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 and for Stay of enforcement pending resolution of the motion #337 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ).
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #346 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Lisa J. Parker) (Anderson, Kimball)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to reschedule #344 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ).
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Reschedule Show Cause Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ).
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE of Correction regarding #341 (ca, ).
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 DESIGNATION of Lisa Marie Noller as U.S. Attorney for Unknown United States of America (Noller, Lisa)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Document entered in error (Noller, Lisa) Modified on 4/22/2010 (ca, ).
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion #279 of John Kness for leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Order defendant Kevin Trudeau is directed to appear on 4/28/2010 at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why he should not be prosecuted for and held in criminal contempt of this court's 9/2/2004 Consent Order. The court requests the US Attorney prosecute defendant Trudeau for criminal contempt. The US Attorney or an assistant, is directed to appear at the 4/28/2010 hearing. Mailed notice (gds, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Supplemental Order Modifying the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction and Awarding Monetary Relief as to defendant Kevin Trudeau signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Supplemental order modifying the stipulated final order for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief entered. Defendant Trudeau is ordered to obtain and maintain in force a performance bond in the principal amount of $2,000,000.00. In lieu of a performance bond, he may establish an interest-bearing escrow account fund. As a sanction for defendant Trudeau's contempt of the Final Order, and affirmed by the USCA, he is ordered to pay forthwith to plaintiff FTC the sum of $37,616.161.00, representing consumer loss. Plaintiff FTC's report on status of reimbursement efforts is due by 7/23/2010. Status hearing is set for 7/29/2010, at 10:00 a.m. This court shall retain jurisdiction. Mailed notice (gds, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Memorandum opinion and order entered. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion #267 for entry of compensatory monetary remedy, and plaintiff's motion #269 to modify the stipulated final order are granted in part. The Court will enter the Supplemental order modifying the stipulated final judgment for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief. Mailed notice (gds, )
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 THIRD PARTY COMMUNICATIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Poor quality original - paper document on file) Modified on 3/29/2010 (ca, ).
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 332 SUPPLEMENTAL Post-Hearing Brief by Federal Trade Commission in Support of its Renewed Motion #267 #269 for Compensatory Contempt Remedy and Renewed Motion to Modify the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction As To Defendant Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Attachments 1-3, #2 Exhibit FTC Attachments 1-9)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ca, ).
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 331 SUPPLEMENTAL Brief by Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Renewed Remedy Motion, and Renewed Motion to modify the 2004 Stipulated Order #267 #269 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Exhibit I-J)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ca, ).
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Renewed Motions for Entry of Compensatory Monetary Remedy and to Modify the Stipulated Final Order #267 #269 (ca, ).
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Preliminary hearing held. Defendant's motion #323 for leave to file sur-reply in opposition to plaintiffs motion for compensatory remedy and motion to modify stipulated final order is granted. Defendant's motion #325 to stay is denied. The matter is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 OPPOSITION by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay Proceeding #325 (O'Toole, David) Modified on 3/12/2010 (ca, ).
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay #325 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay the proceedings in civil action no. 03-C-3904 Pending a Decision by the Appellate Court in expedited appeal no. 10-1381 #325 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 3/10/2010 (ca, ).
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay THE PROCEEDINGS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 03-C-3904 PENDING A DECISION BY THE APPELLATE COURT IN EXPEDITED APPEAL NO. 10-1381 (Anderson, Kimball)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file #323 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file INSTANTER A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COMPENSATORY REMEDY AND MOTION TO MODIFY STIPULATED FINAL ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER dated 2/26/10 from the USCA Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal #301 ; Appellate case no. : 10-1383 (ca, ).
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 321 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal #301 (USCA no. 10-1383) consisting of four volume of transcripts (ca, ).
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. The Court declines to rule on defendant's motion #310 to modify release conditions. This Court stays payment of the fine until the Court of Appeals rules.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 318 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/18/10 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/11/10 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/22/09 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 315 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/3/09 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 320 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal #301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal #301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #310 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/24/2010 at 03:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Modify Release Conditions (UNOPPOSED) (Anderson, Kimball)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 RECEIVED by USCA Seventh Circuit, long record on appeal, USCA No. 10-1383 (ca, ).
