Zhang v. Groupon, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Fan Zhang
Defendant: Groupon, Inc., Andrew D. Mason, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Peter J. Barris, Kevin J. Efrusy, Mellody Hobson, Bradley A. Keywell, Howard Schultz, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Allen & Company LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Loop Capital Markets, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC and The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02450
Filed: April 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER: The Groupon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint 131 is denied. The Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint 134 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 9/18/2013. Mailed notice (ao,)
September 9, 2013 Filing 157 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle: The September 13, 2013 motion hearing date is stricken. Telephoned/mailed notice (ewf, )
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: Groupon Defendant's and the Underwriter Defendant's Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint 131 , 134 remain before the Court. Hearing and argument on the motions is set for September 13, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 9/4/2013. Mailed notice (ao,)
August 22, 2013 Filing 155 Defendants' Joint Response To Lead Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority by Jason E. Child, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Goldman Sachs & Co., Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Howard Schultz (Suskin, Howard)
August 22, 2013 Filing 154 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for leave to file 150 is granted. Motion for leave to file 152 is granted. The parties are not required to appear on Friday, August 23, 2013. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 21, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE of Motion by Howard Steven Suskin for presentment of motion for leave to file, 152 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/23/2013 at 10:30 AM. (Suskin, Howard)
August 21, 2013 Filing 152 MOTION by Defendants Jason E. Child, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Goldman Sachs & Co., Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Howard Schultz for leave to file Instanter Response To Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Suskin, Howard)
August 20, 2013 Filing 151 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua B. Silverman for presentment of motion for leave to file 150 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/23/2013 at 10:30 AM. (Silverman, Joshua)
August 20, 2013 Filing 150 MOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter for leave to file Instanter Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Silverman, Joshua)
May 9, 2013 Filing 149 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Defendants' Joint Motion Requesting the Court to Consider Their Responses to Plaintiff's Surreply When Adjudicating Their Motions to Dismiss 146 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, May 10, 2013. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 148 RESPONSE by Michael Cohn Carter to MOTION by Defendants Jason E. Child, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Goldman Sachs & Co., Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Howard Schultz Request 146 (Ludwig, Louis)
May 6, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE of Motion by Howard Steven Suskin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 146 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/10/2013 at 10:30 AM. (Suskin, Howard)
May 6, 2013 Filing 146 MOTION by Defendants Jason E. Child, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Goldman Sachs & Co., Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Howard Schultz Requesting The Court To Consider Their Responses To Plaintiff's Surreply When Adjudicating Their Motion To Dismiss (JOINT) (Suskin, Howard)
May 2, 2013 Filing 145 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion for leave to file surreply instanter 141 is granted. The parties are not required to appear on Friday, May 3, 2013. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 1, 2013 Filing 144 RESPONSE by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC to MOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter for leave to file Surreply in Response to New Arguments Raised in Defendants Motion to Dismiss Reply BriefsMOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter to file instanter 141 (Duff, Kevin)
May 1, 2013 Filing 143 RESPONSE by Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultzin Opposition to MOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter for leave to file Surreply in Response to New Arguments Raised in Defendants Motion to Dismiss Reply BriefsMOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter to file instanter 141 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Suskin, Howard)
April 26, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE of Motion by Louis Carey Ludwig for presentment of motion for leave to file,, motion to file instanter, 141 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/3/2013 at 10:30 AM. (Ludwig, Louis)
April 26, 2013 Filing 141 MOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter for leave to file Surreply in Response to New Arguments Raised in Defendants Motion to Dismiss Reply Briefs, MOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter to file instanter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Surreply)(Ludwig, Louis)
April 22, 2013 Filing 140 REPLY by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC Reply Memorandum In Further Support of the Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Duff, Kevin)
April 22, 2013 Filing 139 REPLY by Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz to MOTION by Defendants Theodore J. Leonsis, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Andrew D. Mason, Kevin J. Efrusy, Howard Schultz, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto to dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint 131 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Suskin, Howard)
March 19, 2013 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM by Michael Cohn Carter in Opposition to motion to dismiss, 134 , motion to dismiss 131 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Louis C. Ludwig, # 2 Appendix of Unreported Decisions)(Silverman, Joshua)
February 12, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE by Kevin Buckley Duff of Change of Address Change of Firm Name (Duff, Kevin)
January 18, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC re memorandum in support of motion, 135 , MOTION by Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC to dismiss The Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in the Groupon Defendant 134 (Duff, Kevin)
January 18, 2013 Filing 135 MEMORANDUM by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC in support of motion to dismiss, 134 Memorandum of Law In Support of the Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Joinder In The Groupon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duff, Kevin)
January 18, 2013 Filing 134 MOTION by Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC to dismiss The Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and Joinder in the Groupon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Duff, Kevin)
January 18, 2013 Filing 133 NOTICE by Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz re memorandum in support of motion, 132 , MOTION by Defendants Theodore J. Leonsis, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Andrew D. Mason, Kevin J. Efrusy, Howard Schultz, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto to dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint 131 (Suskin, Howard)
January 18, 2013 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM by Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz in support of motion to dismiss 131 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Suskin, Howard)
January 18, 2013 Filing 131 MOTION by Defendants Theodore J. Leonsis, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Andrew D. Mason, Kevin J. Efrusy, Howard Schultz, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto to dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Suskin, Howard)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion of Defendants to Amend Schedule and Enlarge Page Limitations for Briefing of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/14/2012: (lp, )
December 14, 2012 Filing 129 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Enter Order to Amend Schedule and Enlarge Page Limitations for Briefing of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (lp, )
December 13, 2012 Filing 128 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Unopposed Motion of Defendants to Amend Schedule and Enlarge Page Limitations for Briefing of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 126 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 12, 2012 Filing 127 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Buckley Duff for presentment of extension of time, 126 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/14/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Duff, Kevin)
December 12, 2012 Filing 126 MOTION by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC for extension of time Unopposed Motion of Defendants to Amend Schedule and Enlarge Page Limitations for Briefing of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Duff, Kevin)
October 29, 2012 Filing 125 AMENDED Consolidated Class Action complaint by Michael Cohn Carter against Michael Cohn Carter (Silverman, Joshua) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (lp, ).
October 29, 2012 Filing 124 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Michael Cohn Carter by Joshua B. Silverman (Silverman, Joshua)
September 20, 2012 Filing 123 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion to withdraw as attorney 119 is granted. Motion to withdraw as attorney 121 is granted. Attorney Heidi E. Vonder Heide terminated. The parties are not required to appear on Friday, September 21, 2012. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 18, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE of Motion by Heidi E. VonderHeide for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 121 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/21/2012 at 09:30 AM. (VonderHeide, Heidi)
September 18, 2012 Filing 121 MOTION by counsel for Movant Gus Sekas to withdraw as attorney (VonderHeide, Heidi)
September 18, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE of Motion by Heidi E. VonderHeide for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 119 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/21/2012 at 09:30 AM. (VonderHeide, Heidi)
September 18, 2012 Filing 119 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff John H. Cottrell to withdraw as attorney (VonderHeide, Heidi)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 OPINION and Order Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/28/2012. (lp, )
August 28, 2012 Filing 117 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Michael Carter Cohn's Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel 76 is granted. Michael Carter Cohn is to serve as lead plaintiff in this action and his selection of Pomerantz Haudek Grossman & Gross LLP as lead counsel is approved. Gus Sekas's Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel 77 is denied. John Pedrow's Motion to Consolidate Related Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Lead Counsel 85 is denied. The Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis's Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel 88 is denied. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (lp, )
August 22, 2012 Filing 116 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Status hearing set for August 24, 2012 is stricken. Ruling on pending motions to be mailed. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 16, 2012 Filing 115 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant John Pedrow by Daniel J. Kurowski (Kurowski, Daniel)
August 16, 2012 Filing 114 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant John Pedrow by Elizabeth A. Fegan (Fegan, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2012 Filing 113 REPLY by Movant John Pedrow to response in support of motion, 107 , response in support of motion, 104 , memorandum in opposition to motion, 106 (Kathrein, Reed)
July 13, 2012 Filing 112 REPLY by Movant Michael Cohn Carter to response in support of motion, 107 , response in support of motion, 104 , memorandum in opposition to motion, 106 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael Carter Cohn Declaration in Support of Reply Memorandum of Law)(Dahlstrom, Patrick)
July 13, 2012 Filing 111 REPLY by Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis to response in support of motion, 107 , response in support of motion, 104 (Barz, James)
