Johnson v. Archer Daniels Midland Company et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Johnson
Defendant: Amercian River Transportation Company LLC and Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01382
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/17/2018. (jdh)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Johnson (Lakin, Bradley)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley M. Lakin on behalf of Kevin Johnson (Lakin, Bradley)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Lakin does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1382-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (lmb)
July 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3614264.), filed by Kevin D Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lakin, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Archer Daniels Midland Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Johnson
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amercian River Transportation Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?