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/18/2010. The Court stays payment of the fine to 2/24/2010. status hearing is set for 2/24/2010, at 3:00 p.m. Preliminary hearing date of 3/9/2010 is re-set to 3/12/2010 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 308 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Trudeau (Poor quality original - paper document on file). Modified on 2/19/2010 (ca, ).
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 307 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #301 ; USCA Case No. 10-1383 (ca, ).
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE of Case Opening (ca, ).
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #301 . Notified counsel (gej, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 EXHIBIT (Transcript of Radio Broadcast of February 10, 2010 Taken from the Internet-USTREAM Website). (Document not Imaged) (gej, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 EXHIBIT. Modified on 2/19/2010 (ca, ).
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders #299 , #300 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-4537069. (Anderson, Kimball)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/17/2010. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages #296 is granted. The Court certifies that defendant committed direct criminal contempt of court. Under 18 U.S.C. Sect. 401 he is committed for a term of 30 days custody of the U.S. Marshal and he is fined $5,000.00. Defendant's motion #295 for acquittal and his oral motion for preparation of a pre-sentence report are denied. Imposition of the sanctions imposed herein are stayed until 2/18/2010, at 2:15 p.m. Status hearing set for 2/18/2010 at 2:15 p.m. Terms of defendant's bond are to stand until he surrenders into custody.Mailed notice (gds, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order FORWARDED two certified copy of minute order dated 2/17/10 and three copies of signed order to the U.S. Marshals office. Modified on 2/18/2010 (ca, ).
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #296 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #295 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages INSTANTER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau FOR ACQUITTAL (Anderson, Kimball)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 294 FTC's Statement Regarding the Court's February 11, 2010 Order Holding Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Criminal Contempt by Federal Trade Commission (Mora, Michael)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 APPEARANCE BOND in the amount of $ 50,000 posted by Kevin Trudeau (REDACTED IMAGE) (cdy, )
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/11/2010(ca, ).
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Return on rule to show cause held. The court finds defendant to be in direct criminal contempt. Defendant's bond is set at $50,000.00. Defendant is not to leave the Northern District of Illinois without prior permission by this Court. Defendant is to surrender his passport. Defendant is ordered RELEASED after processing. He is allowed to post the $50,000.00 on 2/12/2010. Parties submission to the court are due by 2/16/2010. Status hearing is set for 2/17/2010, at 1:30 p.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Status hearing held on 2/11/2010. Rule to show cause why defendant Kevin Trudeau should not be held in contempt issues and is returnable 2/11/2010 at 01:00 PM. Mailed notice (gds, )
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order FORWARDED two Certified copies of minute order dated 2/11/10 #290 and Order dated 2/11/10 to the U.S. Marshals office (ca, ).
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing set for 2/11/2010 at 10:00 a.m. to deal with an urgent matter that has come to the Court's attention. Counsel are directed to appear. Mailed notice (gds, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 287 REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission Modification of Stipulated Final Order #269 , response in opposition to motion #278 FTC's Reply to Kevin Trudeau's Opposition to the FTC's Motion to Modify the Stipulated Final Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Ex. 61-63, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mora, Michael)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission Contempt Remedy Order #267 , response to motion #284 FTC's Reply in Support of Its Renewed Motion for Entry of Compensatory Contempt Remedy Against Kevin Trudeau, and Certificate of Service (Mora, Michael)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau regarding response to motion #284 (Anderson, Kimball)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 284 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to the FTC's renewed motion for entry of compensatory monetary remedy #267 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 1/20/2010 (cdy, ).
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE by Sandhya Prabhu Brown of Change of Address Notice of Name Change (Brown, Sandhya)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/22/2009. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion #267 for compensatory monetary remedy is due by 1/18/2010. Plaintiff's reply is due by 2/1/2010. Plaintiff's reply to defendant's response to plaintiff's renewed motion #269 for permanent injunction is due by 2/1/2010. Status hearing set for 3/9/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Kevin Trudeau's Addendum Discovery Proposal #277 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments A through D)(Prabhu, Sandhya) Modified on 12/22/2009 (ca, ).
