Calavan v. First Love International Ministries et al
Plaintiff: KATHERINE CALAVAN
Defendant: LOVING INDEED, INC., PHILIP GUSKE, ROBERT OPPERMAN, PHOEBE WILHELM, FIRST LOVE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES, JERRY WINSLOW, ROBERT CLINTON, DALE GRAY, STEVEN JOHNSON, THOMAS CLINTON, JOHN DOE CO-CONSPIRATORS 1-100 and PAUL LONER
Case Number: 1:2021cv00185
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Katherine Calavan. Loving Indeed, Inc. waiver sent on 2/16/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phoebe Wilhelm by Nicholas Kenton Fedde (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Fedde, Nicholas)
February 11, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phoebe Wilhelm by Andrew M Cook (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Cook, Andrew)
February 11, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phoebe Wilhelm by Christiane Elizabeth Murray (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Murray, Christiane)
February 11, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phoebe Wilhelm by Emily Erin Schnidt (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Schnidt, Emily)
February 11, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phoebe Wilhelm by Whitney Newton Hutchinson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hutchinson, Whitney)
February 11, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phoebe Wilhelm by Timothy P Scahill (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Scahill, Timothy)
February 11, 2021 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phoebe Wilhelm by Steven Blair Borkan (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Borkan, Steven)
February 9, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendants' unopposed joint motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 3/15/2021 #19 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 3/18/2021 at 10:00 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants Robert Clinton, Thomas Clinton, First Love International Ministries, Dale Gray, Philip Guske, Steven Johnson, Paul Loner, Robert Opperman, Jerry Winslow for extension of time to file answer Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hutchinson, Whitney)
February 8, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Clinton, Thomas Clinton, First Love International Ministries, Dale Gray, Philip Guske, Steven Johnson, Paul Loner, Robert Opperman, Jerry Winslow by Nicholas Kenton Fedde (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Fedde, Nicholas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Clinton, Thomas Clinton, First Love International Ministries, Dale Gray, Philip Guske, Steven Johnson, Paul Loner, Robert Opperman, Jerry Winslow by Andrew M Cook (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Cook, Andrew)
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Clinton, Thomas Clinton, First Love International Ministries, Dale Gray, Philip Guske, Steven Johnson, Paul Loner, Robert Opperman, Jerry Winslow by Christiane Elizabeth Murray (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Murray, Christiane)
February 8, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Clinton, Thomas Clinton, First Love International Ministries, Dale Gray, Philip Guske, Steven Johnson, Paul Loner, Robert Opperman, Jerry Winslow by Emily Erin Schnidt (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Schnidt, Emily)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Clinton, Thomas Clinton, First Love International Ministries, Dale Gray, Philip Guske, Steven Johnson, Paul Loner, Robert Opperman, Jerry Winslow by Whitney Newton Hutchinson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hutchinson, Whitney)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Clinton, Thomas Clinton, First Love International Ministries, Dale Gray, Philip Guske, Steven Johnson, Paul Loner, Robert Opperman, Jerry Winslow by Timothy P Scahill (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Scahill, Timothy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Clinton, Thomas Clinton, First Love International Ministries, Dale Gray, Philip Guske, Steven Johnson, Paul Loner, Robert Opperman, Jerry Winslow by Steven Blair Borkan (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Borkan, Steven)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Calavan as to Paul Loner on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Calavan as to Phoebe Wilhelm on 1/20/2021, answer due 2/10/2021. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Calavan as to Thomas Clinton on 1/16/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Calavan as to Robert Clinton on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Calavan as to Robert Opperman on 1/20/2021, answer due 2/10/2021. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Calavan as to Dale Gray on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Calavan as to First Love International Ministries on 1/16/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Thomas Clinton (txl, )
January 13, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ROBERT CLINTON, FIRST LOVE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES, DALE GRAY, PAUL LONER, LOVING INDEED, INC., ROBERT OPPERMAN, PHOEBE WILHELM, JERRY WINSLOW (jg, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KATHERINE CALAVAN by Michael J. Summerhill (Summerhill, Michael)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KATHERINE CALAVAN by Elizabeth A. Fegan (Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by KATHERINE CALAVAN; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17820499.(Fegan, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calavan v. First Love International Ministries et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOVING INDEED, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP GUSKE
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT OPPERMAN
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOEBE WILHELM
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST LOVE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY WINSLOW
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CLINTON
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALE GRAY
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN JOHNSON
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS CLINTON
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CO-CONSPIRATORS 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL LONER
Represented By: Christiane Elizabeth Murray
Represented By: Timothy P Scahill
Represented By: Nicholas Kenton Fedde
Represented By: Andrew M Cook
Represented By: Whitney Newton Hutchinson
Represented By: Emily Erin Schnidt
Represented By: Steven Blair Borkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE CALAVAN
Represented By: Michael J. Summerhill
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?