Clemons v. Ron et al
Plaintiff: Dawrence E. Clemons
Defendant: Hain Ron, Ducay, McKanna, Conklin, Directo and Pedro Ibarra
Case Number: 1:2020cv04568
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's revised application to proceed in forma pauperis #8 is denied. Plaintiff is given leave to file a complete application on or before October 30, 2020. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case. See Statement for details. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 10/1/2020.Mailed notice (nsf, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Dawrence E. Clemons for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Additional pages) (Envelope post marked 9/3/2020) (rp, )
August 17, 2020 MAILED Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of order #7 dated 8/14/2020. (ph, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, he must either: (1) pre-pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00; or (2) submit a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with this order. Failure to comply by September 18, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the Court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this case for failure to comply with a Court order and for want of prosecution. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's complaint #1 and related pleadings #4 until his fee status is resolved. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/14/2020. Mailed notice (ph, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Dawrence E. Clemons for attorney representation (rc, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Dawrence E. Clemons for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (rc, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (rc, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Dawrence E. Clemons; Jury Demand. (Exhibits) (Envelope not postmarked) (rc, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Ron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hain Ron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawrence E. Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?