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #279 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/22/2009 at 02:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Anderson, Kimball)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission Modification of Stipulated Final Order #269 (Anderson, Kimball)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for Entry of compensatory Monetary Remendy #267 (Attachments: #1 Addendum)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 12/18/2009 (ca, ).
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/3/2009(ca, ).
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephone status hearing held. Defendant's response to plaintiff's renewed motion to modify the injunction is due by 12/17/2009. Defendant's response to plaintiff's renewed motion for compensatory monetary remedy is due by 12/17/2009. Plaintiff's motion #272 to enter proposed scheduling order is denied. Defendant's discovery plan is due by 12/17/2009. A preliminary hearing is set for 12/22/2009, at 2:00 p.m. [For further detail see separate order] Mailed notice (ca, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/1/2009. Telephonic status hearing set for 12/3/2009 at 8:45 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #272 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/3/2009 at 08:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau TO ENTER PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimball R. Anderson)(Anderson, Kimball)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 11/17/2009. Status hearing set for 12/1/2009 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (gds, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of Renewed motion to Modify #269 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/17/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Mora, Michael) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ca, ).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 RENEWED MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Modify the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Ex. 56-60, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Supplemental Order Modifying Stipulated Final Order)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ca, ).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of Renewed motion for entry of Compensatory #267 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/17/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Mora, Michael) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ca, ).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 RENEWED MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for Entry of Compensatory Monetary Remedy Against Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Contempt Remedy Order)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ca, ).
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is re-set to 11/17/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Telephone notice (gds, )
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is set for 11/4/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 264 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 08-4249 consisting of four volume of pleadings, eight volume of loose pleadings, eight transcripts and one box of exhibits (ca, ).
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 OPINION from the USCA for the Seventh Circuit; Argued May 14, 2009; Decided August 27, 2009 in USCA case no. 08-4249 (ca, ).
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MANDATE of USCA dated 8/27/09 regarding notice of appeal #231 ; USCA No. 08-4249. The district court's finding Trudeau in contempt of the 2004 Consent Order is Affirmed. However, the monetary sanction and the infomercial ban is Vacated and the case is Remanded for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. No award of costs. (ca, ).
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 08-4249 consisting of four volumes of pleadings, eight volumes of loose pleadings, eight transcripts, and one volume of exhibits (ca, ).
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/8/2009(ca, ).
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion #255 for protective order is granted. [For further detail see separate order]Mailed notice. (ca, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Aesha R Pallesen (Pallesen, Aesha)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 EXHIBIT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau (AMENDED) 1-4 regarding MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for protective order #255 (Anderson, Kimball)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for protective order #255 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/8/2009 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Anderson, Kimball)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery #245 is withdrawn. Status hearing date of 6/30/2009 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds, )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 UNOPPOSED Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Discovery and Request to cancel status hearing by Federal Trade Commission (Mora, Michael) Modified on 6/18/2009 (ca, ).
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion #245 to compel is continued to 6/30/2009, at 9:30 a.m. Telephone notice (gds, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion to compel is re-set to 6/4/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Telephone notice (gds, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/28/2009. Status hearing set for 5/20/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 4/13/2009 regarding plaintiff's motion to compel discovery responses, #245 which is continued to 4/28/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion #246 for leave to file under seal Ex. 10 to plaintiff's motion to compel postjudgment discovery responses is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for discovery,, #245 , motion to seal document, #246 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/9/2009 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission For Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit 10 to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery Responses from Defendant Kevin Trudeau, and Certificate of Service (Mora, Michael) Modified on 4/7/2009 (ca, ).
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery Responses from Defendant Kevin Trudeau, and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC Ex 1, #2 Exhibit FTC Ex 2, #3 Exhibit FTC Ex 3, #4 Exhibit FTC Ex 4, #5 Exhibit FTC Ex 5, #6 Exhibit FTC Ex 6, #7 Exhibit FTC Ex 7, #8 Exhibit FTC Ex 8, #9 Exhibit FTC Ex 9, #10 Exhibit FTC Ex 11, #11 Exhibit FTC Ex 12, #12 Exhibit FTC Ex 13, #13 Exhibit FTC Ex 14)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 4/7/2009 (ca, ).
