Employers and Operating Engineers Local 520 Pension Fund et al v. Ehret, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dale Keller, Michael Luhr, Eugene Kelley, Timothy Keeley, Operating Engineers Local 520 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Eugene Keely, Operating Engineers Local 520 Annuity Trust Fund, Charles Mahoney, David Baxmeyer, Henry Rohwedder, Michael Parkinson, Employers and Operting Engineers Local 520 Health and Welfare Fund, Eugene Keeley, Employers and Operating Engineers Local 520 Vacation Fund, Chad Goldschmidt, Steve Smith, David Kelly Brown, Ryan Fischer, Kenneth J. Kilian, Ken Toennies, Mark Johnson, Donald Ferrari and Employers and Operating Engineers Local 520 Pension Fund
Defendant: Ehret, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00777
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(lmt)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Status Conference held on 10/5/2020. Greg A. Campbell appears on behalf of Plaintiff. Bryan M. Kaemmerer appears on behalf of Defendant. The Court has reviewed the Joint Report of Parties and finds it conforms with the Local Rules established by the district court for the Southern District of Illinois. The report is accepted and will be made part of the docket. Status conference is set for Monday, March 8, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss the progress of discovery and referral to mediation. Instructions to join the call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted, enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 2945. (Court Reporter N/A.) (lmt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bryan M. Kaemmerer on 9/18/2020. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan M. Kaemmerer $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4283548 by on behalf of Ehret, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-777-MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Campbell, Greg) Unsealed on 9/10/2020 (cds).
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Campbell, Greg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE: All Plaintiffs was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, All Plaintiffs shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 9/9/2020 (cds)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties is due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted, enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 0452. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 6/26/2020. (rah)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Jury Trial Month set for September 2021 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty.(rah)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lammert, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ehret, Inc..(Lammert, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ehret, Inc.. (Lammert, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Lammert on behalf of Ehret, Inc. (Lammert, Andrew)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ehret, Inc.. (cds)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Plaintiffs. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-777-MAB. Consent due by 9/1/2020 (cds)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg A. Campbell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Campbell, Greg)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4250565.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(Campbell, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers and Operating Engineers Local 520 Pension Fund et al v. Ehret, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Keller
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Luhr
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Kelley
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Keeley
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 520 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Keely
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 520 Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Mahoney
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Baxmeyer
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Rohwedder
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Parkinson
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers and Operting Engineers Local 520 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Keeley
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers and Operating Engineers Local 520 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Goldschmidt
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Smith
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kelly Brown
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Fischer
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth J. Kilian
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Toennies
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ferrari
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers and Operating Engineers Local 520 Pension Fund
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ehret, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan M. Kaemmerer
Represented By: Andrew M. Lammert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?