Fowler v. United States Of America

Plaintiff: James Fowler
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2008cv02785
Filed: May 13, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 2/21/2014:Mailed notice(air, )
January 17, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/17/2012: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff James Fowlers motion to compel 53 is granted in part and denied in part. Mailed notice(tbk, )
December 22, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/22/2011. Mailed notice(tbk, )
March 18, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/18/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fowler
Represented By: Daniel Edward O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?