Sharifeh et al v. Fox Jr.

Appellant: Haifa Sharifeh, Soad Wattar and Haifa Kaj
Appellee: Horace Fox Jr.
Debtor In Possession: Richard Sharif
Case Number: 1:2018cv08508
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY by Appellee Horace Fox Jr. to motion to remand, #21 (Block, Bradley)
February 11, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Appellee's motion to remand #21 is taken under advisement. Given the filing of a response #29 , Appellee is given until 2/19/2019 to file a reply. The Court will issue a ruling by mail on all pending motions. The notice of motion date of 2/12/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Haifa Sharifeh, Soad Wattarin Opposition to MOTION by Appellee Horace Fox Jr. to remand #21 (Salem, M.)
February 10, 2019 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 4/11/2018, 6/26/2018, 6/27/2018, 6/28/2018, 6/29/2018, 7/2/2018 and 8/15/2018 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
February 10, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY by Appellee Horace Fox Jr. to motion to dismiss #8 (Block, Bradley)
February 10, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY by Appellee Horace Fox Jr. to motion to compel #10 (Block, Bradley)
February 6, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Appellants Haifa Sharifeh, Soad Wattar to motion to dismiss #8 appeal from orders granting attorneys' fees (Salem, M.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Appellants Haifa Sharifeh, Soad Wattar to motion to compel #10 (Attachments: #1 Transcript Order Form, #2 Emails of Received Transcripts)(Salem, M.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Amended Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 BK Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Bruce E. de'Medici for presentment of motion to remand, #21 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/12/2019 at 09:15 AM. (de'Medici, Bruce)
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Appellee Horace Fox Jr. to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Order Disposing of Remanded Issues, #2 Supplement Part II of Exh A, #3 Supplement Part III of Exh A, #4 Supplement Part IV of Exh A)(de'Medici, Bruce)
February 4, 2019 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Horace Fox Jr. re response in opposition to motion, #18 (de'Medici, Bruce)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Horace Fox Jr.in Opposition to MOTION by Appellants Haifa Sharifeh, Soad Wattar to set a briefing schedule and either prohibiting any further use of the bankruptcy estate assets for attorneys fees, or in the alternative, limit the amount of attorneys fees that can be used in this #4 (de'Medici, Bruce)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court adopts the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule for appeal #16 . Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Briefing Schedule by Horace Fox Jr. (Block, Bradley)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellee2 ROA part12 (USBC-Green, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant and Appellee Designation of Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion by Horace Fox, Jr. as Trustee, Appellee, to dismiss appeal #8 and motion to compel Appellant to comply with Fed. R. BankR. P. 8009 #10 are taken under advisement; responses are due 2/6/2019; replies are due 2/13/2019; the Court will issue a ruling by mail. No appearances are necessary on 1/24/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Bruce E. de'Medici for presentment of motion to compel #10 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/24/2019 at 09:15 AM. (de'Medici, Bruce)
January 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Appellee Horace Fox Jr. to compel with Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit Designation Record | Statement of Issues, #3 Exhibit Emails)(de'Medici, Bruce)
January 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Bruce E. de'Medici for presentment of motion to dismiss #8 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/24/2019 at 09:15 AM. (de'Medici, Bruce)
January 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Appellee Horace Fox Jr. to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit Orders in appeal)(de'Medici, Bruce)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Appellant's motion for an order setting a briefing schedule and prohibiting any further attorneys' fees expenses by the bankruptcy trustee #4 is taken under advisement. In regard to a briefing schedule, counsel are to confer and submit on the docket no later than 1/28/2019 an agreed proposed briefing schedule for this appeal. In regard to the remainder of the motion, responses are due by 2/1/2019; reply is due by 2/8/2019. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. Notice of motion date of 1/22/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Horace Fox Jr. by Bradley Stephen Block (Block, Bradley)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by M. James Salem for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule, #4 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/22/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Salem, M.)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Appellants Haifa Sharifeh, Soad Wattar to set a briefing schedule and either prohibiting any further use of the bankruptcy estate assets for attorneys fees, or in the alternative, limit the amount of attorneys fees that can be used in this appeal, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Salem, M.)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3))(sxb, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )
December 28, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (pj, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 09B05868 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharifeh et al v. Fox Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Haifa Sharifeh
Represented By: M. James Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Soad Wattar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Haifa Kaj
Represented By: M. James Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Horace Fox Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Block
Represented By: Bruce E. de'Medici
Represented By: Ean Lane Kryska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: Richard Sharif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?