Adamczyk v. Illinois et al
Petitioner: Lawrence Adamczyk
Respondent: Kwame Raoul, Warden Sullivan, State of Illinois, Rob Jeffreys and IDOC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00063
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $2.14 received, receipt number 34625099664 (rah)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Alter or Amend and MOTION for Reconsideration by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Alter or Amend and MOTION for Reconsideration by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Clarify by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Lawrence Adamczyk (jaj)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Petitioner is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.14. The agency having custody of Petitioner is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from his account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Petitioner shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Petitioner shall forward payments from his account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Petitioner shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Big Muddy River Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/5/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Petitioner to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Petitioner on 1/15/2020. Consent due by 2/5/2020 (jaj)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from USDC/SDIL to Petitioner informing him of case number. (jaj)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Petitioner regarding Writ of Mandamus. (jaj)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lawrence Adamczyk. (jaj)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Lawrence Adamczyk.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamczyk v. Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kwame Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rob Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence Adamczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?