Mudd v. Dart et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Mudd
Defendant: Brady, Ogrodnik, Barajas, Walsch, Tom Dart and Torres
Case Number: 1:2019cv00219
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT by Jeremy Mudd. (Envelope not post marked) (nsf, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is taken under advisement. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, he must (1) explain in writing and under oath why he should be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis, and (2) submit a certified trust fund statement showing activity in his account from December 29, 2018, to the date he responds to this order. If Plaintiff has been incarcerated at more than one facility since December 29, 2018, he must provide a certified trust fund account statement from each facility at which he was incarcerated. Alternatively, he may pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee; payment may be made by check or money order payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Failure to comply with this order by March 6, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also is advised that he promptly must submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. The Court defers consideration of Plaintiff's complaint and motion for attorney representation until his fee status has been resolved. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/6/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jeremy Mudd of Change of Address. (Envelope post marked 1/29/19) (nsf, ) ( Case number not on document) Modified on 2/5/2019 (nsf, ).
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jeremy Mudd of Change of Address(Envelope post marked 1/16/19)(Case number not on document) (nsf, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED, sent to Jeremy Mudd returned as undeliverable, return to sender. New address found, re-mailed to R-45116, Stateville N.R.C., P.O. Box 112, Joliet, IL 60434 (lma, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Jeremy Mudd for attorney representation. (smm, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Jeremy Mudd for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Jeremy Mudd. (Envelope not postmarked). (smm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mudd v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogrodnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?