Viirre v. Walgreen Co. et al

Plaintiff: Michael A Viirre
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00062
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case was filed in federal court based on a claim of diversity of citizenship. However, the complaint identifies only the state of residence of the plaintiff, not his state of citizenship (the two are not necessarily the same), and it does not identify the principal place of business of defendant Walgreen Co. Plaintiff is directed to file, by 3/5/2019, an amended complaint curing these omissions. If plaintiff does not do so, the Court may dismiss the case for lack of a sufficient allegation of subject matter jurisdiction. (mk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 3/7/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Corbett, James)
January 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Corbett, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Janes A Corbett; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15335171. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit D)(Corbett, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viirre v. Walgreen Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Viirre
Represented By: James William Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?