Pittman v. Viamonte Investments Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Pittman, Jr.
Defendant: Northern Illinois Gas Company, Barbara P. Christopher, Peretta Oscar, Viamonte Investments Group, LLC, Nicor Gas Company, Melvin Williams, Housing Authority of Cook County, Salvador Ruiz, Mr. Williams and Anne Richmond
Case Number: 1:2019cv04732
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Correction regarding #7 . (jh, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST Amended Complaint by Ricardo Pittman, Jr. (Exhibits) (jh, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Housing Authority of Cook County, Anne Richmond, Salvador Ruiz. (jh, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED Complaint by Ricardo Pittman, Jr. (Exhibits) (jh, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 9/25/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction regarding Entry dated 7/22/2019. (jh, )
July 22, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR. (jh, ) Modified on 7/22/2019 (jh, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ricardo Pittman, Jr. (jh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ricardo Pittman, Jr. (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. Viamonte Investments Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Illinois Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara P. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peretta Oscar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viamonte Investments Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicor Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Pittman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?