United States Of America v. One Ezonics Ezcam Model P35U1 USB Webcam et al

Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: One Ezonics Ezcam Model P35U1 USB Webcam, One Olympus Camedia C 440 Zoom Digital Camera with Flash, One Cannon Powershot A70 Digital Camera, One Nikon CL30S 24MM Lens, One Nikon/Nikkor CL13 52MM Lens, One Sunpak 58MM Macro Lens, One Studio Light, One Nikon N70 Camera with HB25 Lens, If Asperical Macro 1:2 and Speedlight SB28 Flash, One Nikon FA Camera, Model 84PA, One Dell Dimension 8250 CPU, One Micron Millenia SB44.BX-PII400-MT CPU, One Micron Millenia Se440BX-PII400-MT CPU, One Magnavox Headstart DX33, Model HS3300 GY01 CPU, One Nikon Super Coolscan LS-4000 Film Scanner, One Connertechnology CT210 Hard Drive and One Western Digital Caviar WDAC365-23F Hard Drive
Case Number: 1:2007cv03759
Filed: July 5, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:0881 Forfeiture of Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2012 164 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 3/1/2012.(ea, )
August 2, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/2/2011.(ea, )
March 24, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Claimant Charles Burt for judgment (Beal, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. One Ezonics Ezcam Model P35U1 USB Webcam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Monika Bickert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Ezonics Ezcam Model P35U1 USB Webcam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Olympus Camedia C 440 Zoom Digital Camera with Flash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Cannon Powershot A70 Digital Camera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Nikon CL30S 24MM Lens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Nikon/Nikkor CL13 52MM Lens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Sunpak 58MM Macro Lens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Studio Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Nikon N70 Camera with HB25 Lens, If Asperical Macro 1:2 and Speedlight SB28 Flash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Nikon FA Camera, Model 84PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Dell Dimension 8250 CPU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Micron Millenia SB44.BX-PII400-MT CPU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Micron Millenia Se440BX-PII400-MT CPU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Magnavox Headstart DX33, Model HS3300 GY01 CPU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Nikon Super Coolscan LS-4000 Film Scanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Connertechnology CT210 Hard Drive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Western Digital Caviar WDAC365-23F Hard Drive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?