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ABSTRACT of judgment issued by the USA as to Kevin Trudeau in the amount of $37,616,161. (cdy, ).
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued per the request of USA as to Kevin Trudeau in the amount of $37, 616,161. (ca, )
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion #241 of Michael Mora for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mora, Michael)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 USCA RECEIVED on 1/23/2009 the long record regarding notice of appeal #231 . (gej, )
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #231 (USCA no. 08-4249) consisting of 4 volumes of pleadings, 8 loose pleadings, 8 transcripts and 1 box of exhibits. (gej, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 238 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC. (Poor quality original - paper document on file). (ca, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 237 EXHIBITS by Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC. (1 Box) (Document not scanned) (td, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 DESIGNATION by Kevin Trudeau of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 08-4249 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Parker, Lisa)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE of Case Opening. (ca, )
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #231 ; USCA Case No. 08-4249. (ca, )
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #231 . Notified counsel (gej, )
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, )
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders #221 , #156 , #158 , #228 , #93 , #211 , #220 , #212 , #157 , #92 , #229 , #219 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 07520000000003360763. (Anderson, Kimball)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 12/19/2008 is stricken. Telephone notice (gds, )
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/11/2008: Mailed notice (gds, )
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to alter or amend judgment #222 is denied and motion to stay #222 is denied Mailed notice (gds )
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion to alter judgment, motion to stay, motion for relief #222 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Anderson, Kimball)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to alter judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVEMOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding entered judgment #221 PENDING APPEAL #222 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments)(Prabhu, Sandhya)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 11/18/2008 regarding defendant's motion to alter judgment, motion to stay, motion for relief #222 . Response is due by 11/26/2008. Reply is due by 12/3/2008. Status hearing set for 12/19/2008 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds )
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to alter judgment, motion to stay, motion for relief #222 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Anderson, Kimball)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to alter judgment, motion to stay, motion for relief #222 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/18/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to alter judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding entered judgment #221 PENDING APPEAL (Anderson, Kimball)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ENTERED JUDGMENT. (ca, )
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Supplemental Order and Judgment entered signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/4/2008: mailed notice ( gds )
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Supplemental Order and Judgment entered. Accordingly, the court denies defendant's motion to reconsider its finding that he is in contempt of the 2004 injunction. The court enters judgment in favor of the FTC and against defendant Kevin Trudeau in the amount of $37,616,161, representing a reasonable approximation of the loss consumers suffered as a result of defendant's deceptive infomercials. The 2004 injunction remains in full force and effect. Defendant is enjoined. This court retains jurisdiction. mailed notice (gds, )
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for leave to file #215 supplemental authority is granted. Status hearing held on 11/4/2008 mailed notice (gds, )
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file #215 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/4/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING REMEDIES (Attachments: #1 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING REMEDIES, #2 Exhibit 1-3 TO SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING REMEDIES)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 10/30/2008. Status hearing set for 11/4/2008 at 10:00 a.m. mailed notice (gds )
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PROPOSED REVISIONS TO THE COURT'S OCTOBER 21, 2008 PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 213 FTC PROPOSED Revisions to Court's October 21, 2008 Proposed Supplemental Order and Judgment by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC's Proposed Revisions to Court's Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Red-line of FTC Proposed Revisions)(Prabhu, Sandhya) Modified on 10/28/2008 (cdy, ).
