In Re: First Farmers Financial Litigation
Plaintiff: Encore Bank, Illinois Metropolitan Investment Fund, Pennant Management, Inc., Michael Nanosky, Harvard Illinois Bancorp, Inc., University of Wisconsin Credit Union, Patrick Cavanaugh, ComNet Communications, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C., Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Blackhawk Bank and Citizens Bank
Defendant: Steven Standley, Alena Hospitality LBV, LLC, Able Connection, LLC, Edu-Pro Management, LLC, Standley Plastics, Inc., Alena Production, LLC, Alena Hospitality UCF, LCC, Patel Construction, LLC, U.S. Small Business Administration, Shamir Patel, Alena Hospitality SSL, LLC, Cleanaire Mechanical, Inc., Ward Harris Properties II, Inc., Niraj V. Patel, BCM High Income Fund, LP, Leslie Cohen, Jesse I Newton, Trisha N. Patel, Alena Hospitality Saddle Brook, LLC, Suri Hospitality, LLC, Ankur Patel, Ward Harris Properties, Inc., Jessie I Newton, Alena Laboratories, LLC, State of Florida Department of Environmental Protection, Kuber Consulting, JMC Quality Builders Corporation, NPSSS, LLC, Matthew A. Cohen, Vincent Desai, 500 Hamilton Peoria, LLC (IL), Nikesh Ajay Patel, Kuber Capital Funding, LLC, Erica Herman, Charter School Development Services, Inc., Alena Hospitality, LLC, First Farmers Financial, LLC, United States of America, Suri Hospitality International, LLC, ASL Pictures, LLC, Timothy Glenn Fisher, Alena Aviation, LLC, Captain's Cay Hotel Davenport, LLC, Pinu Patel, Unknown Owners And Non-Record Claimants, Translucent Entertainment, LLC, Ajay G. Patel, BCM High Income GP, LLC and 500 Hamilton Peoria, LLC
Petitioner: Foley & Lardner LLP
Respondent: Davenport Ventures II, LLC
Claimant: PSI Water Control, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Third Eye Vision Corporation, Inc., Taka Elevator, LLC, Supreme Works Corp., Waste Management, Wiseman Ventures, Inc., MSES, LLC, CVC Hospitality, Inc., Master Tech Service, LLC, Corey Wallace, AR&C, Inc., Bobby G Stokes, O'Malley International, LLC and Robert Lawrence Contracting, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: United States, The
Counter Defendant: Patrick D. Cavanaugh
Counter Claimant: Alvarez, Winthrop, Thompson & Storey, P.A.
Intervenor: Kenner & Greenfield and Truline Contracting & Remodeling Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv07581
Filed: September 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 1985 ENTERED JUDGMENT Mailed notice(gel, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 1984 AMENDED ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT,DISCHARGING THE RECEIVERS, TERMINATING THE RECEIVERSHIP, DISMISSING THE LITIGATION, AND GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/29/2020. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 1983 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The United States' motion to amend #1977 is granted, and the Court's order (I) approving the Overall Receiver's final report; (II) discharging the Receivers; (III) terminating the Receivership; (IV) dismissing this Receivership Action; and (V) granting related relief #1973 is hereby amended. Enter Amended Order. Consistent with this order, the remainder of this consolidated Receivership Action is hereby dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Absent reinstatement by 5/1/20, this dismissal shall convert to a dismissal with prejudice, and the Clerk shall enter a final order of dismissal at that time. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 1982 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of the United States' objections #1981 to the Court's proposed modifications to the parties' dismissal order. To address those objections, this Court proposes the following modifications to paragraph 7 of the dismissal order #1973 . Absent any other filed written objection by 4/27/20, this Court will enter an amended dismissal order containing an amended paragraph 7 to read as follows: "The Receivers, their employees, agents, professionals, contractors, attorneys (including Fox Rothschild LLP) and any other person who acted on behalf of the Receivers (collectively, the "Receiver Parties") are hereby discharged and released of any and all claims, obligations and liabilities, arising from or relating to the activities, conduct, acts, omissions, decisions, management and operation of the Receivership, the Receivership Entities and the Receivership assets upon the Termination Date, and all such claims, obligations and liabilities against the Receiver Parties are barred, except to the extent that this Court otherwise orders; provided, however, that the foregoing release granted by this paragraph a) shall also be deemed to extend to the Wind-Down Actions without further order of the Court, and (b) shall not affect any federal employment related tax liabilities incurred to federal taxing entities during the Receivership. Without limiting the foregoing, the Receiver Parties shall neither have nor incur any liability to, or will be subject to any claim or cause of action by, any of Receivership Entities, the Defendants, any creditors or equity holders of Receivership Entities, the Plaintiff, the Intervenors, the Investors, or any other persons or entities (or the officers, directors, employees, or professionals of any of them) for or in connection with any of the Receivers' actions or conduct in connection with the Receivership or this proceeding, except for any unpaid federal employment related tax liabilities incurred to federal taxing entities during the Receivership. The foregoing release shall survive the termination of the Receivership and the discharge of the Receivers." Mailed notice (gel, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 1981 OBJECTIONS by United States, The to order on motion to amend/correct,,,,,,,,, text entry,,,,,,,, #1980 (Objection to Proposed Modification to Dismissal Order) (Sarnell, Bradley)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1980 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The United States and the Receiver's agreed motion to modify the dismissal order #1977 is denied without prejudice. On the Court's own motion, this Court proposes the following modifications to paragraph 7 of the dismissal order #1973 . Absent any filed written objection, including by the United States or the Receiver, by 4/24/20, this Court will enter an amended dismissal order containing an amended paragraph 7 to read as follows: "The Receivers, their employees, agents, professionals, contractors, attorneys (including Fox Rothschild LLP) and any other person who acted on behalf of the Receivers (collectively, the "Receiver Parties") are hereby discharged and released of any and all claims, obligations and liabilities, arising from or relating to the activities, conduct, acts, omissions, decisions, management and operation of the Receivership, the Receivership Entities and the Receivership assets upon the Termination Date, and all such claims, obligations and liabilities against the Receiver Parties are barred, except to the extent that this Court otherwise orders; provided, however, that the foregoing release granted by this paragraph shall also be deemed to extend to the Wind-Down Actions without further order of the Court. Without limiting the foregoing, the Receiver Parties shall neither have nor incur any liability to, or will be subject to any claim or cause of action by, any of Receivership Entities, the Defendants, any creditors or equity holders of Receivership Entities, the Plaintiff, the Intervenors, the Investors, or any other persons or entities (or the officers, directors, employees, or professionals of any of them) for or in connection with any of the Receivers' actions or conduct in connection with the Receivership or this proceeding. The foregoing release shall survive the termination of the Receivership and the discharge of the Receivers." Mailed notice (gel, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 1979 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The United States and the Receiver's agreed motion to modify the dismissal order #1977 is taken under advisement. Any objections shall be filed by 4/14/20. The 4/14/20 notice of motion date is hereby stricken, and the parties need not appear. The Court will rule on the motion, or set another status if needed, by separate order. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 1978 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Alexander Sarnell for presentment of motion to amend/correct #1977 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/14/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Sarnell, Bradley)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1977 MOTION by Defendant United States of America to amend/correct order #1973 (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Sarnell, Bradley)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1976 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States of America by Bradley Alexander Sarnell (Sarnell, Bradley)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1975 ENTERED JUDGMENT Mailed notice(gel, )
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1974 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPLICATION OF FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP AS COUNSEL TO THE OVERALL RECEIVER FOR COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/26/2020. Mailed notice(gel, )
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1973 ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT, DISCHARGING THE RECEIVERS, TERMINATING THE RECEIVERSHIP, DISMISSING THE LITIGATION, AND GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/26/2020. Mailed notice(gel, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 1972 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Receiver's Final Fee Application #1962 and the Receiver's motion for entry of an order (I) approving the Overall Receiver's final report; (II) discharging the Receivers; (III) terminating the Receivership; (IV) dismissing this Receivership Action; and (V) granting related relief #1966 are granted. Enter orders. Consistent with the latter order, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Absent reinstatement by 5/1/20, this dismissal shall convert to a dismissal with prejudice without further order. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 1971 CERTIFICATE of Service by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding terminate deadlines,,, #1969 (Guon, Allen)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1970 SEALED DOCUMENT by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1969 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Overall Receiver's final application for allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses #1962 and motion for entry of an order (I) approving his final report; (II) discharging him; (III) terminating the receivership; (IV) dismissing the receivership action; and granting related relief #1966 are taken under advisement. The receiver's request to file exhibit A [1966-1] under seal is granted. Any objections to either motion shall be filed by 3/25/20. The 3/25/20 notice of motion and final status hearing date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The Court will consider any objections and rule on the pending motions in due course and set any additional dates as needed. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1968 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 1967 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1966 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/25/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1966 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry Of An Order (I) Approving The Overall Receiver's Final Report; (II) Discharging The Receiver's; (III) Terminating The Receivership; (IV) Dismissing The Receivership Action; and (V) Granting Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1965 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1964 Overall Receiver's Final Report (Guon, Allen)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1964 OVERALL RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1963 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1962 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/25/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1962 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh OF FINAL APPLICATION OF FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP AS COUNSEL TO THE OVERALL RECEIVER FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1961 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/11/2020. Mailed notice(gel, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 1960 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 3/11/2020. Receiver's motion to destroy records and computer hardware #1956 is granted without objection. Enter order. Final status hearing set for 3/25/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Parties shall submit proposed final report and distribution schedule to the proposed order inbox by 3/20/20. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 1959 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the 3/5/20 status date is hereby stricken, and the parties need not appear. The 3/11/20 status hearing to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 1958 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the motion hearing previously set for 2/25/20 is hereby stricken and rescheduled for 3/11/30 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (ags)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1957 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1956 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/25/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1956 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Destroy Records and Computer Hardware (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1955 ORDER GRANTING OVERALL RECEIVER'S FORTY-THIRD REPORT Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/11/2020. Mailed notice(gel, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 1954 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 2/11/2020. Receiver's motion to approve overall receiver's Forty-Third Report #1948 is granted without objection. Enter order. Status hearing set for 3/11/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 1953 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1952 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (jh, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 1952 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the 1/23/20 motion hearing is reset to 2/11/20 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1951 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/14/2020. Mailed notice(gel, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 1950 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: For the reasons explained in the accompanying order setting forth this Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law following the bench trial in the UCF Litigation, this Court hereby finds that Plaintiffs are entitled, under the equitable theory of rescission, to a return of their deposit. This Court hereby directs Fidelity to return such funds posthaste. All pending hearings stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 1949 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1948 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/23/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1948 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. CavanaughMotion to Approve Overall Receiver's Forty-Third Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1947 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1946 (Guon, Allen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1946 Overall Receiver's Forty-Third Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1945 ORDER GRANTING NINTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP AS COUNSEL TO THE OVERALL RECEIVER FOR COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/21/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1944 ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS AND ESTABLISHING AN ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE CLAIM RESERVE Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/21/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 1943 SEALED EXHIBIT by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding order on motion for miscellaneous relief,,,, motion hearing,, set/reset hearings, #1942 (Guon, Allen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1942 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 11/21/2019. Receiver's ninth interim fee application #1936 is granted without objection. Enter order. Overall Reciever's motion to distribute funds #140 is also granted without objection. Enter order. The Court grants the oral motion for leave to file underseal Exhibit B (as noted in court). Status hearing set for 3/5/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 1941 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1940 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/21/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1940 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Motion for Authority To Distribute Funds and Establish an Administrative Expense Claim Reserve (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1939 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1934 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; this is the second time the letter has been returned notices will be shut off. (aee, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 1938 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on October 3, 2019, before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Order Number: 36341. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2020. (Lacien, Laura)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1937 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1936 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/21/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1936 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh OF THE NINTH INTERIM FEE APPLICATION OF FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP AS COUNSEL TO THE OVERALL RECEIVER FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1934 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties' joint motion to correct errata to transcript of 10/3/19 bench trial #1930 is denied, as the transcript accurately reflects what was heard in court. The Court will, of course, review the transcript in context and consider the parties' agreed corrections when resolving the pending matter. The 10/31/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 1935 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1927 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (jh, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 1931 NOTICE of Motion by Todd A Gale for presentment of motion to amend/correct #1930 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/31/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gale, Todd)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1930 MOTION by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. to amend/correct Errata to Transcript of October 3, 2019 Bench Trial (JOINT) (Gale, Todd)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1929 Exhibits to Joint Stipulation (DE 1840) by Orlando International Hotels, LLC (Gale, Todd)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1928 Guidry Exhibits to Joint Stipulation (DE 1840) by Orlando International Hotels, LLC (Gale, Todd)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1933 ORDER GRANTING OVERALL RECEIVER'S FORTY-SECOND REPORT Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/3/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1932 ORDER APPROVING OVERALL RECEIVER'S SECOND AMENDED PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION; APPROVING IRS SUBORDINATION STIPULATION; AND GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/3/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 1927 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 10/3/19. The Overall Receiver's motion for entry of an order (1) approving the proposed second amended plan of distribution, (2) approving the stipulation between the Overall Receiver and the Internal Revenue Service subordinating certain tax claims against the Receivership Estate, and (3) granting related relied #1916 is granted without objection. Enter Order. The Overall Receiver's motion to approve his forty-second report and to shorten notice #1924 also is granted. Enter Order. Bench trial held and concluded in connection with the UCF litigation. All parties waived any right to a jury trial. The Court will issue findings and conclusions and set any additional case management dates in a separate order. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 1926 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1918 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (jh, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 1925 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1924 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/3/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1924 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Forty-Second Report and to Shorten Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1923 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1922 Overall Receiver's Forty- Second Report (Guon, Allen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1922 Overall Receiver's Forty- Second Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1921 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, and with the parties' consent, the status hearing and bench trial previously set for 9/24/19 are stricken and reset for 10/3/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1920 CERTIFICATE of Service (Supplemental) by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh of the Overall Receivers Motion For Entry of an Order (I) Approving The Overall Receivers Proposed Second Amended Plan of Distribution; (II) Approving The Proposed Stipulation Between The Overall Receiver and #1916 , notice of motion #1917 (Guon, Allen)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1919 CERTIFICATE of Service by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh of the Overall Receivers Motion For Entry of an Order (I) Approving The Overall Receivers Proposed Second Amended Plan of Distribution; (II) Approving The Proposed Stipulation Between The Overall Receiver and #1916 , notice of motion #1917 (Guon, Allen)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1918 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: By agreement, the 9/10/19 status hearing and bench trial are stricken and reset for 9/24/19 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1917 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1916 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/3/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1916 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh of the Overall Receivers Motion For Entry of an Order (I) Approving The Overall Receivers Proposed Second Amended Plan of Distribution; (II) Approving The Proposed Stipulation Between The Overall Receiver and The Internal Revenue Service Subordinating Certain Tax Claims Against The Receivership Estate; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to A, #3 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1915 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1914 Overall Receiver's [Proposed] Second Amended Plan of Distribution (Guon, Allen)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1914 Overall Receiver's [Proposed] Second Amended Plan of Distribution by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Guon, Allen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1913 Notice of Withdrawal of Claim by USDA (DeCelles, David)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1912 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Forty-First Report Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/2/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 1911 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 7/2/2019. Receivers motion to approve overall Receiver's Forty-First Report #1908 is granted. Status and stipulated bench trial set for 9/10/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 1910 Supplemental Response to Court's Question Posed During Status Hearing on July 2, 2019 by Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gale, Todd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1909 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1908 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1908 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Forty-First Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1907 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1906 Overall Receiver's Forty-First Report (Guon, Allen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1906 Overall Receiver's Forty-First Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1905 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 16, 2019, before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Order Number: 34773. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (Lacien, Laura)
May 31, 2019 Filing 1904 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1900 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ew, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1903 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1900 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (smm, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1902 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 5/16/2019. Status hearing set for 7/2/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The Court will issue further case management dates and any rulings by separate order. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1901 AUTHORIZING OVERALL RECEIVER TO ABANDON THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATES INTEREST IN THE SUNDAY HORSE II, LLC LOAN Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/9/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1900 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held. The Receiver's motion for entry of an order authorizing the abandonment of the estate's interest in the Sunday Horse II loan #1898 is granted. Enter Order. The Receiver and Orlando International Hotel's motion for status #1893 is entered and continued to 5/16/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The parties should be prepared at that time to clarify the exact legal theory underlying their respective claims (i.e., Are they purely contractual? Are they equitable?). If the parties are seeking equitable remedies, they should be prepared to explain: what claims they are making; whether such claims have been properly pled; and whether additional facts (stipulated or disputed) are necessary to any resolution of those claims. The parties should also be prepared to advise the Court as to the escrow agent's position with respect to the deposit. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 1899 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1898 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1898 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry of an Order Authorizing The Abandonment of The Overall Receivership Estate's Interest In The Sunday Horse II, LLC Loan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1897 ORDER GRANTING OVERALL RECEIVERS FORTIETH REPORT Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/23/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 1896 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 4/23/2019. Receiver's motion to approve Overall Receiver's Fortieth Report #1887 is granted. Enter order. Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendant's agreed motion for case status #1893 is taken under advisement and the Court will rule, and set additional case management dates as needed, by separate order. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 1895 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1882 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (jjr, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 1894 NOTICE of Motion by Todd A Gale for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1893 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/23/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gale, Todd)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1893 MOTION by Counter Defendants Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C., Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C.Agreed Motion for Case Status subsequent to the filing of joint stipulation of facts (Gale, Todd)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1892 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1882 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 1891 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1881 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ew, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 1890 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1873 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 1889 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1862 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 1888 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1887 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/23/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1887 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Fortieth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1886 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1885 Overall Receiver's Fortieth Report (Guon, Allen)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1885 Overall Receiver's Fortieth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1884 ORDER GRANTING OVERALL RECEIVER'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT WITH BCM HIGH INCOME FUND, LP AND BCM HIGH INCOME GP, LLC AND GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/19/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1883 ORDER GRANTING EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP AS COUNSEL TO THE OVERALL RECEIVER FOR COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/19/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 1882 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 3/19/2019. Receiver's motion to approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-Ninth Report #1844 is granted. Receiver's Eighth Interim Fee Application of Fox Rothschild LLP As Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses #1874 is granted. Enter order. Motion by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Settlement With BCM High Income Fund, LP and BCM High Income GP, LLC and Grant Related Relief #1877 is granted without objection. All hearings and deadlines to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 1881 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Receiver's Eighth Interim Fee Application #1874 is entered and continued to 3/19/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The 3/12/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 1880 CERTIFICATE of Service to Notice of Hearing on Overall Receiver's Motion To Approve Settlement With BCM High Income Fund, LP and BCM High Income GP, LLC and Grant Related Relief by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding other #1879 (Guon, Allen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1879 NOTICE OF HEARING ON OVERALL RECEIVER'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT WITH BCM HIGH INCOME FUND, LP AND BCM HIGH INCOME GP, LLC AND GRANT RELATED RELIEF by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1878 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1877 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/19/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1877 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Settlement With BCM High Income Fund, LP and BCM High Income GP, LLC and Grant Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Guon, Allen)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1876 WITHDRAWING Patrick Johnson as counsel for Intervenor Plaintiff United States, The and substituting David Harold DeCelles as counsel of record (DeCelles, David)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1875 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1874 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1874 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Eighth Interim Fee Application of Fox Rothschild LLP As Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Guon, Allen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1873 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Attorney, Erin Bolan Hines' motion to withdraw as attorney #1871 is granted. Motion hearing set for 3/7/2019, is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 1872 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #1871 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/7/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hines, Erin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1871 MOTION by Attorney Erin Bolan Hines to withdraw as attorney for NeJame Law, P.A.. No party information provided (Hines, Erin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1870 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1862 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ek, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 1869 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1868 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ek, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1868 GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 1867 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1855 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (las, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 1864 WITHDRAWING Michael Kelly as counsel for Creditor United States and substituting Patrick Walter Johnson as counsel of record (Johnson, Patrick)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1866 MAIL RETURNED, for documents #1855 , #1852 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 1865 MAIL RETURNED, for documents #1854 , #1847 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1863 ORDER APPROVING OVERALL RECEIVER'S RETENTION AND PAYMENT OF CONSULTING EXPERT IN CONNECTION WITH THE BANES LITIGATION Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/22/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 1862 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held. The Receiver's motion for authority to employ and compensate expert in connection with the Banes Litigation #1848 is granted. Enter Order Authorizing Expert. The Receiver's motion to approve his thirty-ninth report #1844 is entered and continued to the next court date. In light of the continuing government shutdown, the Court will not consider any matters affected by the lapse in federal appropriations funding. For now, subject to any objections made by the government once counsel's employment status is restored, the Receiver and High Ridge Partners ("HRP") are allowed interim compensation and expense reimbursement as follows: (i) $23,151.50 in compensation for professional services rendered to the Estates for the period of September 1, 2018 through and including November 30, 2018 and (ii) $39.67 in expense reimbursement attendant to those services. The Overall Receiver is authorized to pay HRP the allowed interim compensation and expense reimbursement from assets of the Estates. The case is set for status hearing on 4/23/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 1861 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1854 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; this is the second time the letter has been returned notices will be shut off. (bg, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 1860 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1847 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; this is the second time the letter has been returned notices will be shut off. (bg, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 1859 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case is currently set for a status and motion hearing on 1/22/19. The Trustee should be prepared at that time to advise the Court on the extent to which these consolidated proceedings are impacted by the continuing government shutdown. At this time, the Court will consider only those matters not affected by the lapse in federal appropriations funding. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1858 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1846 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 1856 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended) by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Authority to Employ and Compensate Expert in Connection with The Banes Litigation #1848 , notice of motion #1849 (Guon, Allen)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1857 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1852 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; this is the second time the letter has been returned notices will be shut off. (bg, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1855 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1854 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Receiver's motion for authority to employ and compensate expert in connection with the Banes Litigation #1848 is entered and continued to 1/22/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The 1/8/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 1853 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1846 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ew, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1852 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (sm, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 1851 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1832 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1850 GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (rp, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1849 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1848 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/8/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1848 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Authority to Employ and Compensate Expert in Connection with The Banes Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1847 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral motion to reset motion and status hearing is granted. Motion and status hearing previously set for 1/23/2019 is reset for 1/22/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1846 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the motion hearing previously set for 1/10/2019 is reset for 1/23/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1845 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1844 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1844 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-Ninth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1843 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1842 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Ninth Report (Guon, Allen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1842 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Ninth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1841 STATEMENT REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION OF FACTS STATEMENT by Orlando International Hotels, LLC (Gale, Todd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1840 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION OF FACTS (Gale, Todd)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1839 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1832 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1838 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1831 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 1837 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1831 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (sxb, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 1836 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1822 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ew, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 1835 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1818 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ew, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1834 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1821 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1833 ORDER GRANTING SEVENTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF SHAW FISHMAN GLANTZ & TOWBIN LLC AS COUNSEL TO THE OVERALL RECEIVER FOR COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/13/2018. Mailed notice(gel, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 1832 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 11/13/2018. The Seventh interim fee application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC as Counsel to the Overall Receiver for allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses #1825 is granted without objection. Enter order. Status hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 1831 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Receivers' agreed motion for extension of time #1828 is granted. The parties to the litigation shall submit to chambers their stipulations of fact and related exhibits by 12/7/18. The 11/13/18 Notice of Motion date is stricken, though the date stands as to the Seventh Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC #1825 . Mailed notice (gel, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 1830 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1822 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (gcy, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 1829 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #1828 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/13/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Banich, Terence)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1828 MOTION by Counter Defendant Patrick D. Cavanaugh for extension of time to file Stipulations of Fact in UCF Litigation (AGREED) (Banich, Terence)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1827 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1821 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; this is the second time the letter has been returned notices will be shut off. (bg, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 1826 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1825 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/13/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1825 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Seventh Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC As Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Guon, Allen)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1824 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1818 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (pk, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1823 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1818 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 1822 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held. The Overall Receiver's motion to amended receiver order #1819 is granted. Paragraph 7 of the Agreed Order Appointing Receiver #29 is stricken, and the Overall Receiver may cancel the Nanosky Bond. All set dates and deadlines, including the 11/13/18 status hearing, stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 1821 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the motion hearing previously set for 10/23/2018 at 10:30 a.m. is reset for 10/23/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. (Note time change only) Mailed notice (gel, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 1820 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1819 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/23/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1819 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Modify Amended Receiver Order Requiring The Nanosky Receiver To Maintain Surety Bond (Guon, Allen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1818 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 10/9/2018. Receiver's motion to approve overall receiver's thirty-eight report #1813 is granted. Counter Defendant's motion for extension of time to submit agreed exhibits and stipulations of fact to UCF Litigation #1815 is granted. UCF Litigation's proposed stipulation and agreed exhibit binder shall be submitted to Chambers on or before 11/9/2018. Status hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. All other deadlines and hearings to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1817 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1810 , #1809 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 1816 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of extension of time #1815 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/9/2018 at 10:45 AM. (Banich, Terence)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1815 MOTION by Counter Defendant Patrick Cavanaugh for extension of time to Submit Stipulations of Fact in UCF Litigation (AGREED) (Banich, Terence)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1814 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1813 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/16/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1813 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh TO APPROVE OVERALL RECEIVER'S THIRTY-EIGHTH REPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1812 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1811 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Eighth Report (Guon, Allen)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1811 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Eighth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1810 ORDER GRANTING OVERALL RECEIVER'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR (I) AUTHORITY TO ENTER INTO MEDIATION AGREEMENT, (II) APPROVE MEDIATOR'S COMPENSATION ARRANGEMENT, AND (III) APPROVE MEDIATION PROCEDURES IN CONNECTION WITH THE BANES LITIGATION Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/25/2018. Mailed notice(gel, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 1809 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 9/25/2018. Receiver's motion for authority to enter into mediation agreement, compensate mediator and approve mediation procedures in connection with the Banes Litigation #1805 is granted. Enter order. Status hearing previously set for 10/9/2018, to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1808 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1801 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1807 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1798 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 1806 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1805 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/25/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1805 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Overall Receiver's Supplemental Motion For Authority To Enter Into Mediation Agreement, Compensate Mediator And Approve Mediation Procedures In Connection With The Banes Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1804 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1801 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 1803 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1798 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1802 ORDER APPROVING OVERALL RECEIVER'S RETENTION AND PAYMENT OF CONSULTING EXPERT IN CONNECTION WITH THE BANES LITIGATION Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/31/2018. Mailed notice(gel, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 1801 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Overall Receiver's motion to stay discovery and for authority to employ and compensate a mediator in connection with the Banes Litigation #1794 is granted. The overall Receiver's motion to employ and compensate a consulting expert #1796 consistent with the accompanying order is granted. Enter Order. The 9/4/18 Notice of Motion date is stricken. The status hearing previously set for 10/9/18 stands. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 1800 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1790 , #1789 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 1799 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1786 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (eaa, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 1798 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: In light of discussions in open court on 8/7/18 and the procedures the parties and the Court have implemented to bring the UCF litigation to resolution, the motion for return of deposit #1654 filed by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels and Robert Guidry Investments is denied without prejudice. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 1797 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1796 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/4/2018 at 10:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1796 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. CavanaughFor Authority To Employ and Compensate Consulting Expert In Connection with The Banes Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1795 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Elizabeth Caplin for presentment of motion to stay #1794 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/4/2018 at 10:45 AM. (Caplin, Laura)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1794 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to stay Discovery and for Authority to Employ and Compensate a Mediator in Connection with the Banes Litigation (Caplin, Laura)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1793 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1786 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 1792 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 7, 2018, before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Order Number: 31698. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018. (Lacien, Laura)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1791 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on July 12, 2018, before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Order Number: 31812. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018. (Lacien, Laura)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1790 AGREED ORDER GRANTING OVERALL RECEIVER'S MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT WITH PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC & GAS COMPANY Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/15/2018. Mailed notice(gel, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 1789 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 8/14/2018. Receiver's motion to approve settlement #1784 is granted. Enter order approving settlement. All previously set deadlines and hearings, to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 1788 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Allison Hudson by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Hudson, Allison)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1787 ORDER GRANTING SIXTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF SHAW FISHMAN GLANTZ & TOWBIN LLC AS COUNSEL TO THE OVERALL RECEIVER FOR COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/7/2018. Mailed notice(gel, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 1786 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 8/7/2018. Receiver's Sixth interim Fee Application #1781 is granted. Enter order. Receiver's agreed motion for entry of order #1777 is granted in part, as stated in open court. Parties shall submit a proposed stipulation in preparation of bench trial, as discussed in open court, on or before 10/8/2018. Motion hearing previously set for 8/14/2018, to stand. Status hearing set for 10/9/2018 at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1785 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1784 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/14/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1784 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Settlement With Public Service Electric & Gas Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1783 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/7/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1782 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/7/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1781 FEE Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC As Counsel To The Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1780 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1769 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 1779 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1775 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 1778 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1777 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/7/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Banich, Terence)
July 26, 2018 Filing 1777 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry of Order Regulating Further Proceedings in UCF Litigation (Agreed Motion) (Banich, Terence)
July 23, 2018 Filing 1776 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1768 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (eaa, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 1775 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants BCM High Income Fund, LP and BCM High Income GP, LLC's unopposed motion #1771 for leave to depose Third Party Mikesh Patel, an incarcerated person, is granted. The Receiver's motion to enforce the Court's July 18, 2018 Order #1773 is also granted. The Pennant Parties shall produce documents responsive to the Revised Requests by 8/10/18, and shall produce a designee from each Pennant Party for deposition by 8/31/18. The 8/7/18 and 8/8/18 Notice of Motion dates are stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 1774 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Elizabeth Caplin for presentment of motion to enforce #1773 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/7/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Caplin, Laura)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1773 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to enforce the Court's July 18, 2018 Order Granting the Receiver's Motions to Compel the Pennant Parties (Caplin, Laura)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1772 NOTICE of Motion by Shannon C. Gross for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1771 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/8/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Gross, Shannon)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1771 MOTION by Defendants BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC- Unopposed Motion for Leave to Depose Incarcerated Third Party Nikesh Patel (Gross, Shannon)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1770 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC by Shannon C. Gross (Gross, Shannon)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1769 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Receiver's motion to compel 1727 and 1741 are granted as to the revised discovery requests as set forth in open court on 7/12/2018, as to all non-privileged material. The request to extend discovery [1762-4] in the "Banes Litigation" (Cavanaugh v. BCM High Income Fund, LP, et al., 17 CV-3263) is granted, and the fact discovery deadline is extended to 11/13/2018. Status hearing set for 9/11/2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1203 to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 12, 2018 Filing 1768 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 7/12/2018. Receiver's motion to compel #1727 and #1741 are taken under advisement and will be ruled on by separate order. Receiver's motions to approve overall Receiver's Thirty-Sixth Report #1733 and Receiver's Thirty-Seventh Report #1756 are granted and the reports are approved. Oral motion to extend report deadlines is granted, and Receiver Reports shall now be filed every 90 days as stated in open court. Intervenor Plaintiff's motion to dismiss without prejudice #1760 is granted. Plaintiff-Intervenor, Harvard Illinois Bancorp, Inc.'s complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Attorneys, James Wilson, Edward Halper and Nidhi Srivastava are withdrawn. Plaintiff's motion for return of Plaintiff's deposit #1654 is entered and continued. Parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court's proposed order in-box, an agreed or competing proposed orders as to fund distribution, on or before 7/26/2018. Status hearing set for 9/11/2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 1767 RESPONSE by Objectors Greatbanc Trust Company, Pennant Management, Inc., U.S. Fiduciary Services, Inc. to motion to compel #1741 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Shawn)
July 3, 2018 Filing 1766 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1745 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (jk, )
July 2, 2018 Filing 1764 STATUS Report by University of Wisconsin Credit Union (Vaccaro, Daniel)
June 29, 2018 Filing 1765 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1740 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received, therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
June 29, 2018 Filing 1763 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1762 Overall Receiver's Reassignment Report (Guon, Allen)
June 29, 2018 Filing 1762 Overall Receiver's Reassignment Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Guon, Allen)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1761 NOTICE of Motion by James Donehoo Wilson for presentment of motion to dismiss #1760 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/12/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Wilson, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1760 MOTION by Intervenor Plaintiff Harvard Illinois Bancorp, Inc. to dismiss Without Prejudice (Wilson, James)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1759 CLAIM by United States regarding (Kelly, Michael)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1758 CLAIM by United States regarding (Kelly, Michael)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1757 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1756 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/12/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1756 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-Seventh Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1755 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1754 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Seventh Report (Guon, Allen)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1754 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Seventh Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1753 NOTICE by Gordon Elliot Gouveia of Change of Address (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1752 NOTICE by Laura Elizabeth Caplin of Change of Address Firm Name Change (Caplin, Laura)
June 20, 2018 Filing 1751 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1745 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (eaa, )
June 18, 2018 Filing 1750 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1736 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; this is the second time the letter has been returned notices will be shut off. (eaa, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 1749 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1740 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (eaa, )
June 14, 2018 Filing 1748 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended) by Mark Lee Radtke on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding notice of filing #1747 (Radtke, Mark)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1747 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1580 Re-Notice of Issuance of Amended Subpoena (Radtke, Mark)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1746 REPLY by Patrick D. Cavanaugh to MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to compel (Overall Receiver's Supplemental Motion to Compel the Pennant Parties to Produce Witnesses Pursuant to 30(b)(6) Subpoenas #1741 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit T)(Caplin, Laura)
June 8, 2018 Filing 1745 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Receiver's supplemental motion to compel #1741 is entered and continued to 7/12/18 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The 6/12/18 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. By 7/2/18, the parties shall file a joint status report as to the overall receivership providing details as to the status of all remaining matters consolidated herein (including as to each matter an assessment of what (if any) discovery remains, whether and when dispositive motions are anticipated, etc.). Mailed notice (gel, )
June 8, 2018 Filing 1744 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1736 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (eaa, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 1743 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena -- 30(b)(6) Subpoena for Deposition to Scott Taylor by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Caplin, Laura)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1742 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Elizabeth Caplin for presentment of motion to compel #1741 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/12/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Caplin, Laura)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1741 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to compel (Overall Receiver's Supplemental Motion to Compel the Pennant Parties to Produce Witnesses Pursuant to 30(b)(6) Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - S)(Caplin, Laura)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1740 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Receiver's motion for extension of time to file response/reply #1738 is granted. Reply shall be filed on or before 6/11/2018. Motion hearing set for 6/7/2018, is stricken. All other deadlines and hearings to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 1739 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Elizabeth Caplin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #1738 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/7/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Caplin, Laura)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1738 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to compel,, #1727 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Caplin, Laura)
May 30, 2018 Filing 1737 RESPONSE by Pennant Management, Inc., Greatbanc Trust Company, U.S. Fiduciary Services, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to compel THE PENNANT PARTIES TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES PURSUANT TO 30(B)(6) SUBPOENAS, AND AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES #1727 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tim Weber, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Taylor, Shawn)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:This case has been reassigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. The 7/17/18 status hearing previously set by Judge St. Eve is stricken and reset for 7/12/18 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The briefing schedule previously set on the Receiver's motion to compel #1727 stands. The Receiver's motion to approve his thirty-sixth report #1733 is entered and continued to 7/12/18 at 9:45 a.m. Motion hearing set before Judge St. Eve for 6/7/2018, is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 23, 2018 Filing 1735 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that cases previously assigned to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve requires reassignment; therefore It is hereby ordered that the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f) within the guidelines of IOP 16. Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings. Honorable Amy J. St. Eve no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/23/2018.(pk, )
May 17, 2018 Filing 1734 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1733 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/7/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
May 17, 2018 Filing 1733 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-Sixth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
May 17, 2018 Filing 1732 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1731 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Sixth Report (Guon, Allen)
May 17, 2018 Filing 1731 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Sixth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1730 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Thirty-Fifth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/16/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 1729 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 5/16/2018 and continued to 7/17/18 at 8:30 a.m. Motion to approve Receiver's thirty-fifth report #1718 is granted. Agreed motion to extend discovery deadlines #1727 is denied without prejudice. Motion to compel #1727 is entered. Response by 5/30/18. Reply by 6/4/18. Despite their representations, the Banes litigation is not ready for a settlement conference. The Court thanks Judge Coleman for being willing to conduct the settlement conference. The parties should contact the courtroom deputy for a referral to the magistrate judge if they wish to have a settlement conference. Mailed notice (kef, )
May 11, 2018 Filing 1728 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Elizabeth Caplin for presentment of motion to compel,, #1727 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/16/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Caplin, Laura)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1727 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to compel the Pennant Parties to Produce Documents and Witnesses Pursuant to 30(B)(6) Subpoenas, and Agreed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit GROUP B, #3 Exhibit GROUP B1, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit GROUP D1, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit GROUP H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N)(Caplin, Laura)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1726 Notice of Issuance of Subpoena by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 30(b)(6) Subpoena for Deposition to Shay Financial Services, Inc., n/k/a Austin Atlantic Capital, Inc.)(Caplin, Laura)
May 7, 2018 Filing 1725 Notice of Issuance of Subpoenas by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Subpoena for Deposition to Joseph Geisler, #2 Subpoena for Deposition to Noemi Schaefer)(Caplin, Laura)
May 3, 2018 Filing 1724 Notice of Issuance of Subpoenas by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Joe Geisler, #2 Subpoena to Scott Taylor)(Caplin, Laura)
May 2, 2018 Filing 1723 Notice of Issuance of Subpoenas by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Pennant Management, Inc., #2 Subpoena to GreatBanc Trust Company, #3 Subpoena to U.S. Fiduciary Services, Inc.)(Caplin, Laura)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1722 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Unopposed Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing and Directing Horwitz and Citro, P.A. to Turnover Certain Funds Held in Trust Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/1/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 1721 AGREED ORDER as to Claims Held by the U.S. Department of Agriculture Against Receivership Estate on Account of Patel's New Fraud Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/1/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 1720 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 5/1/2018 and continued to 5/16/2018 at 08:30 AM. Receiver's motion for entry of agreed order as to claims held by the U.S. Dept. of Agriculture against Receivership Estate on account of Patel's new fraud #1712 and Receiver's motion for an entry of an order authorizing and directing Horwitz & Citro, P.A. to turnover certain funds held in trust #1714 are granted without objection. Mailed notice (kef, )
April 25, 2018 Filing 1719 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1718 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/16/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1718 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-Fifth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1717 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1716 (Guon, Allen)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1716 Overall Receivers Thirty-Fifth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1715 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1714 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/1/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1714 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry of An Order Authorizing and Directing Horwitz & Citro, P.A. To Turnover Certain Funds Held In Trust (Guon, Allen)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1713 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1712 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/1/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1712 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For An Entry Of An Agreed Order As To Claims Held By The U.S. Department of Agriculture Against Receivership Estate on Account of Patel's New Fraud (Guon, Allen)
April 19, 2018 Filing 1711 Notice of Issuance of Subpoenas on (1) Pennant Management, Inc.; (2) GreatBanc Trust Company; and (3) U.S. Fiduciary Services, Inc. by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Caplin, Laura)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1710 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Judge Coleman will conduct a settlement conference in the Banes litigation. Mailed notice (kef, )
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1709 ORDER Approving Overall Receiver's Retention and Payment of Consulting Expert in Connection with the Banes Litigation Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/10/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1708 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Thirty-Fourth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/10/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
April 10, 2018 Filing 1707 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 4/10/2018. Motion to approve thirty-fourth report #1697 , motion for authority to employ and compensate expert in connection with the Banes litigation #1700 and motion to reset discovery deadlines #1705 are granted. Fact discovery cutoff in the Banes litigation is extended to 8/6/18. No further extensions likely. Burden of proof expert disclosures by 9/5/18. Rebuttal expert disclosures by 10/5/18. All expert discovery shall be completed by 11/16/18. Mailed notice (kef, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 1706 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Elizabeth Caplin for presentment of motion to reset #1705 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/10/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Caplin, Laura)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1705 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to reset Discovery Deadlines (Caplin, Laura)
April 3, 2018 Filing 1704 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/28/18 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 4/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
April 3, 2018 Filing 1703 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/14/18 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Order Number: 30432. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 4/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
March 29, 2018 Filing 1702 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing set for 4/30/18 is stricken and reset to 5/1/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
March 28, 2018 Filing 1701 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1700 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/10/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1700 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receivers Motion For Authority To Employ And Compensate Expert In Connection With The Banes Litigation) (Guon, Allen)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1699 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 3/28/2018. Receiver's motion to deem requests admitted #1676 is denied in part as moot, denied in part and granted in part as stated in open court. Defendant is directed to contact the courtroom deputy, 312/435-5879, by 4/4/18 to inform the court whether or not there is interest in participating in a settlement conference. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 26, 2018 Filing 1698 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1697 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/10/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 26, 2018 Filing 1697 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-Fourt Report (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guon, Allen)
March 26, 2018 Filing 1696 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1695 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Fourth Report (Guon, Allen)
March 26, 2018 Filing 1695 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Fourth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
March 26, 2018 Filing 1694 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: On 3/23/18, parties were ordered to file the Amended Responses to the Request for Admissions referenced in the Amended Status Report. Parties have failed to do so. Parties are again ordered to file the Amended Responses to the Request for Admissions referenced in the Amended Status Report by today, 3/26/18. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1693 ORDER Granting Fifth Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC As Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/26/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 26, 2018 Filing 1692 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Fifth Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC As Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses #1679 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 26, 2018 Filing 1691 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendants BCM's motion for leave to file the Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Requests Admitted Under Seal #1689 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 23, 2018 Filing 1690 RESPONSE by BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLCin Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Motion To Deem Requests Admitted Under Seal) #1676 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haws, J Matthew)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1689 MOTION by Defendants BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC for leave to file the Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Requests Admitted Under Seal (Haws, J Matthew)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1688 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Amended Responses to the Request for Admissions referenced in the Amended Status Report #1687 shall be filed on 3/23/18. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 22, 2018 Filing 1687 STATUS Report AMENDED STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE RECEIVERS PENDING MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS ADMITTED by Patrick Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
March 21, 2018 Filing 1686 STATUS Report by Patrick Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
March 21, 2018 Filing 1685 REPLY by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. in support of Motion for Return of Plaintiffs' Deposit (Warner, Jennifer)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1684 ORDER Authorizing Overall Receiver's to Abandon the Receivership Estate's Interest in the Lancaster Energy Partners, LLC Loan Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/16/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1683 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Thirty-Third Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/16/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 16, 2018 Filing 1682 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 3/16/2018 and continued to 4/30/18 at 9:00 a.m. Motion to approve Receiver's thirty-third report #1661 and Receiver's motion for entry of an order authorizing the abandonment of the receivership estate's interest in the Lancaster Energy Partners LLC loan #1670 are granted without objection. Fifth interim fee application #1679 is entered and taken under advisement. Receiver's motion to deem requests admitted #1676 is entered and continued to 3/28/18 at 8:00 a.m. Parties are directed to meet and confer on the motion to deem requests admitted and file a joint status report as to the remaining issues by 3/21/18. Any response shall be filed by 3/23/18. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 1681 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing set for 3/19/18 and all motions noticed for 3/16/18 and 3/19/18 are stricken and reset to 3/16/18 at 8:45 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 12, 2018 Filing 1680 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1679 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/16/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 12, 2018 Filing 1679 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Fifth Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC As Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
March 12, 2018 Filing 1678 DECLARATION of Laura Caplin regarding Sealed motion #1676 (Declaration Of Laura Caplin in Support of the Motion to Deem Requests Admitted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Caplin, Laura)
March 12, 2018 Filing 1677 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Elizabeth Caplin for presentment of Sealed motion #1676 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/16/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Caplin, Laura)
March 12, 2018 Filing 1676 SEALED MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Motion To Deem Requests Admitted Under Seal) (Towbin, Steven)
March 12, 2018 Filing 1675 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion for leave to file the Receiver's motion to deem requests admitted under seal #1673 is granted. No appearance is required on the 3/16/18 notice of motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 1674 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Elizabeth Caplin for presentment of motion for leave to file #1673 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/16/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Caplin, Laura)
March 9, 2018 Filing 1673 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for leave to file Receiver's Motion To Deem Requests Admitted Under Seal (Caplin, Laura)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1672 RESPONSE by Patrick D. Cavanaughin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C.Return of Plaintiffs' Deposit #1654 (Banich, Terence)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1671 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1670 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/19/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1670 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry Of An Order Authorizing The Abandonment Of The Receivership Estate's Interest In The Lancaster Energy Partners, LLC Loan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1669 ORDER Approving Overall Receiver's Retention and Payment of BIA for USDA Documents Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/5/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 1668 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 3/5/2018. Receiver's motion for authority to employ and compensate document review vendor for Banes Litigation #1665 is granted without objection. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 1667 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court has reviewed BCM Defendants' operating agreements in camera and orders their release. The operating agreements are relevant to the dispute and are not burdensome to produce. BCM Defendants must turn over these documents to Cavanaugh Receiver by March 8, 2018.Mailed notice (kef, )
February 26, 2018 Filing 1666 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Lee Radtke for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1665 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/5/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Radtke, Mark)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1665 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receiver's Motion for Authority To Employ And Compensate Document Review Vendor For Banes Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Radtke, Mark)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1664 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/23/18 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 3/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1663 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/23/18 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 3/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1662 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1661 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/19/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1661 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-Third Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1660 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1659 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Third Report (Guon, Allen)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1659 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Third Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
February 16, 2018 Filing 1658 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/16/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1657 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Thirty-Second Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/14/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
February 14, 2018 Filing 1656 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 2/14/2018 and continued to 3/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. Motion to approve Receiver's thirty-second report #1633 is granted. Motion for return of plaintiffs' deposit #1654 is entered. Response by 3/7/18. Reply by 3/21/18. Mailed notice (kef, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 1655 (UCF Litigation) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Ann Warner for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1654 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/14/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Warner, Jennifer)
February 8, 2018 Filing 1654 MOTION by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C.Return of Plaintiffs' Deposit (Warner, Jennifer)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1653 ORDER Granting Renewed Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/8/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 1652 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Receiver's motion to enforce settlement agreement #1646 is granted without objection. Mailed notice (kef, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 1651 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal, the civil proceeding against defendant Shamir Patel is hereby dismissed with prejudice (original case no. 16-cv-4516). Mailed notice (kef, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 1650 STIPULATION of Dismissal Solely with Respect to the Shamir Patel Civil Proceeding (Gouveia, Gordon)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1649 ORDER Approving Overall Receiver's Retention and Payment of BIA Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/31/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 1648 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 1/31/2018. Receiver's motion for authority to employ and compensate document review vendor for Banes Litigation #1644 is granted. Receiver's motion to enforce settlement agreement #1646 is entered. Any response shall be filed by 2/7/18. Mailed notice (kef, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 1647 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion to enforce #1646 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/31/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1646 MOTION by Plaintiff Patrick Cavanaugh to enforce Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gouveia, Gordon)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1645 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1644 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/31/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1644 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Authority To Employ and Compensate Document Review Vendor For Banes Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
January 25, 2018 Filing 1643 Stipulated Protective Order by BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC (Platt, Joseph)
January 25, 2018 Filing 1642 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC by Joseph Platt (Platt, Joseph)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1641 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Thirty-First Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/23/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 23, 2018 Filing 1640 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 1/23/18 and continued to 2/14/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Orlando and BCM Litigations) and 3/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. (general status). Motion to approve Overall Receiver's 31st report #1625 is granted. At stated in open court, Receiver's motions to compel #1617 #1620 are granted in part, denied in part and denied in part as moot. An agreed protective order re: BCM litigation shall be submitted (not filed) by 1/26/18. Orlando's motion for release of funds shall be filed by 2/9/18.Mailed notice (kef, )
January 19, 2018 Filing 1639 STATUS Report Joint Status Report Regarding the Receiver's Pending Motions to Compel by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Caplin, Laura)
January 19, 2018 Filing 1638 REPLY by Patrick D. Cavanaugh to MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND AMEND THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS #1617 , memorandum in opposition to motion, #1627 , MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to compel DEFENDANTS TO AMEND THEIR SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSE #1620 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Notice of Filing)(Caplin, Laura)
January 19, 2018 Filing 1637 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The parties' Joint Motion to Clarify December 5, 2017 Order Denying Cross-Motions for Summary Judgement in UCF Litigation #1635 is granted. The Court, however, declines to give an advisory opinion as requested by the parties. On December 5, 2017, the Court denied the parties' cross motions for summary judgment because neither party met its burden. (R. 1611.) The parties now ask the Court for "clarification" on two issues: 1) what happens to the money in escrow; and 2) how the parties can obtain a final, appealable order. The parties have not briefed either of these issues. Accordingly, the Court declines to give an advisory opinion on either one. Mailed notice (kef, )
January 18, 2018 Filing 1636 (UCF Litigation) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Ann Warner for presentment of motion to clarify #1635 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/23/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Warner, Jennifer)
January 18, 2018 Filing 1635 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh, Plaintiffs Michael Nanosky, Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. to clarify December 5, 2017 Order (Joint) (UCF Litigation) (Warner, Jennifer)
January 17, 2018 Filing 1634 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1633 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/14/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
January 17, 2018 Filing 1633 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-Second Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
January 17, 2018 Filing 1632 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1631 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Second Report (Guon, Allen)
January 17, 2018 Filing 1631 Overall Receiver's Thirty-Second Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
January 9, 2018 Filing 1630 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 1/9/2018 and continued to 1/23/18 at 9:00 a.m. (as opposed to the previously set time of 8:45 a.m.). The parties shall file a status report as to the pending BCM motions #1617 #1620 by 1/19/18. Any reply to these motions may be filed by 1/19/18. Written discovery in the BCM litigation shall be completed by 2/9/18. Mailed notice (kef, )
January 8, 2018 Filing 1629 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing re: BCM litigation set for 1/9/18 is reset from 8:30 a.m. to 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1628 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/5/2018: The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendants' affirmative defenses #1597 , and grants Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendants' affirmative defenses #1608 . [For further details, see Order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
January 4, 2018 Filing 1627 RESPONSE by BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC in Opposition to motion to compel,, #1617 , motion to compel, #1620 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Haws, J Matthew) (Docket Text Modified on 1/5/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
December 20, 2017 Filing 1626 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1625 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/23/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
December 20, 2017 Filing 1625 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Approve Overall Receiver's Thirty-First Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Guon, Allen)
December 20, 2017 Filing 1624 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Motion hearing held on 12/20/2017. Receiver's motions to compel #1617 #1620 are entered. Response by 1/4/18. Status hearing re: BCM litigation set for 1/30/18 is stricken and reset to 1/9/18 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
December 20, 2017 Filing 1623 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1622 Overall Receiver's Thirty-First Report (Guon, Allen)
December 20, 2017 Filing 1622 Overall Receiver's Thirty-First Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1621 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion to compel, #1620 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/20/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1620 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to compel DEFENDANTS TO AMEND THEIR SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Group D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Group H)(Towbin, Steven)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1619 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion to compel,, #1617 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/20/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1618 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion to compel, #1617 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/19/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1617 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to compel DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND AMEND THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit H1, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Towbin, Steven)(Linked document has the incorrect sub caption title) Modified on 12/13/2017 (pk, ).
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 ORDER Granting Fourth Interim Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC as Counsel to the Overall Receiver for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/8/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 7, 2017 Filing 1615 RESPONSE by Patrick D. Cavanaughin Opposition to MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to strike Defendants' Amended Affirmative and Other Defenses #1597 (Radtke, Mark)
December 7, 2017 Filing 1614 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Fourth interim fee application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC as counsel to the Overall Receiver for allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses #1593 is granted. Counsel shall submit a proposed order. Mailed notice (kef, )
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1613 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Thirtieth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/6/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 6, 2017 Filing 1612 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 12/6/2017 and continued to 1/23/2018 at 08:45 AM. Motion to approve Overall Receiver's thirtieth report #1601 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 1611 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/5/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 1610 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court denies Plaintiffs' summary judgment motion #1525 and denies Receivers' summary judgment motion #1529 . [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 1609 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status and motion hearing set for 12/6/2017 is reset from 8:30 a.m. to 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
December 1, 2017 Filing 1608 MOTION by Defendants BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC to strike MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to strike Defendants' Amended Affirmative and Other Defenses #1597 (Poronsky, Brian)
November 29, 2017 Filing 1607 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Settlement conference held on 11/29/2017 with regards to the BCM litigation. Parties were unable to reach an agreement to settle the case at this time. Receiver's motion to strike defendants' affirmative and other defenses #1597 is entered. Response by 12/1/17. Reply by 12/8/17. Motion for extension of time to complete discovery in BCM civil proceeding #1605 is granted. Written discovery shall be completed by 1/10/18. Fact discovery shall be completed by 4/6/18. Burden of proof expert disclosures by 5/4/18. Rebuttal expert disclosures by 6/4/18. All expert discovery shall be completed by 7/13/18. Status hearing (BCM litigation) set for 1/30/18 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
November 27, 2017 Filing 1606 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Lee Radtke for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #1605 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/29/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Radtke, Mark)
November 27, 2017 Filing 1605 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for extension of time to complete discovery in BCM Civil Proceeding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Radtke, Mark)
November 27, 2017 Filing 1604 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Settlement Conference as to the BCM Litigation set for 11/29/17 is reset from 1:30 p.m. to 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
November 22, 2017 Filing 1603 Amended Certificate of Service by Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Dkts: 1599, 1600, 1601, and 1602 (Guon, Allen)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1602 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1601 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/6/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1601 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Approve Overall Receivers Thirtieth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Guon, Allen)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1600 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1599 (Guon, Allen)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1599 Overall Receivers Thirtieth Report. by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
November 21, 2017 Filing 1598 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion to strike #1597 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/29/2017 at 01:30 PM. (Towbin, Steven)
November 21, 2017 Filing 1597 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to strike Defendants' Amended Affirmative and Other Defenses (Towbin, Steven)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1596 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-Ninth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/9/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
November 9, 2017 Filing 1595 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 11/9/2017 and continued to 12/6/2017 at 08:30 AM. Motion to approve Overall Receiver's 29th report #1591 is granted without objection. Fourth interim fee application #1593 is entered and taken under advisement. Mailed notice (kef, )
October 25, 2017 Filing 1594 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1593 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/9/2017 at 08:15 AM. (Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1593 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Fourth Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC As Counsel to the Overall Receiver for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1592 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1591 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/9/2017 at 08:15 AM. (Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1591 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-Ninth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1590 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1589 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Ninth Report (Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1589 OVERALL Receiver's Twenty-Ninth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1588 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 10/25/2017 and continued to 11/9/2017 at 08:15 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
October 11, 2017 Filing 1587 REPLY by Counter Defendant Patrick Cavanaugh to memorandum in opposition to motion #1565 , memorandum in support of motion #1531 in Support of Receivers' Motion for Summary Judgment in UCF Litigation (Banich, Terence)
October 11, 2017 Filing 1586 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. to statement #1569 of Additional Material Facts (UCF Litigation) (Warner, Jennifer)
October 11, 2017 Filing 1585 REPLY by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. to response in opposition to motion, #1567 and in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (UCF Litigation) (Warner, Jennifer)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 ORDER Approving Overall Receiver's Retention and Payment of Consulting Expert in Connection with the Banes Litigation Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 ORDER Approving Davenport Ventures Transaction and Related Compromises Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1582 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-Eighth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
October 10, 2017 Filing 1581 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 10/10/2017 and continued to 10/25/2017 at 09:30 AM (as opposed to the 10:00 a.m. time given in open court). Motion to approve Overall Receivers 28th report #1563 , motion for authority to employ and compensate expert in connection with the Banes Litigation #1570 , motion to approve Davenport Ventures transaction and related compromises #1575 and agreed motion for entry of an order disallowing proof of claim filed by Nejame Law, P.A. #1578 are granted without objection. Motion for authority to facilitate restitution payments to investors and granting related relief #1572 is denied without prejudice. Mailed notice (kef, )
October 10, 2017 Filing 1580 Notice of Issuance of Subpoena (to United States Department of Agriculture) by Patrick Cavanaugh (Radtke, Mark)
October 4, 2017 Filing 1579 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1578 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
October 4, 2017 Filing 1578 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry of An Order Disallowing Proof of Claim Filed by Nejame Law, P.A. (Guon, Allen)
October 4, 2017 Filing 1577 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Settlement Conference as to the BCM Litigation set for 11/29/2017 at 01:30 PM. The parties' joint settlement position paper shall be delivered to chambers, room 1260, by 11/20/17. Mailed notice (kef, )
October 2, 2017 Filing 1576 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1575 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
October 2, 2017 Filing 1575 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Approve Davenport Ventures Transaction and Related Compromises (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gouveia, Gordon)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1574 (Amended) NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1563 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1573 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1572 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1572 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receiver's Motion For Authority to Facilitate Restitution Payments To Investors and Granting Related Relief) (Guon, Allen)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1571 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1570 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1570 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Authority to Employ and Compensate Expert in Connection with the Banes Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1569 Defendants' Statement of Additional Material Facts in Response to Plaintiffs' LR 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts STATEMENT by Patrick Cavanaugh [in UCF Litigation] (Banich, Terence)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1568 RESPONSE by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Rule 56 statement #1528 [in UCF Litigation] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 49)(Banich, Terence)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1567 RESPONSE by Patrick Cavanaughin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C., Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Counter Defendants Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. for summary judgment #1525 [in UCF Litigation] (Banich, Terence)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1566 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. to Rule 56 statement, #1532 (Warner, Jennifer)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1565 MEMORANDUM by Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. in Opposition to motion for summary judgment #1529 (Warner, Jennifer)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1564 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1563 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1563 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-Eighth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1562 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1561 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Eighth Report (Guon, Allen)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1561 OVERALL Receiver's Twenty-Eighth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen) (Docket Text Modified on 9/26/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
September 20, 2017 Filing 1559 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC(Haws, J Matthew)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1558 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: General case status hearing set for 10/10/2017 is reset from 9:30 a.m. to 8:45 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1560 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Shamir Patel Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/12/2017:Mailed notice (Attachments: Exhibit 1)(kef, )
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1557 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-Seventh Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/12/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 12, 2017 Filing 1556 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 9/12/2017. Motion to approve Receiver's 27th report #1541 and motion to approve settlement with defendant Shamir Patel #1554 are granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
September 7, 2017 Filing 1555 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1554 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/12/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
September 7, 2017 Filing 1554 MOTION by Plaintiff Patrick Cavanaugh to Approve Settlement with Defendant Shamir Patel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gouveia, Gordon)
September 6, 2017 Filing 1552 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/6/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 6, 2017 Filing 1551 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses. #1486 The Court strikes the First Defense, Third Defense, Fourth Defense, Fifth Defense, Sixth Defense, Eighth Defense, Ninth Defense, Tenth Defense, Eleventh Defense, and Twelfth Defense without prejudice. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to strike with regard to the Seventh Defense. Plaintiff did not move to strike the Second Defense and Defendants withdrew the Thirteenth Defense. The Court grants Defendants leave to replead their affirmative defenses in their amended Answer, to be filed on or before September 20, 2017. [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1553 ORDER Approving Agreement to Facilitate Sale of 7411 International Drive Property and Settle Certain Claims Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/31/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 ORDER Authorizing the Sale of the 7411 International Drive Property Free and Clear of Interests and Granting Related Relief Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/31/2017:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(kef, )
August 31, 2017 Filing 1549 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing and final sale hearing held on 8/31/2017. Receiver's motion for authority to enter into an agreement to facilitate the sale of 7411 International Drive, Orlando, Florida and settle certain claims #1517 is granted. Motion for extension of time #1544 is withdrawn. Notice motion date of 9/6/17 is stricken. General case status hearing set for 10/10/2017 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 30, 2017 Filing 1548 DECLARATION of Greg Apathy regarding order, #1492 (In Support Of The Sale Of The 7411 Property) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Guon, Allen)
August 30, 2017 Filing 1547 NOTICE Regarding Verification of Publication of Sale Notice for 7411 Property by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Guon, Allen)
August 30, 2017 Filing 1546 CERTIFICATE of Service Amended by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding notice of filing #1540 , other #1539 (Guon, Allen)
August 30, 2017 Filing 1545 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #1544 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/6/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
August 30, 2017 Filing 1544 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for extension of time to complete discovery in Shamir Patel Civil Proceeding (Gouveia, Gordon)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1543 RULE 56 LR56.1 Statement Of Material Facts (Re-Filed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit GROUP J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit GROUP M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Gale, Todd)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1542 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1541 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/12/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1541 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-Seventh Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1540 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1539 (Guon, Allen)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1539 OVERALL Receiver's Twenty-Seventh Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen) (Docket Text Modified on 8/28/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
August 22, 2017 Filing 1538 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule. Parties' cross-motions for summary judgment #1525 #1529 are entered. Responses by 9/27/17. Replies by 10/11/17. No appearance is required on the 8/28/17 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 22, 2017 Filing 1537 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1536 , Rule 56 statement, #1532 (Banich, Terence)
August 22, 2017 Filing 1536 GROUP EXHIBIT 8 to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Banich, Terence)
August 22, 2017 Filing 1535 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Receiver's motion for leave to file Brief in Excess of Fifteen Pages and LR56.1 Statement of Material Facts in Excess of 80 Statements #1533 is granted. The parties are advised that in the future it is helpful to specify how many additional pages and separately numbered statements of fact they are seeking to include. The Receiver may have up to 112 proposed statements of undisputed fact and up to 30 pages for its supporting memorandum. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 21, 2017 Filing 1534 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for leave to file #1533 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/28/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Banich, Terence)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1533 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for leave to file Brief in Excess of Fifteen Pages and LR56.1 Statement of Material Facts in Excess of 80 Statements (Banich, Terence)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1532 RULE 56 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Excess of 80 Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 9, #2 Exhibit 10 through 19, #3 Exhibit 20 through 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34, #9 Exhibit 35, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 38, #13 Exhibit 39, #14 Exhibit 40 through 47)(Banich, Terence)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1531 MEMORANDUM by Patrick D. Cavanaugh in support of motion for summary judgment #1529 (Banich, Terence)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1530 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for summary judgment #1529 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/28/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Banich, Terence)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1529 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for summary judgment (Banich, Terence)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1528 RULE 56 56(c)(1) Statement by Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. regarding motion for summary judgment #1525 (Warner, Jennifer)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1527 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Ann Warner for presentment of motion for summary judgment #1525 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/28/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Warner, Jennifer)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1526 MEMORANDUM by Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. in support of motion for summary judgment #1525 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit GROUP J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit GROUP M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Warner, Jennifer)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1525 MOTION by Plaintiffs Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C., Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Counter Defendants Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. for summary judgment (Warner, Jennifer)
August 14, 2017 Filing 1524 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/14/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 14, 2017 Filing 1523 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court denies the Overall Receiver's motion for a preliminary injunction [Cavanaugh v. BCM High Income Fund, LP, No. 17-cv-3263, Dkt. No. 7 (N.D. Ill. 2017)]. [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
August 11, 2017 Filing 1522 CERTIFICATE of Service by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding other, #1521 (Guon, Allen)
August 10, 2017 Filing 1521 NOTICE of Hearing on Overall Receiver's Motion For Authority to Enter into an Agreement to Facilitate The Sale of 7411 International Drive, Orlando, Florida and Settle Certain Claims by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Guon, Allen)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1520 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-Sixth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/9/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 9, 2017 Filing 1519 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 8/9/2017. Motion to approve Receiver's twenty-sixth report #1502 and motion for authority to pay fees and expenses of expert witness in UCF litigation #1504 are granted. Motion for authority to enter into an agreement to facilitate the sale of 7411 International Drive, Orlando, Florida and settle certain claims #1517 is entered and continued to 8/31/2017 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
August 4, 2017 Filing 1518 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1517 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/9/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
August 4, 2017 Filing 1517 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Authority to Enter Into an Agreement to Facilitate the Sale of 7411 International Drive, Orlando, Florida and Settle Certain Claims (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1516 ORDER Approving Second Amendment to Purchase and Sale Agreement Regarding Charter and Edu-Pro Properties. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/31/2017. Mailed notice(ep, )
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1515 ORDER Approving Payment to Consulting Expert. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/31/2017. Mailed notice(ep, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 1514 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status and motion hearing held. Receiver's Motion for Approval of the Second Amendment to Purchase and Sale Agreement #1495 is granted. Receiver's Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in the Shamir Patel Civil Proceeding #1497 is granted. The Court sets the following amended discovery schedule: fact discovery is extended to 8/30/17. Burden of proof expert disclosures by 9/29/17. Rebuttal expert disclosures shall by 10/31/17. All expert discovery shall be completed by 11/30/17. Any potential dispositive motion, with supporting memorandum shall be filed by 11/30/17. Hearing previously set for 8/31/17 at 8:30 a.m. will stand. Mailed notice (ep, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 1513 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Receivers' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion in UCF Litigation #1510 is granted. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 8/21/17. Mailed notice (ep, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 1512 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Overall Receiver's Motion for an Extension of Time to Issue Written Discovery #1508 is granted. The deadline to issue written discovery is extended to seven days after the Court rules on the Motion to Strike. Mailed notice (ep, )
July 28, 2017 Filing 1511 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #1510 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/31/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Banich, Terence)
July 28, 2017 Filing 1510 MOTION by Counter Defendant Patrick Cavanaugh for extension of time to file Dispositive Motions in the UCF Litigation (Banich, Terence)
July 28, 2017 Filing 1509 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of extension of time #1508 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/31/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Guon, Allen)
July 28, 2017 Filing 1508 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for extension of time (Motion Of The Overall Receiver For Extension Of Time To Issue Written Discovery) (Guon, Allen)
July 28, 2017 Filing 1507 NOTICE by Patrick Cavanaugh re reply #1506 (Towbin, Steven)
July 28, 2017 Filing 1506 REPLY by Plaintiff Patrick Cavanaugh to motion for miscellaneous relief #1486 (Overall Receiver's Reply In Support of His Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative and Other Defenses) (Towbin, Steven)
July 27, 2017 Filing 1505 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1504 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/9/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
July 27, 2017 Filing 1504 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receivers Motion For Authority To Pay Fees And Expenses Of Expert Witness In UCF Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Towbin, Steven)
July 25, 2017 Filing 1503 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1502 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/9/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
July 25, 2017 Filing 1502 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Motion To Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-Sixth Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
July 25, 2017 Filing 1501 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1500 (Guon, Allen)
July 25, 2017 Filing 1500 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Sixth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
July 21, 2017 Filing 1499 Notice of Issuance of Subpoena (to United States Department of Agriculture) by Patrick Cavanaugh (Radtke, Mark)
July 21, 2017 Filing 1498 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #1497 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/31/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
July 21, 2017 Filing 1497 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for extension of time to complete discovery in Shamir Patel Civil Proceeding (Gouveia, Gordon)
July 21, 2017 Filing 1496 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1495 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/31/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
July 21, 2017 Filing 1495 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Approval of Second Amendment to Purchase and Sale Agreement Related to Charter and Edu-Pro Properties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gouveia, Gordon)
July 21, 2017 Filing 1494 CERTIFICATE of Service by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
July 21, 2017 Filing 1493 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing set for 7/27/17 is stricken and reset to 7/31/17 at 9:15 a.m. Receiver's motion to strike defendants' affirmative and other defenses #1486 is entered. Reply by 7/28/17. No appearance is required on the 7/27/17 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 17, 2017 Filing 1491 MEMORANDUM by BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief #1486 Opposition to Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses (Haws, J Matthew)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1492 ORDER APPROVING BIDDING PROCEDURES AND PROTECTIONS AND FIXING DATES FOR THE SUBMISSION OF COMPETITIVE BIDS, THE AUCTION, OBJECTIONS TO THE SALE AND A HEARING TO CONSIDER ENTRY OF THE SALE ORDER WITH RESPECT TO THE 7411 PROPERTY Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/13/2017:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(kef, )
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1490 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/13/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
July 13, 2017 Filing 1489 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 7/13/2017. Motion to approve Overall Receiver's twenty-fifth report #1473 and Motion For Entry Of An Order Approving (I) Bidding Procedures And Bid Protections; (II) The Sale Of The 7411 International Drive Property Free And Clear Of Interests; (III) The Form And Manner Of Notice With Respect Thereto; (IV) The Payment Of Advertising And Closing Costs; And (V) Related Relief #1480 are granted. Final sale hearing set for 8/31/2017 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
July 12, 2017 Filing 1488 Notice of Overall Receiver's Proposed Payment To Consulting Expert by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
July 10, 2017 Filing 1487 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1486 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/27/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
July 10, 2017 Filing 1486 MOTION by Plaintiff Patrick Cavanaugh (Motion of the Overall Receiver to Strike Defendants' Affirmative and Other Defenses) (Towbin, Steven)
July 7, 2017 Filing 1485 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Joint motion for extension of time until 8/7/17 to file dispositive motions in UCF litigation #1482 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 6, 2017 Filing 1484 JURY Demand (Poronsky, Brian)
July 6, 2017 Filing 1483 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Ann Warner for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #1482 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/13/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Warner, Jennifer)
July 6, 2017 Filing 1482 MOTION by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. for extension of time to file Dispositive Motions in UCF Litigation (JOINT) (Warner, Jennifer)
July 5, 2017 Filing 1481 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1480 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/13/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
July 5, 2017 Filing 1480 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receivers Motion For Entry Of An Order Approving (I) Bidding Procedures And Bid Protections; (II) The Sale Of The 7411 International Drive Property Free And Clear Of Interests; (III) The Form And Manner Of Notice With Respect Thereto; (IV) The Payment Of Advertising And Closing Costs; And (V) Related Relief) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 3)(Guon, Allen)
June 29, 2017 Filing 1479 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 6/29/2017 as to BCM defendants only. Receiver's motion to strike the affirmative defenses shall be filed by 7/10/17. Response by 7/17/17. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 7/28/17. Written discovery shall be issued by 8/4/17. Fact discovery shall be completed by 11/30/17. General case status remains set for 7/27/17 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1478 ORDER: Motion to remove counsel from CM/ECF listing #1476 is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to remove John Schriver and Christopher Grohman, counsel for Standley Plastics, Inc. and Steven Standley, from receiving notice in this case. No appearance is required on the 7/10/17 notice motion date. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/28/2017. Mailed notice (ew, )
June 27, 2017 Filing 1477 NOTICE of Motion by John T. Schriver for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1476 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/10/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Schriver, John)
June 27, 2017 Filing 1476 MOTION by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc.TO REMOVE COUNSEL AS RECIPIENTS FROM THE CM/ECF LISTING IN THIS MATTER (Schriver, John)
June 27, 2017 Filing 1475 CERTIFICATE of Service Amended Certificate of Service by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding other #1469 , notice of filing #1470 (Guon, Allen)
June 27, 2017 Filing 1474 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1473 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/13/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
June 27, 2017 Filing 1473 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
June 27, 2017 Filing 1472 REPLY by Plaintiff Patrick Cavanaugh Overall Receiver's Reply In Support Of His Motion For Preliminary Injunction (with Exhibit A attached) (Towbin, Steven)
June 27, 2017 Filing 1471 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Overall Receiver's motion for leave to file reply brief in excess of fifteen pages #1467 is granted. Counsel shall separately file the reply brief upon receipt of this order. No appearance is required on the 6/29/17 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
June 26, 2017 Filing 1470 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1469 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Report (Guon, Allen)
June 26, 2017 Filing 1469 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
June 26, 2017 Filing 1468 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Lee Radtke for presentment of motion for leave to file #1467 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/29/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Radtke, Mark)
June 26, 2017 Filing 1467 MOTION by Plaintiff Patrick Cavanaugh for leave to file Reply Brief In Excess of Fifteen Pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Radtke, Mark)
June 23, 2017 Filing 1466 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC(Poronsky, Brian)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1465 ORDER Approving First Amendment to Purchase and Sale Agreement Regarding Charter and Edu-Pro Properties Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/15/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion to Approval Settlement with Defendants Vincent Desai, Charter School Development Services, Inc. and Edu-Pro Management, LLC Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/15/2017:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(kef, )
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/15/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 15, 2017 Filing 1462 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: General case status hearing held on 6/15/2017 and continued to 7/27/2017 at 09:00 AM. Motion to approve Overall Receiver's 24th report #1451 , Motion to approve settlement with defendants Vincent Desai, Charter School Development Services, Inc. and Edu-Pro Management #1455 and Motion for approval of First Amendment to Purchase and Sale Agreement related to Charter and Edu-Pro Properties #1460 are granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
June 9, 2017 Filing 1461 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1460 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/15/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 9, 2017 Filing 1460 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Approval of First Amendment to Purchase and Sale Agreement Related to Charter and Edu-Pro Properties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gouveia, Gordon)
June 7, 2017 Filing 1459 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal #1458 , defendants Standley Plastics, Inc. and Steven Standley (original case no. 15-cv-10264) are dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Steven Standley and Standley Plastics, Inc. terminated.Mailed notice (kef, )
June 6, 2017 Filing 1458 STIPULATION of Dismissal /STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL SOLELY WITH RESPECT TO THE STANDLEY CIVIL PROCEEDING/ (Guon, Allen)
June 5, 2017 Filing 1457 MEMORANDUM by BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel Banes, #2 Declaration of Matthew Monaco)(Haws, J Matthew)
June 2, 2017 Filing 1456 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1455 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/15/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 2, 2017 Filing 1455 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Approve Settlement with Defendants Vincent Desai, Charter School Development Services, Inc., and Edu-Pro Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gouveia, Gordon)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion for Authority to Pay April 2017 Invoice of Greenberg Traurig, LLP as Special Counsel and for Related Relief Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/1/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 1, 2017 Filing 1453 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 6/1/2017. Receiver's motion for authority to pay April 2017 invoice of Greenberg Traurig, LLP as special counsel #1445 is granted without objection. Mailed notice (kef, )
May 25, 2017 Filing 1452 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1451 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/15/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Guon, Allen)
May 25, 2017 Filing 1451 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
May 25, 2017 Filing 1450 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1449 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Report (Guon, Allen)
May 25, 2017 Filing 1449 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1448 ORDER: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of BCM High Income Fund LP and BCM High Income Income GP, LLC by Anthony Paccione #1447 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/19/2017. Mailed notice (cc, )
May 18, 2017 Filing 1447 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13190527. (Paccione, Anthony)
May 18, 2017 Filing 1446 NOTICE of Motion by Allison Hudson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1445 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/1/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Hudson, Allison)
May 18, 2017 Filing 1445 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Authority to Pay April 2017 Invoice of Greenberg Traurig, LLP As Special Counsel and For Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hudson, Allison)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1444 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC by Brian J. Poronsky (Poronsky, Brian)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1443 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC (Haws, J Matthew)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1442 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BCM High Income Fund, LP, BCM High Income GP, LLC by J Matthew W Haws (Haws, J Matthew)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1441 ORDER Authorizing Sale of Charter and Edu-Pro Properties Free and Clear of Interests and Granting Related Relief Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/11/2017:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(kef, )
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1440 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-third Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/11/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 11, 2017 Filing 1439 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 5/11/2017. Motion to approve Receiver's twenty-third report #1429 and motion for entry of an order (I) authorizing the sale of Charter and Edu-Pro properties fee and clear of all interests; (II) waiving compliance with 28 U.S.C. 2001 and 2002; and (III) granting related relief #1433 are granted. General case status hearing set for 6/14/17 is stricken and reset to 6/15/17 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
May 5, 2017 Filing 1438 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh by Mark Lee Radtke (Radtke, Mark)
May 4, 2017 Filing 1437 AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/4/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 4, 2017 Filing 1436 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 5/4/2017. Motion to reassign related proceeding #1431 is granted without objection. Reassignment of 17C3263 shall follow shortly. Case 17C3263 will be consolidated under 14C7581. All pleadings shall be filed in 14C7581. Receiver's motion for preliminary injunction filed in 17C3263 is entered. Response by 6/5/17. Reply by 6/26/17. Status hearing as to the BCM defendants only set for 6/29/2017 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
May 2, 2017 Filing 1435 CERTIFICATE of Service (Supplemental) by Steven Bennett Towbin on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding notice of motion #1432 , MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to reassign case (Overall Receivers Motion to Reassign Related Civil Proceeding) #1431 (Towbin, Steven)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1434 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1433 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/11/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1433 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Sale of the Charter and Edu-Pro Properties Free and Clear of All Interests; (II) Waiving Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 2001 and 2002; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gouveia, Gordon)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1432 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion to reassign case #1431 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/4/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1431 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to reassign case (Overall Receivers Motion to Reassign Related Civil Proceeding) (Towbin, Steven)
April 24, 2017 Filing 1430 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1429 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/11/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
April 24, 2017 Filing 1429 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-Third Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
April 24, 2017 Filing 1428 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1427 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Third Report (Guon, Allen)
April 24, 2017 Filing 1427 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Third Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-Second Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/20/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
April 20, 2017 Filing 1425 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 4/20/2017 and continued to 6/14/2017 at 09:00 AM. Receiver's motion to approve the 22nd report #1416 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
April 19, 2017 Filing 1424 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing and motion hearing set for 4/20/2017 is reset from 9:00 a.m. to 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion for Authority to Employ and Compensate a Mediator in Connection with the Disputes and Claims Against Nejame Law, P.A. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/30/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Standley Defendants Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/30/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 30, 2017 Filing 1421 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 3/30/2017. Receiver's motion to approve settlement with Standley Defendants #1406 and motion for authority to employ and compensate a mediator in connection with the disputes and claims against Nejame Law #1411 are granted. Receiver's motion for summary judgment as to the Standley Defendants #1340 is denied as moot.Mailed notice (kef, )
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER Allowing Third Interim Fee Application Filed by Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC as Counsel to the Overall Receiver Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/29/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 29, 2017 Filing 1419 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Third Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC as counsel to the overall receiver for allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses #1360 is granted without objection. Counsel shall emailed the proposed order for entry. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 28, 2017 Filing 1418 RESPONSE by NeJame Law, P.A. to MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receivers Motion For Authority To Employ And Compensate A Mediator In Connection With The Disputes And Claims Against NeJame Law, P.A.) #1411 (Hines, Erin)
March 24, 2017 Filing 1417 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1416 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/20/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 24, 2017 Filing 1416 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-Second Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
March 24, 2017 Filing 1415 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1414 (Guon, Allen)
March 24, 2017 Filing 1414 Overall Receiver's Twenty-Second Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
March 23, 2017 Filing 1413 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Overall Receiver's motion for approval of a proposed Amendment to Standstill Agreement #1401 is granted. The Overall Receiver is hereby authorized to enter into the proposed Amendment to Standstill Agreement. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 22, 2017 Filing 1412 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1411 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/30/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 22, 2017 Filing 1411 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receivers Motion For Authority To Employ And Compensate A Mediator In Connection With The Disputes And Claims Against NeJame Law, P.A.) (Guon, Allen)
March 21, 2017 Filing 1410 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: At the Receiver's oral request, Status hearing set for 4/12/17 is stricken and reset to 4/20/2017 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 ORDER Granting Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/20/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 20, 2017 Filing 1408 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Receiver's motion to enforce settlement agreement #1397 is granted by agreement. Briefing schedule is stricken and hearing set for 3/30/17 on this motion is stricken. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 17, 2017 Filing 1407 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1406 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/30/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
March 17, 2017 Filing 1406 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Settlement With Defendants Standley Plastics, Inc. and Steven Standley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Guon, Allen)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion for Authority to Retain Crossman & Company as Property Manager Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/15/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twenty-First Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/15/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
March 15, 2017 Filing 1403 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 3/15/2017. Receiver's motion to enforce settlement agreement #1397 is entered and continued to 3/30/17 at 8:30 a.m. Response by 3/22/17. Reply by 3/24/17. Receiver's motion for authority to retain Crossman & Company as property manager #1399 and motion to approve Receiver's 21st report #1381 are granted without objection. Notice motion date of 3/16/17 is stricken. Receiver's motion for approval of amendment to standstill agreement #1401 is entered and taken under advisement. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 10, 2017 Filing 1402 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1401 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/15/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
March 10, 2017 Filing 1401 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Approval of Amendment to Standstill Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gouveia, Gordon)
March 10, 2017 Filing 1400 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1399 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/15/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
March 10, 2017 Filing 1399 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Authority to Retain Crossman & Company as Property Manager (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Gouveia, Gordon)
March 10, 2017 Filing 1398 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion to enforce #1397 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/15/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
March 10, 2017 Filing 1397 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to enforce Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gouveia, Gordon)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1396 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Standley Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time #1393 is granted. Response to the Overall Receiver's motion for summary judgment #1340 shall be filed by 4/12/17. Reply by 4/26/17. No appearance is required on the 3/15/17 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 ORDER: Motions for leave to withdraw #1389 #1391 are granted. Stanely Ball and William Kane are given leave to withdraw as counsel for NeJame Law, P.A. Notice motion date of 3/15/17 is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/9/2017. Mailed notice. (eg,)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1394 AGREED MOTION - NOTICE of Motion by John T. Schriver for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, motion for relief,,, #1393 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/15/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Schriver, John)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1393 MOTION by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for partial summary judgment, motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) #1340 AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Schriver, John)
March 7, 2017 Filing 1392 NOTICE of Motion by William Kevin Kane for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #1391 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/15/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Kane, William)
March 7, 2017 Filing 1391 MOTION by Attorney William K. Kane to withdraw as attorney for NeJame Law, P.A.. No party information provided (Kane, William)
March 7, 2017 Filing 1390 NOTICE of Motion by Stanley Clarence Ball for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #1389 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/15/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Ball, Stanley)
March 7, 2017 Filing 1389 MOTION by Attorney Stanley C. Ball to withdraw as attorney for NeJame Law, P.A.. No party information provided (Ball, Stanley)
March 6, 2017 Filing 1388 ATTORNEY Appearance for Creditor NeJame Law, P.A. by Erin Bolan Hines (Hines, Erin)
March 6, 2017 Filing 1387 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 3/6/2017. Agreed motion for extension of time to complete discovery in UCF litigation #1383 is granted. Fact discovery cutoff is extended to 4/28/17. Expert disclosures by 5/19/17. Expert discovery closes 6/16/17. Any potentially dispositive motion, with supporting memorandum, shall be filed by 7/17/17. Defendant is directed to contact the courtroom deputy, 312/435-5879, by 3/17/17 to inform the court whether or not they are interested in participating in a settlement conference. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 ORDER: Motion to withdraw #1385 is granted. Ehren Fournier is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Foley & Lardner LLP. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/2/2017. Mailed notice. (eg,)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1385 MOTION by Attorney Ehren M. Fournier to withdraw as attorney for Foley & Lardner LLP. No party information provided (Fournier, Ehren)
February 28, 2017 Filing 1384 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #1383 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Banich, Terence)
February 28, 2017 Filing 1383 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for extension of time to complete discovery in the UCF Litigation (AGREED) (Banich, Terence)
February 28, 2017 Filing 1382 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1381 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/16/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
February 28, 2017 Filing 1381 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Twenty-First Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
February 27, 2017 Filing 1380 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1379 (Guon, Allen)
February 27, 2017 Filing 1379 OVERALL RECEIVERS TWENTY-FIRST REPORT by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
February 23, 2017 Filing 1378 REPLY by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion #1364 , response in opposition to motion, #1368 STANDLEY DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN ADDITIONAL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Standley dep'n excerpts))(Schriver, John)
February 23, 2017 Filing 1377 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 2/23/2017 as to the Standley defendants. Standley defendants' motion for leave to file reply #1373 is granted. Standley defendants' motion to file additional affirmative defense #1363 and motion to reopen discovery #1374 are denied for the reasons stated in open court. Mailed notice (kef, )
February 22, 2017 Filing 1376 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh by Christina Marie Sanfelippo, First (Sanfelippo, Christina)
February 22, 2017 Filing 1375 NOTICE of Motion by John T. Schriver for presentment of motion for leave to file, #1373 , motion for discovery #1374 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/28/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Schriver, John)
February 22, 2017 Filing 1374 MOTION by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. for discovery MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Schriver, John)
February 22, 2017 Filing 1373 MOTION by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. for leave to file Reply to Receiver's Response to Motion for Leave to File Additional Affirmative Defense (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Filing (Reply))(Schriver, John)
February 22, 2017 Filing 1372 AGREED ORDER as to Claims Held by the U.S. Department of Labor Against Receivership Estate in Favor of Certain Defrauded Distribution Participants Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/22/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 ORDER: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of NeJame Law, P.A. by Elizabeth Green and Wendy Cramer Townsend #1369 #1370 are granted. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/21/2017. Mailed notice (ph, )
February 20, 2017 Filing 1370 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12875355. (Townsend, Wendy)
February 20, 2017 Filing 1369 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12875311. (Green, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2017 Filing 1368 RESPONSE by Patrick D. Cavanaughin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. for leave to file An Additional Affirmative Defense #1363 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Saldinger, Richard)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twentieth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/15/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 1366 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 2/15/17 and continued to 4/12/17 at 9:15 a.m. Receiver's motion to vacate order authorizing the receiver to resolve certain insider and affiliate claims #1287 , Receiver's motion for authority to retain Interessant as manager for Davenport Hotel Property #1291 and Motion to enforce settlement agreement #1293 are withdrawn without prejudice. Motion to approve Receiver's 20th report #1346 , Receiver's motion for authority to employ and compensate an appraiser as a consulting expert in connection with the real property located at 7411 Intl Drive, Orlando, Florida #1352 and Receiver's motion for entry of agreed order as to claims held by the U.S. Dept. of Labor against Receivership Estate #1357 are granted. Third interim fee application of Shaw Fishman #1360 is entered. Any response/objection shall be filed by 3/8/17. Receiver's objection to the Department of Labor's claim #1309 is denied as moot without prejudice in light of agreement. Standley Defendants' motion for leave to file additional affirmative defense #1363 is entered. Receiver's response shall be filed by 2/17/17. Notice motion date of 2/21/17 is stricken. The following deadlines pertain to the Shamir Patel case: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be exchanged by and written discovery issued by 3/8/17. Fact discovery shall be completed by 7/31/17. Burden of proof expert disclosures by 8/31/17. Rebuttal expert disclosures by 9/29/17. All expert discovery shall be completed by 10/31/17. Any potentially dispositive motion, with supporting memorandum shall be filed by 11/30/17.Mailed notice (kef, )
February 14, 2017 Filing 1365 NOTICE of Motion by John T. Schriver for presentment of motion for leave to file #1363 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/21/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Schriver, John)
February 14, 2017 Filing 1364 MEMORANDUM by Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. in support of motion for leave to file #1363 additional affirmative defense (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1&2)(Schriver, John)
February 14, 2017 Filing 1363 MOTION by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. for leave to file An Additional Affirmative Defense (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Filing)(Schriver, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 1362 STATUS Report and [Proposed] Joint Discovery Plan (Cavanaugh v. Shamir Patel) by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Gouveia, Gordon)
February 10, 2017 Filing 1361 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1360 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/15/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
February 10, 2017 Filing 1360 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Third Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC as Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
February 10, 2017 Filing 1359 CLAIM by United States regarding Amending Claim Filed on 1/28/16 (Kelly, Michael)
February 8, 2017 Filing 1358 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1357 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/15/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
February 8, 2017 Filing 1357 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry of Agreed Order As To Claims Held By the U.S. Department of Labor Against Receivership Estate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
February 6, 2017 Filing 1356 RESPONSE by Creditor NeJame Law, P.A. to motion for miscellaneous relief, #1352 OVERALL RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR AUTHORITY TO EMPLOY AND COMPENSATE A CONSULTING EXPERT (Ball, Stanley)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion for Turnover by Citibank, N.A. of the Proceeds of Certain Fisher Bank Accounts Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/6/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 1354 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 2/6/2017. Receiver's motion for summary judgment and for a Rule 54(b) finding #1340 is entered. Response by 3/13/17. Reply by 3/23/17. Status hearing as to the Standley defendants only set for 2/23/17 at 8:30 a.m. Receiver's motion for an entry of an order authorizing and directing the turnover by Citibank of the proceeds of certain Fisher Bank accounts #130 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
February 3, 2017 Filing 1353 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1352 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/15/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
February 3, 2017 Filing 1352 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Authority to Employ and Compensate an Appraiser as a Consulting Expert in Connection with the Real Property Located at 7411 International Drive, Orlando, Florida (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 1351 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1350 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/6/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 1350 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For An Entry of an Order Authorizing and Directing The Turnover By Citibank, N.A., of the Proceeds of Certain Fisher Bank Accounts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 1349 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh by Allison Hudson (Hudson, Allison)
January 26, 2017 Filing 1348 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: U.S. Department of Labor's second uncontested motion for extension of time #1338 is granted. The U.S. Department of Labor's response to the Overall Receiver's Objection to the U.S. Department of Labor's claim shall be filed by 2/9/17. No appearance is required on the 1/31/17 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
January 25, 2017 Filing 1347 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1346 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/15/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1346 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Twentieth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1345 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1344 Overall Receiver's Twentieth Report (Guon, Allen)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1344 Overall Receiver's Twentieth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1343 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion for partial summary judgment, motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) #1340 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/6/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Saldinger, Richard)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1342 RULE 56 56.1(a)(3) Statement by Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding motion for partial summary judgment, motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) #1340 Statement Of Material Facts To Which The Overall Receiver Contends There Is No Genuine Issue (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits 1 - 7)(Saldinger, Richard)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1341 MEMORANDUM by Patrick D. Cavanaugh in support of motion for partial summary judgment, motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) #1340 (Saldinger, Richard)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1340 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for partial summary judgment on Counts I and II of The First Amended Complaint, MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) (Saldinger, Richard)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1339 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin M. Wilemon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #1338 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/31/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Wilemon, Kevin)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1338 MOTION by Objector Thomas E. Perez for extension of time to file response/reply to the Overall Receiver's Objection to the U.S. Department of Labor's Claim (Wilemon, Kevin)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1337 Notice of Issuance of Subpoena (to The Brand Banking Company) by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1336 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Shamir Patel(Case, Robert)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Nineteenth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/20/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 20, 2017 Filing 1334 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 1/20/17 and continued to 2/15/17 at 9:00 a.m. Receiver's motion to vacate order authorizing the receiver to resolve certain insider and affiliate claims #1287 , receiver's motion for authority to retain Interessant as manager for Davenport Hotel Property #1291 and motion to enforce settlement agreement #1293 are continued to 2/15/17 at 9:00 a.m. Motion to approve the Receiver's nineteenth report #1318 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
January 13, 2017 Filing 1333 NOTICE by Christopher R. Parker of Change of Address (Parker, Christopher)
January 11, 2017 Filing 1332 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: U.S. Department of Labor's uncontested motion for extension of time #1330 is granted. The U.S. Department of Labor's response to the Overall Receiver's Objection to the U.S. Department of Labor's Claim #1309 is due by 1/26/17. The 1/20/17 hearing for the Objection is stricken and will be reset if necessary. No appearance is required on the 1/17/17 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
January 11, 2017 Filing 1331 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin M. Wilemon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #1330 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/17/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Wilemon, Kevin)
January 11, 2017 Filing 1330 MOTION by Objector Thomas E. Perez for extension of time to file response/reply to the Overall Receiver's Objection to the U.S. Department of Labor's Claim (Wilemon, Kevin)
January 10, 2017 Filing 1329 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/10/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 10, 2017 Filing 1328 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court denies Defendant's motion to dismiss #1289 . Defendant should file his answer to the complaint by January 24, 2017. [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 1327 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 1/5/2017. Overall Receiver's motion for approval of standstill agreement #1325 is granted. The Overall Receiver is herewith authorized to enter into the proposed Standstill Agreement, a copy of which has been provided to the Court for an in camera review. Mailed notice (kef, )
December 28, 2016 Filing 1326 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1325 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/5/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
December 28, 2016 Filing 1325 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receiver's Motion for Approval of Standstill Agreement) (Towbin, Steven)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 ORDER: Motion for withdrawal as counsel of record #1323 is granted. Patrick Stanton is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Orlando International Hotels, LLC and Robert J. Guidry Investments, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/27/2016. Mailed notice (ph, )
December 27, 2016 Filing 1323 MOTION by Attorney Patrick T. Stanton to withdraw as attorney for Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C.. No party information provided (Stanton, Patrick)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion for Turnover by Timothy Fisher of the Proceeds from the Sale of the Fisher Home Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/22/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 22, 2016 Filing 1321 REPLY by Shamir Patel to response in opposition to motion #1308 Shamir Patel's Motion to Dismiss (Case, Robert)
December 22, 2016 Filing 1320 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 12/22/2016 and continued to 1/20/2017 at 08:30 AM. Receiver's objection to the Department of Labor's Claim #1309 and motion to approve Receiver's nineteenth report #1318 will be heard on 1/20/17 at 8:30 a.m. as opposed to the 1/19/17 notice date. Receiver's motion to vacate order authorizing the receiver to resolve certain insider and affiliate claims #1287 , receiver's motion for authority to retain Interessant as manager for Davenport Hotel Property #1291 and motion to enforce settlement agreement #1293 are continued to 1/20/17 at 8:30 a.m. Motion for an entry of an order authorizing and directing the turnover by Timothy Fisher of the proceeds from the sale of the Fisher home #1312 is granted. Counsel shall prepare and submit a proposed order. Motion for approval of standstill agreement #1314 is denied without prejudice to refile when the standstill agreement becomes final. Motion for leave to file under seal #1314 is withdrawn. Mailed notice (kef, )
December 21, 2016 Filing 1319 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1318 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/19/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
December 21, 2016 Filing 1318 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Nineteenth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gouveia, Gordon)
December 21, 2016 Filing 1317 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1316 Overall Receiver's Nineteenth Report (Gouveia, Gordon)
December 21, 2016 Filing 1316 Overall Receiver's Nineteenth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
December 19, 2016 Filing 1315 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, motion for leave to file #1314 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/22/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
December 19, 2016 Filing 1314 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Approval Of Standstill Agreement , MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for leave to file Standstill Agreement Under Seal (Towbin, Steven)
December 15, 2016 Filing 1313 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion for order, #1312 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/22/2016 at 10:15 AM. (Saldinger, Richard)
December 15, 2016 Filing 1312 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for order Authorizing and Directing The Turnover By Timothy Fisher Of The Proceeds From The Sale Of The Fisher Home (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Saldinger, Richard)
December 14, 2016 Filing 1311 Notice Of Issuance Of Subpoena (to Greenberg Traurig, LLP) by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Roberts, Peter)
December 13, 2016 Filing 1310 #1309 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/19/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
December 13, 2016 Filing 1309 OBJECTIONS by Patrick D. Cavanaugh to other #1157 (Overall Receivers Objection To The United States Department Of Labors Claim) (Towbin, Steven)
December 12, 2016 Filing 1308 RESPONSE by Patrick D. Cavanaughin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Shamir Patel to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law #1289 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saldinger, Richard)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Eighteenth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/8/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 8, 2016 Filing 1306 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 12/8/2016 and continued to 12/22/16 at 10:15 a.m. Receiver's motion to vacate order authorizing the receiver to resolve certain insider and affiliate claims #1287 , receiver's motion for authority to retain Interessant as manager for Davenport Hotel Property #1291 and motion to enforce settlement agreement #1293 are continued to 12/22/2016 at 10:15 AM. Motion to approve Overall Receiver's Eighteenth Report #1299 is granted. No appearance is required on the 12/13/16 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
December 6, 2016 Filing 1305 Exhibits to AMENDED complaint by Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C., Orlando International Hotels, LLC against Patrick D. Cavanaugh, Michael Nanosky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint)(Warner, Jennifer)
December 6, 2016 Filing 1304 AMENDED complaint by Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C., Orlando International Hotels, LLC against Patrick D. Cavanaugh, Michael Nanosky (Warner, Jennifer)
December 6, 2016 Filing 1303 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC and Robert J. Guidry Investments, LLC's agreed motion for leave to file amended complaint #1301 is granted. Counsel shall separately file the amended complaint upon receipt of this order. Mailed notice (kef, )
December 5, 2016 Filing 1302 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Ann Warner for presentment of motion for leave to file #1301 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/8/2016 at 09:15 AM. (Warner, Jennifer)
December 5, 2016 Filing 1301 MOTION by Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. for leave to file Agreed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Warner, Jennifer)
November 28, 2016 Filing 1300 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1299 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/13/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
November 28, 2016 Filing 1299 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Eighteenth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
November 28, 2016 Filing 1298 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1297 Overall Receiver's Eighteenth Report (Guon, Allen)
November 28, 2016 Filing 1297 Overall Receiver's Eighteenth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
November 21, 2016 Filing 1296 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 11/21/2016. Receiver's motion to vacate order authorizing the receiver to resolve certain insider and affiliate claims #1287 , receiver's motion for authority to retain Interessant as manager for Davenport Hotel Property #1291 and motion to enforce settlement agreement #1293 are entered and continued to 12/8/16 at 9:15 a.m. Shamir Patel's motion to dismiss #1289 is entered. Response by 12/12/16. Reply by 12/22/16.Mailed notice (kef, )
November 17, 2016 Filing 1295 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion to enforce #1293 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
November 16, 2016 Filing 1294 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion to enforce #1293 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
November 16, 2016 Filing 1293 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to enforce Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gouveia, Gordon)
November 16, 2016 Filing 1292 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1291 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
November 16, 2016 Filing 1291 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Authority to Retain Interessant as Manager for Davenport Hotel Property (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gouveia, Gordon)
November 15, 2016 Filing 1290 NOTICE of Motion by Robert L Case for presentment of motion to dismiss #1289 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Case, Robert)
November 15, 2016 Filing 1289 MOTION by Defendant Shamir Patel to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Case, Robert)
November 11, 2016 Filing 1288 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion to vacate, motion for relief #1287 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/21/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Saldinger, Richard)
November 11, 2016 Filing 1287 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to vacate order #1144 Authorizing the Overall Receiver to Resolve Certain Insider and Affiliate Claims and Related Relief (Saldinger, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 1286 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/10/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
November 10, 2016 Filing 1285 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' Motion for a Determination of Choice of Law #1174 . [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
November 10, 2016 Filing 1284 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shamir Patel by Arthur M. Scheller, III (Scheller, Arthur)
November 10, 2016 Filing 1283 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shamir Patel by Robert L Case (Case, Robert)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Seventeenth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/8/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
November 8, 2016 Filing 1281 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion to approve Overall Receiver's 17th Report #1273 is granted. No appearance is required on the 11/9/16 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 ORDER: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Shamir Patel by Robert Case #1279 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/4/2016. Mailed notice (ph, )
November 3, 2016 Filing 1279 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12532941. (Case, Robert)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1278 ANSWER to Complaint STANDLEY DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COUNTS 3 AND 4 OF THE OVERALL RECEIVER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc.(Schriver, John)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1277 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Agreed motion for extension of time to complete discovery in UCF litigation #1275 is granted. Fact discovery shall be completed by 2/28/17. Expert disclosures due by 3/14/17. Expert discovery closes 4/14/17. Any potentially dispositive motion, with supporting memorandum, shall be filed by 5/15/17. Mailed notice (kef, )
October 31, 2016 On 10/31/16 the Clerk audited this case file and discovered that William J. McKenna, Jr. is not receiving electronic notice. The Clerk modified CM/ECF to provide notice to the attorney. The record indicates you are counsel of record in this case. If you are no longer representing this client, you must file a motion to withdraw from this case pursuant to LR 83.17. (tt, )
October 28, 2016 Filing 1276 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #1275 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/9/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Banich, Terence)
October 28, 2016 Filing 1275 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for extension of time to complete discovery in the UCF Litigation (AGREED) (Banich, Terence)
October 25, 2016 Filing 1274 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1273 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/9/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 1273 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Seventeenth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 1272 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1271 Overall Receiver's Seventeenth Report (Guon, Allen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 1271 Overall Receiver's Seventeenth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Sixteenth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/20/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's motion to approve settlement with defendants Charter School Development Services, Inc., Edu-Pro Management, LLC and Vincent Desai Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/20/2016:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(kef, )
October 20, 2016 Filing 1268 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 10/20/16 and continued to 12/8/16 at 9:15 a.m. Status hearing set for 11/10/16 is stricken. Receiver's motion for an order appointing him as receiver for Charter School Development Services, Inc. and Edu-Pro Mgmt, approving management agreement with Jack Meeks & Assoc #1079 is withdrawn without prejudice. Receiver's motion to approve settlement with defendants Charter School Development Services, Inc., Edu-Pro Management, LLC and Vincent Desai and for related relief #1253 and motion to approve Receiver's 16th report #1258 are granted. Defendant Desai's motions to dismiss #1194 #1196 are denied as moot. Standley defendants shall answer the Receiver's First Amended Complaint by 10/31/16. Mailed notice (kef, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 1267 SUR-REPLY by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to motion for miscellaneous relief #1174 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Saldinger, Richard)
October 14, 2016 Filing 1266 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Receiver's unopposed oral request for an extension of time is granted. Receiver's sur-reply to the Standley Defendants' motion for choice of law shall be filed by noon on 10/19/16. Mailed notice (kef, )
October 13, 2016 Filing 1265 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/13/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
October 13, 2016 Filing 1264 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court denies the Standley Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts Three and Four of the Overall Receiver's First Amended Complaint #1171 . [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
October 7, 2016 Filing 1263 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1258 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/20/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Guon, Allen)
October 6, 2016 Filing 1262 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court directs the Receiver to file a surreply addressing Standley Plastic's argument, raised in its reply brief (R. 1260), that Sections 195 and 203 of the Restatement (Second) of Conflict of Laws indicate that Florida law controls the issues relevant to Count One. The Court asks that the Receiver address Shannon-Vail Five Inc. v. Bunch, 270 F.3d 1207 (9th Cir. 2001), which provides an in-depth examination of Sections 188, 195, and 203 of the Restatement. In particular, the Receiver should respond to the Shannon-Vail court's statement that "the 'unless' clause of 195 should not be read as designed to save contracts that violate usury laws of the state of repayment." Shannon-Vail, 270 F.3d at 1212. The Receiver should file its surreply by 10/17/16. No further briefing unless ordered by the Court.Mailed notice (kef, )
September 30, 2016 Filing 1261 REPLY by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. to motion to dismiss #1171 STANDLEY DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 3 AND 4 OF RECEIVER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Grohman, Christopher)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1260 RESPONSE by Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc.in Support of MOTION by Defendant Standley Plastics, Inc.Determination of Choice of Law Motion for Determination of Choice of Law #1174 STANDLEY DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR A DETERMINATION OF CHOICE OF LAW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. A-E)(Schriver, John)
September 27, 2016 Filing 1259 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1258 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/20/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Guon, Allen)
September 27, 2016 Filing 1258 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Sixteenth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
September 26, 2016 Filing 1257 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1244 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ph, )
September 26, 2016 Filing 1256 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1255 Overall Receiver's Sixteenth Report (Guon, Allen)
September 26, 2016 Filing 1255 Overall Receiver's Sixteenth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1254 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1253 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/20/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1253 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receivers Motion To Approve Settlement With Defendants Charter School Development Services, Inc., Edu-Pro Management, LLC And Vincent Desai And For Related Relief) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Gouveia, Gordon)
September 20, 2016 Filing 1252 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Receiver's oral request to dismiss the case against Ward Harris Properties, Inc. and Ward Harris Properties II, Inc. (original case no. 16-cv-241) with prejudice is granted. Ward Harris Properties II, Inc. and Ward Harris Properties, Inc. terminated.Mailed notice (kef, )
September 16, 2016 Filing 1251 RESPONSE by Patrick D. Cavanaughin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Standley Plastics, Inc., Steven Standley to dismiss Motion to Dismiss Counts Three and Four of the Receiver's First Amended Complaint #1171 (Saldinger, Richard)
September 16, 2016 Filing 1250 RESPONSE by Patrick D. Cavanaughin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Standley Plastics, Inc.Determination of Choice of Law Motion for Determination of Choice of Law #1174 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saldinger, Richard)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1249 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1248 Michael Nanosky Final Receiver's Report (Guon, Allen)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1248 Michael Nanosky Final Receiver's Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1247 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on September 8, 2016. Mailed notice (ph, )
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with the Ward Harris Defendants Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Fifteenth Report and Shortening Notice Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 ORDER: (0:45) Status hearing held on 9/7/16 and continued to 10/20/16 at 9:45 a.m. Continued Receiver's motion for an order appointing him as receiver for Charter School Development Services, Inc. and Edu-Pro Mgmt, approving management agreement with Jack Meeks & Assoc #1079 is entered and continued to 10/20/16 at 9:45 a.m. Motion for substitution of Harvard Illinois Bancorp, Inc. for Harvard Savings Bank #1214 is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to substitute Harvard Illinois Bancorp, Inc. for Harvard Savings Bank and recognize the appearance of counsel for Harvard Savings Bank as counsel for Harvard Illinois Bancorp, Inc. Motion to approve Receiver's 15th report and to shorten notice #1221 and Receiver's motion to approve settlement with the Ward Defendants #1230 are granted. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016. Mailed notice (ph, )
September 7, 2016 Filing 1243 ANSWER to amended complaint STANDLEY DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO OVERALL RECEIVER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc.(Schriver, John)
September 7, 2016 Filing 1242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Agreed order extending briefing schedule #1240 is granted. Receiver's responses to defendant Desai's motions to dismiss #1194 #1196 shall be filed by 10/4/16. Replies by 10/25/16. Mailed notice (kef, )
September 6, 2016 Filing 1241 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1240 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
September 6, 2016 Filing 1240 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Entry of Agreed Order Extending Briefing Schedule on Defendant Vincent Desai's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gouveia, Gordon)
September 6, 2016 Filing 1239 REPLY by Plaintiff Illinois Metropolitan Investment Fund to objections #1158 in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lending, Randall)
September 6, 2016 Filing 1238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: IMET's motion for leave to file reply in support of its objection and joinder of UWCU's objection to the Receiver's plan of distribution #1234 is granted. Counsel shall separately file its reply upon receipt of this order. Mailed notice (kef, )
September 6, 2016 Filing 1237 AGREED ORDER Subordinating Claims Held by Pennant Management, Inc. Against Receivership Estate Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/6/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 6, 2016 Filing 1236 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion for entry of agreed order subordinating claims held by Pennant Management, Inc. #1126 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
September 2, 2016 Filing 1235 NOTICE of Motion by Randall Marc Lending for presentment of motion for leave to file #1234 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Lending, Randall)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1234 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Metropolitan Investment Fund for leave to file reply in support of its objection and joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lending, Randall)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1233 REPLY by Intervenor University of Wisconsin Credit Union to objections #1146 Reply in Support of Its Objection to the Application of 31 U.S.C. Sec. 3713 to the USDA's Contribution Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Illinois Metropolitan Investment Fund, et al. v. United States of America Complaint)(Vaccaro, Daniel)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel #1223 is granted. Patrick Scott is given leave to withdraw as counsel for defendants Ward Harris Properties, Inc. and Ward Harris Properties II, Inc. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/1/2016. Mailed notice (ph, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 1231 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion for settlement #1230 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Saldinger, Richard)
September 1, 2016 Filing 1230 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for settlement with Ward Harris Properties, Inc. and Ward Harris Properties II, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Saldinger, Richard)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 ORDER Granting Second Interim Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin as Counsel to the Overall Receiver for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/1/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 1228 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Second Interim Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC as Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses #1186 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 1227 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1226 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Guon, Allen)
September 1, 2016 Filing 1226 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to Entry of Agreed Order Subordinating Claims Held by Pennant Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 31, 2016 Filing 1225 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Shelby Scott for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #1223 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Scott, Patrick)
August 29, 2016 Filing 1224 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Timothy Glenn Fisher (bg, )
August 26, 2016 Filing 1223 MOTION by Attorney Patrick S. Scott to withdraw as attorney for Ward Harris Properties II, Inc., Ward Harris Properties, Inc.. No party information provided (Scott, Patrick)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1222 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1221 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Guon, Allen)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1221 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Fifteenth Report and to Shorten Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1220 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1219 Overall Receiver's Fifteenth Report (Guon, Allen)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1219 Overall Receiver's Fifteenth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1217 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re status report #1216 (Guon, Allen)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1216 STATUS Report of Amended Report of Sale With Respect to the Point Cypress Property by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1215 NOTICE of Motion by Edward J. Halper for presentment of motion to substitute party #1214 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Halper, Edward)
August 24, 2016 Filing 1214 MOTION by Intervenor Plaintiff Harvard Savings Bank to substitute party (Halper, Edward)
August 22, 2016 Filing 1218 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1170 sent to Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Pro se contacted and directed to file a Notification of Change of Address with the Clerk's Office. Re-mailed to 26 S. Sunny Slope Ave. Pasadena CA, 91107 (mc, )
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 ORDER Appointing the Overall Receiver as the Receiver for FFF Guaranty Fund I, LLC Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 22, 2016 Filing 1212 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 8/22/16. Second interim fee application as counsel to the receiver #1186 is entered and taken under advisement. Receiver's motion for entry of an order appointing him as receiver for FFF Guaranty Fund I, LLC #1190 is granted. Desai's motions to dismiss #1194 #1196 are entered. Responses by 9/6/16. Replies by 9/20/16. Status hearing as to these defendants set for 11/10/16 at 8:30 a.m. Receiver's motion for authority to employ and compensate expert #1199 is granted. Receiver's motion authorizing payment of Master Tech Service, Inc's secured claim #1201 is granted and entered as to Harris Civil Engineers, LLC's claim. Any response by Harris Civil Engineers shall be filed by 8/29/16. Receiver's motion authorizing payment of commission to Janus Hotels and Resorts form the sale of the Point Cypress Property #1204 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 22, 2016 Filing 1211 ATTORNEY Appearance for Creditor Valley National Bank by Peter Ross Morrison (Morrison, Peter)
August 19, 2016 Filing 1209 RESPONSE by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to objections #1156 (Towbin, Steven)
August 19, 2016 Filing 1208 RESPONSE by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to objections #1146 (Towbin, Steven)
August 19, 2016 Filing 1207 RESPONSE by Creditors United States, The, United States to objections #1146 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kelly, Michael)
August 18, 2016 Filing 1206 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/22/16 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.Redaction Request due 9/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2016. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1210 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #1200 , #1203 , #1201 , #1199 , #1204 , #1202 , #1205 sent to Attorney Gerald William Delaney returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Gerald William Delaney a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (sxn, )
August 17, 2016 Filing 1205 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1204 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016 at 01:00 PM. (Guon, Allen)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1204 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry of an Order Authorizing Payment of Commission to Janus Hotels & Resorts From the Sale of the Point Cypress Property (Guon, Allen)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1203 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1201 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016 at 01:00 PM. (Guon, Allen)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1202 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1201 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016 at 01:00 PM. (Guon, Allen)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1201 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh For Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing The Payment of Master Tech Service, Inc.'s Secured Claim and (II) Providing Instruction as to the Classification and Treatment of Harris Civil Engineers, LLC's Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1200 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1199 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016 at 01:00 PM. (Banich, Terence)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1199 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Authority to Employ and Compensate Expert (Banich, Terence)
August 16, 2016 Filing 1198 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Standley Defendants' motions to dismiss #1171 #1174 are entered. Responses by 9/16/16. Replies by 9/30/16. No appearance is required on the 8/17/16 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 15, 2016 Filing 1197 NOTICE of Motion by E. Philip Groben for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #1196 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016 at 01:00 PM. (Groben, E. Philip)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1196 MOTION by Defendant Vincent Desai to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Groben, E. Philip)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1195 NOTICE of Motion by E. Philip Groben for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #1194 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016 at 01:00 PM. (Groben, E. Philip)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1194 MOTION by Defendant Vincent Desai to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Groben, E. Philip)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1193 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re status report #1192 (Guon, Allen)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1192 STATUS Report Of Sale With Respect To The Point Cypress Property by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1191 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion for order #1190 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016 at 01:00 PM. (Saldinger, Richard)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1190 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for order Appointing Him as Receiver for FFF Guaranty Fund I, LLC (Saldinger, Richard)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1189 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re status report #1188 (Guon, Allen)
August 15, 2016 Filing 1188 STATUS Report Of Sale With Respect to the Kilgore Property by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 12, 2016 Filing 1187 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1186 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/22/2016 at 01:00 PM. (Guon, Allen)
August 12, 2016 Filing 1186 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Second Interim Fee Application of Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC as Counsel to the Overall Receiver For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
August 12, 2016 Filing 1185 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1184 (Guon, Allen)
August 12, 2016 Filing 1184 Overall Receiver's [Proposed First Amended] Plan of Distribution by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's First Omnibus Objection to Claim Nos. 366-1, 457 and 469 Filed by Onity, Inc. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 10, 2016 Filing 1182 AMENDED ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's First Omnibus Objection Claim No. 504 Filed by Alvarez, Winthrop Thompson & Storey, P.A. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Fourteenth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 10, 2016 Filing 1180 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 8/10/2016. Motion to approve Overall Receiver's fourteenth report #1151 and Overall Receiver's motion for leave to file his proposed first amended plan of distribution #1167 are granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2016: The Court denies the Overall Receiver's objection to Claim No. 336 filed by Master Tech Service, LLC. [For further details, see Order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 9, 2016 Filing 1178 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1177 (Guon, Allen)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1177 Michael Nanosky Receiver's Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1176 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher T Grohman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1174 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/17/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Grohman, Christopher)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1175 MEMORANDUM by Standley Plastics, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #1174 Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Determination of Choice of Law (Grohman, Christopher)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1174 MOTION by Defendant Standley Plastics, Inc.Determination of Choice of Law Motion for Determination of Choice of Law (Grohman, Christopher)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1173 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher T Grohman for presentment of motion to dismiss #1171 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/17/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Grohman, Christopher)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1172 MEMORANDUM by Standley Plastics, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #1171 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts Three and Four of Receivers First Amended Complaint (Grohman, Christopher)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1171 MOTION by Defendants Standley Plastics, Inc., Steven Standley to dismiss Motion to Dismiss Counts Three and Four of the Receiver's First Amended Complaint (Grohman, Christopher)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1169 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Agreed motion for extension of time to complete discovery in UCF Litigation #1161 is granted. Fact discovery cutoff is extended to 10/28/16. Expert disclosures by 11/11/16. Expert discovery shall be completed by 12/9/16. Any potentially dispositive motion, with supporting memorandum, shall be filed by 1/13/17. However, if no party timely serves an expert disclosure, then dispositive motions shall be due on 12/2/16. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel #1164 is granted. Susan Alton is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Orlando International Hotels, LLC and Robert J. Guidry Investments, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/8/2016. Mailed notice (lf, )
August 5, 2016 Filing 1168 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for leave to file #1167 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
August 5, 2016 Filing 1167 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for leave to file his Proposed First Amended Plan of Distribution and For Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
August 5, 2016 Filing 1166 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Defendants Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C., Plaintiffs Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C. by Jennifer Ann Warner (Warner, Jennifer)
August 5, 2016 Filing 1165 NOTICE of Motion by Suzanne Marie Alton for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #1164 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/24/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Alton, Suzanne)
August 5, 2016 Filing 1164 MOTION by Attorney Suzanne M. Alton to withdraw as attorney for Orlando International Hotels, LLC, Robert J. Guidry Investments, L.L.C.. No party information provided (Alton, Suzanne)
August 3, 2016 Filing 1163 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1141 sent to Timothy Glenn Fisher and Translucent Entertainment, LLC returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Pro Se Litigant contacted and directed to file a Pro Se Litigant Appearance with the Clerk's Office. Re-mailed to 26th S. Sunnyslope Ave., Pasadena, CA 91107 (Attachments: #1 Translucent Entertainment, LLC). (ph, )
August 3, 2016 Filing 1162 NOTICE of Motion by Terence G. Banich for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #1161 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Banich, Terence)
August 3, 2016 Filing 1161 MOTION by Counter Defendant Patrick Cavanaugh for extension of time to complete discovery in the UCF Litigation (AGREED) (Banich, Terence)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 ORDER Authorizing the Sale of Kilgore Property Free and Clear of Interests and Granting Related Relief Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/28/2016:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(kef, )
July 28, 2016 Filing 1159 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 7/28/2016. Receiver's motion for order authorizing sale of Kilgore Property #1147 is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 1158 OBJECTIONS by Illinois Metropolitan Investment Fund to objections #1156 , other #1066 objection and joinder to the Overall Receiver's (Proposed) Plan of Distribution (Conner, Brooke)
July 27, 2016 Filing 1157 Proof of Claim by Thomas E. Perez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to EBSA's Proof of Claim and Exhibit A)(Wilemon, Kevin)
July 27, 2016 Filing 1156 OBJECTIONS by University of Wisconsin Credit Union to other #1066 the Overall Receiver's [Proposed] Plan of Distribution (Vaccaro, Daniel)
July 27, 2016 Filing 1155 CERTIFICATE of Service Amended Certificate of Service by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Fourteenth Report #1151 (Guon, Allen)
July 27, 2016 Filing 1154 CERTIFICATE of Service Amended Certificate of Service by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding other #1149 (Guon, Allen)
July 25, 2016 Filing 1152 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1151 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
July 25, 2016 Filing 1151 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Fourteenth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
July 25, 2016 Filing 1150 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1149 Overall Receiver's Fourteenth Report (Guon, Allen)
July 25, 2016 Filing 1149 Overall Receiver's Fourteenth Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
July 25, 2016 Filing 1148 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1147 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/28/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
July 25, 2016 Filing 1147 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh MOTION OF OVERALL RECEIVER FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF KILGORE PROPERTY FREE AND CLEAR OF INTERESTS AND FOR RELATED RELIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gouveia, Gordon)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 ORDER (I) Authorizing the Sale of the Point Cypress Property Free and Clear of All Interests; (II) Authorizing Payment of Redmon Lien Claim and Sale Related Costs; and (III) Granting Related Relief Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(kef, )
July 22, 2016 Filing 1146 OBJECTIONS to United States Department of Agriculture's January 28, 2016 Contribution or Indemnity Claim (Vaccaro, Daniel)
July 22, 2016 Filing 1145 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Patrick D. Cavanaugh against Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Saldinger, Richard)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 ORDER Authorizing Overall Receiver to Resolve Certain Insider and Affiliate Claims and Related Relief Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion for Authority to Expand the Scope of Services Provided by Shutts & Bowen LLP and Greenberg Traurig as Special Counsel Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Thirteenth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
July 22, 2016 Filing 1141 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 7/22/16 and continued to 9/7/16 at 1:30 p.m. Sale hearing held on 7/22/16. The Court approves the Point Cypress sale. Receiver's continued motion re: omnibus claim objection #1045 and Receiver's continued motion for an order appointing him as receiver for Charter School Development and Edu-Pro Management #1079 are continued to 9/7/16 at 1:30 p.m. Receiver's motion to approve thirteenth report #1093 , Receiver's motion for authority to expand the services of Shutts & Bowen LLP and Greenberg Traurig as special counsel #1111 , IMET's and Harvard Savings Bank's joinder motions #1127 #1137 , Receiver's motion for authority to resolve certain claims against affiliates and insiders #1129 and Receiver's motion for leave to file his first amended complaint against Standley Plastics #1133 are granted. Counsel shall separately file the first amended complaint upon receipt of this order. Standley Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 8/10/16. University of Wisconsin Credit Union's motion for leave to file objection to the U.S. Department of Agriculture's 1/28/16 contribution or indemnity claim #1125 is granted. Counsel shall separately file its objection upon receipt of this order. Responses to the objection shall be filed by 8/19/16. Replies by 9/2/16. Any responsive pleading to Pennant's third amended complaint is stayed until further order of the Court. Approval hearing set for 9/1/16 is stricken and reset to 9/7/16 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 22, 2016 Filing 1140 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Receiver's oral request to dismiss the case against Erica Herman and Jesse Newton (original case no. 16-cv-00572) with prejudice is granted. Erica Herman and Jesse I Newton terminated.Mailed notice (kef, )
July 21, 2016 Filing 1139 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re response in opposition to motion, #1138 (Towbin, Steven)
July 21, 2016 Filing 1138 RESPONSE by Patrick D. Cavanaughin Opposition to MOTION by Intervenor University of Wisconsin Credit Union for leave to file Objection to the United States Department of Agriculture's January 28, 2016 Contribution or Indemnity Claim #1125 (Towbin, Steven)
July 21, 2016 Filing 1137 MOTION by Intervenor Plaintiff Harvard Savings Bank for joinder to UWCU Motion for Leave to File Objection to USDA 1-18-2016 Contribution or Indemnity Claim (Halper, Edward)
July 21, 2016 Filing 1136 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other, #1135 (Gouveia, Gordon)
July 21, 2016 Filing 1135 Overall Receiver's Report of Auction with Respect to Sale of Point Cypress Property by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 6)(Gouveia, Gordon)
July 19, 2016 Filing 1134 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion for leave to file #1133 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Saldinger, Richard)
July 19, 2016 Filing 1133 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for leave to file His First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saldinger, Richard)
July 19, 2016 Filing 1132 THIRD AMENDED complaint by Pennant Management, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Group Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Group Ex N, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Exhibt AA)(Bernstein, Mark)
July 19, 2016 Filing 1131 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. by Christopher T Grohman (Grohman, Christopher)
July 19, 2016 Filing 1130 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1129 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
July 19, 2016 Filing 1129 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Overall Receiver for Authority to Resolve Certain Claims Against Affiliates and Insiders and for Clarification or Modification of this Courts Prior Injunctive Orders and Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Towbin, Steven)
July 18, 2016 Filing 1128 NOTICE of Motion by Brooke Elizabeth Conner for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1127 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Conner, Brooke)
July 18, 2016 Filing 1127 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Metropolitan Investment Fund to Join in UWCU Objection (Conner, Brooke)
July 18, 2016 Filing 1126 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel J. Vaccaro for presentment of motion for leave to file #1125 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Vaccaro, Daniel)
July 18, 2016 Filing 1125 MOTION by Intervenor University of Wisconsin Credit Union for leave to file Objection to the United States Department of Agriculture's January 28, 2016 Contribution or Indemnity Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vaccaro, Daniel)
July 18, 2016 Filing 1124 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Standley defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #1122 is granted. Said defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment by 8/10/16. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 15, 2016 Filing 1123 (UNOPPOSED MOTION) NOTICE of Motion by John T. Schriver for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #1122 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Schriver, John)
July 15, 2016 Filing 1122 MOTION by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. for extension of time to file UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Schriver, John)
July 14, 2016 Filing 1121 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: August 13, 2016 being a Saturday, defendant Vincent Desai shall answer or otherwise plead by 8/15/16. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 14, 2016 Filing 1120 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Vincent Desai's motions for extension of time until 8/13/16 to answer or otherwise plead #1114 #1116 are granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
July 13, 2016 Filing 1119 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Vincent Desai by Matthew Thomas Gensburg (Gensburg, Matthew)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1118 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Vincent Desai by E. Philip Groben (Groben, E. Philip)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1117 NOTICE of Motion by E. Philip Groben for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #1116 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Groben, E. Philip)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1116 MOTION by Defendant Vincent Desai for extension of time to file answer to 16-05255 Complaint (Groben, E. Philip)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1115 NOTICE of Motion by E. Philip Groben for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #1114 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Groben, E. Philip)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1114 MOTION by Defendant Vincent Desai for extension of time to file answer to 16-05251 Complaint (Groben, E. Philip)
July 6, 2016 Filing 1112 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1111 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
July 6, 2016 Filing 1111 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Overall Receiver's Motion For Authority to Expand the Services of Shutts & Bowen LLP and Greenberg Traurig, LLP as Special Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
July 1, 2016 Filing 1109 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/9/16 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 7/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2016. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 ORDER Granting in Part and Continuing in Part Overall Receiver's First Omnibus Objection to Certain Disputed Claims Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(kef, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Erica Herman and Jesse I. Newton Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion to Approve Compromise with Hufcor, Inc. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 ORDER Authorizing Overall Receiver's Retention of and Proposed Compensation Arrangement with an Investigative Services Firm Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER: (0:05) Motion hearing held on 6/30/16. Receiver's motion re: omnibus claim objection #1045 is entered and continued as to the Onity claim to 7/22/16 at 8:30 a.m., taken under advisement as to Master Tech Service's response and granted as to the remainder of the motion. Receiver's motion for an order appointing him as receiver for Charter School Development Services, Inc. and Edu-Pro Mgmt, approving management agreement with Jack Meeks & Assoc #1079 is entered & continued to 7/22/16 at 8:30 a.m. in light of the bankruptcy filing by Charter School Development Services and Edu-Pro Mgmt. Receiver's motion for approval of his proposed retention and compensation arrangement with an investigative services firm #1081 , Receiver's motion to approve settlement with Erica Herman and Jesse Newton #1085 and Receiver's motion to approve compromise resolving lien claim of Hufcor, Inc. #1087 are granted. Motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Timothy Fisher and Translucent Entertainment #1089 is granted. Anthony DiMonte is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Timothy Fisher and Translucent Entertainment, LLC. Motion for leave to appear #1095 is granted. Mark Bernstein and Shawn Taylor are given leave to file their appearances on behalf of Pennant Management, Inc. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016. Mailed notice (ph, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 1105 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pennant Management, Inc. by Shawn Michael Taylor (Taylor, Shawn)
June 30, 2016 Filing 1104 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pennant Management, Inc. by Mark Scott Bernstein (Bernstein, Mark)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1103 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Cavanaugh (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1102 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Cavanaugh as to Edu-Pro Management, LLC on 6/20/2016, answer due 7/11/2016. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1101 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Cavanaugh as to Charter School Development Services, Inc. on 6/20/2016, answer due 7/11/2016. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1100 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Cavanaugh as to Cleanaire Mechanical, Inc. on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1099 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Cavanaugh as to State of Florida Department of Environmental Protection on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1098 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Cavanaugh as to Vincent Desai on 6/20/2016, answer due 7/11/2016. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1097 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Cavanaugh as to JMC Quality Builders Corporation on 6/21/2016, answer due 7/12/2016. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 28, 2016 Filing 1096 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Scott Bernstein for presentment of motion for leave to appear #1095 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Bernstein, Mark)
June 28, 2016 Filing 1095 additional counsel MOTION by Plaintiff Pennant Management, Inc. for leave to appear as additional counsel (Bernstein, Mark)
June 24, 2016 Filing 1094 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1093 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
June 24, 2016 Filing 1093 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Overall Receiver's Thirteenth Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
June 24, 2016 Filing 1092 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/24/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 24, 2016 Filing 1091 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1090 OVERALL RECEIVER'S THIRTEENTH REPORT (Guon, Allen)
June 24, 2016 Filing 1090 OVERALL RECEIVER'S THIRTEENTH REPORT by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1089 MOTION by Attorney Anthony A DiMonte to withdraw as attorney for Timothy Glenn Fisher, Translucent Entertainment, LLC. New address information: Timothy Fisher, Translucent Entertainment, LLC; 13280 Dronfield Ave., Sylmar, California 91342 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notification of Party Contact Information)(DiMonte, Anthony)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1088 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1087 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1087 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh To Approve Compromise Resolving Lien Claim of Hufcor, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Guon, Allen)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1086 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion for settlement #1085 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Saldinger, Richard)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1085 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for settlement with Erica Herman and Jesse I. Newton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Saldinger, Richard)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1084 RESPONSE of Master Tech Service, LLC., to claim objection. (mc, )
June 20, 2016 Filing 1083 CERTIFICATE of Service on Order and Notice Regarding Approval of the Overall Receiver's Plan of Distribution and Fixing Deadlines For Filing Objections [Dkt. No. 1077] and the Overall Receiver's [Proposed] Plan of Distribution [Dkt. No. 1066] by Allen Jay Guon on behalf of Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding order #1077 , other #1066 (Guon, Allen)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1082 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1081 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1081 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receivers Motion For Approval Of His Proposed Retention And Compensation Arrangement With An Investigative Services Firm) (Towbin, Steven)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1080 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion to appoint receiver, #1079 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1079 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to appoint receiver for Charter School Development Services, Inc. and Edu-Pro Management, LLC, Approving Management Agreement with Jack Meeks & Associates and for Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Gouveia, Gordon)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 ORDER and Notice Regarding Approval of the Overall Receiver's Plan of Distribution and Fixing Deadlines for Filing Objections Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/16/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Twelfth Report Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/16/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 16, 2016 Filing 1075 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing held on 6/16/2016 and continued to 7/22/2016 at 08:30 AM. Motion to approve Receiver's twelfth report #1036 is granted without objection. Receiver's motion to set hearing on Overall Receiver's plan of distribution, fixing the time fo filing objections and approving the form notice #1068 is granted with date modifications. Approval hearing set for 9/1/16 at 2:00 p.m. Standley defendants' renewed motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 7/18/16. Mailed notice (kef, )
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/16/2016: Defendants Timothy Glenn Fisher's and Translucent Entertainment, LLC's motion to release funds from the Receivership Estate #1013 is denied. [For further details, see Order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 ORDER: Motion for leave to withdraw as counsel #1071 is granted. Jeffrey Finke is given leave to withdraw his appearance as counsel for Pennant Management, Inc. Notice motion date of 6/21/16 is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/14/2016. Mailed notice (ph, )
June 13, 2016 Filing 1072 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Wayne Finke for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #1071 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/21/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Finke, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2016 Filing 1071 MOTION by Attorney Jeffrey W. Finke to withdraw as attorney for Pennant Management, Inc.. No party information provided (Finke, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2016 Filing 1070 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Receiver's oral request to dismiss the case against Matthew Cohen and Leslie Cohen (original case no. 15-cv-10262) with prejudice is granted. Leslie Cohen and Matthew A. Cohen terminated.Mailed notice (kef, )
June 10, 2016 Filing 1069 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1068 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/16/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
June 10, 2016 Filing 1068 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Overall Receiver's Motion to Set Hearing on Overall Receiver's Plan of Distribution, Fixing the Time for Filing Objections and Approving The Form of Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
June 10, 2016 Filing 1067 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1066 (Guon, Allen)
June 10, 2016 Filing 1066 Overall Receiver's [Proposed] Plan of Distribution by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
June 9, 2016 Filing 1065 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 6/9/2016. Standley defendants' motion for partial summary judgment #1057 is denied without prejudice to refile. Mailed notice (kef, )
June 7, 2016 Filing 1064 CERTIFICATE of Service by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh regarding order, #1052 , other #1061 (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 7, 2016 Filing 1063 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1062 Receiver's Report (Guon, Allen)
June 7, 2016 Filing 1062 Michael Nanosky Receiver's Report by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1061 Notice of Proposed Auction Sale of the Point Cypress Property by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Gouveia, Gordon)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1060 RULE 56 56.1 Material Facts Statement by Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. regarding motion for partial summary judgment #1057 (Schriver, John)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1059 Standley Defendants NOTICE of Motion by John T. Schriver for presentment of motion for partial summary judgment #1057 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/9/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Schriver, John)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1058 MEMORANDUM by Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. in support of motion for partial summary judgment #1057 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit))(Schriver, John)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1057 MOTION by Defendants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc., Counter Claimants Steven Standley, Standley Plastics, Inc. for partial summary judgment (Schriver, John)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 ORDER Approving Payment to Consulting Expert Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/3/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 3, 2016 Filing 1055 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Overall Receiver's motion for authority to employ local counsel in Memphis, Tennessee to enforce subpoena #1053 is granted. No appearance is required on the 6/9/16 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
June 2, 2016 Filing 1054 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1053 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/9/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
June 2, 2016 Filing 1053 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Overall Receiver's Motion For Authority To Employ Local Counsel In Memphis, Tennessee To Enforce Subpoena) (Towbin, Steven)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 ORDER Approving Bidding Procedures and Protections and Fixing Dates for the Submission of Competitive Bids, the Auction, Objections to the Sale and a Hearing to Consider Entry of the Sale Order with Respect to Point Cypress Property Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/1/2016:Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(kef, )
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 ORDER: (0:04) Motion hearing held on 6/1/16. Receiver's motion for entry of an order approving (I) bidding procedures and bid protections; (2) the sale of the Point Cypress property free and clear of all interests; (III) the form and manner of notice with respect thereto; (IV) payment of advertising costs, Redmon lien claim, brokers commission, real estate taxes and customary closing costs; and (V) related relief #1043 is granted. Sale hearing set for 7/22/16 at 8:30 a.m. Motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for Pennant Management, Inc. #1039 is granted. Paul Fox, Felicia Manno, Paul Ferak, Jonathan Claydon and Kyle Flynn are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Pennant Management, Inc. The Clerk's Office is directed to place Pennant Management's contact information on the docket. Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/1/2016. Mailed notice (ph, )
June 1, 2016 Filing 1050 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pennant Management, Inc. by Julie Ann Govreau (Govreau, Julie)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER Granting Overall Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement with Matthew Cohen and Leslie Cohen Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/31/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 31, 2016 Filing 1048 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 5/31/2016. Receiver's motion to approve settlement with Matthew Cohen and Leslie Cohen #1038 is granted without objection. Mailed notice (kef, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 1047 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE for document sent to counsel, returned as Spam. The Clerk mailed to counsel letter advising counsel to contact their email administrator or check personal settings in their email account for spam filtering of uscourts.gov domain. Electronic notices will be turned to "NO" until the Clerk's office has been advised that this matter has been corrected. Letter mailed to Thomas A Sadaka with document #1046 , #1045 . (mr, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 1046 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1045 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/30/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Guon, Allen)
May 27, 2016 Filing 1045 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh Omnibus Claim Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 5A, #7 Exhibit 5B, #8 Exhibit 6)(Guon, Allen)
May 26, 2016 Filing 1044 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,, #1043 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/1/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
May 26, 2016 Filing 1043 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Entry of an Order Approving (I) Bidding Procedures and Bid Protections; (II) The Sale of the Point Cypress Property Free and Clear of All Interests; (III) the Form and Manner of Notice With Respect Thereto; (IV) Payment of Advertising Costs, Redmon Lien Claim, Broker's Commission, Real Estate Taxes and Customary Closing Costs; and (V) Related Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Gouveia, Gordon)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1042 Notice Of Overall Receivers Proposed Payment To Consulting Expert by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Towbin, Steven)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1041 NOTICE of Motion by Paul Thaddeus Fox for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #1039 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/1/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Fox, Paul)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1040 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion for settlement #1038 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/31/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Saldinger, Richard)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1039 MOTION by Attorney Paul T. Fox, Felicia V. Manno, Paul J. Ferak, Jonathan H. Claydon and Kyle Flynn to withdraw as attorney for Pennant Management, Inc.. New address information: Pennant Management, Inc. 801 Warrenville Rd, Suite 500, Lisle IL, 60532, 888-647-4282 (Fox, Paul)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1038 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for settlement with Matthew and Leslie Cohen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Saldinger, Richard)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1037 NOTICE of Motion by Allen Jay Guon for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1036 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/16/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Guon, Allen)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1036 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. CavanaughTO APPROVE OVERALL RECEIVER'S TWELFTH REPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guon, Allen)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1035 NOTICE by Patrick D. Cavanaugh re other #1034 OVERALL RECEIVER'S TWELFTH REPORT (Guon, Allen)
May 25, 2016 Filing 1034 OVERALL RECEIVER'S TWELFTH REPORT by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Guon, Allen)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 ORDER Authorizing the Employment of Metropolitan Solutions as Environmental Consultant and the Sage Group as Appraiser Related to the Sunday Horse II, LLC and Lancaster Energy Partners, LLC Loans Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/24/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 ORDER Approving Overall Receiver's Retention and Payment of Consulting Expert Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/24/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
May 24, 2016 Filing 1031 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 5/24/2016. Receiver's motion for authority to employ and compensate an expert #1023 , motion for authority to employ Metropolitan Solutions as environmental consultant and the Sage Group as appraiser #1028 and motion to reassign 16 C 5255 #1026 are granted. Reassignment order to follow shortly. Mailed notice (kef, )
May 20, 2016 Filing 1030 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Claim Asserted By Comnet Communications, LLC #506 by Patrick D. Cavanaugh (Guon, Allen)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1029 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #1028 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/24/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1028 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh for Authority to Employ Metropolitan Solutions as Environmental Consultant and The Sage Group as Appraiser Related to The Sunday Horse II, LLC and Lancaster Energy Partners, LLC Loans (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Group Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Gouveia, Gordon)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1027 NOTICE of Motion by Gordon Elliot Gouveia for presentment of motion to reassign case #1026 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/24/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Gouveia, Gordon)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1026 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to reassign case (Gouveia, Gordon)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1025 MOTION by Receiver Patrick D. Cavanaugh to reassign case (Gouveia, Gordon)
May 19, 2016 Filing 1024 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Bennett Towbin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1023 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/24/2016 at 08:30 AM. (Towbin, Steven)
May 19, 2016