Perry et al. v. Heisner et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Martinez, John Thompson, Fernando Rodriguez, Lennie Perry and Romeo C. Blackman
Defendant: T. Miller, T. Holt-Nicholson, MacDonald, Sgt. D. Taylor, J. Valle, Shelby, A. Wallace, Warden Russel Heisner, Strickland, P. Robinson, K. Eaton, Wattier, Zaida Iris Ndife, Jane Doe Lab Tech, O. Roman, S Bowers, T. Canada, J. Russell, J.A. Dunn, C. Hurt, L. Samora-Martinez, L. Clarke-Williams, J. Harris, Kimball, Ms. Wallace, J. Burns, Hess, Brij Mohan, D. Cweta and T Grullon
Case Number: 1:2020cv07502
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 MAILED copy of Order dated 2/11/21 w/Amended Complaint to Lennie Perry. (gcy, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The Court denies Plaintiff Lennie Perry's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #9 because Plaintiff Perry has "struck out" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), and the events underlying his claims to dismisses the complaint #1 without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to: (1) dismiss and terminate all Plaintiffs except Plaintiff Perry, without prejudice to the dismissed Plaintiffs initiating separate lawsuits as to their own experiences; (2) terminate as moot all pending motions brought by the dismissed Plaintiffs #3 #5 #6 #11 #12 #13 ; (3) amend the docket to reflect that Perry is the sole Plaintiff; (4) turn off future notices to the dismissed Plaintiffs; and (5) send Plaintiff Perry an amended civil rights complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and a copy of this order. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action individually, he must, by March 12, 2021: (1) pay the $402 filing fee by check or money order payable to the Clerk of Court;(2) submit an amended complaint on the Court's required form; and (3) submit a completed USM-285 form for each Defendant. If he fails to comply with the foregoing directives by that date, the Court will dismiss this case. Perry's numerous letters #7 #8 #10 #14 #15 are stricken. Piecemeal amendments to complaints are not allowed. See Flannery v. Recording Indus. Ass'n of Am., 354 F.3d 663, 638 n.1 (7th Cir. 2004). Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied as premature. See Pickett v. Chicago Transit Auth., 930 F.3d 869, 871 (7th Cir. 2019). Plaintiff may renew his motion for attorney assistance once he has submitted an acceptable complaint. Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/11/2021. Mailed notice(gcy, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER from Lennie Perry. (Attachments). (Envelope postmark date 2/1/21). (gcy, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER from Fernando Rodriguez. (Envelope postmark date 1/29/21). (gcy, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 20 PRISONER Correspondence to add additional documents/exhibits of the more policies and practices violations amounting g to criminal offenses filed by Lennie Perry. (Exhibits) (Envelope Postmarked 1/20/2021/Institution Mailroom dated 1/20/2021) (jh, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 EXHIBIT by Lennie Perry. (Envelope postmark date 1/14/21. (gcy, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Correction [9,10].] (gcy, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Correction #1 . (gcy, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Lennie Perry. (Envelope postmark date 1/12/21). (gcy, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER from Lenny Perry. (Attachments). (Envelope postmark date 1/5/21 (gcy, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER from Lennie Perry. (gcy, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Manuel Martinez for attorney representation. (gcy, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Manuel Martinez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit (Envelope postmark date 12/31/20). (gcy, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Romeo C. Blackman for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (Attachments). (Envelope postmark dated 12/29/20). (gcy, ) Modified on 1/11/2021 (gcy, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Lennie Perry. (Attachments). ((Envelope postmark date 12/18/20). (gcy, ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/21/2021) (gcy, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lennie Perry for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (Attachments). (Envelope postmark date 12/18/20). (gcy, ) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/21/2021) (gcy, ).
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Lennie Perry. (Attachments). (Envelope postmark date 12/15/20). (gcy, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from Lennie Perry. (Attachments). (Envelope postmark date 12/10/20). (gcy, ) Modified on 12/22/2020 (gcy, ).
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Romeo C. Blackman for attorney representation. (gcy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Fernando Rodriguez for attorney representation. (gcy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Lennie Perry for attorney representation. (gcy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Fernando Rodriguez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (Attachments). (gcy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Romeo C. Blackman, Manuel Martinez, Lennie Perry, Fernando Rodriguez, John Thompson. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibits))(gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al. v. Heisner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Holt-Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Russel Heisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wattier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaida Iris Ndife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Lab Tech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Samora-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Clarke-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brij Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Cweta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Grullon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennie Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo C. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?