People Of The State Of Illinois et al v. Sterigenics U.S., LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois and Robert Berlin
Defendant: Sterigenics U.S., LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv08010
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Sterigenics U.S., LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Robert Berlin, Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois to remand its Case Against Defendant to State Court #28 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kelly, Gerard)
January 18, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file a joint status report and to strike the January 30, 2019 status hearing #32 is granted in part and denied in part. The initial status date of 1/30/19 is reset to 4/2/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed Motion NOTICE of Motion by Stephen J. Sylvester for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #32 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sylvester, Stephen)
January 17, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiffs Robert Berlin, Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois for extension of time to file Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report and to Strike the January 30, 2019 Status Date (Sylvester, Stephen)
January 4, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff filed a motion to remand its case against Defendant to state court #28 . Sterigenics U.S. is ordered to file a response by 1/25/2019. Plaintiff may file a reply brief by 2/8/2019. The court will rule by mail. No appearance is necessary on 1/8/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
January 3, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen J. Sylvester for presentment of motion to remand #28 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sylvester, Stephen)
January 3, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Robert Berlin, Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois in support of motion to remand #28 its Case Against Defendants to State Court (Sylvester, Stephen)
January 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiffs Robert Berlin, Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois to remand its Case Against Defendant to State Court (Sylvester, Stephen)
January 2, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterigenics U.S., LLC by Kate F Lambert (Lambert, Kate)
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program by Daniel I. Rottenberg (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rottenberg, Daniel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program by Stephen J. Sylvester (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sylvester, Stephen)
January 2, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program by Elizabeth A. Wallace (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Wallace, Elizabeth)
January 2, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program of Matthew J. Dunn (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Dunn, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Vaci, Gregory)
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Smith, Lisa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois by Daniel Isaac Rottenberg (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Rottenberg, Daniel)
December 11, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Joint motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead 14 days after the Court's ruling on the notice of removal and Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to remand #12 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 1/30/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff People Of The State Of Illinois by Gregory E. Vaci (Vaci, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff People Of The State Of Illinois by Lisa Ann Smith (Smith, Lisa)
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Sterigenics U.S., LLC re notice of removal, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Disk, Exhibit E) (Document Not Scanned). (aee, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sterigenics U.S., LLC (Kelly, Gerard)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Gerard David Kelly for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Kelly, Gerard)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Sterigenics U.S., LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Joint) (Kelly, Gerard)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois by Elizabeth A. Wallace (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certifcate of Service)(Wallace, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois by Matthew Joseph Dunn (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Dunn, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Lisa Madigan, People Of The State Of Illinois by Stephen J. Sylvester (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Sylvester, Stephen)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
December 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterigenics U.S., LLC by Stephanie C. Stern (Stern, Stephanie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterigenics U.S., LLC by Gerard David Kelly (Kelly, Gerard)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterigenics U.S., LLC by Elizabeth M. Chiarello (Chiarello, Elizabeth)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sterigenics U.S., LLC by Maja C. Eaton (Eaton, Maja)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Eaton, Maja)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Dupage County, Illinois, case number (2018CH001329) filed by Sterigenics U.S., LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15246810. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Eaton, Maja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People Of The State Of Illinois et al v. Sterigenics U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Daniel Isaac Rottenberg
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Dunn
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wallace
Represented By: Stephen J. Sylvester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Of The State Of Illinois
Represented By: Daniel Isaac Rottenberg
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Dunn
Represented By: Lisa Ann Smith
Represented By: Gregory E. Vaci
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wallace
Represented By: Stephen J. Sylvester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Berlin
Represented By: Lisa Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterigenics U.S., LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Chiarello
Represented By: Stephanie C. Stern
Represented By: Maja C. Eaton
Represented By: Gerard David Kelly
Represented By: Kate F Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?