Banks v. Bieble et al

Plaintiff: Larry Maurice Banks
Defendant: Paul Bieble, Michael Sheahan, Dick Devine and Lisa Madigan
Case Number: 1:2007cv00784
Filed: April 10, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2012 363 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/11/2012. (tg, )
October 17, 2012 352 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/17/2012: Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis 347 is denied. Plaintiff did not seek leave to file an interlocutory appeal. Furthermore, he has struck out under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and this case does not involve imminent danger of serious physical injury. In addition, the court certifies that the appeal is not taken in good faith. Plaintiff is therefore ordered to pay the appellate fees of $455 b y 11/7/2012; if Plaintiff does not comply with this order, the Court of Appeals may dismiss his appeal for want of prosecution. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the PLRA Attorney, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit. (For further details see written opinion.) Mailed notice.(ym, )
July 17, 2012 331 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/17/2012: Plaintiff's motion for Rule 60 relief from judgment 321 and motion to compel the court reporter to turn over deposition transcripts 322 are denied. Plaintiff is reminded that his response to Defendants' summary judgment motion is due 8/15/2012. (For further details see text below.) Mailed notice. (psm, )
April 26, 2012 285 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/26/2012: Plaintiff's motion for recusal 265 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for the City of Chicago to indemnify Officers Lopes and Fuentes 263 is denied as unnecessary. Plain tiff's motion to compel 264 is denied without prejudice as moot in light of the 4/10/2012 order 275 . Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a fifth amended complaint 266 is denied. (For further details see text below.) Mailed notice.(psm, )
December 16, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/16/2011.Mailed notice.(jlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Bieble et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Maurice Banks
Represented By: Damon Matthew Cheronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bieble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sheahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?