May 27, 2022 |
Filing 16
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Joseph A. Shaw as to Jacob Otto on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022; Erin Stokes on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form - Erin Stokes)(rc, )
|
April 21, 2022 |
Filing 15
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 4/21/2022. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Defendants' motions to dismiss #13 , #14 . Plaintiff shall respond to the motions by 6/7/2022. Defendants shall reply by 6/28/2022. Discovery is stayed, with the caveat that discovery for the limited purpose of identifying and locating any unnamed defendants may proceed. By 6/30/2022, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth any progress that has been made toward identifying the unidentified defendants and any issues the parties believe require a status hearing prior to 7/7/2022. Telephonic status hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
|
April 18, 2022 |
Filing 14
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Jimenez, Gustavo)
|
April 11, 2022 |
Filing 13
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Tom Dart (Wilson, Rachael)
|
March 29, 2022 |
Filing 12
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: At the emailed request of the parties, the telephonic status hearing set for 4/21/2022 is reset for 4/21/2022 at 9:15 AM. (TIME CHANGE ONLY). Mailed notice (dal, )
|
March 29, 2022 |
Filing 11
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing set for 3/31/2022 is stricken and reset for 4/21/2022 at 9:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
|
March 23, 2022 |
Filing 10
STATUS Report Joint Initial by Corey Joseph A. Shaw (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence)
|
March 23, 2022 |
Filing 9
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tom Dart by Rachael Denae Wilson (Wilson, Rachael)
|
March 15, 2022 |
Filing 8
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Erin Stokes. Erin Stokes waiver sent on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Jimenez, Gustavo)
|
March 15, 2022 |
Filing 7
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jacob Otto. Jacob Otto waiver sent on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Jimenez, Gustavo)
|
March 15, 2022 |
Filing 6
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes by Gustavo Angel Jimenez (Jimenez, Gustavo)
|
February 8, 2022 |
Filing 5
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Marshal as to Tom Dart waiver sent on 2/8/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (kl, )
|
January 31, 2022 |
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Tom Dart, Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes. Forwarded to U.S. Marshal via email. (kl, )
|
January 31, 2022 |
Filing 4
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court finds that Plaintiff is unable to pay the fees associated with filing this action and thus the filing fee is waived. The U.S. Marshal is appointed to serve Defendants. The Clerk is directed to issue summonses for service on Defendants by the U.S. Marshal. The Marshals Service shall communicate with Plaintiff's counsel of record regarding effecting service. The Court advises Plaintiff's counsel that a completed USM-285 form is required for service on each Defendant. Alternatively, Plaintiff's counsel may elect to serve Defendants or request waivers of service on his own. Telephonic status hearing set for 3/31/2022 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
|
January 29, 2022 |
Filing 3
APPLICATION by Plaintiff Corey Shaw for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Redmond, Lawrence)
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing 2
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Redmond, Lawrence)
|
January 28, 2022 |
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
|
January 28, 2022 |
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached
|
January 25, 2022 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT filed by Corey Shaw; Jury Demand. (Redmond, Lawrence)
|