Stoller v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Stoller
Defendant: Marco Flores, Lisa T. Damico, Richard Galanti, Melrose Park Police Department, John Doe's 1 thru 10, Christine Carlson, Law Offices of Lisa T Damico Esq., Patricio Omar Chavez, Ron Vachri, Sonny Hicotera, Mary Ramiez Taconi, Paul Moulton, Anthony J Prignano, Timothy Rose, Thomas J. Pontikis, James Murphy, Village of Melrose Park, Chris Barbarino, Ronald M Serpico, Sam C. Pitassi, Dennis Zook, Bradley C. Nahrstadt, Michael DeCarlo Jr, Joseph Portera, Mary Ann Paolantonio, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Kenneth Denman, Jeffrey H. Lipe, Greg Killian, Anthony N Abruzzo, James Hamilton, Jaime Angulano, Lipe Lyons Murrphy & Pontikis Ltd., Ron Galanti, Raymond Lyons, Jr., Jeff Erickson, John McKay, Franz Lazarus, Edward J. Murphy, Arturo Mota, W. Craig Jelinch, Matt Harris and Damico Law
Case Number: 1:2019cv00140
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jeffrey H. Lipe, Lipe Lyons Murrphy & Pontikis Ltd., Raymond Lyons, Jr., Edward J. Murphy, Bradley C. Nahrstadt, Thomas J. Pontikis by Jordan Keith Cray (Cray, Jordan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jeffrey H. Lipe, Lipe Lyons Murrphy & Pontikis Ltd., Raymond Lyons, Jr., Edward J. Murphy, Bradley C. Nahrstadt, Thomas J. Pontikis by Daniel K. Cray (Cray, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 5/14/2019 at 9:00 a.m. All Defendants are given until 5/3/2019 to file their answers and motions to dismiss. Mailed notice (cdh, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chris Barbarino, Christine Carlson, Patricio Omar Chavez, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Kenneth Denman, Jeff Erickson, Richard Galanti, Ron Galanti, James Hamilton, Matt Harris, W. Craig Jelinch, Greg Killian, Franz Lazarus, John McKay, Paul Moulton, James Murphy, Joseph Portera, Timothy Rose, Ron Vachri, Dennis Zook by David F. Ryan (Ryan, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chris Barbarino, Christine Carlson, Patricio Omar Chavez, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Kenneth Denman, Jeff Erickson, Richard Galanti, Ron Galanti, James Hamilton, Matt Harris, W. Craig Jelinch, Greg Killian, Franz Lazarus, John McKay, Paul Moulton, James Murphy, Joseph Portera, Timothy Rose, Ron Vachri, Dennis Zook by Jayne Bart-Plange (Bart-Plange, Jayne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chris Barbarino, Christine Carlson, Patricio Omar Chavez, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Kenneth Denman, Jeff Erickson, Richard Galanti, Ron Galanti, James Hamilton, Matt Harris, W. Craig Jelinch, Greg Killian, Franz Lazarus, John McKay, Paul Moulton, James Murphy, Joseph Portera, Timothy Rose, Ron Vachri, Dennis Zook by John William Patton, Jr (Patton, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chris Barbarino, Christine Carlson, Patricio Omar Chavez, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Kenneth Denman, Jeff Erickson, Richard Galanti, Ron Galanti, James Hamilton, Matt Harris, W. Craig Jelinch, Greg Killian, Franz Lazarus, John McKay, Paul Moulton, James Murphy, Joseph Portera, Timothy Rose, Ron Vachri, Dennis Zook by James Alexander Garfield (Garfield, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 27 STATUS Report by Anthony N Abruzzo, Jaime Angulano, Lisa T. Damico, Michael DeCarlo Jr, Sonny Hicotera, Melrose Park Police Department, Arturo Mota, Mary Ann Paolantonio, Sam C. Pitassi, Anthony J Prignano, Ronald M Serpico, Mary Ramiez Taconi, Village of Melrose Park (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Zimmer, K.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lisa T. Damico by Sean Michael Sullivan (Sullivan, Sean)
February 28, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lisa T. Damico by K. Austin Zimmer (Zimmer, K.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: On the Court's own motion, the status hearing set for 2/28/2019 is stricken and reset to 3/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael DeCarlo Jr. Michael DeCarlo Jr waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sam C. Pitassi. Sam C. Pitassi waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Anthony J Prignano. Anthony J Prignano waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arturo Mota. Arturo Mota waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mary Ramiez Taconi. Mary Ramiez Taconi waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jaime Angulano. Jaime Angulano waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sonny Hicotera. Sonny Hicotera waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Anthony N Abruzzo. Anthony N Abruzzo waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mary Ann Paolantonio. Mary Ann Paolantonio waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald M Serpico. Ronald M Serpico waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melrose Park Police Department. Melrose Park Police Department waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Village of Melrose Park. Village of Melrose Park waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Zimmer, K.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthony N Abruzzo, Jaime Angulano, Michael DeCarlo Jr, Sonny Hicotera, Melrose Park Police Department, Arturo Mota, Mary Ann Paolantonio, Sam C. Pitassi, Anthony J Prignano, Ronald M Serpico, Mary Ramiez Taconi, Village of Melrose Park by Sean Michael Sullivan (Sullivan, Sean)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthony N Abruzzo, Jaime Angulano, Michael DeCarlo Jr, Sonny Hicotera, Melrose Park Police Department, Arturo Mota, Mary Ann Paolantonio, Sam C. Pitassi, Anthony J Prignano, Ronald M Serpico, Mary Ramiez Taconi, Village of Melrose Park by K. Austin Zimmer (Zimmer, K.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS Report by Christopher Stoller (Exhibits). (aee, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 2/28/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Christopher Stoller; Notice. (aee, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Stoller by Philip M. Kiss. (aee, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Christopher Stoller. (aee, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Stoller; Jury Demand (Exhibits). (aee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoller v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Stoller
Represented By: Philip M. Kiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa T. Damico
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Galanti
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melrose Park Police Department
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's 1 thru 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Carlson
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Lisa T Damico Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricio Omar Chavez
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Vachri
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Hicotera
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ramiez Taconi
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Moulton
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J Prignano
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Rose
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Pontikis
Represented By: Daniel K. Cray
Represented By: Jordan Keith Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Murphy
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Melrose Park
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Barbarino
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M Serpico
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam C. Pitassi
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Zook
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley C. Nahrstadt
Represented By: Daniel K. Cray
Represented By: Jordan Keith Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael DeCarlo Jr
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Portera
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Paolantonio
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Denman
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey H. Lipe
Represented By: Daniel K. Cray
Represented By: Jordan Keith Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Killian
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony N Abruzzo
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hamilton
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Angulano
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipe Lyons Murrphy & Pontikis Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel K. Cray
Represented By: Jordan Keith Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Galanti
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Lyons, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel K. Cray
Represented By: Jordan Keith Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Erickson
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McKay
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franz Lazarus
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Murphy
Represented By: Daniel K. Cray
Represented By: Jordan Keith Cray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Mota
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Craig Jelinch
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Harris
Represented By: Jayne Bart-Plange
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Represented By: James Alexander Garfield
Represented By: David F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damico Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?