Sashital et al v. SEVA Beauty, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Davis, Mark Ferguson and Mahesh Sashital
Defendant: SEVA Beauty, LLC and Kari Comrov
Case Number: 1:2020cv04692
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendants' motion for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages #15 is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Michael Scott Davis, Mark Ferguson, Mahesh Sashitalin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants SEVA Beauty, LLC, Kari Comrov to dismiss or Compel Arbitration #16 (Loftus, Alexander)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants SEVA Beauty, LLC, Kari Comrov to dismiss or Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moran, Patrick)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Kari Comrov, SEVA Beauty, LLC for leave to file Brief in Excess of Fifteen Pages (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moran, Patrick)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Telephone motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order, preliminary injunction and/or declaratory judgment #5 is taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' motion for an expedited hearing on Plaintiffs' emergency motion for a temporary restraining order, preliminary injunction and/or declaratory judgment #7 is taken under advisement as well. Defendants' response to the motion filed in state court shall be filed by 8/17/2020. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by 8/21/2020. Counsel shall submit copies of their filings to this court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michael Scott Davis, Mark Ferguson, Mahesh Sashital to Response, #12 (Loftus, Alexander)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Defendants Kari Comrov, SEVA Beauty, LLC to motion for preliminary injunction, #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Group 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Certificate of Service)(Dellacroce, Marissa)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file oversized brief #6 is granted. Plaintiffs' motions for preliminary injunction #5 and for an expedited hearing #7 are entered and continued to 8/14/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 877-336-1839 and the access code is 6708061. Counsel of record will receive an email 10 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Scott Davis, Mark Ferguson, Mahesh Sashital by Alexander Nicholas Loftus (Loftus, Alexander)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Scott Davis, Mark Ferguson, Mahesh Sashital by David Alan Eisenberg (Eisenberg, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Scott Davis, Mark Ferguson, Mahesh Sashital to expedite (Loftus, Alexander)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Scott Davis, Mark Ferguson, Mahesh Sashital for leave to file excess pages (Loftus, Alexander)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Scott Davis, Mark Ferguson, Mahesh Sashital for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E-1, #5 Exhibit E-2, #6 Exhibit F-K)(Loftus, Alexander)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kari Comrov, SEVA Beauty, LLC by Marissa Louise Dellacroce (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dellacroce, Marissa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kari Comrov, SEVA Beauty, LLC by Patrick Frasor Moran (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moran, Patrick)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Moran, Patrick)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (2020CH05088) filed by Kari Comrov, SEVA Beauty, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17299703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Group A)(Moran, Patrick)
August 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sashital et al v. SEVA Beauty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVA Beauty, LLC
Represented By: Marissa Louise Dellacroce
Represented By: Patrick Frasor Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Comrov
Represented By: Marissa Louise Dellacroce
Represented By: Patrick Frasor Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Davis
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Loftus
Represented By: David Alan Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ferguson
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Loftus
Represented By: David Alan Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahesh Sashital
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Loftus
Represented By: David Alan Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?