Norfleet v. Lashbrook et al
Plaintiff: Marc Norfleet
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook, John Doe, IDOC, Frank Lawrence, Angela Crain, Wexford Health Care Sources and Mr. Asselmeier
Case Number: 3:2018cv02085
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Marc Norfleet. (jaj)
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Disclosure of Settlement Funds by Marc Norfleet. (jaj)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Christopher L. Higgerson terminated. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/4/2019. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Hinal Akshay Patel on behalf of Jacqueline Lashbrook (Patel, Hinal)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Jacqueline Lashbrook. (Patel, Hinal)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Mr. Asselmeier waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (tjk)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Wexford Health Care Sources waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (tjk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Higgerson on behalf of Jacqueline Lashbrook (Higgerson, Christopher)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff has been without funds for six months, he is currently without funds, and he appears to have no means currently with which to pay an initial partial filing fee. Accordingly, the Court will not assess an initial partial filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4). Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/3/2018. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jacqueline Lashbrook waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (tjk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lashbrook on 11/29/2018. Waiver of Service due by 1/2/2019. (tjk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Asselmeier on 11/29/2018. Waiver of Service due by 1/2/2019. (tjk)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wexford on 11/29/2018. Waiver of Service due by 1/2/2019. (tjk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Marc Norfleet. (tjk)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counts 1-3 survive threshold review against Defendants Wexford, Asselmeier, Doe, and Lashbrook. Frank Lawrence, Angela Crain and IDOC terminated. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/28/2018. (tjk)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for issuance of a temporary restraining order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/28/2018. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 18-2085-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/16/2018. (jaj)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marc Norfleet. (jaj)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marc Norfleet.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfleet v. Lashbrook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Represented By: Christopher L. Higgerson
Represented By: Hinal Akshay Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Care Sources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Asselmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Norfleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?