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER Regarding Trial Exhibits Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/23/2008.(ca, )
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Enter order regarding trial exhibits. [For further detail see separate order]. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 CORRECTED REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of it's Motion to Clarify and Amend the Judgment entered against Defendant Kevin Trudeau on August 7, 2008. #165 (ca, )
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Plaintiff's motion #202 for leave to file corrected reply brief is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/21/2008: Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(gds, )
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 10/20/2008. Status hearing set for 10/30/2008 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MANDATE of USCA dated 10/17/08 regarding notice of appeal #196 ; USCA No. 08-3548. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (ca, )
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 205 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit in USCA no. 08-3548, no record to be returned. (ca, )
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Joint Submission Regarding Evidentiary Rulings On Trial Exhibits by Federal Trade Commission, Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hurtado, Daniel)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE of Motion by Sandhya Prabhu for presentment of motion for leave to file #202 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/20/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Prabhu, Sandhya)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Clarify and Amend Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Reply Brief)(Prabhu, Sandhya)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #196 ; USCA Case No. 08-3548. (ca, )
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to stay #193 judgment pending disposition of FTC's Rule 59(e) motion is granted. There will be no production of any infomercials promoting products in which defendant has an interest. Mailed notice (gds, )
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to response to motion #191 to Clarify/Amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Exhibits)(Prabhu, Sandhya)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (ef, )
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #196 . Notified counsel (ef, )
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders #156 , #158 , #93 , #157 , #92 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 07520000000003167371. (Anderson, Kimball)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay #193 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/7/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay #193 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Anderson, Kimball)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay JUDGMENT PENDING DISPOSITION OF THE FTC'S RULE 59(e) MOTION (Anderson, Kimball)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is re-set to 10/20/2008 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to amend/correct Judgment Entered Against Defendant Kevin Trudeau on August 7, 2008 #165 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Anderson, Kimball)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC by Lisa Janice Parker (Parker, Lisa)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/9/2008. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion #165 to clarify and amend judgment is due by 9/22/2008. Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/7/2008. Status hearing set for 10/21/2008 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #184 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/9/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION by Defendant Kevin TrudeauTo Admit Evidence And Objections To Plaintiff FTC's Proposed Evidence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List)(Hurtado, Daniel)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Motion by Sandhya Prabhu for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #182 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/9/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Prabhu, Sandhya)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionAdmit Evidence (Attachments: #1 Appendix FTC Objections to Defense Exhibits)(Prabhu, Sandhya)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC by John F Kness (Kness, John)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion #172 of David J. Bradford, Daniel J. Hurtado and David Eric Jiminez-Ekman to withdraw as counsel for defendant Kevin Trudeau is granted. Motion #175 of Katharine R. Saunders to withraw appearance as counsel for defendants Kevin Trudeau and Shop America is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to stay #168 judgment pending appeal is denied. Motion hearing held on 9/2/2008 regarding motion to stay, #168 . Plaintiff's motion to clarify #165 is continued to 9/9/2008 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney #172 (Prabhu, Sandhya)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Motion by Katharine R Saunders for presentment of motion to withdraw appearance #175 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2008 at 9:15 AM. (ca, ) .
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION by counsel for Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC to withdraw appearance. (ca, )
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Amended NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #172 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Bradford, David)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #172 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/27/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Bradford, David)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Bradford, David)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to stay #162 is withdrawn. Telephone notice (gds, )
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay, motion for relief #168 (Amended Memorandum). (Hurtado, Daniel)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief #168 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding entered judgment #158 (Hurtado, Daniel)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Motion by Federal Trade Commission for presentment of motion to amend/correct, #165 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Prabhu, Sandhya)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in support of motion to amend/correct, #165 Judgment Entered Against Defendant Kevin Trudeau on August 7, 2008 (Prabhu, Sandhya)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to amend/correct Judgment Entered Against Defendant Kevin Trudeau on August 7, 2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Supplemental Order and Judgment in a Civil Case Amending the Judgment Entered on August 7, 2008)(Prabhu, Sandhya)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay, motion for relief #162 (Hurtado, Daniel)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief #162 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/26/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding entered judgment #158 pending appeal. (Hurtado, Daniel)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/25/08 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER COSTALES, CRR, RMR (312)427-5351 jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (Costales, Jennifer)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/23/08 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER COSTALES, CRR, RMR (312)427-5351 jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (Costales, Jennifer)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/22/08 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER COSTALES, CRR, RMR (312)427-5351 jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (Costales, Jennifer)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ENTERED JUDGMENT signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/7/2008: Mailed notice ( gds, )
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/7/2008:Mailed notice (gds, )
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Memorandum opinion and order entered. Accordingly, defendant Trudeau's motion for reconsideration #95 of this court's finding of contempt is denied and he is enjoined from participating in the production or publication of any infomercial for any product, including books, for a period of three years. In addition, judgment is entered in favor of FTC and against Kevin Trudeau in the sum of $5,173,000 representing a conservative estimate of the royalties Trudeau realized from the sale of the Weight Loss Book through the offending infomercials. Mailed notice (gds, )
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Hearing resumed, Further evidence heard and concluded. Hearing ends. Plaintiffs motion #148 to disqualify is granted in part and denied in part as stated on the record. Motion #62 to show cause why defendant should not be held in contempt, motion #95 for reconsideration, and motion #146 to withdraw are taken under advisement. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 DOCUMENT entered in error. (cdy, ).
