Ott v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Donald Ott
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00900
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Walgreen Co. (Manuel, Katherine)
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT - ANSWER to Complaint by Walgreen Co.(Manuel, Katherine)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 JURY Demand (Kulwin, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Donald Ott by Jeffrey R. Kulwin (Kulwin, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Amended motion to for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. The time for Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to 3/6/2020. Motion hearing set for 2/18/2020 #9 is stricken. Dkt. 8 is terminated as motion because it is a notice of motion. The status hearing set for 3/2/2020 #5 is stricken. Unless excused by the MIDP Standing Order, MIDP disclosures shall be served by 4/6/2020. Initial status hearing set for 4/30/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 4/23/2020.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Walgreen Co. to amend/correct Motion for An Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Furlong, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Vincent Furlong for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Furlong, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION by Defendant Walgreen Co. for extension of time to file answer (Furlong, Michael) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office). Modified on 2/12/2020 (aee, ).
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/2/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walgreen Co. by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael)
February 7, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walgreen Co. by Katherine A. Manuel (Manuel, Katherine)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Furlong, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the Nineteenth Judicial Circuit, Lake County, IL, case number (2019L00000965) filed by Walgreen Co. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16703176. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Furlong, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ott v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ott
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Kulwin
Represented By: Diana C. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Michael Vincent Furlong
Represented By: Katherine A. Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?