Blassingame et al v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Justin Harris, Jaden Fields, Jeremy Harris and Jolanda Blassingame
Defendant: Donald Kroski, John Hroma, Gerald Lee, Michael Padalino, Kevin Sellers, Paul Meagher, City of Chicago and City of Chicago, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv07287
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On the Court's own motion, the initial status conference set for 1/7/20 is stricken and reset for 2/27/20 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by John Hroma, Donald Kroski, Gerald Lee, Paul Meagher, Michael Padalino, Kevin Sellers re status report #31 - Joint Initial Status Report (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
January 3, 2020 Filing 31 STATUS Report - Joint Initial Status Report by City of Chicago, The, John Hroma, Donald Kroski, Gerald Lee, Paul Meagher, Michael Padalino, Kevin Sellers (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Donald Kroski, Gerald Lee, Paul Meagher, Kevin Sellers by Megan Kathleen Monaghan (Monaghan, Megan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Donald Kroski, Gerald Lee, Paul Meagher, Kevin Sellers by Lawrence S. Kowalczyk (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
December 12, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants' joint motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to the complaint #26 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The plaintiffs have leave to file an amended complaint by 1/14/20. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is due 2/18/20. Mailed notice (air, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence S. Kowalczyk for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #26 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
December 11, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendants John Hroma, Donald Kroski, Gerald Lee, Paul Meagher, Michael Padalino, Kevin Sellers for extension of time to file answer - Defendants' Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Complaint (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
December 11, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael Padalino by Megan Kathleen Monaghan (Monaghan, Megan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael Padalino by Lawrence S. Kowalczyk (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant officers' motion for enlargement of time to answer or otherwise plead #21 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant officers' answer or responsive pleading is now due 12/18/19. The initial status report is extended to 1/3/20; the initial status hearing remains scheduled for 1/7/20 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence S. Kowalczyk for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #21 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant John Hroma for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 - Defendant Officers' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Hroma by Megan Kathleen Monaghan (Monaghan, Megan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Hroma by Lawrence S. Kowalczyk (Kowalczyk, Lawrence)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motion for extension of time to file an answer #16 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant City of Chicago's answer or responsive pleading is now due 12/18/19. The initial status report is now due on 12/18/19 and the initial status conference is reset to 1/7/20 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by John A. Wall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #16 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wall, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago, The for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wall, John)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, The by Lance C. Malina (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Malina, Lance)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, The by John A. Wall (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Wall, John)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, The by Anthony George Becknek (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Becknek, Anthony)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 12/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 12/10/19. Mailed notice (air, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Harris, Jaden Fields, Jolanda Blassingame, Justin Harris as to Kevin Sellers on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Harris, Jaden Fields, Jolanda Blassingame, Justin Harris as to Michael Padalino on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Harris, Jaden Fields, Jolanda Blassingame, Justin Harris as to Paul Meagher on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Harris, Jaden Fields, Jolanda Blassingame, Justin Harris as to Gerald Lee on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Harris, Jaden Fields, Jolanda Blassingame, Justin Harris as to Donald Kroski on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Harris, Jaden Fields, Jolanda Blassingame, Justin Harris as to John Hroma on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Harris, Jaden Fields, Jolanda Blassingame, Justin Harris as to City of Chicago on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Hofeld, Al)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
November 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City of Chicago, John Hroma, Donald Kroski, Gerald Lee, Paul Meagher, Michael Padalino, and Kevin Sellers. (acm, )
November 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jolanda Blassingame, Jaden Fields, Jeremy Harris, Justin Harris by Al Hofeld, Jr (Hofeld, Al)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hofeld, Al)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jeremy Harris, Jaden Fields, Jolanda Blassingame, Justin Harris; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16407568.(Hofeld, Al)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blassingame et al v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Kroski
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hroma
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Lee
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Padalino
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Sellers
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Meagher
Represented By: Lawrence S. Kowalczyk
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, The
Represented By: John A. Wall
Represented By: Anthony George Becknek
Represented By: Lance C. Malina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Harris
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaden Fields
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Harris
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolanda Blassingame
Represented By: Al Hofeld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?