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentuary hearing resumed. Evidence heard in part. Hearing continued to 7/25/2008, at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cdy, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to withdraw #146 continued generally. Evidentiary hearing begins. Evidence heard in part. Hearing continued to 7/23/2008 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdy, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Any documents still under seal in this case are ordered UNSEALED. Mailed notice (cdy, )
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney #145 . The Motion was filed in error. The attorney refiled the correct motion. (ca, )
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Motion by Sandhya Prabhu for presentment of motion in limine #148 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/22/2008 at 01:30 PM. (Prabhu, Sandhya)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissionin limine to Disqualify Proposed Experts and Exclude Their Testimony (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachments to Motion in Limine)(Prabhu, Sandhya)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #146 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/22/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Bradford, David)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Bradford, David)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Hurtado, Daniel).(Entered in error).
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissionin limine Notice of Motion in Limine (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Prabhu, Sandhya)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissionin limine to Disqualify Proposed Experts and Exclude Their Testimony (Prabhu, Sandhya)
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/29/08 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey, (708)840-8482, valharam@aol.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Under Quick Links select Electronic Transcript Procedures. Redaction Request due 7/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2008. (amb, )
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for extension of time #139 to 7/11/2008 for taking fact depositions is granted. Telephone notice (gds, )
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of extension of time #139 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/25/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for extension of time For Taking Depositions (Hurtado, Daniel)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Documents nos. 108,117,118,119,120,130,131,and 132 are ordered UNSEALED.Mailed notice (ca, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for extension of time #134 to 6/20/2008 to take depositions is granted. Status hearing held on 5/29/2008. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/22/2008 at 01:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 10/19/07; Before the Honorable Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. (lcw, ) (Pursuant to the March 2011 Judicial Conference Policy requiring that remote access restrictions be implemented when placing scanned versions of previously filed paper documents on the record, this document is restricted to allow public access only at the Clerk's Office public access terminals.) (Main Document 136 replaced on 5/18/2018) (jk, ). Modified on 5/18/2018 (jk, ).
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of extension of time #134 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/29/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission, Defendant Kevin Trudeau for extension of time for taking depositions. (joint motion) (Hurtado, Daniel)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STATUS Report (Joint). by Federal Trade Commission, Kevin Trudeau (Hurtado, Daniel)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 EXHIBIT 30 & 31 in Support of its Remedy Brief for compensatory contempt sanctions and motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission.(Poor Quality Original - paper document on file) Modified on 9/10/2008 (ca, ).
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Plaintiff's Remedy Brief for Compensatory Contempt Sanctions by Federal Trade Commission. (ca, )
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 EXHIBITS 30 and 31 by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of its Remedy Brief for compensatory contempt sanctions and motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction. (lcw, ) #1 Exhibits) (ca, ).
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of its motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction as to defendant Kevin Trudeau. (lcw, ) #1 Main document) (ca, ).
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of its Remedy Brief for compensatory contempt sanctions. (lcw, ) #1 Main Document) (ca, ).
