J.B. et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: J. B., T. B., Corkey P. Burks, Monique Benjamin, E. A., Irene Aguilar, C. A., Christy Perry, L. B., Ivy Babbit, K. B., Sheri Beauchaine, Z. B., Lisa Bennett, B. B., Amy Harris, Derek Bruce, Natalya Bunich, Tiffany Burroughs, J. C., Joseph Carpenter, JoDee Carpenter, L. D., Lisa Gavazzi, D. D., Lori Dziedzic, C. E., Buffie Ellis, L. G., Rachel Gerstner, T. H., Tahirah Bryant, Z. H., A. H., Sandra Hernandez, Jessie Hobson, B. H., Lillie Hopkins, O. H., Tracey Hosea, A. K., Dana Thompson, L. P., Kimberly Coffey, N. R., Janella Rogers, J. F., Michelle Leal, A. E., G. E., Amanda Erpelding, N. G., Amy Griffin, Lindsey James, L. L., Jaclyn Langer, B. L., C. L., Jaime Bailey, A M. M., Julie Lemmond, G. L., Rana Lee, K. M., Claudia Melnick, P. M., Lisa Modling, D. N., Heidi Denney, Danny Oakley, Amy Obermann, C. P., Angela Pettway, N. P. R., Velmarie Rodriguez Acevedo, J. R., Dawn Flinders, Blaise Romeo, J. S., Teresa Tuttle, Ashley Shamblin, Tyler Smith, S. S., Erika Snow, Alisha Steinmetz, Elizabeth Still, J. T., Janice Thomas, Amy Lambert, C. V., Mary McAllen Vu, C. B., Trudy Murray, R. B., Tyler Bridgewater-Robinson, D. B., Heidi Brown, D. C., Angela Hardy, Katelyn Courtney, Jennifer Courtney, A. D., Kathy Ehorn, R. D., Cynthia Doty, R. F., Maureen O'Connor, M. F., Denise Francis, M. L., D. P., Lisa Parr, Z. S., LaQuonda Tooles, E. S., Katrina Standifer, Larry St. Jules III, S. Y., Susan Yarber, B. D., Sonya Harris and Mechelle Hitt
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Petitioner: T. B-L
Case Number: 3:2013cv00134
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 OMNIBUS ORDER GRANTING 146 Defendants' motion for summary judgment regarding the Michigan product liability statutory immunity, and DENYING 169 Defendants' motion for leave to file a reply. The proposed reply was not considered as part of the Court's analysis. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) as to Plaintiffs Tiffany Burroughs, Jamie Bailey, and minor Plaintiffs T.B-L. and G.L. The Clerk of Court is further directed to remove these Plaintiffs from the lead consolidated case (Case No. 12-CV-52). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/25/2017. (jmw)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING 149 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: INDIANA STATUTE OF REPOSE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly and terminate the applicable Plaintiffs from the lead case. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/11/2017. (jmw)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND. Plaintiffs shall file one unified amended complaint alleging all claims and parties in one document on or before November 4, 2016. Defendant shall have until on or before November 10, 2016 to file a unified amended answer. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/28/2016.(jmw).
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/6/2013. Mailed notice(vcf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/7/2013.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.B. et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Ralph D. McBride
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corkey P. Burks
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Benjamin
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Ralph D. McBride
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. A.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Aguilar
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. A.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Perry
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Mark Ekonen
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: Amanda Scott Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Babbit
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Mark Ekonen
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: Amanda Scott Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Beauchaine
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Bennett
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Harris
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Bruce
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalya Bunich
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Burroughs
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carpenter
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoDee Carpenter
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. D.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Gavazzi
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. D.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Dziedzic
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. E.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Mark Ekonen
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: Amanda Scott Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffie Ellis
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. G.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Gerstner
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. H.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahirah Bryant
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. H.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. H.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Hernandez
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Hobson
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. H.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Hopkins
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. H.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Mark Ekonen
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: Amanda Scott Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Hosea
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Mark Ekonen
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: Amanda Scott Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Thompson
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. P.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Coffey
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. R.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janella Rogers
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. F.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Leal
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. E.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Mark Ekonen
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: Amanda Scott Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. E.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Mark Ekonen
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: Amanda Scott Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Erpelding
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Mark Ekonen
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: Amanda Scott Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. G.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Griffin
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey James
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. L.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Langer
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. L.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. L.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Bailey
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A M. M.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Lemmond
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. L.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rana Lee
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. M.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Melnick
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. M.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Modling
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. N.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Denney
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Oakley
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Obermann
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. P.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Pettway
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. P. R.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velmarie Rodriguez Acevedo
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. R.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Flinders
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaise Romeo
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. S.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Tuttle
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Shamblin
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Smith
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. S.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Snow
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Steinmetz
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Still
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. T.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Thomas
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lambert
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. V.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McAllen Vu
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Murray
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Bridgewater-Robinson
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. B.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Brown
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. C.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hardy
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Courtney
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Courtney
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. D.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Ehorn
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. D.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Doty
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. F.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen O'Connor
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. F.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Francis
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. L.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. P.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Parr
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. S.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaQuonda Tooles
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. S.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Standifer
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry St. Jules III
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Yarber
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. D.
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Harris
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechelle Hitt
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Christopher F. Cueto
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer K. Scifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: T. B-L
Represented By: John T Boundas
Represented By: Sejal K. Brahmbhatt
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Nancy R McEvily
Represented By: Jeffrey D Meyer
Represented By: Heath A Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer Salim
Represented By: Phillip L Sampson, Jr
Represented By: Allen N. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Dan H. Ball
Represented By: Kathleen B. Barry
Represented By: Douglas A. Daniels
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Represented By: Michael B. MacWilliams
Represented By: Stefan Mallen
Represented By: Stephen E. Marshall
Represented By: Jason C. Rose
Represented By: Paul F. Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?