Chester County Employees' Retirement Fund v. White et al
Plaintiff: Warren Pinchuk, Roy Sapir, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, Public School Retirement System Of The School District Of Kansas City, Missouri, derivatively on behalf of Nominal Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Pipefitters Local Union 537 Pension Fund, Pipefitters Local Union 537 Health & Welfare Plan, Pipefitters Local Union 537 Deferred Income Annuity Fund and Chester County Employees' Retirement Fund
Defendant: Phebe N. Novakovic, William N. Daley, Mary T. Szela, Miles D. White, Duane L. Burnham, Jeffrey Leiden, William Dempsey, Richard A. Gonzalez, H. Laurance Fuller, Roxanne S. Austin, W. James Farrell, Samuel C. Scott, III, Glenn F. Tilton, William A. Osborn, Robert J. Alpern, K. Frank Austen, Jack M. Greenberg, Thomas R. Hodgson, David A. Jones, David Owen, Robert L. Parkinson, Jr., Boone Powell, Jr, Addison Barry Rand, W. Ann Reynolds, Roy S. Roberts, William D. Smithburg, John R. Walter, William L. Weiss, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Edward M. Liddy and Michael J. Warmuth
Movant: Jacksonville Police & Fire Pension Fund
Case Number: 1:2011cv08114
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/12/2013: Mailed notice(tlp, )
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/5/2013.Mailed notice(tsa, )
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/15/2012.Mailed notice(tsa, )
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/13/2012.(tsa, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chester County Employees' Retirement Fund v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Pinchuk
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Sapir
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Glenn L Hara
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public School Retirement System Of The School District Of Kansas City, Missouri, derivatively on behalf of Nominal Defendant Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Richard Allen Saldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipefitters Local Union 537 Pension Fund
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Peter E. Borkon
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipefitters Local Union 537 Health & Welfare Plan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Peter E. Borkon
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipefitters Local Union 537 Deferred Income Annuity Fund
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Peter E. Borkon
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester County Employees' Retirement Fund
Represented By: Robin Winchester
Represented By: Norman Rifkind
Represented By: Justin O. Reliford
Represented By: Amelia Susan Newton
Represented By: Leigh R. Lasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phebe N. Novakovic
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William N. Daley
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary T. Szela
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles D. White
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane L. Burnham
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Leiden
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dempsey
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Laurance Fuller
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne S. Austin
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. James Farrell
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel C. Scott, III
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn F. Tilton
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Osborn
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Alpern
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Frank Austen
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack M. Greenberg
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Hodgson
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Jones
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Owen
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Parkinson, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone Powell, Jr
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Barry Rand
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Ann Reynolds
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy S. Roberts
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Smithburg
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Walter
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Weiss
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Joy Donnell
Represented By: Robert J. Kopecky
Represented By: Sallie Gamble Smylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Liddy
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Warmuth
Represented By: Brian Joseph Murray
Represented By: Daniel E. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Jacksonville Police & Fire Pension Fund
Represented By: Andrew D Abramowitz
Represented By: Glenn L Hara
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Heffner
Represented By: Leigh R. Lasky
Represented By: Amelia Susan Newton
Represented By: Norman Rifkind
Represented By: Robert M. Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?