Ortiz v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: David Ortiz
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00727
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1355
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED, for document #3 sent to David Ortiz returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Re-mailed to #46884-424, Oxford-FCI, P.O. Box 1000, Oxford, WI 53952. (kb, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendnant's motion for extension of time to respond to petitioner's Section 2255 motion #5 is granted as follows: Respondent's response shall be filed by 4/26/19. Petitioner's reply in support shall be filed by 5/28/19. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant United States Of America for extension of time to file response/reply as to received complaint #1 (Babu, Kavitha)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 MAIL RETURNED, for document #3 sent to David Ortiz returned as undeliverable, return to sender. New address found, re-mailed to #46884-424, Oxford-FCI, P.O. Box 1000, Oxford, WI 53952. (kb, )
March 5, 2019 MAILED plaintiff copy of order dated 3/5/19 #3 and an in forma pauperis application. (tt, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff is given until March 27, 2019 to either to file an in forma pauperis application on the enclosed form or to pay the full $47.00 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application along with a copy of this order. If Plaintiff does not comply with this order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/5/2019. Mailed notice (tt, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (tt, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by David Ortiz. (Envelope not postmarked; institution mail room 1/31/19) (tt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kavitha J Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?