Alvarez v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Alejandra Alvarez
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00211
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Target Corporation (Mateo, Gray)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation by Kelsey J Schmidt (Schmidt, Kelsey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation by Gray Adames Mateo (Mateo, Gray)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Alejandra Alvarez. Target Corporation waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Peraica, Anthony)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 3/14/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
January 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alejandra Alvarez by Anthony J. Peraica (Peraica, Anthony)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alejandra Alvarez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15362008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peraica, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Gray Adames Mateo
Represented By: Kelsey J Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Alvarez
Represented By: Anthony J. Peraica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?