Flemming v. Gaetz et al
Plaintiff: Ron Flemming
Defendant: Mrs Brown, Director Godinez, Donald Gaetz, Shah Vipin and IDOC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00761
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/2/13. (sgp)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING 42 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING 32 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Christine Brown. Defendant Brown is accordingly DISMISSED with prejudice from this action. This case shall proceed against only Vipin Shah, M.D. The Defendant is listed as Shah Vipin on the Courts docket sheet, however, his name is actually Vipin Shah. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to correct the spelling of Defendant Vipin Shahs name. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 06/17/13. (klh2)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 31 Motion to Preserve Qualified Immunity Defense. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/10/13. (sgp)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to United States Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson, DENYING 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Defendants DONALD GAETZ, DIRECTOR GODINEZ, and the ILLINOIS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS are DISMISSED with prejudice. Count 1 may proceed . The Clerk of Court SHALL PREPARE for Defendants MRS. BROWN and SHAH VIPIN: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 9/14/12. (bjw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flemming v. Gaetz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Gaetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shah Vipin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?