July 13, 2012 Filing 110 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Michael Cohn Carter by Dominic J. Rizzi (Rizzi, Dominic)
July 2, 2012 Filing 109 DECLARATION of Patrick V. Dahlstrom Corrected, in Support of Michael Carter Cohn's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Chart)(Dahlstrom, Patrick)
June 29, 2012 Filing 108 AFFIDAVIT by Movant John Pedrow in Support of MOTION by Movant John Pedrow to consolidate cases appoint John Pedrow and Stephens Johnson as Lead Plaintiffs and Approve their selection of lead counsel 85 and in Opposition to Competing Motions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kathrein, Reed)
June 29, 2012 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of MOTION by Movant John Pedrow to consolidate cases appoint John Pedrow and Stephens Johnson as Lead Plaintiffs and Approve their selection of lead counsel 85 and in Opposition to Competing Motions (Kathrein, Reed) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (lp, ).
June 29, 2012 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM by Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis in Opposition to motion to consolidate cases 85 , motion to consolidate cases 77 , motion to consolidate cases,, motion to appoint counsel, 76 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Barz, James)
June 29, 2012 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Patrick V. Dahlstrom In Further Support of Michael Carter Cohn's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Chart)(Dahlstrom, Patrick)
June 29, 2012 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of MOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter to consolidate cases , for Appointment as Lead PlaintiffMOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter to appoint counsel 76 In Opposition to Competing Motions (Dahlstrom, Patrick) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.)(lp, ).
June 29, 2012 Filing 103 Notice of Withdrawal of Gus Sekas' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Gus Sekas (Rifkind, Norman)
June 14, 2012 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Patrick V. Dahlstrom regarding motion to consolidate cases, motion to appoint counsel,, 76 , memorandum in support of motion, 78 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certification)(Dahlstrom, Patrick)
June 12, 2012 Filing 100 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant John Pedrow by Peter E. Borkon (Borkon, Peter)
June 12, 2012 Filing 99 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant John Pedrow by Reed R Kathrein (Kathrein, Reed)
June 8, 2012 Filing 101 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Status hearing held on 6/8/2012. Status hearing on consolidated cases is continued to 8/24/2012 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Case Numbers 12 C 2450, 12 C 2460, 12 C 2547, 12 C 2791 and 12 C 3129 are hereby consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Rule 41(a) as in re Groupon, Inc. Securities Litigation, Master File no. 12 C 2450. The Stipulation and Order Regarding scheduling [Document # 32 ] which was previously entered in Case No. 12 C 2791 applies to all cases. Mailed notice (lp, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 94 is granted. Mailed notice (lp, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion to consolidate cases and appoint lead counsel 73 is withdrawn. Motion hearing held on 6/8/2012. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 7, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE by Mario Orlandi, Daniel Wright OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION to Consolidate Related Cases, be Appointed as Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of their Choice of Counsel (Gilden, Carol)
June 7, 2012 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7231541. (Robbins, Darren)
June 7, 2012 Filing 93 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Michael Cohn Carter by Louis Carey Ludwig (Ludwig, Louis)
June 5, 2012 Filing 92 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Gus Sekas by Amelia Susan Newton (Newton, Amelia)
June 4, 2012 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM by Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis in support of motion to appoint counsel, 88 (Barz, James)
June 4, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE of Motion by James E Barz for presentment of motion to appoint counsel, 88 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/8/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Barz, James)
June 4, 2012 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Reed R. Kathrein regarding memorandum in support of motion 87 to consolidate cases, appoint John Pedrow and Stephens Johnson as Lead Plaintiffs and Approve Their Selection of Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Kathrein, Reed)
June 4, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION by Movant Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis to appoint counsel The Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis's Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice, # 3 Exhibit C - Cert, # 4 Exhibit D - Resume)(Barz, James)
June 4, 2012 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM by John Pedrow in support of motion to consolidate cases 85 appoint John Pedrow and Stephens Johnson as Lead Plaintiffs and Approve Their Selection of Lead Counsel (Kathrein, Reed)
June 4, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of Motion by Reed R Kathrein for presentment of motion to consolidate cases 85 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/8/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed)
June 4, 2012 Filing 85 MOTION by Movant John Pedrow to consolidate cases appoint John Pedrow and Stephens Johnson as Lead Plaintiffs and Approve their selection of lead counsel (Kathrein, Reed)
June 4, 2012 Filing 84 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Gus Sekas by Heidi E. VonderHeide (VonderHeide, Heidi)
June 4, 2012 Filing 83 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Gus Sekas by Norman Rifkind (Rifkind, Norman)
June 4, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE of Motion by Norman Rifkind for presentment of motion to consolidate cases 77 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/8/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Rifkind, Norman)
June 4, 2012 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Norman Rifkind regarding memorandum 80 , motion to consolidate cases 77 Declaration of Norman Rifkind in Support of the Motion of Gus Sekas for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Rifkind, Norman)
June 4, 2012 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM motion to consolidate cases 77 by Gus Sekas Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion of Gus Sekas for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Rifkind, Norman)
June 4, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE of Motion by Jeremy Alan Lieberman for presentment of Motion of Michael Carter Cohn for Consolidation Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel 76 (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (lp, ).
June 4, 2012 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM by Michael Cohn Carter in support of motion to consolidate cases,, motion to appoint counsel, 76 and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Dahlstrom in Support of the Motion by Michael Carter Cohn for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel, # 2 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 3 Exhibit B - Certification, # 4 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 5 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 4, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION by Movant Gus Sekas to consolidate cases Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Rifkind, Norman)
June 4, 2012 Filing 76 MOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter to consolidate cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION by Movant Michael Cohn Carter to appoint counsel (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 4, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Motion by Carol V Gilden for presentment of motion to consolidate cases 73 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/8/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Gilden, Carol)
June 4, 2012 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM by Mario Orlandi, Daniel Wright in support of motion to consolidate cases 73 Be Appointed as Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Their Choice of Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Joseph R. Seidman, Jr., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Gilden, Carol)
June 4, 2012 Filing 73 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mario Orlandi, Daniel Wright to consolidate cases be appointed as Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of their Choice of Counsel (Gilden, Carol)
June 4, 2012 Filing 72 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mario Orlandi, Daniel Wright by Carol V Gilden (Gilden, Carol)
May 18, 2012 Filing 71 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fan Zhang by Danielle S. Myers (Myers, Danielle)
May 18, 2012 Filing 70 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Williams Capital Group, L.P. (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 69 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by William Blair & Company L.L.C. (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 68 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 67 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by RBC Capital Markets LLC (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 66 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 65 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 64 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Loop Capital Markets, Inc. (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 63 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 62 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Goldman Sachs & Co. (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 61 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 60 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 59 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 58 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Barclays Capital Inc. (Duff, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Filing 57 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Allen & Company LLC (Duff, Kevin)
May 11, 2012 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John H. Cottrell by Heidi E. VonderHeide (VonderHeide, Heidi)
May 11, 2012 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John H. Cottrell by Amelia Susan Newton (Newton, Amelia)
May 11, 2012 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John H. Cottrell by Norman Rifkind (Rifkind, Norman)
May 10, 2012 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Allen W. Burton's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 34 is granted. Mailed notice (lp, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Jonathan Rosenberg's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 33 is granted. Mailed notice (lp, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Edward N. Moss's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 32 is granted. Mailed notice (lp, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Reassignment Based on Relatedness 35 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Goldman Sachs & Co. on 4/26/2012, answer due 5/17/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Howard Schultz waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Bradley A. Keywell waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Mellody Hobson waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Kevin J. Efrusy waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Peter J. Barris waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Theodore J. Leonsis waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Eric P. Lefkofsky waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Joseph M. Del Preto waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Jason E. Child waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Andrew D. Mason waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fan Zhang. Groupon, Inc. waiver sent on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. (Barz, James)
May 10, 2012 Filing 37 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Groupon, Inc. (Suskin, Howard)
May 9, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Howard Steven Suskin for presentment of motion to reassign case, 35 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/11/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Suskin, Howard)
May 9, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION by Defendants Peter J. Barris, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Mellody Hobson, Bradley A. Keywell, Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz to reassign case (UNOPPOSED) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Suskin, Howard)
May 9, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7132211. (Burton, Allen)
May 9, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7131879. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
May 9, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7131803. (Moss, Edward)
April 27, 2012 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion for Reassignment Based on Relatedness 11 is granted. Motion hearing held on 4/27/2012. Counsel to submit agreed stipulated scheduling order within 21 days. Mailed notice (ewf, )
April 27, 2012 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04272012 before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Court Reporter Contact Information: Maellen_Pittman@ilnd.uscourts.gov 312-435-5576. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2012. (Pittman, Maellen)
April 27, 2012 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. by Michael Rachlis (Rachlis, Michael)
April 27, 2012 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. by Kevin Buckley Duff (Duff, Kevin)
April 26, 2012 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Allen & Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C. by Michael Rachlis (Rachlis, Michael)
April 26, 2012 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Allen & Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C. by Kevin Buckley Duff (Duff, Kevin)
April 25, 2012 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (mr, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to The Williams Capital Group, L.P. on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to RBC Capital Markets LLC on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Loop Capital Markets, Inc. on 4/17/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to William Blair & Company L.L.C. on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Wells Fargo Securities, LLC on 4/17/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC on 4/17/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc. on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Barclays Capital Inc. on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated on 4/17/2012, answer due 5/8/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Allen & Company LLC on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 24, 2012 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fan Zhang as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC on 4/16/2012, answer due 5/7/2012. (Barz, James)
April 18, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Howard Steven Suskin for presentment of motion to reassign case, 11 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 4/27/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Suskin, Howard)
April 18, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Peter J. Barris, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Mellody Hobson, Bradley A. Keywell, Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz to reassign case based on relatedness (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Suskin, Howard)
April 16, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Correction regarding 7 . (lp, )
April 16, 2012 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Peter J. Barris, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Mellody Hobson, Bradley A. Keywell, Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz by Marc David Sokol (Sokol, Marc)
April 16, 2012 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Peter J. Barris, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Mellody Hobson, Bradley A. Keywell, Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz by Elizabeth Abbene Coleman (Coleman, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2012 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz by Howard Steven Suskin (Suskin, Howard) (Filed on the incorrect docket) Modified on 4/16/2012 (lp, ).
April 16, 2012 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Peter J. Barris, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Mellody Hobson, Bradley A. Keywell, Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz by Howard Steven Suskin (Suskin, Howard)
April 16, 2012 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mellody Hobson, Peter J. Barris, Bradley A. Keywell, Jason E. Child, Joseph M. Del Preto, Kevin J. Efrusy, Groupon, Inc., Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Andrew D. Mason, Howard Schultz by Anton Ronald Valukas (Valukas, Anton) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.
April 9, 2012 Filing 4 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/9/2012. (lp, )
April 4, 2012 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Allen & Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Peter J. Barris, Jason E. Child, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Joseph M. Del Preto, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Kevin J. Efrusy, Goldman Sachs & Co., Groupon, Inc., Mellody Hobson, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Bradley A. Keywell, Eric P. Lefkofsky, Theodore J. Leonsis, Loop Capital Markets, Inc., Andrew D. Mason, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Howard Schultz, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C. (ma, )
April 3, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fan Zhang; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7011418. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff certification)(Barz, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang v. Groupon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fan Zhang
Represented By: James E Barz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D. Mason
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason E. Child
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Del Preto
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P. Lefkofsky
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore J. Leonsis
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Barris
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Efrusy
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellody Hobson
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley A. Keywell
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Schultz
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbene Coleman
Represented By: Marc David Sokol
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Anton Ronald Valukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company L.L.C.
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Michael Rachlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?