Casares v. Bernal et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Casares
Defendant: Officer Bernal, Officer Szubski, Officer Verdin, Officer Leach, Officer Williams, Officer Calvo, Officer Partyka and City of Chicago, The
Case Number: 1:2008cv04198
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: George W. Lindberg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 261 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/31/2011: On May 20, 2011, this court issued a memorandum opinion and order resolving the parties' motions in limine. Plaintiffs Daniel and Karina Casares have submitted a supplement to t heir motion numbers 5 and 22 seeking to exclude evidence of two witnesses' drug and/or alcohol use before, on the date of, or after the underlying incident. For the reasons set forth below, the request is granted with respect to pre- and post-occurrence use (Pls.' Mot. # 5), but denied with respect to their possession of drugs or alcohol during the underlying incident (Pls.' Mot. # 22). [ For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (aac, )
May 20, 2011 250 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/20/2011. (aac, )
February 10, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 2/10/2011: Based on the submissions of the parties and their oral arguments on February 8, 2011, Defendants' Combined Motion to Substitute Counsel, to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion for S ummary Judgment, and to Re-set Pre-Trial Order Dates 158 is granted in part and denied in part. The court granted Defendants' motion on February 8, 2011, permitting the new attorneys to file their appearances. Defendants' request to set a briefing schedule for a summary judgment motion is denied. Defendants' request to reset the due date for the joint pre-trial order and motions in limine is granted. Parties are ordered to file their joint pre-trial order and motions in limine b y March 31, 2011. Parties may file responses to the opposing party's motions in limine by April 11, 2011. A hearing on the motions in limine will be held on April 15, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1003 (please note the courtroom change). Pret rial conference will be held on May 18, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1944D. Jury trial set for June 6, 2011, starting at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 161 is denied as moot. [ For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (aac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casares v. Bernal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Casares
Represented By: Rachelle M. Sorg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Szubski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Verdin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Calvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Partyka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?