In re Broiler Chicken Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Maplevale Farms, Inc., Big Y Foods, Inc., Steve Mizera, Pamela Tierney, Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc., Bodega Brew Pub, Inc., Gloria J. Lathen, Debra Piette, Sumner Country Restaurant and Creamery, LLC, Vern Peter Gardner, Hy-Vee, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.,, Conagra Brands, Inc., Natalie Wilbur, Jason Liebich, Lester Patterson, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, Nestle USA, Inc., Wayne Deshotel, Sherwood Food Distributors, LLC, W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc., Fareway Stores, Inc., Leslie Weidner, William E. Stack, WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, Restaurants of America, Inc., Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Cheryl Brenchley, Tracy Newman, Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, BJ's Wholesale Club Inc., Brookshire Grocery Company, Schnuck Markets, Inc., Andrew Evans, Darden Restaurants, Inc., Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Pinnacle Foods, Inc., Dorothy Monohan, Christopher Vallaro, WeLoveCaesar LLC, Save Mart Supermarkets, Sabrina Majernik, Don Chavas Mexican Restaurant, Inc., End-User Consumer Plaintiffs, Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Jennifer Wallace, United States of America, Daniel M. Percy, Alex Lee, Inc., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Action Meat Distributors, Inc., PJ Food Service, Inc., Ferraro Foods, Inc., Michael Perry, Matthew Hayward, Nestle Purina Petcare Company, LTP Management Group, Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, Quirch Foods, LLC, f/k/a Quirch Foods Co., Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Maximum Quality Foods, Inc., Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., James Flasch, Plaintiffs in 1:16-cv-08637, Amy Veaner, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Hooters Management Corporation, Services Group of America, Inc., Christopher Gilbert, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Ray Wieters, Albertsons Companies, Inc., Associated Grocers, Inc., Maximum Quality, Catherine Senkle, Barters International LLC, Sargent's, Associated Grocers of New England, Inc., Jonathan Glover, Sam's East, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, Steeple Down River Ltd, US Foods, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Walmart, Inc., Sullott Corporation, Margo Stack, Dorothy Monahan, Christopher Nelson, Woodman's Food Market, Inc., Alpine Special Treatment Center, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Christopher G Glover, Wakefern Food Corporation, Bashas' Inc., Sysco Corporation, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc., Abraham Drucker, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Cedar Farms Co., Inc., Linda Cheslow, Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Unified Grocers, Inc. and David Weidner
Defendant: Koch Foods, Inc, Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Amick Farms, LLC, Wayne Farms, LLC, Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Case Farms Processing, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Amick-OSI Processing, LLC, O.K. Farms, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, George's Farms, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, The Amick Company, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Koch Foods, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Fieldale Farms Corporation, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, O.K. Industries, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Simmons Foods, Inc., Case Foods, Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc. and Perdue Farms, Inc.
Petitioner: Amigos Meat Distributors, LP, The Golub Corporation, The Distribution Group, Inc. (d/b/a Van Eerden Foodservice Company), United Food Service, Inc., Amigos Meat Distributors West, LP, Shamrock Foods Company, Independent Purchasing Cooperative, Inc., Amigos Meat & Poultry, LLC, Gerber's Poultry, Inc., Porky Products, Inc. and Latina Boulevard Foods, LLC
Respondent: R.W. Zant Co.
Special Master: Maura R. Grossman
Case Number: 1:2016cv08637
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5080 MOTION by Plaintiff Sodexo, Inc. and Sodexo Operations, LLC for joinder (Phair, Ryan)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5079 MEMORANDUM by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in support of motion for settlement, #5078 Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Tyson, Pilgrim's Pride, and Mar-Jac Defendants and for Conditional Certification of the Proposed Settlement Classes (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel E. Gustafson)(Gustafson, Daniel)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5078 MOTION by Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for settlement Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Uncontested Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Tyson, Pilgrim's Pride, and Mar-Jac Defendants and for Conditional Certification of the Proposed Settlement Classes (Gustafson, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5077 SEALED RESPONSE by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to sealed document,, #5055 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and for Leave to File Sur-Sur Reply (Laytin, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5076 RESPONSE by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to sealed document,, #5055 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and for Leave to File Sur-Sur Reply (Laytin, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5075 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw #5074 is granted. Attorney Robert Paul Davis terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5074 MOTION by Defendants Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC to withdraw MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE OF ROBERT DAVIS (Foley, Danielle)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5073 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Biscuitville Fresh Southern and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Reichline, Cindy)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5072 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Golden Tree Restaurants, LLC and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Reichline, Cindy)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5071 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Patterson TMP Operating, LLC and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Reichline, Cindy)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5070 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Perkins LLC and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Reichline, Cindy)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5069 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Huddle House, Inc. and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Reichline, Cindy)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5068 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715 by Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Paul Ferruzzi))(Konieczny, Edward)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5067 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file under seal #5054 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5066 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Sodexo, Inc. and Sodexo Operations, LLC (Laytin, Daniel)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5065 Defendant Harrison Poultry, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715 by Harrison Poultry, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Stephanie J. Fiereck, Esq.))(Gorham, Patricia)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5064 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Telephone hearing as to Direct Purcahser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., and Harrison Poultry, Inc #5051 set for 10/1/2021 at 2:00 p.m. is reset for 1:00 p.m. Time change only. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5063 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cajun Operating Company d/b/a Church's Chicken, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Focus Brands LLC, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley, Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurants of America, Inc., Sonic Industries Services Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC, Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach by Aaron Asa Holman (Holman, Aaron)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5062 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re McDonald's Corporation (Laytin, Daniel)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5061 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to appear pro hac vice #5058 #5059 are granted. Attorneys Cindy Reichline and Keith Butler for Biscuitville Fresh Southern, Golden Tree Restaurants, LLC, Huddle House, Inc., Patterson TMP Operating, LLC and Perkins LLC added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5060 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Patterson TMP Operating, LLC, Golden Tree Restaurants, LLC, Biscuitville Fresh Southern, Huddle House, Inc., and Perkins LLC (Laytin, Daniel)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5059 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18691655. (Butler, Keith)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5058 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18691581. (Reichline, Cindy)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5057 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff End-User Consumer Plaintiffs regarding sealed document,, #5055 (Berman, Steve)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5056 Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Class Certification Sur-Reply Brief and Report, or in the Alternative for Leave to File Responsive Briefs and Reports, Exhibits B-F and Exhibits 1-2 to Exhibit G NOTICE of Motion by Steve W. Berman for presentment of (Berman, Steve)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5055 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs [SEALED] Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Class Certification Sur-Reply Brief and Report, or in the Alternative for Leave to File Responsive Briefs and Reports, Exhibits B-F, Exhibits 1 and 2 to Exhibit G (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B [Sealed], #2 Exhibit C [Sealed], #3 Exhibit D [Sealed], #4 Exhibit E [Sealed], #5 Exhibit F [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit G [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit G [Sealed])(Berman, Steve)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5054 MOTION by Plaintiffs Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to seal document (Attachments: #1 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Class Certification Sur-Reply Brief and Report, or in the Alternative for Leave to File Responsive Briefs and Reports, #2 Exhibit A [Public], #3 Exhibit B [Redacted], #4 Exhibit C [Redacted], #5 Exhibit D [Redacted], #6 Exhibit E [Redacted], #7 Exhibit F [Public], #8 Exhibit G [Public], #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit G [Redacted], #10 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Exhibit G [Redacted])(Berman, Steve)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5053 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to Direct Purcahser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., and Harrison Poultry, Inc #5051 is set for 10/1/2021 at 2:00 p.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5052 MEMORANDUM by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs in support of motion for settlement, #5051 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., and Harrison Poultry, Inc (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian D. Clark, #2 Declaration Eric Schachter)(Clark, Brian)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5051 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for settlement Direct Purcahser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., and Harrison Poultry, Inc (Clark, Brian)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5050 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to text entry,,,,,,, #4915 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Professor Robert Klonoff)(Zapala, Adam)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5049 RESPONSE by Plaintiff End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to text entry,,,,,,, #4915 End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Response Regarding Application of Sliding Scale to Attorneys' Fees (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett)(Berman, Steve)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5048 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to text entry,,,,,,, #4915 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian T. Fitzpatrick, #2 Exhibit s 1-3 to Declaration of Brian T. Fitzpatrick, #3 Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner, #4 Exhibit s 1-3 to Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner)(Bruckner, W.)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5047 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions for leave to file excess pages #5045 #5046 are granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5046 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for leave to file excess pages (Hart, Steven)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5045 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for leave to file excess pages (Hart, Steven)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5044 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Gordon Food Service, Inc. and Glazier Foods Company (Laytin, Daniel)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5043 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Costco Wholesale Corporation (Laytin, Daniel)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5042 Notice of Settlement with Defendant Harrison Poultry, Inc. by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Pearson, Clifford)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5041 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC by Robert J Wierenga (Wierenga, Robert)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5040 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC by Kylie Sue Wood (Wood, Kylie)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5039 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC by Kevin James Whelan (Whelan, Kevin)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5038 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC by Suzanne L Wahl (Wahl, Suzanne)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5037 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC by Lawrence Harris Heftman (Heftman, Lawrence)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5036 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC by Margaret A. Hickey (Hickey, Margaret)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5035 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Direct Action Plaintiff Bojangles' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of its Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Cheny #5030 is granted. The motion hearing noticed for 9/24/21 is stricken. Mailed notice (ber, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5034 NOTICE of Motion by Lori P Lustrin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5030 before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 9/24/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Lustrin, Lori)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5033 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/12/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements. Order Number: 41381. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5032 RESPONSE by BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC.in Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC. to compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Cheney #4932 [Public Redacted Version] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibits B-C [Filed Under Seal])(Lustrin, Lori)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5031 SEALED REPLY by BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC. to MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC. to compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Cheney #4932 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Lustrin, Lori)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5030 MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC.for leave to file under seal Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Cheney (Lustrin, Lori)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5029 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Poultry Products Company of New England, LLC, Poultry Products Company, LLC, Poultry Products of Connecticut, LLC, and Poultry Products of Maine, LLC (Laytin, Daniel)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5028 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #5027 is granted. Attorney Timothy Johnson Fazio for Sodexo, Inc. and Sodexo Operations, LLC added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5027 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18632552. (Fazio, Timothy)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5026 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff Sodexo, Inc. and Sodexo Operations, LLC's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #5025 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 4674 pending before Judge Shah be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5025 MOTION by Plaintiff Sodexo, Inc. and Sodexo Operations, LLC to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phair, Ryan)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5024 MOTION by Plaintiff Costco Wholesale Corporation for joinder in Direct Action Plaintiff Chick-fil-A Inc.'s Motion to Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders and Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion To Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders (Iovieno, Philip)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5023 NOTICE by Edward C. Konieczny of Change of Address (Konieczny, Edward)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5022 NOTICE by Wm. Parker Sanders of Change of Address (Sanders, Wm.)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5021 NOTICE by David C. Newman of Change of Address (Newman, David)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5020 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. to Certain DAP's Motions to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadlines (Germaine, David)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5019 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs Patterson TMP Operating, LLC, Golden Tree Restaurants, LLC, Biscuitville Fresh Southern, Huddle House, Inc. and Perkins LLC's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #5018 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 4658 pending before Judge Shah be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5018 MOTION by Plaintiffs Patterson TMP Operating, LLC, Golden Tree Restaurants, LLC, Biscuitville Fresh Southern, Huddle House, Inc., Perkins LLC to reassign case based on relatedness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Reichline, Cindy)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5017 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by Timothy Jackson (Jackson, Timothy)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5016 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 25, 2021 before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Order Number: 41486. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany; nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov; bistanyofficialtranscripts@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2021. (Bistany, Nancy)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5015 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff Costco Wholesale Corporation's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #5013 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 4611 pending before Judge Norgle be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5014 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline #4994 and Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline #4997 are granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5013 MOTION by Plaintiff Costco Warehouse to reassign case Based on Relatedness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Campbell, Terence)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5012 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5011 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5010 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5009 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5008 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5007 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5006 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5005 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline #4996 is granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5004 RESPONSE by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC to MOTION by Plaintiffs Amory Investments LLC, Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods #4996 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.,, EMA Foods Co., LLC, L. Hart, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company, Timber Lake Foods, Inc. to stay #4994 , MOTION by Movants Amigos Meat & Poultry, LLC, Amigos Meat Distributors East, LP, Amigos Meat Distributors West, LP, Amigos Meat Distributors, LP to stay AUGUST 31, 2021 EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE #4997 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO CERTAIN DAPs' MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF AUGUST 31, 2021 EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE (Baldridge, James)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5003 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5002 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5001 STIPULATED Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farm, LLC. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5000 NOTICE by Edward C. Konieczny of Change of Address (Konieczny, Edward)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4999 NOTICE by Wm. Parker Sanders of Change of Address (Sanders, Wm.)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4998 NOTICE by David C. Newman of Change of Address (Newman, David)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4997 MOTION by Movants Amigos Meat & Poultry, LLC, Amigos Meat Distributors East, LP, Amigos Meat Distributors West, LP, Amigos Meat Distributors, LP to stay AUGUST 31, 2021 EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE (Buzbee, Anthony)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4996 MOTION by Plaintiffs Amory Investments LLC, Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods, Inc., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, WalMart, Inc. to stay expert report deadline (Gant, Scott)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4995 MOTION by Plaintiffs EMA Foods Co., LLC, L. Hart, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company, Timber Lake Foods, Inc. to join motion for partial reconsideration (ECF 4652) (Ripp, Paul)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4994 MOTION by Plaintiffs Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.,, EMA Foods Co., LLC, L. Hart, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company, Timber Lake Foods, Inc. to stay (Ripp, Paul)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4993 RESPONSE by Cheney Bros., Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC. to compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Cheney #4932 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoenas & Service Emails, #2 Exhibit B - Cheney Responses to Subpoenas, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Deposition (July 14, 2021), #4 Exhibit D - July 19, 2021 E-Mail Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E - Exemplar RFA Responses & Objections, #6 Exhibit F - Transcript of May 24, 2021 Proceedings, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Deposition (Oct 4, 2019))(Gore, Kristin)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4992 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff Shamrock as to Defendant Amick. (Wagner, Scott)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4991 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff WZ as to Defendant Amick. (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4990 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff White Castle as to Defendant Amick. (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4989 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff Barbeque Integrated as to Defendant Amick. (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4988 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff Johnny Rockets as to Defendant Amick. (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4987 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff Golden Corral as to Defendant Amick. (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4986 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff FIC as to Defendant Amick. (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4985 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff Captain D's as to Defendant Amick. (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4984 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiff Boston Market as to Defendant Amick (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4983 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Direct Action Plaintiffs Bojangles as to Defendant Amick. (Lustrin, Lori)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4982 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4981 is granted. Attorney Marc A. Goldich for Plaintiff Cedar Farms terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4981 MOTION by Attorney Marc A. Goldich to withdraw as attorney for Cedar Farms Co., Inc.. No party information provided (Axler, Noah)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4980 MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., Domino's Pizza Distribution LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Golden Corral Corporation, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC, Movants Shamrock Foods Company, United Food Service, Inc. for joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'S Motion To Reconsider The September 22, 2020 Order And Objection To Magistrate Judge's May 7 And May 13, 2021 Orders And Supplemental Brief In Support Of Its Motion To Partially Reconsider The September 22, 2020 Order And Objection To Magistrate Judge's May 7 And May 13, 2021 Orders (Lustrin, Lori)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4979 REPLY by Defendants Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch, Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc. to motion to stay, #4877 Rabobank's Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Stay Discovery Pending Resolution Of Its Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaints Of Certain DAPS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doyle, David)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4978 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch, Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc. SEALED Rabobank's Reply In Support Of Its Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Certain DAP's Second Amended Complaints (Doyle, David)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4977 REPLY by Defendants Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch, Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc. to motion to dismiss, #4874 REDACTED Rabobank's Reply In Support Of Its Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Certain DAP's Second Amended Complaints (Doyle, David)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4975 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aramark Food and Support Services Group, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., Feeser's Inc., Glazier Foods Company, Jetro Holdings. LLC, Maximum Quality Foods, Inc., McDonald's Coporation, PJ Food Service, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Poultry Products Company of New England, LLC, Poultry Products Company, LLC, Poultry Products of Connecticut, LLC, Poultry Products of Maine, LLC, Quality Supply Chain Co-Op, Inc., Sherwood Food Distributors, LLC, Thurston Foods, Inc., Wood-Fruitticher Grocery Company, Inc. for joinder in Chick-fil-A Inc.'s Motion to Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders, filed on May 14, 2021 (ECF No. 4651) and Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion To Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders (Iovieno, Philip)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4974 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff Gordon Food Service, Inc. and Glazier Foods Company's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4973 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 4557 pending before Judge Dow be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4976 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Telephone motion hearing held on 8/25/21. The parties are directed to the transcript for a complete record of the hearing. The Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Hearing #4964 is granted. The appearance of Attorney Stacy Pepper is withdrawn as counsel for the Sanderson Farms, Inc. Defendants. Direct Action Plaintiff Chick-fil-A's Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Deadline #4934 is granted for the reasons stated on the record. The Court temporarily defers the 8/31/21 expert disclosure deadline in Scheduling Order No. 16 #4748 for Direct Action Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. and for those Direct Action Plaintiffs who joined in the Motion as of today [4935, 4937, 4939, 4940, 4941, 4947, 4952, 4957, 4960, 4971] pending a decision on Chick-fil-A's Motion to Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders (ECF No. #4651 / #4652 ). The expert disclosure and deposition schedule set in Scheduling Order No. 16 #4748 remains in place for all other parties. Mailed notice (ber, ) Modified on 8/26/2021 (ber, ).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4973 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gordon Food Service, Inc., Glazier Foods Company to reassign case Based on Relatedness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Campbell, Terence)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4972 NOTICE by Kyle Pozan of Change of Address (Pozan, Kyle) Modified on 8/25/2021 (bg, ).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4971 MOTION by Plaintiffs Caesars Enterprise Services, LLC, Carl Buddig & Co., Inc. for joinder PLAINTIFFS CARL BUDDIG & CO., INC. AND CAESARS ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC JOINDER IN CHICK-FIL-A, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY AUGUST 31, 2021 EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE IN LIGHT OF SIGNIFICANCE OF PENDING DECISION ON BIFURCATION AND PROPOSED TRIAL PLANS AND POTENTIAL PREJUDICE (Mandell, Floyd)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4969 TRIAL Brief CORRECTED TRIAL PROPOSAL by Harrison Poultry, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Redline Comparision to Dkt. 4855)(Baldridge, James)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4968 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: motion to withdraw as attorney #4964 . Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4967 REPLY by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. In Support of Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice (Phair, Ryan)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4966 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff Poultry Products' motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4954 . This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 4358 pending before Judge Pacold be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Plaintiff McDonald's Corporation's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4956 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 4354 pending before Judge Alonso be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Plaintiff Domino's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4958 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 4401 pending before Judge Valderrama be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4965 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Hearing #4964 is set for hearing on 8/25/21 at 12:30 p.m. CST by telephone conference. To join the telephone conference, dial (877) 336-1829, access code: 1022195#. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4964 MOTION by Attorney Stacy Pepper to withdraw as attorney for Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division). No party information provided (Laytin, Daniel)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4963 RESPONSE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffsin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. to stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice #4934 (Pouya, Bobby)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4962 RESPONSE by Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. to stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice #4934 (Zarlenga, Carmine)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4961 Notice of Settlement With Mar-Jac Defendants by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Pearson, Clifford)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4960 JOINDER by Conagra Brands, Inc., Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Pinnacle Foods, Inc. Chick-fil-A Inc.'s Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significiance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice (Eddy, David)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4959 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Peter Bleiman for presentment of motion to reassign case #4958 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/31/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Bleiman, Andrew)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4958 MOTION by Plaintiffs Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Distribution LLC to reassign case based on Relatedness Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Bleiman, Andrew)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4957 MOTION by Plaintiffs Independent Purchasing Cooperative, Inc., Quirch Foods, LLC, f/k/a Quirch Foods Co., Supply Management Services, Inc. for joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice (Szot, Andrew)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4956 MOTION by Plaintiff McDonald's Coporation to reassign case Based on Relatedness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Campbell, Terence)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4955 SUPPLEMENT to Supplemental Information Regarding End-User Class Notice (Scarlett, Shana)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4954 MOTION by Plaintiffs Poultry Products Company of New England, LLC, Poultry Products Company, LLC, Poultry Products of Connecticut, LLC, Poultry Products of Maine, LLC to reassign case Based on Relatedness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Campbell, Terence)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4953 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. s 1715 by Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Konieczny, Edward)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4952 MOTION by Plaintiffs BJ's Wholesale Club Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., Feeser's Inc., Jetro Holdings. LLC, Maximum Quality Foods, Inc., PJ Food Service, Inc., Sherwood Food Distributors, LLC, Thurston Foods, Inc. for joinder In Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline In Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice (Iovieno, Philip)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4951 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715 by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mahan, Carrie)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4950 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: By agreement of the parties, the Court enters the following briefing schedule on Direct Action Plaintiff Bojangles' Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Cheney [Dkt. 4932, 4933]: Cheney will file its response in opposition by 8/27/21 and Bojangles will file their reply by 9/10/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4949 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs are to file their brief, as described in the minute order docket entry number #4915 , by 9/15/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4948 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Final Approval Hearing on the settlement agreements between End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Defendants Pilgrim's and Mar-Jac is set for 12/20/2021 at 9:00 a.m. by telephone conference. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4947 Joinder in Chick-fil-A Inc.'s Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice by Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cajun Operating Company d/b/a Church's Chicken, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Focus Brands LLC, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley, Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurants of America, Inc., Sonic Industries Services Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC, Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach (Gore, Kristin)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4946 Disclosure and Local Rule 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates STATEMENT by Giant Eagle, Inc. (Lifvendahl, Eric)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4945 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Telephonic motion hearing set for 8/25/21 at 12:30 p.m. on Plaintiff Chick-fil-A's Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Deadline #4934 . The Court sets the following briefing schedule on that motion: any responses are due by 8/19/21, and replies are due by 8/23/21 by 12:00PM CST. The Court requests that any responses and replies be limited to 3 pages exclusive of the signature page(s). The Court also requests that the Joint Status Report due on 8/24/21 be filed by 12:00PM CST. Prior to the telephone hearing, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/#bp=8773361829&mac=1022195 to take you to Judge Gilbert's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877) 336-1829, the access code is: 1022195#. When you are connected to the conference system, please keep your phone on mute until your case is called. There may be other people in other cases speaking in the conference when you join the conference and before your case is called. When your case is called, please unmute your phone and remember to say your name each and every time you speak. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4944 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Amory Investments LLC, Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods, Inc. Rabobank DAPs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Rabobank's Motion to Dismiss (Gant, Scott)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4943 MEMORANDUM by Amory Investments LLC, Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods, Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss, #4874 (Gant, Scott)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4942 RESPONSE by Amory Investments LLC, Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch, Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc. to stay Rabobank's Motion To Stay Discovery While Its Motion #4877 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Gant, Scott)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4941 MOTION by Plaintiff Services Group of America, Inc. for joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice [Dkt No. 4934] (Casas, Gregory)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4940 JOINDER by BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Golden Corral Corporation, Shamrock Foods Company, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., United Food Service, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice [Dkt. No. 4934] (Lustrin, Lori)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4939 MOTION by Plaintiffs ALDI Inc, Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. for joinder in Chick-fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice (Phair, Ryan)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4938 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 8/12/2021. For the reasons stated on the record, and without objection, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreements between End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Defendants Pilgrim's and Mar-Jac and to Direct Notice to the Settlement Class #4920 is granted. Counsel are to contact Judge Durkin's courtroom deputy to schedule a fairness hearing, and the appropriate dates are to be inserted into the proposed order granting preliminary approval. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4937 MOTION by Plaintiff Pollo Operations, Inc. for joinder in Chick-Fil-A's Motion to Stay 8/31/21 Expert Report Deadline (Blechman, William)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4936 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The parties should agree to a briefing schedule on Direct Action Plaintiff Bojangles' Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Cheney [Dkt. #4932 , #4933 ] and provide that schedule to the Court's courtroom deputy via email. If the parties cannot agree on a schedule, then the Court will set a schedule. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4935 MOTION by Plaintiff McLane Company, Inc. for joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice (Youngman, Judith)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4934 MOTION by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. to stay August 31, 2021 Expert Report Deadline in Light of Significance of Pending Decision on Bifurcation and Proposed Trial Plans and Potential Prejudice (Phair, Ryan)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4933 MEMORANDUM by BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC. in support of motion to compel #4932 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lustrin, Lori)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4932 MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC. to compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Cheney (Lustrin, Lori)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4931 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Depositions of Sysco and Ahold and for an Award of Certain Costs and Fees Under Seal #4923 is granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4930 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Plaintiff ALDI, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Individualized Discovery for ALDI, Inc. from Defendant Tyson Under Seal #4911 is granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4929 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4926 is granted. Attorney Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4928 STIPULATION CONCERNING WAIVER OF SERVICE re PANDA RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. (Laytin, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4927 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreements Between End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Defendants Pilgrim's and Mar-Jac and to Direct Notice to the Settlement Class #4920 is set for 8/12/2021 at 9:30 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4926 MOTION by Attorney Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso to withdraw as attorney for WZ Franchise Corporation. No party information provided (Alton de Eraso, Suzanne)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4925 REPLY by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC to Sealed motion,,,,,, #4823 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Depositions of Sysco & Ahold and for an Award of Certain Costs and Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Tank, Jordan)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4924 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Depositions of Sysco & Ahold and for an Award of Certain Costs and Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Tank, Jordan)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4923 MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC for leave to file to file reply brief in support of motion to compel additional depositions of Sysco and Ahold and for an award of certain costs and fees underseal (Tank, Jordan)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4922 Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreements Between End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Defendants Pilgrim's and Mar-Jac and to Direct Notice to the Settlement Class NOTICE of Motion by Steve W. Berman for presentment of (Berman, Steve)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4921 MEMORANDUM by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs in support of motion for settlement, #4920 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreements Between End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Defendants Pilgrim's and Mar-Jac and to Direct Notice to the Settlement Class (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #2 Declaration of Eric Schachter)(Berman, Steve)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4920 MOTION by Plaintiff End-User Consumer Plaintiffs for settlement End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreements Between End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Defendants Pilgrim's and Mar-Jac and to Direct Notice to the Settlement Class (Berman, Steve)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4919 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4918 is granted. Attorney Michelle Lukic terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4918 MOTION by Attorney Michelle Lukic to withdraw as attorney for Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Fargo Stopping Center LLC. No party information provided (Perkovic, Michelle)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4917 MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to file instanter Notice of Supplemental Facts in Support of Motion to Compel Pilgrim's Depositions (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Supplemental Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Pilgrim's Depositions, #2 Exhibit A)(Phair, Ryan)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4916 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: By agreement of the parties, the date for the parties to file a joint discovery status report #4749 is extended from 8/10/21 to 8/24/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4915 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Counsel for the DPP class has filed a motion for an interim fee award #4550 . At least twice, the Seventh Circuit has suggested that district courts apply a sliding scale in awarding class counsel fees. See In re Synthroid Mktg. Litig., 325 F.3d 974, 978 (7th Cir. 2003); Silverman v. Motorola Sols., Inc., 739 F.3d 956, 959 (7th Cir. 2013) (citing empirical studies, including Theodore Eisenberg & Geoffrey P. Miller, Attorney Fees in Class Action Settlements: An Empirical Study, 1 J. Empirical Legal Studies 27 (2004)). Several courts in this district have applied the scale suggested in Synthroid. See Gehrich v. Chase Bank USA, N.A., 316 F.R.D. 215, 236 (N.D. Ill. 2016) (citing cases); In re Cap. One Tel. Consumer Prot. Act Litig., 80 F. Supp. 3d 781, 805 (N.D. Ill. 2015). The Court's current intent is to apply such a scale to the fee award in this case. The DPPs should file a brief addressing: (1) whether application of a sliding scale is appropriate in this case; and (2) if the Court applies a sliding scale, what that sliding scale should be. The DPP's brief on these issues should directly engage the authorities cited above, and provide any other more recent authorities on this issue (preferably in antitrust cases). The Court is far more likely to be persuaded by authority from within this district and circuit, so counsel should not focus on cases from outside the circuit unless those authorities directly address and undermine the authority the Court has cited. The DPPs should contact the Courtroom Deputy to set a deadline for their brief. Counsel for the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Class and the End User Consumer Plaintiffs Class are also invited to submit briefs subject to the deadline that is set. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4914 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages #4908 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4913 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ALDI Inc Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Individualized Discovery for ALDI, Inc. From Defendant Tyson (Phair, Ryan)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4912 REPLY by Plaintiff ALDI Inc in Support of Motion to Compel Individualized Discovery for ALDI, Inc. From Defendant Tyson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phair, Ryan)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4911 MOTION by Plaintiff ALDI Inc to seal ALDI's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Individualized Discovery for ALDI, Inc. from Defendant Tyson (Phair, Ryan)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4910 REPLY by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. in Support of Ahold Delhaize's Motion to Compel Tyson Deposition (Phair, Ryan)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4909 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC (Gore, Kristin)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4908 MOTION by Plaintiff End-User Consumer Plaintiffs for leave to file excess pages (Scarlett, Shana)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4907 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4905 is granted. Attorney Scott Arthur Eggers for Wayne Farms, LLC added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4906 NOTICE by United States of America of Case Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Superseding Indictment: Koch), #2 Exhibit (Indictment: McGuire, Stiller, Tucker, and Gay))(Torzilli, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4905 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18511756. (Eggers, Scott)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4904 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Giant Eagle, Inc. by Rachel Anne Beckman (Beckman, Rachel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4903 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4902 is granted. Attorney Rachel Anne Beckman for Giant Eagle, Inc. added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4902 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18504994. (Beckman, Rachel)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4901 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Depositions of Sysco and Ahold and for an Award of Certain Costs and Fees and Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal #4896 is granted. Mailed notice. (pk, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4900 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Sysco Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Depositions Under Seal #4894 is granted. Mailed notice. (pk, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4899 RESPONSE by Sysco Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms #4822 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Gant, Scott)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4898 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Depositions of Sysco and Ahold and For an Award of Certain Costs and Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4)(Phair, Ryan)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4897 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sysco Corporation Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Gant, Scott)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4896 MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to seal Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Depositions of Sysco and Ahold and For an Award of Certain Costs and Fees and its accompanying exhibits (Phair, Ryan)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4895 RESPONSE by Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms #4822 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Phair, Ryan)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4894 MOTION by Plaintiff Sysco Corporation to seal Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Depositions (Gant, Scott)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4893 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff McLane Company, Inc. by Michael Roger Krantz (Krantz, Michael)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4892 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4889 is granted. Attorney Peter Young-hyun Cheun terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4891 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. Exhibit A (Phair, Ryan)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4890 REPLY by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. to motion for miscellaneous relief #4651 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phair, Ryan)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4889 MOTION by Attorney Peter Cheun to withdraw as attorney for Peco Foods, Inc.. No party information provided (Cheun, Peter)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4888 SEALED REPLY by Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. to memorandum #4759 (Germaine, David)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4887 REPLY by Plaintiffs Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. in Support of Supplemental Memorandum Responding to Court's Order of May 27, 2021 [Dkt. 4759] (Public REDACTED Version) (Germaine, David)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4886 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Amory Investments LLC, Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods, Inc. to Statements in Defendants' Filing Concerning Bifurcation (ECF 4833 & 4834) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gant, Scott)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4885 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service for Wood Fruitticher Grocery Company, Inc. (Laytin, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4884 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service for Quality Supply Chain Co-op, Inc. (Laytin, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4883 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Aramark Food and Support Services Group, Inc. (Laytin, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4882 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4861 is granted. Attorneys Cecile L. Farmer, Jonathan S. Goldsmith, Lorell Guerrero, Adam C. Hemlock, Eric A. Rivas, Robert A Dahnke and Jessica L. Falk terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4881 ORDER: Upon agreement of the parties, the Court hereby enters the following order setting the briefing schedule for Defendant Rabobank's Motion to Stay Discovery While Its Motion to Dismiss Certain DAPs' Second Amended Complaints is Pending (ECF No. #4877 ): 1. Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs shall file any response brief in opposition to Rabobank's motion to stay discovery by August 18, 2021. 2. The Rabobank Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their motion to stay discovery within 14 days after any opposition brief is filed by the Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 7/22/2021. Mailed notice(ber, )
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4880 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff Quality Supply Chain Co-op, Inc.'s motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4842 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 3668 pending before Judge Feinerman be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Plaintiff Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.'s motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4843 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 3667 pending before Judge Lefkow be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Plaintiff Aramark Food and Support Services Group, Inc.'s motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4844 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 3663 pending before Judge Alonso be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Plaintiff Wood-Fruitticher Grocery Company, Inc.'s motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4845 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 3666 pending before Judge Kennelly be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4879 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Upon agreement of the parties, the Court hereby enters the following order setting the briefing schedule for Defendant Rabobank's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Certain DAPs' Second Amended Complaints #4874 : Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs shall file any response brief in opposition to Rabobank's motion to dismiss by 8/18/2021. The Rabobank Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss within 14 days after any opposition brief is filed by the Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4878 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Tyson Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Direct-Action Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize's Motion to Compel Tyson Deposition Under Seal #4862 is granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4877 MOTION by Defendants Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch, Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc. to stay Rabobank's Motion To Stay Discovery While Its Motion To Dismiss Certain DAPS' Second Amended Complaints is Pending (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doyle, David)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4876 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch, Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc. SEALED Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Rabobank's Rule 12( b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Certain DAPS' Second Amended Complaints (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Doyle, David)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4875 MEMORANDUM by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch, Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss, #4874 REDACTED Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Rabobank's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Certain DAP's Second Amended Complaints (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15)(Doyle, David)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4874 MOTION by Defendants Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Rabobank USA Financial Corporation to dismiss Rabobank's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Certain DAPS' Second Amended Complaints (Doyle, David)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4873 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch (Doyle, David)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4872 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch by Matthew Thomas Connelly Corrected Additional Appearance (Connelly, Matthew)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4871 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch by Jill Christine Anderson Corrected Additional Appearance (Anderson, Jill)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4870 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch by David James Doyle Corrected Appearance (Doyle, David)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4869 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc., Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., N.Y. Branch by Andrew C. Nordahl (Nordahl, Andrew)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4868 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rabobank by Matthew Thomas Connelly (Connelly, Matthew)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4867 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rabobank by Jill Christine Anderson (Anderson, Jill)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4866 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rabobank by David James Doyle (Doyle, David)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4865 RESPONSE by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff ALDI Inc to compel Individualized Discovery #4795 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Adcox, Rachel)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4864 RESPONSE by Defendants Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. Opposition to Direct-Action Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize's Motion to Compel Tyson Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tank, Jordan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4863 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. Opposition to Direct-Action Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize's Motion to Compel Tyson Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tank, Jordan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4862 MOTION by Defendants Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. for leave to file opposition to direct-action plaintiff ahold Delhaize's motion to compel Tyson deposition under seal (Tank, Jordan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4861 MOTION by Attorney Jonathan S. Goldsmith, Adam C. Hemlock, Cecile L. Farmer, Eric A. Rivas, Jessica L. Falk, Lorell Guerrero, and Robert A. Dahnke to withdraw as attorney for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. No party information provided (Mahan, Carrie)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4860 NOTICE of Motion by Terence H. Campbell for presentment of motion to reassign case #4843 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Campbell, Terence)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4859 NOTICE of Motion by Terence H. Campbell for presentment of motion to reassign case #4845 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Campbell, Terence)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4858 NOTICE of Motion by Terence H. Campbell for presentment of motion to reassign case #4842 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Campbell, Terence)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4857 NOTICE of Motion by Terence H. Campbell for presentment of motion to reassign case #4844 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Campbell, Terence)
July 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4856 NOTICE by The NPD Group, Inc of Designations of confidentiality under the Agreed Protective Order (Slobig, Robert)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4855 Proposed Trial Plan by Harrison Poultry, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC (Baldridge, James)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4854 Proposed Trial Plan by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Hart, Steven)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4853 Proposed Trial Plan by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs (Berman, Steve)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4852 NOTICE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs of Filing of Trial Plan (Zapala, Adam)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4851 STATEMENT by Amick Farms, LLC, Fieldale Farms Corporation, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Peco Foods, Inc. in Support of Certain Defendants' Trial Proposal (ECF No. 4850) (Fitzgerald, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4850 Defendants' Trial Proposal [Public, Redacted] by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laytin, Daniel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4849 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) Defendants' Trial Proposal (Laytin, Daniel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4848 Proposed Trial Plan by Direct-Action Plaintiffs (Blechman, William)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4847 NOTICE by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Defendant Pilgrim's Pride Corporation of Settlement and Stipulation for Suspension of Proceedings (Scarlett, Shana)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4846 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Quality Supply Chain Co-Op, Inc. to reassign case as Related #4841 , MOTION by Plaintiff Aramark Food and Support Services Group, Inc. to reassign case as Related #4839 , MOTION by Plaintiff Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. to reassign case as Related #4840 . (rc, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4845 MOTION by Plaintiff Wood-Fruitticher Grocery Company, Inc. to reassign case as Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Campbell, Terence)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4844 MOTION by Plaintiff Aramark Food and Support Services Group, Inc. to reassign case as Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Campbell, Terence)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4843 MOTION by Plaintiff Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. to reassign case as Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Campbell, Terence)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4842 MOTION by Plaintiff Quality Supply Chain Co-Op, Inc. to reassign case as Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Campbell, Terence)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4841 Entered in Error. (Campbell, Terence) Modified on 7/16/2021 (rc, ).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4840 Entered in Error. (Campbell, Terence) Modified on 7/16/2021 (rc, ).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4839 Entered in Error. (Campbell, Terence) Modified on 7/16/2021 (rc, ).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4838 RESPONSE by Defendants Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. to Response,,,, #4830 (Tank, Jordan)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4837 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 06/29/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Final Approval of Settlements. Order Number: 41092. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4836 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' Motion To Compel Additional Depositions Of Sysco And Ahold And For An Award Of Certain Costs And Fees #4822 : Sysco and Ahold shall file any opposition by 7/26/21, and the moving Defendants shall file any reply by 8/5/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
July 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4835 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for leave to file additional pages #4828 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4834 RESPONSE by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc.for Partial Reconsideration and Objection #4651 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DIRECT-ACTION PLAINTIFF CHICK-FIL-A, INC.'S MOTION #4651 AND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF #4754 TO PARTIALLY RECONSIDER THE SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 ORDER AND OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MAY 7 AND MAY 13, 2021 ORDERS [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Laytin, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4833 SEALED RESPONSE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DIRECT-ACTION PLAINTIFF CHICK-FIL-A, INC.'S MOTION AND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO PARTIALLY RECONSIDER THE SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 ORDER AND OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MAY 7 AND MAY 13, 2021 ORDERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Laytin, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4832 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to order,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,, order on motion for relief, #4722 Class Plaintiffs' Submission Pursuant to the Court's May 27, 2021 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hart, Steven)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4831 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Additional Depositions of Sysco and Ahold and for an Award of Certain Costs and Fees Under Seal #4821 is granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4830 RESPONSE by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC to memorandum #4759 Defendants' Response to Kroger & Publix Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Response to May 27, 2021 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Zarlenga, Carmine)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4829 NOTICE by Fieldale Farms Corporation re MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms #4822 Notice of Partial Withdrawal (williams, valarie)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4828 MOTION by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) for leave to file Additional Pages (Laytin, Daniel)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4827 NOTICE by George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc. re MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms #4822 (NOTICE of partial withdrawal) (Greene, William)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4826 AMENDED complaint by Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC against Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDLINE WAB Amended Complaint)(Esau, David)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4825 Notice of Partial Withdrawal from Defendants' Motion to Compel Additional Depositions of Sysco and Ahold and for an Award of Certain Costs and Fees (ECF No. 4822) by Peco Foods, Inc. (Flath, Lara)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4824 MEMORANDUM Brief in Support of Motion To Compel Additional Depositions Of Sysco And Ahold And For An Award Of Certain Costs And Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Taylor, Jarod)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4823 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms Corporation, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC Brief in Support of Motion To Compel Additional Depositions Of Sysco And Ahold And For An Award Of Certain Costs And Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Taylor, Jarod)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4822 MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms Corporation, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC to compel Defendants' Motion To Compel Additional Depositions Of Sysco And Ahold And For An Award Of Certain Costs And Fees (Taylor, Jarod)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4821 MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms Corporation, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC for leave to file (Taylor, Jarod)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4820 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4819 is granted. Attorney Zachary R. Glubiak terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4819 MOTION by Attorney Zachary R. Glubiak to withdraw as attorney for Vern Peter Gardner, Tracy Newman, Alison Pauk, Marilyn Stangeland, David Weidner, Leslie Weidner. No party information provided (Glubiak, Zachary)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4818 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff McLane Company, Inc. by Nicole Jones (Jones, Nicole)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4817 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiff Aldi, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Individualized Discovery From Defendants Tyson, Koch, Simmons, and Foster Farms #4795 : Defendants shall file their opposition by 7/20/21 and ALDI shall file its reply by 8/3/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4816 AMENDED complaint by Thurston Foods, Inc. against Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC (Campbell, Terence)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4815 NOTICE by Daniel M. Percy of Attorney Brandon M. Bohlman withdrawal; J. Barton Goplerud to remain as counsel for Plaintiff Daniel M. Percy (Bohlman, Brandon)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4814 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/24/2021 before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Order Number: 40827. Court Reporter Contact Information: Amy Spee, amyofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4813 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/04/2021 before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Order Number: 40673. Court Reporter Contact Information: Amy Spee, amyofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4812 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, the Court enters the following briefing schedule on Direct-Action Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize's Motion to Compel Tyson Deposition #4777 : Tyson shall file its opposition by 7/20/21 and Ahold Delhaize shall file its reply by 8/3/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4811 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4792 is granted. Attorney Becky Leigh Caruso for Services Group of America, Inc. added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4810 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. Second Amended Complaint (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4809 Second AMENDED complaint by US Foods, Inc. against Rabobank (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4808 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sysco Corporation Second Amended Complaint (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4807 Second AMENDED complaint by Sysco Corporation against Rabobank (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4806 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Target Corporation Second Amended Complaint (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4805 Second AMENDED complaint by Target Corporation against Rabobank (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4804 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc. Second Amended Complaint (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4803 Second AMENDED complaint by John Soules Foods, Inc., John Soules Acquisitions LLC against Rabobank (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4802 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C. Second Amended Complaint (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4801 Second AMENDED complaint by Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., Campbell Soup Company against Rabobank (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4800 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Amory Investments LLC Amended Complaint (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4799 AMENDED complaint by Amory Investments LLC against Rabobank (Gant, Scott)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4798 SUPPLEMENT to memorandum in support of motion #4551 , motion for attorney fees #4550 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplement to Their Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Class Representative Incentive Awards (Hart, Steven)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4797 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ALDI Inc Memorandum in support of motion to compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Phair, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4796 MEMORANDUM by ALDI Inc in support of motion to compel #4795 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Phair, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4795 MOTION by Plaintiff ALDI Inc to compel Individualized Discovery (Phair, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4794 MOTION by Plaintiff ALDI Inc to seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Individualized Discovery (Phair, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4793 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Certain Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Mountaire Employee Bruce Mooney as Document Custodian and its Accompanying Exhibit Under Seal #4785 is granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4792 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18408645. (Caruso, Becky)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4791 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint Allegations Regarding Rabobank #4783 is granted. Defendant Rabobank is to answer or otherwise plead by 7/21/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4790 NOTICE by Stephen J. Teti of Change of Address (Teti, Stephen)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4789 ORDER Granting Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Pilgrim's Pride Corp., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/29/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4788 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Fairness hearing on final approval of the settlements with Defendants Pilgrim's Pride Corp., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. held on 6/29/2021 by telephone. No one appeared to object to the settlement. For the reasons stated on the record, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Pilgrim's Pride Corp., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. #4745 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4787 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Mountaire Employee as Document Custodian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phair, Ryan)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4786 REPLY by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. In Support of Motion to Compel Mountaire Employee as Document Custodian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phair, Ryan)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4785 MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to seal Certain DAPs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel (Phair, Ryan)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4784 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Amory Investments LLC, Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods, Inc. Certain DAPs' Motion to Amend Complaint Allegations Regarding Rabobank (Gant, Scott)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4783 MOTION by Plaintiffs Amory Investments LLC, John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods, Inc., Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C. to amend/correct Certain DAPs' Motion to Amend Complaint Allegations Regarding Rabobank (Gant, Scott)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4782 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Exhibit 1 to Reply in Support of Motion to Set Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Contention Interrogatories Under Seal #4774 is granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4781 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Direct-Action Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize igranted leave to file its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Compel #4778 under seal nunc pro tunc to 6/25/21. In the future, a motion seeking leave to file under seal should be filed. Given the intervening Fourth of July holiday, ongoing deposition discovery, and the 7/16/21 filing date for the parties' trial plans, the Court requests that the parties agree to a briefing schedule for Direct-Action Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize's Motion to Compel Tyson Deposition #4777 and send it to the Court's courtroom deputy, Brenda_Rinozzi@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4780 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/17/21 before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Order Number: 41012. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4779 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. Memorandum in support of Motion to Compel Tyson Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit J)(Phair, Ryan)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4778 MEMORANDUM by Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. in support of motion to compel #4777 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan P. Phair, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Phair, Ryan)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4777 MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to compel Tyson Deposition (Phair, Ryan)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4776 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Direct-Action Plaintiffs Exhibit 1 to Reply in Support of Motion to Set Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Contention Interrogatories regarding reply to response to motion, #4775 (Blechman, William)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4775 REPLY by Direct-Action Plaintiffs to response in opposition to motion,, #4752 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Pollo Operations, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co.Set Schedule for Defendants to Respond to DAPs Contention Interrogatories #4732 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (under seal))(Blechman, William)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4774 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct-Action Plaintiffs to seal Exhibit 1 to Reply in Support of Motion to Set Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Contention Interrogatories (Blechman, William)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4773 Joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders by Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cajun Operating Company d/b/a Church's Chicken, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Focus Brands LLC, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley, Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurants of America, Inc., Sonic Industries Services Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC, Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach (Gore, Kristin)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4772 MOTION by Plaintiff Services Group of America, Inc. for joinder In (1) Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Partially Reconsider Bifurcation Order [Dkt 4753]and (2) Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs' Amended Joinder [Dkt 4756] (Casas, Gregory)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4771 RESPONSE by Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to compel Mountaire Employee Bruce Mooney as a Document Custodian #4738 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wofford, Amanda)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4770 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS TO TAKE IMMEDIATE DISCOVERY. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 6/24/2021. Mailed notice(ber, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4769 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Certain DAPs' Motion to Compel Production of Defendants' Judgment Sharing Agreement #4768 : Response by 7/8/21. Reply by 7/19/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4768 MOTION by Plaintiffs EMA Foods Co., LLC, L. Hart, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company, Timber Lake Foods, Inc. to compel on behalf of Certain DAPs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Ripp, Paul)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4767 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs EMA Foods Co., LLC, L. Hart, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company, Timber Lake Foods, Inc. by Paul J Ripp (Ripp, Paul)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4766 DECLARATION of Eric Schachter regarding motion for miscellaneous relief #4764 in Support of Motion to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice (Scarlett, Shana)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4765 MEMORANDUM by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #4764 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice (Scarlett, Shana)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4764 MOTION by Plaintiff End-User Consumer Plaintiffsto Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Notice of Motion and Motion to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice (Scarlett, Shana)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4763 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing [Proposed] Order Granting Their Motion for Final Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Pilgrim's Pride Corp., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Order Granting Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Pilgrim's Pride Corp., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc.)(Pouya, Bobby)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4762 Joinder by Conagra Brands, Inc., Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Pinnacle Foods, Inc. in Chick-Fil-A Inc's Brief in Support of its Motion to Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders (Eddy, David)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4761 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Affiliated Foods, Inc.'s Plaintiffs for reconsideration regarding other #4753 Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs' Amended (To Add Names of Plaintiffs in Signature Block) Joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Partially Reconsider The September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders, MOTION by Plaintiff Affiliated Foods, Inc.'s Plaintiffs for reconsideration (Lifvendahl, Eric) Modified on 6/21/2021 (ecw, ).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4760 MOTION by Plaintiff Affiliated Foods, Inc.'s Plaintiffs for reconsideration regarding other #4753 Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs' Amended (To Add Names of Plaintiffs in Signature Block) Joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Partially Reconsider The September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders (Lifvendahl, Eric)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4759 MEMORANDUM by Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. Responding to Court's Order of May 27, 2021 (Germaine, David)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4758 Joinder by McLane Company, Inc. in Chick-fil-A Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders (Youngman, Judith)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4757 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Affiliated Foods, Inc.'s Plaintiffs Affilated Foods Plaintiffs' Joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Partially Reconsider The September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge May 7, and May 13, 2021 Orders (Lifvendahl, Eric)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4756 MOTION by Plaintiff Affiliated Foods, Inc.'s Plaintiffs for reconsideration regarding other #4753 Affilated Foods Plaintiffs' Joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Partially Reconsider The September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge May 7, and May 13, 2021 Orders (Lifvendahl, Eric)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4755 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Kroger and Publix Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a supplemental brief in response to May 27, 2021 order #4750 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4754 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. Supplemental Brief (Phair, Ryan)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4753 Supplemental Brief by Chick-fil-A, Inc. (Phair, Ryan)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4752 RESPONSE by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Pollo Operations, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co.Set Schedule for Defendants to Respond to DAPs Contention Interrogatories #4732 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Laytin, Daniel)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4751 REPLY by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to motion to compel #4703 (Phair, Ryan)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4750 MOTION by Plaintiffs Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. for leave to file a Supplemental Brief in Response to May 27, 2021 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Germaine, David)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4749 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Telephone conference held on 6/17/21. The Court enters the parties' proposed Scheduling Order No. 16 with the modifications discussed on the record. As also discussed on the record, the parties shall file a joint discovery status report by 8/10/21 that includes at least the following information: the status of outstanding written and oral discovery; the status of any discovery dispute(s) as to which the parties are at impasse and that may require the Court's attention, and either a proposed briefing schedule for any necessary motion practice or a proposed process for resolving such dispute(s). The parties also shall identify in the status report any separately negotiated discovery schedules that have been reached for certain Direct Action Plaintiffs in cases filed on or after 2/1/21 as referenced in Scheduling Order No. 16 #4748 at 2, fn. 4. Mailed notice (ber, ) (ber, ).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4748 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 16. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 6/17/2021. Mailed notice(ber, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4747 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING THEIR MOTION FOR INTERIM PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE AWARDS by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hart, Steven)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4746 MEMORANDUM by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs in support of motion for settlement, #4745 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS PILGRIM'S PRIDE CORP., TYSON FOODS, INC., TYSON CHICKEN, INC., TYSON BREEDERS, INC., AND TYSON POULTRY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Keough)(Pouya, Bobby)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4745 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for settlement DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS PILGRIM'S PRIDE CORP., TYSON FOODS, INC., TYSON CHICKEN, INC., TYSON BREEDERS, INC., AND TYSON POULTRY, INC. (Pouya, Bobby)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4744 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4742 is granted. Attorney Michael B Gratz, Jr for EMA Foods Co., LLC, L. Hart, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company and Timber Lake Foods, Inc. added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4743 STIPULATION Defendants' Stipulation Concerning Waiver of Service re Whatabrands (Laytin, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4742 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18355025. (Gratz, Michael)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4741 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: By agreement, at the Court's request, a brief telephone conference is set for 6/17/21 at 12:00 p.m. central to discuss entry of Scheduling Order No. 16 and to set a date for filing of a report or reports concerning the status of discovery. The call-in number for the telephone conference is 877-336-1829, access code 1022195, press #. When you are connected to the conference system, please keep your phone on mute until your case is called. There may be other people in other cases speaking in the conference when you join the conference and before your case is called. When your case is called, please unmute your phone and remember to say your name each and every time you speak. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4740 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Certain DAPs' Motion to Compel Mountaire Employee Bruce Mooney as a Document Custodian #4738 : responses in opposition to be filed on 6/24/21 and replies in support to be filed on 6/29/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4739 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Mountaire Employee Bruce Mooney as Document Custodian (Phair, Ryan)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4738 MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to compel Mountaire Employee Bruce Mooney as a Document Custodian (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Phair, Ryan)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4737 RESPONSE by Pilgrim's Pride Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to compel Pilgrim's Pride Corporation's Depositions #4703 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Abbott, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Mahan, Carrie)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4736 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file excess pages #4735 is granted. Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs may file their 25-page Motion for Final Approval of the Settlements with Defendants Pilgrim's Pride Corp. and Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4735 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for leave to file excess pages Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Hart, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4734 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Schedule for Defendants' Responses to Contention Interrogatories (Dkt. #4732 ): Defendants' response due 6/18/21. DAPs' reply due 6/25/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4733 REPLY by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC to motion for hearing,,, #4639 in Support of Defendants' Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification (Mahan, Carrie)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4732 MOTION by Plaintiffs Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Pollo Operations, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, The Kroger Co.Set Schedule for Defendants to Respond to DAPs Contention Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blechman, William)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4731 REPLY by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Amick Farms, LLC, Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC to motion for miscellaneous relief,,,,, #4580 defts' Reply in support of their motion for an order governing the operation of direct action (Tank, Jordan)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4730 REPLY by Plaintiff Direct-Action Plaintiffs to motion for order, #4637 Preventing Defendants from Relying on the Absence of Evidence about, or Consideration of, the Possible or Actual Effects of Alleged or Potential Bid-Rigging (Porter, Julie)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4729 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Rabobank's motion to dismiss #4369 is granted. The claims against Rabobank are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/1/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4728 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs Columbia Meats, Inc. and Greenville Meats, Inc.'s motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4726 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 2847 pending before Judge Valderrama be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4727 STIPULATION and Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gant, Scott)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4726 MOTION by Plaintiff Action Meat Distributors, Inc. to reassign case Unopposed Motion for Reassignment Based on Relatedness Under Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lifvendahl, Eric)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4725 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) Combined Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit B)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4724 SUR-REPLY by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to Sealed motion, #3971 , motion to certify class,,,, #3962 , motion to certify class,, #3968 Combined Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit B)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4723 RESPONSE by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, K #4639 Class Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4722 ORDER: Chick-fil-A should file a supplemental brief to its motion #4651 by June 18, 2021. Defendants' response should be filed by July 9, 2021. Class Plaintiffs should also file responses on July 9. Replies are due July 23, 2021. See attached order for further details. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/27/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4721 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' request, the date for the parties to submit their proposed order that incorporates the pretrial schedule discussed at the 5/25/21 hearing #4714 is extended to 6/4/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4720 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4719 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC by Keith M. Stolte (Stolte, Keith)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4718 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4717 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs Whatabrands LLC and Whataburger Restaurants LLC's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4716 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 2844 pending before Judge Tharp be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4716 MOTION by Plaintiffs Whatabrands LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC to reassign case based on relatedness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint)(Esau, David)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4715 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Springfield Grocer Co. (Laytin, Daniel)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4714 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Telephone hearing held on 5/24/21 per the Court's order of 5/14/21 #4651 . The parties are directed to the transcript for a complete record of the hearing. All counsel participating in the hearing who wish to have their appearances recorded shall identify themselves to liaison counsel and liaison counsel shall send that information to the Court's courtroom deputy, Brenda_Rinozzi@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties will submit to Judge Gilbert's proposed order E-Filing in-box on or before 6/1/21 a proposed order that incorporates the pretrial schedule discussed on the record. For the reasons discussed on the record, the Court extends the fact discovery close date to 7/30/21. No written discovery can be served during that time without leave of court. Unless otherwise agreed by the parties in the proposed order to be submitted by 6/1/21, Plaintiffs shall identify their merits experts by topic by 8/17/21, and Plaintiffs' merits expert reports will be disclosed to Defendants by 8/31/21. All stayed depositions #4557 are to be completed at least 30 days before summary judgment practice begins. The parties will include in their proposed order dates by which Plaintiffs' merits experts will be deposed, and by which Defendants will disclose their merits experts by topic and then disclose their expert reports, consistent with the schedule submitted by Defendants with the concurrence of Class Plaintiffs on 5/22/21 ECF #4699 and the Court's guidance as to those proposed dates. If the parties still differ on the dates for these events when they submit their proposed order, then they should indicate as much in their submission and the Court will set those dates. As discussed on the record, the Court is most focused now on re-setting dates for fact and expert discovery. If the parties want to do so, however, they also can include in their proposed order a schedule for filing and briefing summary judgment motions and a tentative trial date that also is consistent with what they submitted on 5/22/21 #4699 . The Court extends the date for parties to file their proposed trial plans #4616 to 7/16/21 for the reasons discussed on the record. Certain DAPs' Motion for An Extension of Time to Serve Initial Expert Reports #4648 also is granted for the reasons stated on the record. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4713 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Direct-Action Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize's Motion to Compel Pilgrim's Pride Depositions #4703 : oppositions to be filed on 6/8/21 with replies on 6/18/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4712 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Amick Farms, LLC (Phair, Ryan)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4711 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: No response should be filed to the motion for partial reconsideration and objection #4651 until the Court so orders. The Court will set a briefing schedule shortly. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4710 MEMORANDUM by Agri Stats, Inc., Amick Farms, LLC, Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms Corporation, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC in Opposition to motion for order, #4637 - DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER PREVENTING ANY DEFENDANT FROM RELYING ON THE ABSENCE OF EVIDENCE ABOUT, OR CONSIDERATION OF, THE POSSIBLE OR ACTUAL EFFECTS OF ALLEGED OR POTENTIAL BID-RIGGING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zarlenga, Carmine)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4709 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4707 is granted. Attorney Amy M. Bowers terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4708 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: McLane Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Certain Defendants' Responses to McLane Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Dkt. #4647 is withdrawn per the Notice of Complete Withdrawal #4693 and the briefing schedule set on 5/18/21 #4669 is stricken. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4707 MOTION by Attorney Amy Bowers to withdraw as attorney for Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley, Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurants of America, Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach. No party information provided (Gore, Kristin)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4706 MOTION by Plaintiffs Independent Purchasing Cooperative, Inc., Quirch Foods, LLC, f/k/a Quirch Foods Co., Supply Management Services, Inc. for joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders (Szot, Andrew)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4705 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. Memorandum by Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. in support of motion to compel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Dufek, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Phair, Ryan)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4704 MEMORANDUM by Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. in support of motion to compel #4703 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Dufek, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Phair, Ryan)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4703 MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. to compel Pilgrim's Pride Corporation's Depositions (Phair, Ryan)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4702 Certain Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Submission in Advance of May 24, 2021 Hearing by Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. (Phair, Ryan)
May 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4701 Class Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order No. 16 for Discussion at the May 24, 2021 Hearing STATEMENT by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs (Hart, Steven)
May 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4700 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/14/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Telephone Conference with MJ Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Order Number: 40760. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
May 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4699 Corrected Submission by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) in Advance of May 24, 2021 Hearing on Proposed Scheduling Order 16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4698 Submission by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) in Advance of May 24, 2021 Hearing on Proposed Scheduling Order 16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4697 RESPONSE by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to MOTION by Plaintiffs Independent Purchasing Cooperative, Inc., Quirch Foods, LLC, f/k/a Quirch Foods Co., Supply Management Services, Inc. for extension of time Moving Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time to Serve Initial Ex #4648 (Laytin, Daniel)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4696 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: In light of the filing of the Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Take Depositions of McLane Witnesses #4687 , Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Take Depositions of McLane Witnesses #4583 is withdrawn and the briefing schedule set on 5/7/21 is stricken. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4695 MEMORANDUM by Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief,,,,, #4580 Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for an Order Governing the Operation of Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Porter, Julie)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4694 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file a sur-reply and supplemental expert report #4677 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4693 NOTICE by McLane Company, Inc. Notice of Complete Withdrawal of McLane Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Compel Certain Defendants' Responses to McLane Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Youngman, Judith)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4692 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4688 is granted. Attorney Christopher J Dufek for ALDI Inc, Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc., and Chick-fil-A, Inc. added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4691 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file instanter supplemental authority in support of motion for entry of a protective order #4675 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4690 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs S&S Trading, LLC, Springfield Grocer Company, and Topco Associates, LLC's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4674 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 2693 pending before Judge Bucklo be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4689 ORDER AND JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO CONTENTION INTERROGATORIES. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 5/21/2021. Mailed notice(ber, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4688 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18272475. (Dufek, Christopher)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4687 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods Corporation, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to Take Depositions of McLane Witnesses (Mahan, Carrie)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4686 SEALED REPLY by Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC to reply,,,, #4685 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carrie C. Mahan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mahan, Carrie)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4685 REPLY by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC to motion for miscellaneous relief,,,, #4262 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Russell Mangum (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carrie C. Mahan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mahan, Carrie)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4684 SEALED REPLY by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC to MOTION by Defendants Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Dr. David Sunding #4281 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Dr. David Sunding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Baldridge, James)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4683 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Colin Carter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4682 REPLY by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to motion for miscellaneous relief #4272 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Direct Action Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Colin Carter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4681 NOTICE by United States of America of Case Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Indictment: USA v. Claxton Poultry))(Torzilli, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4680 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) Motion to File a Sur-Reply and Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and 1-8, #2 Exhibit B)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4679 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel E. Laytin for presentment of (Laytin, Daniel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4678 MEMORANDUM by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) in support of motion for leave to file, #4677 a Sur-Reply and Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and 1-8, #2 Exhibit B)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4677 MOTION by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) for leave to file a Sur-Reply and Supplemental Expert Report (Laytin, Daniel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4676 NOTICE by McLane Company, Inc. re memorandum in support of motion, #4649 , MOTION by Plaintiff McLane Company, Inc. to compel Certain Defendants' Responses to McLane Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production #4647 Notice Of Partial Withdrawal Of McLane Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion To Compel Certain Defendants' Responses To McLane Plaintiffs' First Set Of Requests For Production (Youngman, Judith)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4675 MOTION by Intervenor Jayson Penn for leave to file instanter supplemental authority in support of motion for entry of a protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tubach, Michael)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4674 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct-Action Plaintiffs to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lifvendahl, Eric)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4673 Joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders by Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cajun Operating Company d/b/a Church's Chicken, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Focus Brands LLC, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley, Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurants of America, Inc., Sonic Industries Services Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach (Gore, Kristin)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4672 STIPULATION [JOINT] Extending Deadline to Respond to Contention Interrogatories (Murray, Lynn)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4671 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4670 is granted. Attorney Emily M. Asp for George's Farms, Inc. and George's Inc. added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4670 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18261944. (Asp, Emily)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4669 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on the McLane Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Certain Defendants' Responses to McLane Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Dkt. #4647 ): Defendants' opposition is due by 5/21/21 and the McLane Plaintiffs' reply is due by 5/28/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4668 SEALED DOCUMENT by Intervenor Timothy Stiller Reply in Support of Non-Party Timothy Stiller's Motion for the Entry of a Stay of Deposition Discovery AMENDED #4666 (Frost, Kristen)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4667 RESPONSE by Timothy Stillerin Support of MOTION by Intervenor Timothy Stiller to intervene and Request to Stay Deposition Discovery #4619 AMENDED #4665 (Frost, Kristen)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4666 SEALED DOCUMENT by Intervenor Timothy Stiller Reply in Support of Non-Party Timothy Stiller's Motion for the Entry of a Stay of Deposition Discovery (Frost, Kristen)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4665 RESPONSE by Timothy Stillerin Support of MOTION by Intervenor Timothy Stiller to intervene and Request to Stay Deposition Discovery #4619 (Frost, Kristen)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4664 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Direct Action Plaintiffs and Defendants have agreed on the following briefing schedule for the Motion for Entry of an Order Preventing Any Defendant From Relying on the Absence of Evidence About, or Consideration of, the Possible or Actual Effects of Alleged or Potential Big-Rigging #4637 : Defendants' opposition is due by 5/24/2021, and Direct Action Plaintiffs' reply is due by 6/4/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4663 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to dismiss #4661 is granted. All claims in this action by Plaintiff Pacific Foods of Oregon, LLC only are dismissed with prejudice, with parties to bear their respective fees and costs. Pacific Foods of Oregon, L.L.C. terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4662 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants and Class Plaintiffs have agreed to the following briefing schedule on the Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification #4639 : Class Plaintiffs' response brief is due by 5/27/2021. Defendants' reply brief is due by 6/7/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4661 MOTION by Plaintiff Pacific Foods of Oregon, L.L.C. to dismiss its claims with prejudice (Gant, Scott)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4660 MOTION by Plaintiff Caesars Enterprise Services, LLC for joinder [Direct-Action Plaintiff Caesars Enterprise Services, LLC's Joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders] (Mandell, Floyd)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4659 RESPONSE by McLane Company, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Amick Farms, LLC, Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster #4583 for Extension of Time to Take Depositions of McLane Plaintiffs (Youngman, Judith)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4658 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Telephone hearing held on 5/14/21 before Judge Durkin and Judge Gilbert. All counsel participating in the hearing who wish to have their appearances recorded shall identify themselves to liaison counsel and liaison counsel shall send that information to the Court's courtroom deputy, Brenda_Rinozzi@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The October 17, 2022 trial date #4641 is vacated for the reasons stated on the record. The parties are directed to the transcript for a complete record of the hearing. Telephone hearing set for 5/24/21 at 4:00 p.m. Central time before Judge Gilbert. The Court will discuss with the parties at that time, among other things, potential further modifications to Scheduling Order No. 15 #4641 and a process for addressing those matters going forward. Prior to the hearing, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/#bp=8773361829&mac=1022195 to take you to Judge Gilbert's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877) 336-1829, the access code is: 1022195#. When you are connected to the conference system, please keep your phone on mute until your case is called. There may be other people in other cases speaking in the conference when you join the conference and before your case is called. When your case is called, please unmute your phone and remember to say your name each and every time you speak. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4657 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Certain DAPs' Motion for An Extension of Time to Serve Initial Expert Reports (Dkt. #4648 ): Defendants' Opposition Brief will be due 5/21/21, and DAPs' Reply Brief will be due 5/28/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4656 MOTION by Plaintiff McLane Company, Inc. for joinder in Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Motion to Partially Reconsider the September 22, 2020 Order and Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 7 and May 13, 2021 Orders (Youngman, Judith)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4655 Joinder by Conagra Brands, Inc., Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Pinnacle Foods, Inc. Conagra Plaintiffs' Notice of Joinder in Certain DAP Submissions to the Court on May 13-14, 2021 - ECF No. 4642 and ECF No. 4651 (Eddy, David)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4654 Joinder in Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration and Objection by ALDI Inc, Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. (Phair, Ryan)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4653 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The telephone conference previously set for 4:00 p.m. on 5/14/21 #4614 is reset to 4:15 p.m. to accommodate Judge Durkin's trial schedule today. This is a change in time only. The Court anticipates this conference will last no more than 30 to 45 minutes. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4652 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc. Motion for Partial Reconsideration and Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phair, Ryan)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4651 MOTION by Plaintiff Chick-fil-A, Inc.for Partial Reconsideration and Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phair, Ryan)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4650 Statement by Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs and Rabobank Regarding the Court's May 11, 2021 Order and May 14, 2021 Hearing STATEMENT by Sysco Corporation (Gant, Scott)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4649 MEMORANDUM by McLane Company, Inc. in support of motion to compel #4647 Certain Defendants' Responses to McLane Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Youngman, Judith)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4648 MOTION by Plaintiffs Independent Purchasing Cooperative, Inc., Quirch Foods, LLC, f/k/a Quirch Foods Co., Supply Management Services, Inc. for extension of time Moving Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time to Serve Initial Expert Reports (Szot, Andrew)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4647 MOTION by Plaintiff McLane Company, Inc. to compel Certain Defendants' Responses to McLane Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Youngman, Judith)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4646 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Walmart, Inc. to Response, #4642 Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Joinder-in-Part in Other Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Responses to the Questions in the Court's May 11 Order (Bhalla, Ravi)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4645 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The Court will use the following call-in information for the telephone hearing set for 5/14/21 at 4:00 p.m. Central Standard Time #4614 . Prior to the hearing, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/#bp=8773361829&mac=1022195 to take you to Judge Gilbert's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877) 336-1829, the access code is: 1022195#. When you are connected to the conference system, please keep your phone on mute until your case is called. There may be other people in other cases speaking in the conference when you join the conference and before your case is called. When your case is called, please unmute your phone and remember to say your name each and every time you speak. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4644 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiffs and non-party Timothy Stiller have agreed to the following briefing schedule as to Mr. Stiller's motion #4619 . Mr. Stiller will have until 5/17/2021 to file his reply. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4643 SEALED DOCUMENT by Unknown Affiliated Foods, Inc., Plaintiff Affiliated Foods, Inc.'s Plaintiffs Certain DAP s' Responses to the Questions in the Court's May 11 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit no. 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit no. 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit no. 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit no. 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit no. 5)(Lifvendahl, Eric)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4642 RESPONSE by Unknown Affiliated Foods, Inc., Plaintiff Affiliated Foods, Inc.'s Plaintiffs Certain DAP s' Responses to the Questions in the Court's May 11 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit no. 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit no. 2 CP, #3 Exhibit Exhibit no. 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit no. 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit no. 5)(Lifvendahl, Eric)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4641 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 5/13/2021. Mailed notice(ber, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4640 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Enter Scheduling Order No. 15. The Court has modified in some respects the proposed order submitted by Defendants and joined by Class Plaintiffs [ECF No. 4439-2] and deleted language by which certain parties purported to reserve the right to seek additional time for discovery, to modify other deadlines set in this Scheduling Order, to object to any modification of the Scheduling Order, or to seek other like relief, as unnecessary in the context of this Order and inconsistent with the Order entered on 5/11/21 [ECF No. 4626] ("The Court is not willing to move the October 2022 trial date for market manipulation issues."). By removing this language from the Scheduling Order, the Court does not intend to prevent the parties from seeking any relief in the future that they believe is necessary and appropriate in this case. In the Court's view, however, it is unnecessary to include such caveated language in this Scheduling Order. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4639 MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC for hearing on class certification (Mahan, Carrie)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4638 Defendants' Rule 16 Statement for May 14, 2021 Hearing STATEMENT by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laytin, Daniel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4637 MOTION by Plaintiff Sysco Corporation for order Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of an Order Preventing Any Defendant From Relying on the Absence of Evidence About, or Consideration of, the Possible or Actual Effects of Alleged or Potential Bid-Rigging (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gant, Scott)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4636 SEALED RESPONSE of Kroger & Publix Plaintiffs' to Court's Questions for May 14, 2021 Hearing (Filed Under Seal). (Slater, Paul)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4635 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. Plaintiffs' to Court's Questions for May 14, 2021 Hearing (Public Redacted Version). (Slater, Paul)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4634 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Plaintiffs in related action 1:17-cv-08850 by Gregory K Arenson (Arenson, Gregory)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4633 SEALED DOCUMENT by Intervenor Jayson Penn / Reply in Support of Intervenor Jayson Penn's Motion for Entry of a Protective Order (Tubach, Michael)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4632 REPLY by Jayson Penn to MOTION by Intervenor Jayson Penn to intervene and for Entry of Protective Order #4575 (Tubach, Michael)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4631 SEALED REPLY by Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc. #4585 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Staunton, Thomas)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4630 SEALED RESPONSE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct-Action Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to sealed document #4621 All Plaintiffs' Opposition to Non-Party Timothy Stiller's Motion for the Entry of a Stay of Deposition Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hart, Steven)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4629 SEALED REPLY by Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC The Mar-Jac Defendants' Motion for Protective Order #4579 Mar-Jac's Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order (Konieczny, Edward)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4628 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding the Court's May 11, 2021 Order and Hearing on May 14, 2021 STATEMENT by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Hart, Steven)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4626 ORDER signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin and the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 5/11/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4625 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 7, 2021 before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Order Number: 40697. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany; nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov; bistanyofficialtranscripts@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/31/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Bistany, Nancy)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4624 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to appear pro hac vice #4622 #4623 are granted. Attorney Louis Robert Katz for Vern Peter Gardner, Christopher Gilbert, Tracy Newman, Alison Pauk, Marilyn Stangeland, David Weidner, and Leslie Weidner added. Attorney Patrick Ridley for Timothy Stiller added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4623 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18226241. (Ridley, Patrick)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4622 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18225875. (Katz, Louis)
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4621 SEALED DOCUMENT by Intervenor Timothy Stiller Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Frost, Kristen)
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4620 MEMORANDUM by Timothy Stiller in support of motion to intervene #4619 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Frost, Kristen)
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4619 MOTION by Intervenor Timothy Stiller to intervene and Request to Stay Deposition Discovery (Frost, Kristen)
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4618 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Timothy Stiller by William P. Murphy (Murphy, William)
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4617 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Timothy Stiller by Kristen Michelle Frost (Frost, Kristen)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4616 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: For the reasons stated on the record during the telephone hearing held on 5/7/21, Defendants' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order No. 14 and to Adopt Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 #4438 , #4439 is granted in large part. The Court will enter a modified version of Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 as a separate docket entry in due course consistent with its rulings on the record. The Court recognizes Class Plaintiffs' Joinder #4441 in Defendants' Motion to Amend #4438 , #4439 . Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' ("DAPs'") objections [4461, 4468, 4469, 4472] to Defendants' Motion to Amend #4438 , #4439 are overruled for the reasons discussed on the record. Certain Restaurant DAPs' Motion to Establish a Separate Restaurant DAP Track and to Appoint Certain Restaurant DAP Liaison Counsel #4460 , #4507 is denied without prejudice for the reasons discussed on the record and in the context of the Court's rulings concerning discovery scheduling matters. Certain DAPs' Motion to Compel Keystone Depositions #4565 is granted for the reasons discussed on the record. As discussed during the hearing, any interested party may submit to the Court on or before 6/15/21 a proposed trial plan for an October 2022 trial. Any such submission should include a date by which any DAP case must be or have been consolidated with this master case to be eligible for trial in October 2022. The Court intends to begin the process of discussing a trial plan and related matters with the parties during the telephone hearing scheduled for 5/14/21 #4614 . Mailed notice (ber, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4615 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Take Depositions of McLane Witnesses #4583 : response is due 5/14/21, and reply is due 5/21/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4614 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Continued telephone hearing set for 5/14/21 at 4:00 p.m. Central Standard Time before Judges Durkin and Gilbert for the purpose of discussing certain trial and discovery scheduling and other matters. An agenda and telephone dial-in number for that hearing will be distributed in an order to be entered next week. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4613 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Motion hearing held on 5/7/21 on certain pending motions. Further orders to follow. All counsel participating in the hearing who wish to have their appearances recorded shall identify themselves to liaison counsel and liaison counsel shall send that information to the Court's courtroom deputy, Brenda_Rinozzi@ilnd.uscourts.gov, by 12:00 p.m. on 5/8/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4612 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: All Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Instanter Supplemental Authority In Support of Their Oppositions to Motions for Protective Order #4611 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4611 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct-Action Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Instanter Supplemental Authority In Support of Their Oppositions to Motions for Protective Order (Filed Under Seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(Hart, Steven)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4610 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL H. CAMILLE PAPINI-CHAPLA by McLane Company, Inc. ON BEHALF OF MCLANE PLAINTIFFS (Papini-chapla, Heather)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4609 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Cameron Azari (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baldridge, James)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4608 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct-Action Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Case Farms Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Filed Under Seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(Hart, Steven)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4607 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Supervalu Inc., Unified Grocers, Inc., Wakefern Food Corporation by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman (Bergman, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4606 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4605 is granted. Attorney Matthew W. Ruan for Vern Peter Gardner, Christopher Gilbert, Tracy Newman, Alison Pauk, Marilyn Stangeland, David Weidner, and Leslie Weidner added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4605 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18217109. (Ruan, Matthew)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4604 NOTICE by Carmel Rana Arikat of Change of Address (Arikat, Carmel)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4603 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct-Action Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Mar-Jac Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Filed Under Seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal))(Hart, Steven)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4602 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct-Action Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Entry of Protective Order (Filed Under Seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal))(Hart, Steven)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4601 RESPONSE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs, Direct-Action Plaintiffsin Opposition to MOTION by Intervenor Jayson Penn to intervene and for Entry of Protective Order #4575 All Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Entry of Protective Order (Public Redacted Version) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Public Redacted Version), #2 Exhibit B (Public Redacted Version), #3 Exhibit C (Public Redacted Version))(Hart, Steven)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4600 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF CLASS CONTACT INFORMATION. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 5/5/2021. Mailed notice(ber, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4599 NOTICE by Michael J O'Mara of Change of Address (O'Mara, Michael)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4598 NOTICE by Daniel K. Oakes of Change of Address (Oakes, Daniel)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4597 NOTICE by Kenina J Lee of Change of Address (Lee, Kenina)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4596 NOTICE by Rachel Johanna Adcox of Change of Address (Adcox, Rachel)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4595 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Telephone hearing held on 5/4/21 on Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Keystone Depositions #4565 . All counsel participating in today's call shall identify themselves to liaison counsel and liaison counsel shall send to the Court's courtroom deputy, Brenda_Rinozzi@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties are directed to the transcript for a complete record of the hearing. Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Compel Keystone Depositions #4587 is granted. Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Keystone Depositions #4565 is taken under advisement for the reasons stated on the record. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4594 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: On the parties' request, the briefing schedule on the Sealed Motion by Defendants Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc. #4585 is amended as follows. Responses are due by 5/6/2021. Replies are due by 5/12/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4593 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Giant Eagle, Inc. by Brian Hill (Hill, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4592 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to appear pro hac vice #4589 #4590 are granted. Attorney Brian Hill for Giant Eagle, Inc. added. Attorney Corey K. Brady for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation added. Motion to withdraw as attorney #4591 is granted. Attorney Kevin J. Arquit terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4591 MOTION by Attorney Kevin J. Arquit to withdraw as attorney for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. No party information provided (Mahan, Carrie)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4590 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18205794. (Brady, Corey)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4589 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18205498. (Hill, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4588 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Any responses to the Sealed Motion by Defendants Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc. #4585 are due by 5/10/2021. Replies are due by 5/17/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4587 MOTION by Plaintiff Sysco Corporation for leave to file Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Keystone Depositions (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Gant, Scott)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4586 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Production of Class Contact Information (Scarlett, Shana)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4585 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc. (Feeney, Daniel)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4584 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc. by Andrew Dylan Campbell Andrew D. Campbell (Campbell, Andrew)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4583 MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Amick Farms, LLC, Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC for extension of time to take Depositions of McLane Witnesses (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica L. Falk, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mahan, Carrie)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4582 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: DAPs and Defendants have agreed to the following briefing schedule on Defendants' motion for an Order Governing the Operation of Direct Action Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint #4580 . DAPs' response to Defendants' motion is due 5/21/2021, and Defendants' reply is due 6/4/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4581 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Jayson Penn's motion #4575 is granted to the extent that he is permitted to intervene to seek a protective order. Any response to his motion for a protective order should be filed by 5/5/2021. Any reply should be filed by 5/12/2021. Responses to Mar-Jac's motion for a protective order #4579 should also be filed by 5/5/2021, and replies due 5/12/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4580 MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Amick Farms, LLC, Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC for an Order Governing the Operation of Direct Action Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Tank, Jordan)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4579 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC The Mar-Jac Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Konieczny, Edward)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4578 RESPONSE by Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Sysco Corporation to compel Keystone Depositions #4565 (Tank, Jordan)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4577 MOTION by Defendants Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc. to compel Opposition to Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel "Keystone Depositions" (Tank, Jordan)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4576 MEMORANDUM by Jayson Penn in support of motion to intervene, #4575 (Corrected) (Tubach, Michael)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4575 MOTION by Intervenor Jayson Penn to intervene and for Entry of Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of, #2 Declaration of Michael F. Tubach in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Tubach, Michael)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4574 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC Sealed Version of Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Luis Cabral (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1 to Medlock Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Medlock Declaration)(Zarlenga, Carmine)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4573 REPLY by Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC to MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, K #4245 to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Luis Cabral (REDACTED) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1 to Medlock Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Medlock Declaration)(Zarlenga, Carmine)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4572 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Jayson Penn by Kevin Buckley Duff (Duff, Kevin)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4571 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to appear pro hac vice #4568 , #4570 are granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4570 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18189380. (Tubach, Michael)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4569 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Maplevale Farms, Inc. by Jeffrey L. Spector (Spector, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4568 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18188978. (Spector, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4567 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: A telephone hearing on Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Keystone Depositions #4565 is set for 5/4/21 at 10:45 a.m. Any response to the Motion shall be filed by noon on 4/30/21. Prior to the hearing, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/#bp=8773361829&mac=1022195 to take you to Judge Gilbert's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877) 336-1829, the access code is: 1022195#. When you are connected to the conference system, please keep your phone on mute until your case is called. There may be other people in other cases speaking in the conference when you join the conference and before your case is called. When your case is called, please unmute your phone and remember to say your name each and every time you speak. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice (ber, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4566 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Keystone Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gant, Scott)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4565 MOTION by Plaintiff Sysco Corporation to compel Keystone Depositions (Gant, Scott)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4564 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4562 is granted. Attorney Aaron Karl Block for Fieldale Farms Corporation added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4563 ORDER AND AGREED JOINT STIPULATION CONCERNING DEFENDANTS' DAUBERT REPLIES. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Excess Pages (Dkt. 4560] is granted. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 4/27/2021. Mailed notice(ber, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4562 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18180221. (Block, Aaron)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4561 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Amory Investments LLC (Laytin, Daniel)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4560 MOTION by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) for extension of time and leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Laytin, Daniel)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4559 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4558 is granted. Attorney Serena Georgette Rabie for JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc. and Koch Meats Co., Inc. added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4558 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18164159. (Rabie, Serena)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4557 SEALED ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/19/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4556 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: There are two motions pending before the Court that directly impact the schedule set in Scheduling Order No. 14 #3788 . They are Defendants' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order No. 14 and to Adopt Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 [ECF No. 4439], which Class Plaintiffs have joined [ECF No. 4441], and Certain Restaurant DAPs' Motion to Establish A Separate Restaurant DAP Track and to Appoint Certain Restaurant DAP Liaison Counsel [ECF Nos. 4460, 4507]. The Department of Justice's Motion to Stay #4516 pending before the District Judge also could affect the dates set in Scheduling Order No. 14 #3788 . All the referenced motions are fully-briefed. A telephonic hearing to discuss scheduling matters is set for 5/7/21 at 10:00 a.m. Central Standard Time. The subjects to be addressed at the hearing on 5/7/21 include but are not necessarily limited to the following: (1) the dates for the completion of fact and expert discovery, (2) discovery in DAP cases generally, in newer DAP cases specifically, and in DAP cases that may be filed in the future, and (3) Certain Restaurant DAPs' proposal to create a separate Restaurant DAP track and to appoint separate liaison counsel. Judge Durkin will enter a separate order on The Department of Justice's Motion to Stay #4516 . If the 5/7/21 hearing date poses irreconcilable conflicts for the parties, liaison counsel should immediately inform the Court's courtroom deputy so that a different date can be set. Prior to the hearing, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/#bp=8773361829&mac=1022195 to take you to Judge Gilbert's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877) 336-1829, access code: 1022195#. When you are connected to the conference system, please keep your phone on mute until your case is called. There may be other people in other cases speaking in the conference when you join the conference and before your case is called. When your case is called, please unmute your phone and remember to say your name each and every time you speak. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice (ber, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4555 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Ex parte telephone conference held on 4/19/2021. Transcript to remain under seal. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4554 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4553 is granted. Attorney Devon Charles Holstad terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4553 MOTION by Attorney Devon C. Holstad to withdraw as attorney for JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc.. No party information provided (Moore, Christopher)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4552 DECLARATION of W. Joseph Bruckner regarding motion for attorney fees #4550 (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-32)(Bruckner, W.)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4551 MEMORANDUM by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs in support of motion for attorney fees #4550 (Bruckner, W.)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4550 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for attorney fees Interim Payment of attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and class representative incentive awards (Bruckner, W.)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4549 SEALED DOCUMENT by Intervenor United States of America (SEALED version of Reply in support of motion for limited deposition stay) (Torzilli, Paul)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4548 REPLY by Intervenor United States of America to motion to stay #4516 (in further support of motion for limited stay) (Torzilli, Paul)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4547 ORDER: Service Group of America's motion to permit late opt-out from the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff class settlements with defendants George's and Peco #4187 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/16/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4546 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The parties are directed to review Judge Durkin's new procedures for sealing motions, which can be found on Judge Durkin's web page in the Case Procedures section, "Sealing Motions." Although the new procedures apply to all cases, due to the high volume of under seal filings in this case, the Court asks that the parties make note of these changes. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4545 REPLY by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Golden Corral Corporation, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC, Movants Shamrock Foods Company, United Food Service, Inc. to motion for miscellaneous relief,,, #4460 CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAPS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO ESTABLISH A SEPARATE RESTAURANT DAP TRACK AND APPOINT CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAP LIAISON COUNSEL (Lustrin, Lori)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4544 SEALED REPLY by Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. to MOTION by Intervenor United States of America to stay (limited deposition stay) #4516 (Germaine, David)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4543 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file excess pages #4540 is granted. Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs may file a Memorandum in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses not to exceed 25 pages. Motion for leave to file document under seal #4542 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4542 MOTION by Plaintiffs Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. to seal document Dkt. #4541 (Germaine, David)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4541 MEMORANDUM by Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. in Opposition to motion to stay #4516 (Redacted Version - Motion to Seal Pending) (Germaine, David)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4540 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for leave to file excess pages (Bruckner, W.)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4539 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff Amory Investments LLC's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4537 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 1907 pending before Judge Chang be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4538 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Focus Brands LLC (Gore, Kristin)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4537 MOTION by Plaintiff Amory Investments LLC to reassign case based on relatedness pursuant to LR 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Amory Investments LLC v. Agri Stats et al. Complaint 21-cv-1907)(Kosoglad, Jared)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4536 REPLY by Defendants Rabo AgriFinance LLC, Rabobank USA Financial Corporation, Utrecht-America Finance Co., Utrecht-America Holdings, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion, #4510 Reply Brief In Support Of Rabobank's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss (Doyle, David)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4535 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Amend Scheduling Order No. 14 and to Adopt Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 and Opposition to Certain Restaurant DAPS' Motion to Establish Separate DAP Track #4530 is granted. Mailed notice (ber, )
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4534 REPLY by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to motion to amend/correct, #4439 DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AND TO ADOPT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15 AND OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAPS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH SEPARATE DAP TRACK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Laytin, Daniel)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4533 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AND TO ADOPT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15 AND OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAPS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH SEPARATE DAP TRACK (Laytin, Daniel)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4532 Notice of Motion to Seal NOTICE of Motion by Daniel E. Laytin for presentment of (Laytin, Daniel)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4531 NOTICE by Richard Lyle Coffman of Change of Address (Coffman, Richard)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4530 MOTION by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to seal DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AND TO ADOPT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15 AND OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAPS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH SEPARATE DAP TRACK (Laytin, Daniel)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4529 REPLY by Plaintiffs Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to other, #4441 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AND TO ADOPT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hart, Steven)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4528 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4527 is granted. Attorney Deborah Leah Bessner terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4527 MOTION by Attorney Deborah Bessner to withdraw as attorney for Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC. No party information provided (Bessner, Deborah)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4526 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Ex parte telephone conference held on 4/6/2021. Transcript to remain under seal. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4525 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4524 is granted. Attorney Daniel Alan Baquet for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4524 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18093675. (Baquet, Daniel)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4523 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated (Yearick, Garth)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4522 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc. (Yearick, Garth)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4521 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file under seal #4518 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4520 Brief in support of motion for limited deposition stay by United States of America (redacted, public version) (Torzilli, Paul)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4519 SEALED DOCUMENT by Intervenor United States of America (Redacted brief in support of United States' motion for limited deposition stay) (Torzilli, Paul)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4518 MOTION by Intervenor United States of America to seal (Torzilli, Paul)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4516 MOTION by Intervenor United States of America to stay (limited deposition stay) (Torzilli, Paul)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4515 Corporate Disclosure Document by Thurston Foods, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Campbell, Terence)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4514 Corporate Disclosure Document by Feeser's Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Campbell, Terence)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4513 REPLY by Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to reply, #4495 , motion to certify class,, #3968 (Corrected Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification) (Zapala, Adam)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4512 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Corrected Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Zapala, Adam)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4511 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file under seal #4508 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4510 MEMORANDUM by Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., Pacific Foods of Oregon, LLC, EMA Foods Co., LLC, John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., L. Hart, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company, Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, Timber Lake Foods, Inc., US Foods, Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss #4369 (Gant, Scott)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4509 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., Pacific Foods of Oregon, LLC, EMA Foods Co., LLC, John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., L. Hart, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company, Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, Timber Lake Foods, Inc., US Foods, Inc. Opposition to Rabobank's Motion to Dismiss (Gant, Scott)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4508 MOTION by Plaintiffs Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., Pacific Foods of Oregon, LLC, EMA Foods Co., LLC, John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., L. Hart, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., R & D Marketing, LLC, Red Bird Farms Distribution Company, Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, Timber Lake Foods, Inc., US Foods, Inc. for leave to file Opposition to Rabobank's Motion to Dismiss under seal (Gant, Scott)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4507 MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Golden Corral Corporation, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC, Movants Shamrock Foods Company, United Food Service, Inc. CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAPS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH A SEPARATE RESTAURANT DAP TRACK AND APPOINT CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAP LIAISON COUNSEL [REDACTED VERSION] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori P. Lustrin, #2 Exhibit A [Under Seal], #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Lustrin, Lori)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4506 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Campbell Soup Company, Campbell Soup Supply Company L.L.C., Pacific Foods of Oregon, LLC, John Soules Acquisitions LLC, John Soules Foods, Inc., Sysco Corporation, Target Corporation, US Foods, Inc. by Ryan Thomas McAllister (McAllister, Ryan)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4505 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Expert Report of Colin A. Carter, Ph.D., in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (UNREDACTED VERSION)(DKT#4481)(FILED UNDER SEAL) (Pouya, Bobby)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4504 SEALED REPLY by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to reply,, #4480 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF BOBBY POUYA REGARDING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (UNREDACTED VERSION)(DKT#4480)(FILED UNDER SEAL) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12)(Pouya, Bobby)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4503 SEALED REPLY by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, K #4262 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Russell Mangum (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua J. Rissman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Wexler, Kenneth)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4502 NOTICE by Feeser's Inc. re amended complaint #4501 (Campbell, Terence)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4501 First AMENDED complaint by Feeser's Inc. against All Defendants (Campbell, Terence)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4500 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT DR. COLIN A. CARTER (UNREDACTED VERSION)(DKT # 4478)(FILED UNDER SEAL) (Hart, Steven)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4499 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' agreement, Class Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order No. 14 and to Adopt Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 #4441 by 4/8/21. Mailed notice (ber, )
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4498 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Responses to Certain Restaurant DAP's Motion to Establish a Separate Restaurant DAP Track and Appoint Certain Restaurant DAP Liaison Counsel #4460 shall be filed by 4/8/21 and replies shall be filed by 4/15/21 unless the affected parties agree to a different briefing schedule and communicate that schedule to the Court's courtroom deputy. Mailed notice (ber, )
