In Re: Aqua Dots Products Liability Litigation

Defendant: Spin Master, Ltd., Spin Master, Inc. and Target Corporation
In Re: Aqua Dots Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 1:2008cv02364
Filed: April 9, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Referring Judge: Susan E. Cox
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2011 541 Opinion or Order of the Court Written Opinion entered by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 8/2/2011: Status hearing set for 9/8/2011 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss the status of member cases not directly impacted by the pending appeal in Seventh Circuit case number 10-3847. Parties a re to file a joint status report on or before 8/30/2011 regarding: (1) the remaining parties' desire to proceed with litigation in member case number 08 C 6914 at this time; (2) the need for further briefing on Moose Enterprise Pty Ltd.'s p ending motion to dismiss in member case number 09 C 4001 35 ; (3) the identification of any pending motions in lead case number 08 C 2364 that will be ripe for resolution by this court upon remand from the Seventh Circuit; and (4) the parties' proposed schedule for proceeding with consolidated expert discovery in the lead case and all member cases. The Monje Plaintiffs' motion for suggestion of remand in member case number 09 C 7652 22 is denied for the reasons set forth in the Statement section of this order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 8/2/2011: Mailed notice (am)
October 4, 2010 524 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 10/4/2010.(psm, )
July 28, 2010 447 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 7/28/10: (vkd, )
June 23, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 6/23/09: (vkd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Aqua Dots Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Aqua Dots Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spin Master, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spin Master, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?