American Train Dispatchers Association et al v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, System Council 16, National Conference of Fireman & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Mechanical Division, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, Transportation Communications UNION/IAM, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees, Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, American Train Dispatchers Association and International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04361
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Mechanical Division by Richard S. Edelman (Edelman, Richard)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees, Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen by Richard S. Edelman (Edelman, Richard)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Joint status report due by 8/30/2019. Status hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/2/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, System Council 16, National Conference of Fireman & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU by Michael S. Wolly (Wolly, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, Transportation Communications UNION/IAM by Elizabeth A. Roma (Roma, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees, Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Mechanical Division, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, System Council 16, National Conference of Fireman & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Transportation Communications UNION/IAM by Ryan A Hagerty (Hagerty, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees, Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Mechanical Division, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, System Council 16, National Conference of Fireman & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Transportation Communications UNION/IAM by Joel Abbott D'Alba (D'Alba, Joel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Affiliation Statement by American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees, Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Mechanical Division, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, System Council 16, National Conference of Fireman & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Transportation Communications UNION/IAM (D'Alba, Joel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (D'Alba, Joel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Mechanical Division, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees, Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division, National Conference of Fireman & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, System Council 16, American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Transportation Communications UNION/IAM, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15979341. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(D'Alba, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Train Dispatchers Association et al v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, System Council 16
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Michael S. Wolly
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Conference of Fireman & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Michael S. Wolly
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Mechanical Division
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transportation Communications UNION/IAM
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees, Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Michael S. Wolly
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Train Dispatchers Association
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Michael S. Wolly
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Represented By: Ryan A Hagerty
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?