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 APPENDIX by Federal Trade Commission Unpublished Cases - Part 2 (Prabhu, Sandhya)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 APPENDIX by Federal Trade Commission Unpublished Cases - Part 1 (Prabhu, Sandhya)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Prabhu, Sandhya)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 2/14/08; Before the Honorable Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. (lcw, ) (Pursuant to the March 2011 Judicial Conference Policy requiring that remote access restrictions be implemented when placing scanned versions of previously filed paper documents on the record, this document is restricted to allow public access only at the Clerk's Office public access terminals.) (Main Document 126 replaced on 5/18/2018) (jk, ). Modified on 5/18/2018 (jk, ).
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE by Kevin Trudeau re Response #123 , exhibit list,,,,, #124 , Response #122 (Hurtado, Daniel)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Exhibit List in Support of Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Modify (122) and Response to Plaintiff's Remedy Brief (123) by Kevin Trudeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T - Transcript of January 29, 2008 deposition of Kevin Trudeau, #2 Exhibit U - Transcript of February 8, 2008 deposition of George Potts, #3 Exhibit V- Transcript of January 28, 2008 deposition of Suneil Sant, #4 Exhibit W- Trucom Custom Transaction Detail, #5 Exhibit X - November 20, 2007 letter from C. Robertson to L. Kapin, #6 Exhibit Y - November 21, 2007 Hearing Transcript, #7 Exhibit Z - Report of Jeffrey Harris, #8 Exhibit AA - ITV Return Policy, #9 Exhibit BB - Chronology of Communications, #10 Exhibit CC - FTC's Responses to Requests for Admission, #11 Exhibit DD - March 19, 2008 letter from L. Kapin to D. Hurtado, #12 Exhibit EE - FTC Privilege Log, #13 Exhibit FF - Article, Asher and Harper, American Journal of Clinical Nutrition, #14 Exhibit GG - Article, Lebon, Journal for the American Geriatrics Society, #15 Exhibit HH - Article, Lebon, Treatment of Overweight Patients with Chorionic Gonadotropin, #16 Exhibit II - September 13, 2007 letter from D. Hurtado to R. Kaye, #17 Exhibit JJ - Keith R. Fentonmiller, Reflections on the Mirror Image Doctrine: Should the Federal Trade Commission Regulate False Advertising for Books Promoting Wealth, Weight Loss, and Miraculous Cures? 110 W. Va. L. Rev. 573 (2008))(Hurtado, Daniel)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau To Plaintiff's Remedy Brief For Compensatory Contempt Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Brian Kleiner, #2 Declaration Of William M. Hughes, Jr.)(Hurtado, Daniel)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau To Plaintiff's Rule 60(b) Motion To Modify The Stipulated Final Order For Permanent Injunction As To Defendant Kevin Trudeau (Hurtado, Daniel)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECLARATION of Marc J. Lane. (lcw, ) # 1 Main Document) (ca, ).
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to plaintiff's Rule 60(b) motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction as to defendant Kevin Trudeau. (lcw, ) #1 Main Document) (ca, )
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 CONSOLIDATED EXHIBITS by Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Response to plaintiff's Remedy Brief and Motion to modify the stipulated final order. (lcw, ) # 1 Main Document) (ca, )
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to plaintiff's remedy brief for compensatory contempt sanctions. (lcw, ) #1 Main Document) (ca, ).
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CERTIFICATE of Service to 1) Defendant Kevin Trudeaus Response To Plaintiffs Rule 60(b) Motion To Modify The Stipulated Protective Order For Permanent Injunction As To Defendant Kevin Trudeau, 2) Defendant Kevin Trudeaus Response to Plaintiffs Remedy Brief for Compensatory Contempt Sanctions, 3) Defendant Kevin Trudeaus Consolidated Exhibits in Response to Plaintiffs Remedy Brief and Motion to Modify the Stipulated Final Order, and 4) Declaration of Marc J. Lane by Daniel Jay Hurtado on behalf of Kevin Trudeau (Hurtado, Daniel)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Defendants motion for leave to file response to plaintiffs remedy brief and response to plaintiffs motion to modify the stipulated final order under seal is granted.Telephoned notice (rbf, )
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for leave to file #113 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/24/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file His Response To Plaintiff's Remedy Brief And Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Modify The Stipulated Final Order Under Seal (Unopposed) (Hurtado, Daniel)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing