Vargas v. Stateville Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Gilberto A. Vargas
Defendant: Richards, Calmes, Bill, John Doe, Pork, Bobby, Durrant, Virginia, Jerry, Bubash, Stateville Correctional Center, Whitfield, Trujullo, Jones, Wendy, Brown, Wimp, Les and Garrante
Case Number: 1:2018cv06068
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gilberto A. Vargas by Ethan Edward Trull (Trull, Ethan)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MAILED a copy of this order #5 to Stateville Correctional Center's trust fund officer. Also, mailed a copy of this order #5 to Plaintiff, the PACER Service Center at http://www.pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/register.html, and the Systems Department of the Northern District of Illinois. (kp, )
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The trust fund officer at Plaintiff s facility is directed to make deductions from Plaintiff's trust account in accordance with this order. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the Stateville Correctional Center's trust fund officer. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is granted. Ethan Edward Trull, Nixon Peabody LLP, 70 W. Madison Suite 3500 Chicago, 60602 IL, (312) 977-4400, is recruited to represent Plaintiff in accordance with counsel's trial bar obligations under N.D. Ill. Local Rules 83.11 (h) and 83.37. Within 21 days of this order, counsel should enter an appearance for Plaintiff. Within 60 days, counsel should file an amended complaint, if he is able to do so consistent with his Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 obligations. As recruited counsel falls within the class of users listed in the Electronic Public Access fee schedule adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States, he shall be exempt from the payment of fees for access via PACER to the electronic case files maintained in this Court for this case and any prior cases filed in this Court by Plaintiff. Counsel should open a separate PACER account to only be used for the above-captioned case. Counsel shall not be exempt from the payment of fees incurred in connection with other uses of the PACER system in this Court. This exemption is valid immediately and for the duration of counsel's participation in the matter. This exemption may be revoked at the discretion of the Court at any time. Counsel should contact the PACER Service Center at 1-800-676-6856 or via the link below to create the new PACER account and to make any necessary arrangements for the waiver. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff, the PACER Service Center at http://www.pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/register.html, and the Systems Department of the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 10/5/2018. Mailed notice. (kp, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Gilberto A. Vargas for attorney representation. (smm)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gilberto A. Vargas for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Gilberto A. Vargas. (smm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Stateville Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bubash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trujullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wimp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto A. Vargas
Represented By: Ethan Edward Trull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?