Perrong v. Prosper Trading Academy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Perrong
Defendant: Scott Bauer and Prosper Trading Academy, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03871
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held. Plaintiff having filed an amended complaint, Defendant Bauer's motion to dismiss #17 is stricken as moot. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the amended complaint by 8/13/2019. Discovery schedule: MIDP are due by 9/13/2019; written discovery to issue by 9/27/2019; final supplementation of MIDP 1/31/2020; fact discovery closes on 2/28/2020. Status hearing set for 11/20/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrew Perrong by Joseph J Jacobi (Jacobi, Joseph)
July 26, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrew Perrong by Avi Robert Kaufman (Kaufman, Avi)
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrew Perrong by Avi Robert Kaufman (Kaufman, Avi)
July 25, 2019 Filing 20 First AMENDED complaint by Andrew Perrong against Scott Bauer, Prosper Trading Academy, LLC (Paronich, Anthony)
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Richard A. Saldinger for presentment of motion to dismiss #17 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Saldinger, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Scott Bauer in support of motion to dismiss #17 complaint (Saldinger, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Scott Bauer to dismiss Complaint (Saldinger, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Prosper Trading Academy, LLC (Saldinger, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Prosper Trading Academy, LLC(Saldinger, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 7/23/19. Mailed notice (mw, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scott Bauer, Prosper Trading Academy, LLC by Mark Bryan Goldstein (Goldstein, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scott Bauer, Prosper Trading Academy, LLC by Richard A. Saldinger (Saldinger, Richard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Ian Howard Fisher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/11/2019 at 01:45 PM. (Fisher, Ian)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Scott Bauer, Prosper Trading Academy, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 AGREED MOTION (Fisher, Ian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Perrong as to Scott Bauer on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Nicgorski, Alan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Perrong as to Prosper Trading Academy, LLC on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Nicgorski, Alan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 8/13/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 8/6/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
June 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Scott Bauer, Prosper Trading Academy, LLC. (kb, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrew Perrong by Anthony Paronich (Paronich, Anthony)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrew Perrong by Michael C. Lueder (Lueder, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrew Perrong by Alan W. Nicgorski (Nicgorski, Alan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nicgorski, Alan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Andrew Perrong; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15912696.(Nicgorski, Alan)
June 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrong v. Prosper Trading Academy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bauer
Represented By: Ian Howard Fisher
Represented By: Mark Bryan Goldstein
Represented By: Richard A. Saldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosper Trading Academy, LLC
Represented By: Ian Howard Fisher
Represented By: Mark Bryan Goldstein
Represented By: Richard A. Saldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Perrong
Represented By: Alan W. Nicgorski
Represented By: Michael C. Lueder
Represented By: Anthony Paronich
Represented By: Avi Robert Kaufman
Represented By: Joseph J Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?