Brennecke v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Jenise Brennecke
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv04845
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Cole
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) by Keith S. Shindler on behalf of Jenise Brennecke (Shindler, Keith)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 Agreed Discovery Schedule by Target Corporation (Gorman, Catherine)
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Judge Tharp has referred the case here for discovery scheduling and supervision and any settlement conference #16 . The parties should submit no later than 9/25/20, an agreed upon discovery schedule. If the parties cannot agree on a schedule, it will be set by the Court. Counsel should contact the Court should any difficulties arise during depositions. I can be reached by a call to my courtroom deputy, Yulonda Thomas, at 312-408-5178, and she will arrange for me to participate in the phone call. Telephone Status Conference is set for 12/2/20 at 10:00am to discuss the progress of discovery. Counsel should call (888) 684-8852, access code 5618926.#. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions. Mailed notice (yt)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jenise Brennecke by Fedor Kozlov (Kozlov, Fedor)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery scheduling and supervision and any settlement conference.(air, )Mailed notice.
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This matter is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for all discovery scheduling and supervision, as well as for any settlement conference the parties may seek. Mailed notice (air, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 STATUS Report - Joint Initial Status Report by Target Corporation (Gorman, Catherine)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation by Catherine Powers Gorman (Gorman, Catherine)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status reports, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==] and to submit an initial status report by 9/8/20. The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Mailed notice (air, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation(Burke, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jenise Brennecke by Keith S. Shindler (Shindler, Keith)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jenise Brennecke by Keith S. Shindler (Shindler, Keith)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation by Michael Joseph Linneman (Linneman, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation by Shana Jackson Scheid (Scheid, Shana)
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 JURY Demand (Burke, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Target Corporation by Robert Michael Burke (Burke, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burke, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020L063059) filed by Target Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17339026. (Burke, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennecke v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Shana Jackson Scheid
Represented By: Robert Michael Burke
Represented By: Catherine Powers Gorman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Linneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenise Brennecke
Represented By: Fedor Kozlov
Represented By: Keith S. Shindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?