Sheppard v. Dart et al

Plaintiff: David Sheppard
Defendant: Cook County, The Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board, Zelda Whittler, Gregory Ernst, Bradley Curry, Thomas J. Dart, County of Cook and Kim Foxx
Case Number: 1:2019cv00296
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED complaint by David Sheppard against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board Decision)(Casper, Cass)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 3/12/19. The parties are to exchange MIDP disclosures by 5/3/19; initial written discovery requests are to be served by 5/31/19; the deadline to amend the pleadings and join parties is 8/2/19. Fact discovery shall close on 10/31/19. Plaintiff's consolidated complaint shall be due by 3/15/19. Defendants answer or response pleading shall be due by 4/12/19. Status hearing set for 6/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff David Sheppard. (Casper, Cass)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board by Lyle Kevin Henretty (Henretty, Lyle)
February 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE By Plaintiff's Attorney Cass T. Casper Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Standing Order (Casper, Cass)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 3/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 19, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Sheppard by Cass Thomas Casper (Casper, Cass)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, County of Cook, Bradley Curry, Thomas J. Dart, Gregory Ernst, Kim Foxx, The Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board, Zelda Whittler by Timothy L. Swabb (Swabb, Timothy)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018 L 006939; 2018 CH 14277) filed by Cook County, County of Cook, Bradley Curry, Thomas J. Dart, Gregory Ernst, Kim Foxx, The Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board, Zelda Whittler Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4624217087. (smm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheppard v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County
Represented By: Timothy L. Swabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board
Represented By: Timothy L. Swabb
Represented By: Lyle Kevin Henretty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zelda Whittler
Represented By: Timothy L. Swabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ernst
Represented By: Timothy L. Swabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Curry
Represented By: Timothy L. Swabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Dart
Represented By: Timothy L. Swabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Cook
Represented By: Timothy L. Swabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Foxx
Represented By: Timothy L. Swabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sheppard
Represented By: Cass Thomas Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?