Adamczyk v. Illinois et al
Petitioner: Lawrence Adamczyk
Respondent: Kwame Raoul, Warden Sullivan, State of Illinois, Rob Jefferys and IDOC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01399
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $2.14 received, receipt number 34625099664 (rah)
February 20, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Alter or Amend and MOTION for Reconsideration by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Alter or Amend and MOTION for Reconsideration by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
February 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Clarify by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE and MOTION to Copy by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re 10 Order Directing Prisoner Payment by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 12 Request for Waiver of Service. Document filed in the wrong case. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY STRICKEN: SECOND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Swells on 1/30/2020. Waiver of Service due by 3/2/2020. (tjk) Modified on 1/30/2020 (tjk). Modified on 1/31/2020 (jaj). Document deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case.
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Copy by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jsm2)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #3 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.14. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Big Muddy River Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/29/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jaj)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Adamczyk to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Adamczyk on 1/16/2020. Consent due by 2/6/2020 (tjk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Order. Document filed in error. Entry stricken. No further action required.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY STRICKEN - NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-1399-NJR. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/2/2020. (jaj) Modified on 1/2/2020 (jaj).
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. #3 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 6/1/2019 to 12/27/2019 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Big Muddy River Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 2/18/2020). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/2/2020. (tjk)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from USDC/SDIL to Petitioner informing him of case number and filing fee requirements. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed IFP, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jaj)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Lawrence Adamczyk. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamczyk v. Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kwame Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rob Jefferys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence Adamczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?