American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago et al v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Ann Brash, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ray Campbell and Maureen Heneghan
Defendant: City of Chicago, Lori Lightfoot, in her official capacity as Mayor of the City of Chicago, Thomas Carney, in his official capacity as Acting Commissioner of the Chicago Department of Transportation, Chicago Department of Transportation, Thomas Carney and Lori Lightfoot
Case Number: 1:2019cv06322
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendants' motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiffs' amended complaint up to and including 12/12/19 #25 is granted. Motion hearing set for 11/1/19 is stricken; no appearance required. Mailed notice (mjc, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Peter Hardt Cavanaugh for presentment of extension of time #25 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Cavanaugh, Peter)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION by Defendants Thomas Carney, Chicago Department of Transportation, City of Chicago, Lori Lightfoot for extension of time (Cavanaugh, Peter)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Thomas Carney, Chicago Department of Transportation, City of Chicago, Lori Lightfoot by Peter Hardt Cavanaugh (Cavanaugh, Peter)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ann Brash, Ray Campbell, Maureen Heneghan by Christina Brandt-Young (Brandt-Young, Christina)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ann Brash, Ray Campbell, Maureen Heneghan by Michelle Caiola (Caiola, Michelle)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Application to appear pro hac vice #6 of Michelle Caiola is withdrawn. Ms. Caiola is admitted to practice in the Northern District of Illinois. Application to appear pro hac vice of Christina Brandt-Young as counsel for plaintiffs #7 is granted. Counsel is directed to file their appearance. The scheduling conference set for 1/17/2020 is stricken, the scheduling conference set for 1/31/2020 to stand. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 1/31/2020 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 1/28/2020. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ray Campbell, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash as to Thomas Carney on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Telman, Nigel)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ray Campbell, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash as to Chicago Department of Transportation on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Telman, Nigel)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ray Campbell, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash as to City of Chicago on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Telman, Nigel)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ray Campbell, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash as to Lori Lightfoot on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Telman, Nigel)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Thomas Carney, Chicago Department of Transportation, City of Chicago, Lori Lightfoot. (jg, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First AMENDED complaint by Ray Campbell, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash against All Defendants (Telman, Nigel)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 1/14/2020. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ray Campbell as to Thomas Carney, in his official capacity as Acting Commissioner of the Chicago Department of Transportation on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Telman, Nigel)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ray Campbell as to Lori Lightfoot, in her official capacity as Mayor of the City of Chicago on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Telman, Nigel)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ray Campbell as to Chicago Department of Transportation on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Telman, Nigel)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ray Campbell as to City of Chicago on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Telman, Nigel)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ann Brash, Ray Campbell, Maureen Heneghan by Jelena Kolic (Kolic, Jelena)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16266005. (Brandt-Young, Christina)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16265990. (Caiola, Michelle)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ann Brash, Ray Campbell, Maureen Heneghan by Holly Renae Morris (Morris, Holly)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ann Brash, Ray Campbell, Maureen Heneghan by Edward Chester Young (Young, Edward)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ann Brash, Ray Campbell, Maureen Heneghan by Nigel F. Telman (Telman, Nigel)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Telman, Nigel)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Maureen Heneghan, Ann Brash, American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago, Ray Campbell; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16262034.(Telman, Nigel)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Lori Lightfoot (mc, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago Department of Transportation, City of Chicago, Thomas Carney(mc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago et al v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Brash
Represented By: Holly Renae Morris
Represented By: Nigel F. Telman
Represented By: Edward Chester Young
Represented By: Jelena Kolic
Represented By: Michelle Caiola
Represented By: Christina Brandt-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Council of The Blind of Metropolitan Chicago
Represented By: Holly Renae Morris
Represented By: Nigel F. Telman
Represented By: Edward Chester Young
Represented By: Jelena Kolic
Represented By: Michelle Caiola
Represented By: Christina Brandt-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Campbell
Represented By: Holly Renae Morris
Represented By: Nigel F. Telman
Represented By: Edward Chester Young
Represented By: Jelena Kolic
Represented By: Michelle Caiola
Represented By: Christina Brandt-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Heneghan
Represented By: Holly Renae Morris
Represented By: Nigel F. Telman
Represented By: Edward Chester Young
Represented By: Jelena Kolic
Represented By: Michelle Caiola
Represented By: Christina Brandt-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Peter Hardt Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Lightfoot, in her official capacity as Mayor of the City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Carney, in his official capacity as Acting Commissioner of the Chicago Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Department of Transportation
Represented By: Peter Hardt Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Carney
Represented By: Peter Hardt Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Lightfoot
Represented By: Peter Hardt Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?