Furry et al v. United States Of America

Plaintiff: David Furry, Diane Nye and Tina Nye
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2008cv06138
Filed: October 27, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 39:409 Postal Service

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/13/2012:Mailed notice(rth, )
May 10, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/10/2011: The government's motions in limine are decided as follows: [97-1] is granted, [98-1] is denied, and [99-1] is denied without prejudice to renewal at trial. Government mot ion in limine [100-1] is denied without prejudice given that the motion seeks relief identical to that sought in a motion being briefed before the magistrate judge. Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/10/2011.Mailed notice. [For further detail see minute order.](kj, )
March 17, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION for summary judgment 83 is denied; WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/17/2011: Defendant United States of America's motion for summary judgment [83-1] is denied. The parties shall report for a status hearing on March 31, 2011, at 11:00 a.m., and shall be prepared to set a date for trial.Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Furry et al v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Furry
Represented By: Benjamin Adam Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Nye
Represented By: Benjamin Adam Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Nye
Represented By: Benjamin Adam Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?