Nitz v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Herman L Nitz, Jr
Defendant: Tony Doe, Jean Harvey, Officer Perkins, John Doe one and two, Ted Doe, Wester, C. Allendorf, Keenan, John E Zaruba, Marty Manion and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2008cv00334
Filed: February 20, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: William J. Hibbler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2011 180 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 1/7/2011: The plaintiff's application for leave to appeal in forma pauperis is denied. The court certifies that the plaintiff has filed an impermissible interlocutory appeal, and tha t the appeal is not taken in good faith. The plaintiff is ordered to pay the appellate fees of $455 within fourteen days or the Court of Appeals may dismiss his appeal for want of prosecution. The clerk is directed to send a copy of this order t o the PLRA Attorney, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit. The plaintiff is once again reminded that he must provide the court with the original plus a judge's copy of every document filed. [For further details see minute order] Mailed notice (ca, ).
December 7, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 12/7/2010. The plaintiff's "motion requesting court's assistance in serving subpoenas" 164 is denied. On the court's own motion, the plaintiff is granted thir ty days to serve on opposing counsel requests for any information or records not yet obtained through prior discovery and disclosures. No further extensions of time will be granted to prolong the discovery process in this 2008 case. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ca, ).
November 22, 2010 163 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 11/22/2010(ca, ).
November 18, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 11/18/2010(ca, ).
July 24, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 7/24/2009(ca, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nitz v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman L Nitz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe one and two
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Allendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Zaruba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Manion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?