Domanus et al v. Lewicki et al

Plaintiff: Jan Domanus, Andrew Kozlowski and Krakow Business Park Sp.z.o.o
Defendant: Derek Lewicki, Richard Swiech, Adam Swiech, Alicja Gostek Swiech, Spectrum Company, Ltd., Orchard Meadows Homes, Inc., Orchard Meadows Homes, LLC, Orchard Meadows, LLC, Lake Ridge Townhomes Corp. and ADR Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv04922
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2015 826 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/28/2015: For the reasons discussed in the attached order, Locke Lord's, Dienner's, and KFTR's motions to dismiss ( 761 , 787 , and 791 , respectively) are granted. Both the supplemental complaint, 755 , and second supplemental complaint, 770 , are dismissed without prejudice. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
January 11, 2013 657 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/11/2013. Mailed notice (jdh)
December 14, 2012 649 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/14/2012.Mailed notice(lxs, )
November 5, 2012 634 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 11/5/2012.Mailed notice(gel, )
June 8, 2012 528 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 6/8/2012.Mailed notice(lxs, )
May 29, 2012 520 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/29/2012Mailed notice(ca, ).
April 13, 2012 494 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Injunction Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/13/2012:Mailed notice(ca, ).
October 31, 2011 438 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 10/31/2011: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Certain Discovery 430 is entered and continued.The Court has ordered the following steps to expedite the discovery process: [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice. (is, )
March 14, 2011 368 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/14/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
August 19, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/19/2009:Mailed notice(mpj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domanus et al v. Lewicki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Domanus
Represented By: Donald H. Segel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Kozlowski
Represented By: Donald H. Segel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krakow Business Park Sp.z.o.o
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Lewicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Swiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Swiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicja Gostek Swiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Meadows Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Meadows Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Meadows, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Ridge Townhomes Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADR Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?