Steele v. Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores

Plaintiff: Jamie Steele
Defendant: Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores and Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv06856
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 12/11/2018 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk)
October 17, 2018 10 NOTICE by Target Corporation re answer to complaint #9 (Burke, Robert)
October 17, 2018 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation(Burke, Robert)
October 15, 2018 8 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to all counsel of record. (smm)
October 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (pj, )
October 12, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores by Catherine Powers Gorman (Gorman, Catherine)
October 12, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores by Michael Joseph Linneman (Linneman, Michael)
October 12, 2018 5 JURY Demand (Burke, Robert)
October 12, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores by Robert Michael Burke (Burke, Robert)
October 12, 2018 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burke, Robert)
October 12, 2018 2 NOTICE by Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores re notice of removal #1 (Burke, Robert)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018 l 007776) filed by Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15051956. (Burke, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation, a foreign corporation d/b/a Target Stores
Represented By: Michael Joseph Linneman
Represented By: Robert Michael Burke
Represented By: Catherine Powers Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Michael Joseph Linneman
Represented By: Robert Michael Burke
Represented By: Catherine Powers Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Steele
Represented By: Osvaldo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?