Jones et al v. Culver Franchising System, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael L. Jones, MBAJ Group, LLC, Michael Anthony G. Wilbern and Wilbern Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Culver Franchising System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03269
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2016 204 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Culver Franchising System, Inc. for judgment CFSI's Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law After Close of Plaintiffs' Case (Farkas, Alan)
September 29, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the Court denies the following motions: (1) CFSI's Motion to Strike Plaintiff Wilbern's Affidavit, 131 ; (2) CFSI's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert John A. Gordon, [12 2]; (3) CFSI's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Time-Barred Claims, 99 ; (4) CFSI's Motion for Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs' Claims for Lost Profits, 123 ; and (5) CFSI's Motion for Summary Judgment on CFSI's Counte rclaim for Breach of Contract and Breach of Personal Guaranty, 96 . CFSI's Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims Brought by Wilbern Enterprises, LLC, 102 , is granted in part and denied in part, with the Court dismissing Wilbern Enterpris es' claims in Count II only. In addition, Plaintiffs shall file a position statement not to exceed 5 pages within 7 days from the date this Order is entered stating whether Wilbern intends to pursue a claim under Count III based on his guarant y. If Wilbern does intend to pursue such a claim, Plaintiffs' position statement shall provide appropriate argument and citation of authority to support Wilbern's legal right to pursue such a claim. CFSI may file a response, also limited t o 5 pages, within 7 days after Plaintiffs' position statement is filed. A status hearing is set for October 21, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel should be prepared to discuss the expected length of trial, and their own trial schedules, as a firm trial date will be set at the status conference. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/29/2015:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 20, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/20/2013. Mailed notice (ao,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Culver Franchising System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Jones
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Represented By: Jamie Lynn North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MBAJ Group, LLC
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Represented By: Jamie Lynn North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony G. Wilbern
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Represented By: Jamie Lynn North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbern Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Represented By: Jamie Lynn North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culver Franchising System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?