Fels v. State of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Alexander A. Fels
Defendant: Arlene Jezirny, Autozone Inc, Kwame Radul, Kristen Collier Wright, William Rhodes, Michael Madigan, Phillip B. Danielle, J.B. Pritzker, Mark A. Finestone, State of Illinois, William T. Giles and Lori Lightfoot
Case Number: 1:2019cv06187
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to apprize the court of other mitigating factors by Plaintiff Alexander A. Fels (pk, )
October 28, 2019 MAILED a copy of the order dated 10/28/2019 #12 to plaintiff Alexander A. Fels; EMAILED a copy of the order dated 10/28/2019 #12 to attorney Berdelle, the PACER Service Center, and the Systems Department of the Northern District ofIllinois. (sxb, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Ann E. Pille's motion to withdraw her appearance as appointed counsel #11 is granted. The Court recruits attorney James J. Berdelle of the law firm Ruberry, Stalmack & Garvey, LLC, 10 S. LaSalle Street, Suite 1800, Chicago, IL 60603, (312) 466-8050, james.berdelle@rsg-law.com, to represent Plaintiff in accordance with counsel's trial bar obligations under the District Court's Local Rules 83.11(h) and 83.37. By 12/2/2019, counsel shall file his appearance. By 12/30/2019, counsel should file a brief status report indicating whether he intends to proceed with the complaint or file an amended complaint assuming he can do so consistent with his Rule 11 obligations. Status hearing set for 12/17/2019 is stricken and reset to 1/7/2020 at 9:45 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and to Attorney Berdelle. Counsel is encouraged to visit the Court's Pro Bono web page at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Pages.aspx?page=ProBono (case sensitive) for various resources related to pro bono representation. The recruited attorney falls within the class of users listed in the Electronic Public Access fee schedule adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States, therefore, the above named-attorney shall be exempt from the payment of fees for access via PACER to the electronic case files maintained in the court for the above captioned-case only. The recruited attorney is directed to open a separate PACER account to only be used for this case, and fees are exempt for this case only. The assigned attorney shall not be exempt from the payment of fees incurred in connection with other uses of the PACER system in this court. This exemption is valid immediately and for the duration of the attorney's participation in the matter. This exemption may be revoked at the discretion of the Court at any time. The attorney shall contact the PACER Service Center at 1-800-676-6856 or via the link below to create the new PACER account and to make any necessary arrangements for the waiver. A copy of this order shall be set to the PACER Service Center at http://www.pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/register.html. A copy of this order shall also be sent to the Systems Department of the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/28/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Statement of Ann E. Pille Regarding Appointment and Notification of Potential Conflict STATEMENT by Alexander A. Fels (Pille, Ann)
October 10, 2019 EMAILED copy of Order dated 10/10/19 to Ann Elizabeth Pille. (gcy, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court recruits attorney, Ann Elizabeth Pille of Reed Smith LLP, 10 South Wacker Drive, 40th Floor, Chicago, IL 60606, (312) 207-1000, apille@reedsmith.com, to represent Plaintiff in accordance with counsel's trial bar obligations under the District Court's Local Rules. By11/12/2019, counsel shall file her appearance. By 12/11/2019, counsel should file a brief status report indicating whether she intends to proceed with the complaint or file an amended complaint assuming she can do so consistent with her Rule 11 obligations. Status hearing set for 12/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiffand to Attorney Pille. Counsel is encouraged to visit the Court's Pro Bono web page at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Pages.aspx?page=ProBono (case sensitive) for various resources related to pro bono representation. The recruited attorney falls within the class of users listed in the Electronic Public Access fee schedule adopted by the Judicial Conference of the UnitedStates, therefore, the above named-attorney shall be exempt from the payment of fees for access via PACER to the electronic case files maintained in the court for the above captioned-case only. The recruited attorney is directed to open a separate PACER account to only be used for this case, and fees are exempt for this case only.The assigned attorney shall not be exempt from thepayment of fees incurred in connection with other uses of the PACER system in this court. This exemption is valid immediately and for the duration of the attorney's participation in the matter. This exemption may be revoked at the discretion of the Court at any time. The attorney shall contact the PACER Service Center at 1-800-676-6856 or via the link below to create the newPACER account and to make any necessary arrangements for the waiver. A copy of this order shall be set to the PACER Service Center at http://www.pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/register.html. A copy of this order shall also be sent to the Systems Department of the Northern District ofIllinois. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/10/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT filed by Alexander A. Fels; Jury Demand. (Exhibits) (ph, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Plaintiff is advised that if he chooses to do so, he may make an appointment to obtain free attorney assistance by scheduling an appointment with the William J. Hibbler Pro Se Assistance Program, 219 S. Dearborn, 20th floor, or by calling (312) 435-5691. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on October 4, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED Complaint and one (1) copy by Alexander A. Fels (Exhibits) (ek, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Alexander A. Fels for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (sxb, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Alexander A. Fels (sxb, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 9 copies by Alexander A. Fels (Exhibits) (sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fels v. State of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Jezirny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwame Radul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Collier Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip B. Danielle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Finestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander A. Fels
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Pille
Represented By: James J. Berdelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?