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4497 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions for leave to file under seal #4479 , #4482 , #4483 , #4484 , #4496 are granted. No appearances on the motions are necessary. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4496 MOTION by Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Zapala, Adam)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4495 REPLY by Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to notice of motion #4494 , reply,, #4493 , motion to certify class,, #3968 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibits 1-11 Redacted)(Zapala, Adam)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4494 NOTICE of Motion by Adam John Zapala for presentment of (Zapala, Adam)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4493 SEALED REPLY by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to MOTION by Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to certify class #3968 (Attachments: #1 CIIPPs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Zapala, Adam)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4492 MEMORANDUM by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief,,,, #4262 Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Russell Mangum (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua J. Rissman, #2 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit C - Filed Unser Seal)(Wexler, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4491 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Alan Hart for presentment of motion for leave to file, #4482 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/1/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Hart, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4490 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Alan Hart for presentment of motion for leave to file, #4479 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/1/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Hart, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4489 SEALED RESPONSE by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to MOTION by Defendants Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC PUBLIC VERSION Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Cameron Azari #4287 End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Cameron Azari (Scarlett, Shana)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4488 SEALED RESPONSE by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to MOTION by Defendants Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Dr. David Sunding #4281 (Scarlett, Shana)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4487 SEALED REPLY by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to MOTION by Plaintiff End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to seal Reply in Support of End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents #4483 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #2 Exhibit Ex. 174 to 188, #3 Declaration of David Sunding)(Scarlett, Shana)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4486 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of (Wexler, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4485 NOTICE of Motion by Shana Scarlett for presentment of (Scarlett, Shana)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4484 MOTION by Plaintiff Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell Mangum (Wexler, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4483 MOTION by Plaintiff End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to seal Reply in Support of End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarlett, Shana)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4482 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for leave to file UNDER SEAL THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF BOBBY POUYA REGARDING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND THE REPLY REPORT OF COLIN A. CARTER, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Dkt# 4480) (Hart, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4481 Expert Report of Colin A. Carter, Ph.D., in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Pouya, Bobby)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4480 REPLY by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to motion to certify class,,,, #3962 (Redacted Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bobby Pouya, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Pouya, Bobby)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4479 MOTION by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for leave to file Under Seal Their Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Colin A. Carter (Dkt# 4478) (Hart, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4478 MEMORANDUM by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief #4272 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT DR. COLIN A. CARTER (REDACTED VERSION) (MOTION TO FILE UNREDACTED VERSION UNDER SEAL PENDING) (Hart, Steven)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4477 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At Defendants' request, and without opposition from Class Plaintiffs, all DAPs, and the Department of Justice, the Court modifies the briefing schedule set forth in ECF No. #4449 as follows: Defendants will file their Reply in Support of their Motion to Amend Scheduling Order No. 14 and to Adopt Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 by 4/8/21. Defendants' reply shall not exceed 20 pages. Mailed notice (ber, )
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4476 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #4474 is granted. Attorney Michael E. Jacobs for Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs added. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4475 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Upon agreement of the parties, the Court hereby modifies the briefing schedule set forth in ECF No. #4422 for Defendant Rabobank's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Direct Action Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint (ECF No. #4369 ) as follows: Direct Action Plaintiffs shall file their response briefs in opposition to Rabobank's motion to dismiss on or before 3/31/2021. The Rabobank Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss on or before 4/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4474 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18061048. (JACOBS, MICHAEL)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4473 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions for leave to file under seal #4467 , #4470 are granted. No appearance on the motions is necessary. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4472 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 (Unredacted Version) (Dkt.4461) (Filed Under Seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Germaine, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4471 NOTICE of Motion by Lori P Lustrin for presentment of motion to seal,, #4470 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/1/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Lustrin, Lori)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4470 MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Golden Corral Corporation, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC, Movants Shamrock Foods Company, United Food Service, Inc. to seal CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAPS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH A SEPARATE RESTAURANT DAP TRACK AND APPOINT CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAP LIAISON COUNSEL [Docket Entry No. 4460] (Lustrin, Lori)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4469 RESPONSE by Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to amend/correct DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AN #4439 [[Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Redacted Public Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion]] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Porter, Julie)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4468 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Adopt Proposed Schedule No. 15 and Request for Court Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Porter, Julie)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4467 MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. for leave to file Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Adopt Proposed Schedule No. 15 and Request for Court Conference and Its Accompanying Exhibit 1 Under Seal (Porter, Julie)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4466 NOTICE of Motion by Lori P Lustrin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,,, #4460 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/25/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Lustrin, Lori)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4465 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions for leave to file under seal #4462 , #4464 are granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4464 MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Golden Corral Corporation, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC, Movants Shamrock Foods Company, United Food Service, Inc. to seal Exhibit A to Docket Entry No. 4460 (Lustrin, Lori)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4463 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Golden Corral Corporation, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC, Movants Shamrock Foods Company, United Food Service, Inc. EXHIBIT A TO CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAPS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH A SEPARATE RESTAURANT DAP TRACK AND APPOINT CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAP LIAISON COUNSEL (Lustrin, Lori)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4462 MOTION by Plaintiffs Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. to seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 (Germaine, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4461 MEMORANDUM by Publix Super Markets, Inc., The Kroger Co. in Opposition to motion to amend/correct, #4439 [Redacted Version] [Motion to Seal Pending] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Germaine, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4460 MOTION by Plaintiffs BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Golden Corral Corporation, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC, Movants Shamrock Foods Company, United Food Service, Inc.CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAPS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH A SEPARATE RESTAURANT DAP TRACK AND APPOINT CERTAIN RESTAURANT DAP LIAISON COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori P. Lustrin, #2 Exhibit A (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Lustrin, Lori)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4459 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/22/2021 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreements. Order Number: 40378. Court Reporter Contact Information: Elia E. Carrion, EECarrionOfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312-408-7782. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/15/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2021. (Carrion, Elia)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4458 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by Leona Bridget Ajavon (Ajavon, Leona)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4457 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Supply Management Services, Inc. (Laytin, Daniel)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4456 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file under seal #4454 is granted. End-User Consumer Plaintiffs are granted leave to file under seal the Opposition and Exhibits A through D of the Scarlett Declaration. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4455 Notice of Motion For Leave to File Under Seal End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Luis Cabral and Supporting Documents NOTICE of Motion by Shana Scarlett for presentment of (Scarlett, Shana)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4454 MOTION by Plaintiff End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to seal Motion For Leave to File Under Seal End-User Consumer Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Luis Cabral and Supporting Documents (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarlett, Shana)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4453 SEALED RESPONSE by End-User Consumer Plaintiffs to MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, K #4262 SEALED Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Luis Cabral (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Scarlett, Shana)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4452 RESPONSE by End-User Consumer Plaintiffsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, K #4262 REDACTED Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Luis Cabral (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Scarlett, Shana)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4451 ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreements between End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Tyson, Fieldale, Peco Foods and George's Defendants. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/22/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4450 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 3/22/2021. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion for preliminary approval of settlement agreement between End-User Consumer Plaintiffs and Tyson, Fieldale, Peco Foods and George's Defendants #4376 is granted without objection. Enter order. A written status report is due by 6/22/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4449 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Direct Action Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order No. 14 and to Adopt Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 [4438, 4439] by 3/25/21 and Defendants shall reply by 4/1/21 unless the parties agree to a different briefing schedule. If the parties agree to a different briefing schedule, then they should email the Court's courtroom deputy at Brenda_Rinozzi@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (ber, ) Modified on 3/18/2021 (ber, ).
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4448 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions for leave to file under seal #4436 , #4445 are granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4447 Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Report and Request for Briefing Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 and Related Issues (Public-Redacted Version) by Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. (Porter, Julie)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4446 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Report and Request for Briefing Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 and Related Issues (Porter, Julie)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4445 MOTION by Plaintiff Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. for leave to file Direct-Action Plaintiffs' Report and Request for Briefing Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order No. 15 and Related Issues Under Seal (Porter, Julie)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4444 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4443 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley by Keith M. Stolte (Stolte, Keith)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4442 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4441 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AND TO ADOPT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15 (ECF NO. 4439) by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-User Consumer Plaintiffs (Hart, Steven)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4440 NOTICE OF MOTION TO AMEND NOTICE of Motion by Daniel E. Laytin for presentment of (Laytin, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4439 MOTION by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to amend/correct DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AND TO ADOPT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Laytin, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4438 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AND TO ADOPT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G)(Laytin, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4437 NOTICE OF MOTION TO SEAL NOTICE of Motion by Daniel E. Laytin for presentment of (Laytin, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4436 MOTION by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) to seal DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 14 AND TO ADOPT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 15 (Laytin, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4435 STIPULATION regarding sealed document #4227 Joint Stipulation Regarding Amendment to Pollo Operations, Inc.'s Amended Complaint (Blechman, William)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4434 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cajun Operating Company d/b/a Church's Chicken, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Focus Brands LLC, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurants of America, Inc., Sonic Industries Services Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4433 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cajun Operating Company d/b/a Church's Chicken, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Focus Brands LLC, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurants of America, Inc., Sonic Industries Services Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach by Keith M. Stolte (Stolte, Keith)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4432 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cajun Operating Company d/b/a Church's Chicken, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Focus Brands LLC, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurants of America, Inc., Sonic Industries Services Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4431 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715 on behalf of Fieldale Farms Corporation, George's, Inc., George's Farms, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. by Peco Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flath, Lara)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4430 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to substitute attorney #4429 is granted. Attorneys Robert W. Turken, Lori P. Lustrin, Scott N. Wagner, Andrew Peter Bleiman, and Mark Ian Fishbein for El Pollo Loco, Inc added. Attorneys Eric W. Buetzow, Judith A. Zahid, James R. Martin, Jennifer Duncan Hackett and Terence H. Campbell terminated for El Pollo Loco, Inc. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4429 MOTION by Plaintiff El Pollo Loco, Inc to substitute attorney (Lustrin, Lori)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4428 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Joint motion and stipulation for dismissal with prejudice #4426 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4427 STATUS Report re: amended complaints by BOJANGLES OPCO, LLC, BOJANGLES' RESTAURANTS, INC., Barbeque Integrated, Inc., Boston Market Corporation, CBOCS Distribution, Inc., Captain D's, LLC, Chick-fil-A, Inc., Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., El Pollo Loco, Inc, FIC Restaurants, Inc., Focus Brands LLC, Golden Corral Corporation, The Johnny Rockets Group, Inc., WZ Franchise Corporation, White Castle Purchasing Co., Zaxby's Franchising LLC (Gant, Scott)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4426 MOTION by Defendant Peco Foods, Inc. and Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Peco Foods, Inc. in Case No. 19-cv-5100 Walmart Inc. v. Pilgrim's Pride Corp, et al. (Joint) (Flath, Lara)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4425 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to withdraw as attorney #4423 is granted. Joseph Vanek, Michael Dickler, and Martin Sinclair terminated as local counsel for the Carlton Fields Plaintiffs. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4424 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated (Laytin, Daniel)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4423 MOTION by Attorney Joseph Vanek, Michael Dickler & Martin Sinclair to withdraw as attorney for Anaheim Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Anaheim, Bob Evans Farms, Inc., Bonita Plaza Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Plaza Bonita, Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cajun Operating Company d/b/a Church's Chicken, Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc., Cheney Bros., Inc., Costa Mesa Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Costa Mesa, Downtown Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Downtown LA, Focus Brands LLC, Gaslamp Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of San Diego, Gibson, Greco & Wood, Ltd., Hollywood Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Hollywood, Hooters Management Corporation, Hooters of America, LLC, Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, LTP Management Group, Inc., Mission Valley Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Mission Valley, Oceanside Wings, LLC previously d/b/a Hooters of Oceanside, Ontario Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Ontario, Rancho Bernardo Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of San Marcos, Restaurant Services, Inc., Restaurants of America, Inc., Sonic Industries Services Inc., South Gate Wings, LLC d/b/a Hooters of South Gate, The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, The Fresh Market, Inc., United Supermarkets, LLC, Wawa, Inc., Wings Over Long Beach, LLC d/b/a Hooters of Long Beach. No party information provided (Gore, Kristin)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4422 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Upon agreement of the parties, the Court enters the following briefing schedule for Defendant Rabobank's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Direct Action Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint #4369 : Direct Action Plaintiffs shall file their response briefs in opposition to Rabobank's motion to dismiss on or before 3/29/2021. The Rabobank Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss on or before 4/12/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4421 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for leave to file documents under seal #4418 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4420 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Pilgrim's Pride Corporation Defendants' Consolidated Answer and Defenses to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Amended and Consolidated Complaint (Mahan, Carrie)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4419 NOTICE of Motion by Carrie C. Mahan for presentment of (Mahan, Carrie)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4418 MOTION by Defendant Pilgrim's Pride Corporation to seal Defendants' Consolidated Answer and Defenses to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Amended and Consolidated Complaint (Mahan, Carrie)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4417 Defendants' Consolidated ANSWER to Complaint by Direct Action Plaintiffs by Agri Stats, Inc., Amick Farms, LLC, Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Equity Group Eufaula Division LLC, Equity Group Kentucky Division LLC, Equity Group-Georgia Division LLC, Fieldale Farms Corporation, Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, George's Farms, Inc., George's Inc., Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia, LLC, Keystone Foods LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meats Co., Inc., Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc., Mar-Jac Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, LLC, Mountainaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, Inc., Mountainaire Farms, LLC, Norman W. Fries, Inc., d/b/a Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., Peco Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Wayne Farms, LLC(Mahan, Carrie)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4416 STIPULATION regarding amended document #4244 (Joint Stipulation Regarding Answers to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint) (Zarlenga, Carmine)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4415 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Thurston Foods, Inc. (Laytin, Daniel)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4414 STIPULATION Concerning Waiver of Service re Feeser's Inc. (Laytin, Daniel)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4413 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #4412 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 1207 pending before Judge Dow be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )